Think Computer Corporation v. Facebook, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 92050675-CAN

Tags

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Think Computer Corporation Think Computer Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Phillips, Erlewine & Given LLP

v.
Facebook, Inc. Facebook, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey Thomas Norberg +1 650 843 5889 +1 650 857 0663 jnorberg@cooley.com
Type Cancellation
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 12-MAR-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None T
Board's Decision: Dismissed W/ Prejudice
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None N
    Withdrawal Of Petition For Cancellation
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None T
      D's Opposition/response To Motion
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None T
        P's Motion To Consolidate
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None N
          Answer
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None T
            Change Of Correspondence Address
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None T
              Appearance
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None T
                Pending, Instituted
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None T
                  Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None N
                    Filed And Fee
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 917 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?