Lee v. Mazzocheri et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00189-MMD-RJJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 17, 2016 at 10:16 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robin M Lee, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robin M Lee

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin M Lee
v.
No Logo Bill Boyd, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Ivana, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ivana Trump Mazzocheri"
No Logo John Waihee, Defendant
No Logo Julia Barton, Defendant
No Logo Kathie Chum, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1981
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 14 Order on Report and Recommendation,, Terminate Case addressed to Robin M. Lee. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 13 Order on Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order, addressed to Robin M. Lee. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
      CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Bill Boyd, Ivana Trump Mazzocheri, John Waihee, Julia Barton, Kathie Chum and against Robin M Lee with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 14 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Adopting 5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
          LREF
          Blank 13 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 Order. This Case shall proceed to the 5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None
            Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 9 Order, addressed to Robin M. Lee. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR) (Entered: 10/10/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/4/2012, Entered: None
              Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 7 Minute Order, addressed to Robin M. Lee. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR) (Entered: 10/05/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPT No.70121010000121749862 re 9 Order. (SLR) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER that a Hearing is set for 10/22/2012 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 6 MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 Order and 1 Application to Proceed In FormaPauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 9/26/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                    Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 7 Minute Order, addressed to Robin M. Lee. No New Address, Did Not Resend. (SLR) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston, on 9/12/2012. A document requesting a Court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter (see F.R.C.P. 7). Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Attachments: # 1 Letter from Robin M. Lee) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 09/12/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MOTION for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION filed by Plaintiff Robin M Lee. (SLR) Event type corrected on 8/27/2012 (SRK). (Entered: 06/06/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of the undersigned Magistrate Judge that this case be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Objections to R&R due by 6/9/2012 Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 5/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 5/23/2012. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Miranda M. Du for all further proceedings. Judge Larry R. Hicks no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:12-cv-00189-MMD -RJJ. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None
                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 2 Order. (SLR) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER Adopting 5 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/24/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 4/4/2012 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston re 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robin M Lee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 2/24/2012. Clerk shall serve a copy of this Order on the Plaintiff by certified mail, return receipt requested. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER Denying 6 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider 5 Order. This Case shall proceed to the 5 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Johnston on 10/23/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/6/2012, Entered: None
                                      MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robin M Lee. Motion ripe 2/6/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ECS) (Entered: 02/06/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 29 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?