DANIEL v. USCIS et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-01816

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 16, 2016 at 8:14 AM DT (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HABTAMA DANIEL, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo GOVERNMENT FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, Defendant
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sobia Haque +1 202 305 9927 +1 202 514 8780 sobia.haque2@usdoj.gov
No Logo VINCENT C. GRAY, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 12/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
MEMORANDUM AND OPINION. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 21, 2012. (AG)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for the District of Columbia, case number 12ca1510 filed by USCIS. (Attachments: # 1 Summons and Complaint, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Haque, Sobia) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 37 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?