David J. Long Jr. v. Review Publishing Limited Partnership
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92049862-CAN

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo David J. Long Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by David Long Dba The Taste Of South Jersey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David J. Long Jr. editor@tasteofsj.com
Space TTAB Attorney Placeholder pr@foodpresswire.com
v.
No Logo Review Publishing Limited Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Apple, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Trademark Docketing trademarks@dechert.com
Space Thomas R. La Perle glenn.gundersen@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space erik.bertin@dechert.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney ROBERTCOGGINS
Date in Location 27-AUG-08
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 37 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 36 Filed: 7/19/2010, Entered: None S
    Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
      LREF
      Blank 35 Filed: 6/29/2010, Entered: None T
      P's Response To D's Motion Dismiss
        LREF
        Blank 34 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None T
        D's Motion To Dismiss; Tm Rule2.132(a)
          LREF
          Blank 33 Filed: 6/25/2010, Entered: None T
          Change Of Correspondence Address
            LREF
            Blank 32 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None T
            Change Of Correspondence Address
              LREF
              Blank 31 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None T
              Returned Mail
                LREF
                Blank 30 Filed: 3/4/2010, Entered: None T
                Change Of Correspondence Address
                  LREF
                  Blank 29 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None X
                  Proceedings Resumed
                    LREF
                    Blank 28 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None M
                    D's Motion To Strike
                      LREF
                      Blank 27 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None T
                      # 24 & 26 Not Considered
                        LREF
                        Blank 26 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None T
                        P's Reply In Support Of Motion
                          LREF
                          Blank 25 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None T
                          D's Reply In Support Of Motion
                            LREF
                            Blank 24 Filed: 9/28/2009, Entered: None T
                            P's Mot To Amend Pleading & For Summary Judgment
                              LREF
                              Blank 23 Filed: 9/13/2009, Entered: None T
                              Change Of Correspondence Address
                                LREF
                                Blank 22 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None S
                                Suspended
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 21 Filed: 9/9/2009, Entered: None T
                                  P's Opposition/response To Motion
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 20 Filed: 8/19/2009, Entered: None M
                                    D's Motion For Sanctions
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 19 Filed: 7/13/2009, Entered: None T
                                      Trial Dates Reset
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 18 Filed: 6/22/2009, Entered: None S
                                        Suspended Pending Disp Of Outstndng Mot
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 17 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None M
                                          D's Motion To Compel Discovery
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 16 Filed: 2/24/2009, Entered: None T
                                            Initial Disclosures No Consideration
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 15 Filed: 2/20/2009, Entered: None T
                                              P's Initial Disclosures
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 2/17/2009, Entered: None T
                                                Change Of Correspondence Address
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/2008, Entered: None N
                                                  Answer
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None T
                                                    Trial Dates Reset
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None T
                                                      P's Opposition/response To Motion
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 11/11/2008, Entered: None M
                                                        P's Motion To Compel Discovery
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 9 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None M
                                                          D's Motion To Strike
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 8 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None T
                                                            P's Reply In Support Of Motion
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 7 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None T
                                                              D's Opposition/response To Motion
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 6 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None T
                                                                P's Notice Discov Conf Was Held
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 10/14/2008, Entered: None T
                                                                  P's Motion To Amend Pleading/amended Pleading
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 10/3/2008, Entered: None N
                                                                    Answer
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None T
                                                                      Pending, Instituted
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None T
                                                                        Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 8/23/2008, Entered: None N
                                                                          Filed And Fee
                                                                            LREF

                                                                            Statistics

                                                                            This case has been viewed 750 times.

                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                            Space
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                             
                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                            Need Password Help?