Securities and Exchange Commission v. True North Finance Corporation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:10-cv-03995-DWF-JJK

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 1, 2021 at 5:48 PM EST (9.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Securities and Exchange Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Benjamin J. Hanauer +1 312 353 8642 +1 312 353 7398 hanauerb@sec.gov
Space Daniel J Hayes +1 312 353 3368 hayesdj@sec.gov
Space Marlene Beth Key-Patterson +1 312 353 0881 keym@sec.gov
Space Eric M. Phillips +1 312 353 7390 phillipse@sec.gov
v.
No Logo Capital Solutions Distributors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Neal Gerber & Eisenberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Z. Gurland +1 312 269 8440 +1 312 269 1747 mgurland@ngelaw.com
Space Phillip Leon Stern +1 312 269 8000 pstern@ngelaw.com
Space Michael Moshe Zmora +1 312 269 8000 mzmora@ngelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cynthia A Bremer +1 612 339 1818 +1 612 339 0061 cynthia.bremer@ogletreedeakins.com
Space Andrea D. Kiehl +1 612 336 6874 +1 612 339 0061 andrea.kiehl@ogletreedeakins.com
No Logo Capital Solutions Management, LP, Defendant
No Logo Capital Solutions Monthly Income Fund, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DC Law Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott R Carlson +1 952 921 2387 scarlson@dc-legal.us

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lawrence J Field +1 612 335 1586 lawrence.field@leonard.com
No Logo Michael W. Bozora, Defendant
No Logo Owen Mark Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by CLYDE SNOW & SESSIONS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brent R. Baker +1 801 322 2516 +1 801 521 6280 BRB@clydesnow.com
Space Jennifer A. James +1 801 322 2516 jaj@clydesnow.com
Space D Loren Washburn +1 801 322 2516 +1 801 521 6280 dlw@clydesnow.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jenny Gassman-Pines +1 612 373 0830 jgassman-pines@greeneespel.com
Space Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Parsons Behle & Latimer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sanna-Rae Taylor +1 801 532 1234 staylor@parsonsbehle.com
No Logo Timothy R. Redpath, Defendant
No Logo Todd A. Duckson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryant D. Tchida +1 612 335 1840 +1 612 335 1657 bryant.tchida@leonard.com
No Logo Transactional Finance Fund Management, LLC, Defendant
No Logo True North Finance Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maslon Edelman Borman & Brand LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey P Jarpe +1 612 672 8200 +1 612 642 8360 geoffrey.jarpe@maslon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winthrop & Weinstine, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip T Colton +1 612 604 6400 +1 612 604 6929 pcolton@winthrop.com
Space William A McNab +1 612 604 6652 +1 612 604 6852 wmcnab@winthrop.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 3/1/2021, Entered: None Writ of Garnishment on Application
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 10/23/2013, Entered: None
    Final Jury Instructions. (BJS) (Entered: 10/23/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial completed on 10/22/2013. Verdict for the Plaintiff received at 3:57 p.m. Exhibits ordered returned. Clerk to file verdict and enter judgment. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (BJS) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/21/2013. Closing arguments; Jury received the case at 2:59 p.m.; jury returned without a verdict and will resume deliberations on 10/22/2013. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson) (BJS) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/17/2013. Plaintiff's rebuttal witness: Owen Mark Williams. Charge conference. Trial to resume on 10/21/13. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (LPH) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 10/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/16/2013. Defendants' witnesses: Todd Duckson. Defendant rests. Trial to resume on 10/17/13. (Court Reporters Jeanne Anderson/Carla Bebault) (LPH) Modified text on 10/17/2013 (lmb). (Entered: 10/17/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 10/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/15/2013. Defendant's witnesses: Dean Engstrom, Todd Duckson. Trial to resume on 10/16/13. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson) (LPH) (Entered: 10/16/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/10/2013. Defendants' witnesses: Jon Essen, Scott Carlson. Trial to resume on 10/15/13. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson Bille) (LPH) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 10/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/9/2013. Defendants' witnesses: Brian Weisenberger, Jon Essen. Trial continued to 10/10/13. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carla Bebault) (LPH) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/8/2013. Defendants' witnesses: Timothy Redpath, Jo Ellen Dyer, David Dyer. Trial continued to 10/9/13. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson) (LPH) Modified on 10/9/2013 (GMW). (Entered: 10/09/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/7/2013. Defendants witness: Timothy Redpath. Trial continued to 10/8/2013. (Court Reporter Carol Danielsen/Heather Schuetz) (BJS) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/3/2013. Plaintiff's witnesses: Todd Duckson, Timothy Redpath. Plaintiff rests. Trial resumes 10/7/2013. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson) (BJS) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/2/2013. Plaintiff's Witness Todd Duckson. Trial continued to 10/3/2013. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carol Danielson) (BJS) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 10/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Donovan W. Frank: Jury Trial continued on 10/1/2013. Plaintiff's witnesses: Michael Stewart, John Dubbs, Todd Duckson. Trial continued to 10/2/2013. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson/Carla Bebault) (BJS) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 333
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Blank 330
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 329
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Blank 323 Filed: 9/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. This matter came before the Court for a pretrial hearing on September 3, 2013. Consistent with, and in addition to the Court's rulings and remarks from the bench, and based upon the memoranda, pleadings, and argumen ts of counsel, and the Court having reviewed the contents of the file in this matter and being otherwise duly advised in the premises, the Court hereby enters the following (see Order for details).(Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 9/6/2013. (BJS)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Blank 197
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 196
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 195
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 154 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Defendants Capital Solutions Monthly Income Fund, LP and Transactional Finance Fund Management, LLCs' Joint Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. No. 113 ) and Defendant Todd A. Duckson's Motion for Summary Judgm ent (Doc. No. 117 ) are GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART as follows: 1. Absent reference to a specific time period, the Court's order applies to statements made during the entire alleged period of fraud (March 2008 to December 2009); 2. Defen dants' motions are DENIED to the extent that they seek dismissal of primary liability claims under Rule 10b-5 or § 17(a)(1) for statements regarding the Fund's risks, strategy success (February 2009 to December 2009), foreclosure termi nology, and use investor funds (May 2008 to December 2009); 3. Defendants' motions are GRANTED to the extent they seek dismissal of primary liability claims under Rule 10b-5 or § 17(a)(1) for statements regarding the Hennessey credit bid, l oans to CS entities, use of investor funds (March 2008 to April 2008), FCB lawsuit, interest reserve account level, and Gardner's background; 4. Defendants' motions are DENIED to the extent they seek dismissal of secondary liability claims under Rule 10b-5 for statements regarding the Fund's risks, strategy success (February 2009 to December 2009), foreclosure terminology, and use investor funds (May 2008 to December 2009); 5. Defendants' motions are GRANTED to the extent the y seek dismissal of secondary liability claims under Rule 10b-5 for statements regarding the Hennessey credit bid, loans to CS entities, use of investor funds (March 2008 to April 2008), FCB lawsuit, interest reserve account level, and Gardner's backgrund; 6. Defendants' motions are DENIED to the extent they seek dismissal of § 17(a)(2) and (3) claims for statements regarding the success of the Fund's strategy (March 2008 to January 2009) and use of investor funds (March 2008 to April 2008); and 7. Defendants' motions are GRANTED to the extent they seek dismissal of § 17(a)(2) and (3) claims for statements regarding the FCB lawsuit. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 11/09/2012. (BJS)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 247 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?