USA v. Garrett
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-00918-L

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Elizabeth C. Hadden +1 619 557 7611 +1 619 557 7055 elizabeth.c.hadden@usdoj.gov
Space Charles Anthony O'Reilly +1 202 616 0115 +1 202 514 9623 charles.a.o'reilly@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher S. Strauss +1 202 514 5183 Christopher.s.strauss@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Fe S. Garrett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Erica K. Zunkel +1 619 234 8467 +1 619 687 2666 erica_zunkel@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 3/27/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1-20
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2) - Aiding and Assisting the Filing of False Income Tax Returns
Count 21-22
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - Filing a False Income Tax Return
Count 23-25
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203C.M
Offense Level 3
267203 - Willful Failure to Pay Tax (Misdemeanor)
Count 1s-20s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(2) - Aiding and Assisting the Filing of False Income Tax Returns
Count 21s-24s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - Filing a False Income Tax Return
Count 25s-30s
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7203C.M
Offense Level 3
267203 - Willful Failure to Pay Tax (Misdemeanor)
Def Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 60 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER to Move Defendant from WRDF/The GEO Group to the Metropolitan Correction Center as to Fe S. Garrett. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/12/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
    LREF
    Blank 59 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Order on Motion for HearingCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M. James Lorenz: Farettea Hearing held 9/3/2008. Dft's requests to have counsel represent her for all further matters granted. Court appoints Federal Defenders. Motion In Limine Hearing as to Fe S. Garrett held on 9/3/2008. Granting [26] Motion for Hearing regarding Dft's pro se status; granting [38] Motion to introduce summaries of voluminous evidence; granting subject to a Daubert Hearing [39] Motion to introduce summary expert witness testimony and granting request for reciprocal discovery; granting [41] Motion to Compel; granting [41] Motion to Preserve Evidence; reserving [41] Motion to supress statements; denying [41] Motion to Suppress Evidence; denying [41] Motion to Dismiss Indictment due to improper Grand Jury Instructions; denying without prejudice [41] Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial; reserving [41] Motion to dismiss indictment due to selective prosecution; denying [41] Motion to Dismiss the indictment due to the govt misleading the grand jury; denying [41] Motion to dismiss the indictment for prosecutorial misconduct; denying without prejudice [41] Motion for Order for the govt to disclose identity of informant; reserving [41] Motion to produce witness and exhibit lists; granting [43] Motion in Limine to Admit Evidence of statement; granting [49] Motion in Limine to Admit Records; denying [53] Motion in Limine to Preclude 404(b) evidence and statements of Gregory Garrett; granting [53] Motion in Limine for Attorney Voir Dire (10 minutes each side); Evidentiary Hearing set for 12/3/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 2/17/2009 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2008 at 9:00 AM is vacated and reset for 2/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Excludable(s) started as to Fe S. Garrett: XT1 Interest of Justice 9/3/2008 to 2/24/2009. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill.)(Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Strauss and Elizabeth Hadden).(Defendant Attorney Fe Garrett and Michelle Betancourt FD S/A for Erica Zunkel FD). (smv)
      LREF
      Legal Document 58 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Trial Brief
      TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Fe S. Garrett (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
        LREF
        Legal Document 57 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Reply to Response
        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Fe S. Garrett re [41] MOTION to compel Discovery MOTION to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Suppress Statements MOTION to Suppress Evidence MOTION to Dismiss Indictment due to improper Grand Jury Instructions MOTION to Dismiss on Speedy Trial /Due to Undue Delay in Filing the Charges MOTION to Dismiss Indictment Due to Selective Prosecution MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment Due to the Government Misleading the Grand Jury MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct MOTION for Order the Government to Disclose Identity of Informant MOTION to Produce Witness & Exhibit Lists (Murphy, Gregory). (jah).
          LREF
          Legal Document 56 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008 Response in Opposition
          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Fe S. Garrett re [53] Amended MOTION to Preclude 404(b) Evidence & Statements of Gregory GarrettIn Limine MOTION for Attorney Voir DireAmended MOTION to Preclude 404(b) Evidence & Statements of Gregory Garrett (Strauss, Christopher)
            LREF
            Blank 55 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: 8/27/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE AND TIME HEARING as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Upon the Court's own motion, Motion/Motion In Limine Hearing set for 9/2/2008 at 10:00 AM is vacated and reset for 9/3/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. The Court will also be conducting a Faretta hearing.(smv)
              LREF
              Legal Document 54 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER as to Fe S. Garrett: Defendant Fe S. Garrett is permitted to receive directly from representatives of Federal Defenders of San Diego, Inc. at the GEO Group books, legal documents, pleadings, case law, motions, periodicals, and other materials relevant to preparing for her trial. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/26/2008. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
                LREF
                Legal Document 53 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Preclude
                Amended In Limine MOTION to Preclude 404(b) Evidence & Statements of Gregory Garrett, In Limine MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire by Fe S. Garrett. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities, # (2) Proof of Service)(Zunkel, Erica) Modified on 8/26/2008 to clarify text. Replaces [52] (mjj)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 52 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/26/2008 Motion to Preclude
                  Replaced by [53] Amended In Limine Motion - In Limine MOTION to Preclude 404(b) Evidence & Statements of Gregory Garrett, In Limine MOTION for Attorney Voir Dire by Fe S. Garrett. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities, # (2) Proof of Service)(Zunkel, Erica) Modified on 8/26/2008 to add link (mjj)
                    LREF
                    Blank 51 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M. James Lorenz: Status Conference as to Fe S. Garrett held on 8/25/2008. Motion in Limine and trial dates confirmed. Dft's request to be allowed receive legal documents directly from shadow counsel granted. Order to be submitted to the court. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill).(Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Strauss and Elizabeth Hadden).(Defendant Attorney Fe Garrett PSE and Ericka Zunkel FD). (smv)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 50 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                      Certificate of Service by USA as to Fe S. Garrett re [47] Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA (Hadden, Elizabeth) (mdc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 49 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Admit Records
                        In Limine MOTION to Admit Records (Certified Domestic Business Records Pursuant to 803(6) and 902(11)) by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Certifications of Authenticity of Business Records)(Hadden, Elizabeth) (mdc)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 48 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 ~Notice (other)
                          NOTICE of Intent to Introduce Business Records by USA (Hadden, Elizabeth) (cap).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 47 Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth C. Hadden appearing for USA. (Hadden, Elizabeth) (cap).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 46 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                              ORDER Granting [44] Motion for Leave to File as to Fe S. Garrett (1): The Clerk shall accept the Government's Omnibus Response and Opposition with supporting document submitted for filing on 8/18/08. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/20/2008.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(mjj)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 45 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008 Response in Opposition
                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Fe S. Garrett re [41] MOTION to compel Discovery MOTION to Preserve Evidence MOTION to Suppress Statements MOTION to Suppress Evidence MOTION to Dismiss Indictment due to improper Grand Jury Instructions MOTION to Dismiss on Speedy Trial /Due to Undue Delay in Filing the Charges MOTION to Dismiss Indictment Due to Selective Prosecution MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment Due to the Government Misleading the Grand Jury MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct MOTION for Order the Government to Disclose Identity of Informant MOTION to Produce Witness & Exhibit Lists (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Gov. Exhibits #1 (Letter dated 8/7/08) #2 (IRS-CI Preparer Information Report #3 (Non-Custody Statement of Rights) #4 (Consents to Search) #5 (Order, 07cr0491) #6 (Order, 07cr1372) #7 Excerpt from Search Warrant Aff.))(Strauss, Christopher) (mdc)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 44 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008, Terminated: 8/20/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                  MOTION for Leave to File Response and Opposition in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Strauss, Christopher) (mdc)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 43 Filed: 8/14/2008, Entered: 8/14/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Admit Evidence
                                    In Limine MOTION to Admit Evidence of Statements by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript dated August 6, 2003, # (2) Exhibit B - Declaration of SA Braga, # (3) Exhibit C - Declaration of SA Haas, # (4) Exhibit D - Declaration of SA Alvarez, # (5) Exhibit E - Declaration of SA Haas)(Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 42 Filed: 8/12/2008, Entered: 8/12/2008 Order on Motion For Leave to File.Court Filing
                                    ORDER Allowing Filing of Motions in Excess of Twenty-Five Pages: Granting [40] Motion for Leave to File as to Fe S. Garrett (1). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 8/12/2008.(mjj)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 41 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Compel
                                      MOTION to compel Discovery, MOTION to Preserve Evidence, MOTION to Suppress Statements, MOTION to Suppress Evidence, MOTION to Dismiss Indictment due to improper Grand Jury Instructions, MOTION to Dismiss on Speedy Trial /Due to Undue Delay in Filing the Charges, MOTION to Dismiss Indictment Due to Selective Prosecution, MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment Due to the Government Misleading the Grand Jury, MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct, MOTION for Order the Government to Disclose Identity of Informant, MOTION to Produce Witness & Exhibit Lists by Fe S. Garrett. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Zunkel, Erica) Modified on 8/12/2008 - sent DO to chambers re attachments and size (mjj)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 40 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008, Terminated: 8/12/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Motions in Excess of 25 Pages by Fe S. Garrett. (Zunkel, Erica) (mjj)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 39 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion for Discovery
                                        Motion to Introduce Summary Expert Witness Testimony and Request for Reciprocal Discovery by USA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Curriculum Vitae of IRS Revenue Agent)(Strauss, Christopher) (mjj) Modified on 8/27/2008 (smv).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion to Admit
                                          Motion to Introduce Summaries of Voluminous Evidence Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 1006 by USA (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Bank Account Summaries Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 1006)(Strauss, Christopher) (mjj) Modified on 8/27/2008 to change from a notice to a motion (smv).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Witness List
                                            WITNESS LIST by Fe S. Garrett (ymm)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 36 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Bond Hearing as to Fe S. Garrett held on 7/24/2008. Court examines surety in court. Court does not approve proposed sureties. Dfts request to modify bail - Denied, without prejudice. C/S/T: Mark Anthony Harwell. (Tape #AJB08-1: 1539-1557).(Plaintiff Attorney Phil Halpern).(Defendant Attorney Fe S. Garrett PSE, Erica K.Zunkel, FD)(PTSO Kimura Hilton). (ymm)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/25/2008 Witness List
                                                WITNESS LIST by Fe S. Garrett (ymm)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank 34 Filed: 7/22/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Bond Hearing as to Fe S. Garrett held on 7/22/2008, Defendants request to modify bail under submission, pending further hearing re property.( Bond Hearing continued to 7/24/2008 03:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.) (Tape #AJB08-1: 1342-1426).(Plaintiff Attorney Phil Halpern).(Defendant Attorney Fe S. Garrett PSE, Erica K.Zunkel, FD)(PTSO Kimura Hilton). (ymm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 33 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Bond Hearing set for 7/22/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (At the request of FD Attorney Erika Zunkel)(ymm)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 32 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF HEARINGS as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Motion In Limine Hearing set for 9/2/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Jury Trial set for 9/9/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service).(smv)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER Granting [30] Joint Motion to Continue and Findings of Fact Excluding Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Fe S. Garrett (1): The joint motion of the parties for a continuance of pretrial proceedings and for a trial date beyond the otherwise applicable time limits is GRANTED. A motions hearing is set for August 25, 2008 and trial is set for September 9, 2008. The period of delay resulting from the granting of this continuance shall be excluded in computing time pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/3/2008.(mjj)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Pretrial Proceedings and Trial Date Pursuant to Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Motion Hearing/Trial SettingCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M. James Lorenz: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Fe S. Garrett held on 6/30/2008. Dft's request for a continuance granted. Status Conference set for 8/25/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Parties to file a joint motion to declare the case complex. Dft has received discovery. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill).(Plaintiff Attorney Christopher S. Strauss).(Defendant Attorney Fe Garret, Erica Zunkel FD, and Steven Barth FD). (smv)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 6/30/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                                              NOTICE (Acknowledgment of Defendant & Advisory Counsel Re: Protective Order) by Fe S. Garrett (Zunkel, Erica) (mjj)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                Certificate of Service by USA as to Fe S. Garrett re [26] MOTION for Hearing Regarding Defendant's Pro Se Status (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008, Terminated: 9/3/2008 Motion for Hearing
                                                                  MOTION for Hearing Regarding Defendant's Pro Se Status by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 25 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia:Arraignment as to Fe S. Garrett (1) Count 1s-20s,21s-24s,25s-30s held on 5/29/2008, Not Guilty plea entered, Status hearing re Defendants request to proceed Pro Se held. Defendants request to proceed Pro Se - Granted. Court appoints Federal Defenders, Inc. as standby counsel. Bond Hearing as to Fe S. Garrett held on 5/29/2008. Defendants request to modify bail - Denied, without prejudice. (Tape #AJB08-1:1435-1516).(Plaintiff Attorney Christopher S. Strauss).(Defendant Attorney Erica Kristine Zunkle, FD, Fe S. Garrett (Pro Se)). (ymm)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Indictment
                                                                      First Superseding INDICTMENT as to Fe S. Garrett (1) count(s) 1s-20s, 21s-24s, 25s-30s. (mjj)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 23 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Bond Hearing set for 5/29/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. (At the request of FD Attorney Erika Zunkel)(ymm)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 22 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Motion Hearing/Trial SettingCourt Filing
                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge M. James Lorenz: Motion Hearing/Trial Setting as to Fe S. Garrett held on 5/7/2008. Dft's request for a continuance granted. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 6/30/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Excludable(s) started as to Fe S. Garrett: XT1 Interest of Justice 5/7/2008 through 6/30/2008. Dft to file motions. (Court Reporter Jeannette Hill).(Plaintiff Attorney Charles O'Reilly and Christopher Strauss).(Defendant Attorney Erica Zunkel FD). (smv)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 21 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                            NOTICE OF CHANGE OF DATE HEARING as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Due to court hearings being cancelled after damage caused by a bomb explosion, Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/5/2008 at 2:00 PM is vacated and reset for 5/7/2008 09:45 AM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. (smv)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order on Motion for OrderCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Allowing Limited Disclosure of Return and Return information and Discovery Protective Order: Granting [14] Motion for Order as to Fe S. Garrett (1); Granting [14] Motion for Protective Order as to Fe S. Garrett (1). The defendant and defense counsel shall file an acknowledgment of this Order within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/22/2008. (mjj)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008 Order on Motion for DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Authorizing government to Disclose Grand Jury Matter and Protective Order: Granting [16] Motion for Disclosure as to Fe S. Garrett (1). Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/22/2008. (mjj)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008, Terminated: 4/22/2008 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                  Ex Parte MOTION for Disclosure of Grand Jury Matter and For A Protective Order by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (O'Reilly, Charles) Modified on 4/18/2008 to clarify text (mjj)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                    Certificate of Service by USA as to Fe S. Garrett re [14] MOTION for Order Allowing Limited Disclosure of Tax Return Information MOTION for Protective Order (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008, Terminated: 4/22/2008 Motion for Order
                                                                                      MOTION for Order Allowing Limited Disclosure of Tax Return Information, MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (Strauss, Christopher) (mjj)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Exhibit List
                                                                                        COURT EXHIBIT LIST (mjj)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia : Status Conference re Counsel/Financial Affidavit as to Fe S. Garrett held on 4/10/2008. Court confirms the Federal Defender Appointment. Documents submitted by defense counsel are Ordered Filed Under Seal. (Tape #AJB08-1: 1342-1350; (1350-1356 (Under Seal); 1356-1358;).(Plaintiff Attorney Charles Anthony O'Reilly).(Defendant Attorney Erica Zunkle, FD). (ymm)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Christopher S. Strauss appearing for USA. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Strauss, Christopher) (mjj, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Charles Anthony O'Reilly appearing for USA. (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(O'Reilly, Charles) (mjj, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER and Conditions of Pretrial Release: Bail: Bond set for Fe S. Garrett (1) 100,000.00 P/S. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/4/2008. (mjj)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Order on Motion to DetainCourt Filing
                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia : denying [7] Motion to Detain as to Fe S. Garrett (1); Detention Hearing as to Fe S. Garrett held on 4/4/2008. USA oral motion for detention; motion denied as to Defendant Fe S. Garrett. Bond set as to Fe S. Garrett (1) $100,000 P/S secured by real property, nebbia/examination prior to release and conditions filed. Status hrg re counsel set for 4/10/08 before Magistrate Judge Battaglia - Confirmed. (Tape #AJB08-1:1520-1544.)(Plaintiff Attorney Stacey Sullivan).(Defendant Attorney Erika Zunkel, FD). (ymm)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Erica Kristine Zunkel appearing for Fe S. Garrett (Attachments: # (1) Proof of Service)(Zunkel, Erica) (mjj, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Motion to Detain
                                                                                                    ORAL MOTION to Detain as to Risk of Flightby USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (aje)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Motion to Unseal Case
                                                                                                      ORAL MOTION to Unseal Indictment by USA as to Fe S. Garrett. (aje)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Anthony J. Battaglia : Initial Appearance as to Fe S. Garrett held on 4/1/2008. Government Oral Motion [6] to Unseal Indictment - Granted. Defendant arraigned on indictment and plead not guilty. Status Conference set for 4/10/2008 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 5/5/2008 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 14 before Judge M. James Lorenz. Governments Oral Motion [7] for Detention as to Risk of Flight. Detention Hearing set for 4/4/08 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Anthony J. Battaglia. Added attorney Stacey H Sullivan for USA, Federal Defenders for Fe S. Garrett. Attorney U S Attorney CR terminated. (Tape #AJB08-1:1057-1110).(Plaintiff Attorney Stacey Sullivan AUSA).(Defendant Attorney Jennifer Coon FD). (aje)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/2/2008 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/28/08 in case as to Fe S. Garrett. (vet)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Arrest
                                                                                                            Arrest of Fe S. Garrett (aje)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. in case as to Fe S. Garrett. (vet) Modified on 4/3/2008, case unsealed per minute order 4/1/08 (aje).
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 4/1/2008 Indictment -Sealed
                                                                                                                INDICTMENT as to Fe S. Garrett (1) count(s) 1-20, 21-22, 23-25. (vet). Modified on 4/3/2008, case unsealed per minute order 4/1/08 (aje).
                                                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 111 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?