Spada Properties, Inc. v. Liberty Fruit Company, Inc.
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 94002391-CNU

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Liberty Fruit Company, Inc., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
No Logo Spada Properties, Inc., Applicant

Toggle Switch Represented by Klarquist Sparkman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James S. Leigh +1 503 226 7391 +1 503 228 9446 james.leigh@klarquist.com
No Logo Liberty Fruit Company, Inc., Registrant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hovey Williams LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael M. Elbein +1 913 647 9050 +1 913 647 9057 mme@hoveywilliams.com
Type Concurrent Use
Interlocutory Attorney JENNIFERKRISP
Date in Location 22-APR-09
Status Code 9
Location Code 845
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (2) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 10 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None T
Commr's Order Restricting Registration
    LREF
    Blank 9 Filed: 1/7/2010, Entered: None T
    Rn 2615855 Added To Proceeding
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 11/4/2009, Entered: None D
      Bd's Decision: Favorable To Applicant
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 6/2/2009, Entered: None T
        Applicant's Statement Of Concurrent Use Agreement
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None T
          Appearance
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 5/6/2009, Entered: None T
            Df's Corrected Certificate Of Service
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None T
              Df's Certificate Of Service
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None T
                Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None T
                  Pending, Instituted
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None T
                    Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 27 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?