Ryonet Corporation v. Lodsys, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-05205
District Judge Ronald B. Leighton, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 10, 2016 at 12:18 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ryonet Corporation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Rrylander & Associates PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt M. Rylander +1 360 750 9931 +1 360 397 0473 rylander@rylanderlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rylander & Associates, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark E. Beatty +1 360 750 9931 +1 360 397 0473 beatty@rylanderlaw.com
v.
No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Lodsys, LLC, Defendant
Unknown Role, Lodsys Holdings, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Donion Gill Huck & Goldfarb PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER on STIPULATION re 10 Stipulation DISMISSING this matter with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 05/04/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by parties. (Rylander, Kurt) (Entered: 05/03/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Rylander, Kurt) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None
        PRAECIPE to attach document (Notice of Appearance) by Defendants Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2012, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher M Huck on behalf of Defendants Lodsys Group, LLC, Lodsys, LLC. (Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 03/14/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT Joint Status Report due by 6/11/2012, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/29/2012, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/4/2012, by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) (Entered: 03/12/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. E-mailed to the US Patent Office. (Attachments: # 1 Patent Report Form completed by counsel.) (PM) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2012, Entered: None
                  Summons Issued electronically as to defendant Lodsys, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Summons - Lodsys Group, LLC) Note to Filer for future reference: please go to our website to download and save the most current version of the court Summons: AO-WAWD 440 (Rev. 8/11)(PM) (Entered: 03/09/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                    REPORT re 1 Complaint, AO 120 by Plaintiff Ryonet Corporation. (Rylander, Kurt) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/8/2012, Entered: None
                      COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against defendant(s) All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-2739373), filed by Ryonet Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-908 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B-834 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C-078 Patent, # 4 Exhibit D-565 Patent, # 5 Exhibit E-Letter, # 6 Civil Cover Sheet, # 7 Summons Lodsys, # 8 Summons Lodsys Group)(Rylander, Kurt) (Entered: 03/08/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 537 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?