EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC et al v. Cellco Partnership
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:08-cv-00816
District Judge Sara Lioi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 28, 2016 at 7:12 AM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Hill +1 330 376 5300 +1 330 258 6559 jhill@bdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 08/31/2010 Robert J Diaz +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 8151 rjdiaz@hahnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 08/31/2010 Michael J. Garvin +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 2824
TERMINATED: 08/31/2010 R. Eric Gaum +1 330 864 5550 +1 330 864 7986 regaum@hahnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by InnovaLaw, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy E Grochocinski +1 314 853 8146 teg@innovalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com
No Logo Location Based Services LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Cellco Partnership, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Ducatman +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 rducatman@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan McCrum +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 rbmccrum@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vincent Joseph Belusko +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 vbelusko@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin M Noonen +1 213 892 5764 +8925 892 892 5454 mnoonen@mofo.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alex S.F. Yap +1 213 892 5200 +1 213 892 5454 ayap@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson Hine, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Ridings +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 matt.ridings@thompsonhine.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas F. Zych, Esq. +1 216 566 5500 +1 216 566 5800 Tom.Zych@thompsonhine.com
No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Location Based Services LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (134) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
    Final Agreed Entry of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 07/07/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
      Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (K,Ca) (Entered: 07/01/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
          Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
            Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Definiteness filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
              Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Definiteness filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                  Transcript of Claims Construction Hearing held on January 29, 2015 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [244 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 2/24/2015. Redaction Request due 3/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2015. Related document(s) 125 , 122 . (M,Ca) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                    Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on January 29, 2015 before Judge Sara Lioi, Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: March 2, 2015 filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                      Amended Markman Briefing Exhibits filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 119 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DM - 12 Combined Defendants Markman Presentation)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 2/4/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                        Amended Exhibits in Support of 100 Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. Related document 18 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DI - 13 Combined Defendants Markman Presentation.)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text and added link on 2/4/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                          Non-Appeal Transcript Order Form for proceedings held on January 29, 2015 before Judge Judge Sara Lioi, re Markman Hearing, Terminate Hearings. Court Reporter: Caroline Mahnke. Requested completion date: March 2, 2015 filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/4/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                            Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                              Amended Markman Hearing Exhibits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Related document(s) 116 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 50)(Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 1/30/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                Markman Briefing (no signature page) filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DM - 1 U.S. Patent 6,847,822, # 2 Exhibit DM - 2 U.S. Patent 5,235,633, # 3 Exhibit DM - 3 Excerpts from Prosecution History of the '633 Patent, # 4 Exhibit DM - 4 Excerpts of Plaintiffs' Initial Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit DM - 5 Declaration of Thomas A. Stansell Jr, # 6 Exhibit DM - 6 Dictionary Definitions of Exact, # 7 Exhibit DM - 7 Newton's Telecom Dictionary Definition of Provisioning, # 8 Exhibit DM - 8 Section 2181 of the MPEP, # 9 Exhibit DM - 9 U.S. Patent 5,548,583, # 10 Exhibit DM - 10 Excerpts of Exh. 1 to EMSAT and LBS Res. to Def Joint Invalidity Claim Chart, # 11 Exhibit DM - 11 Microsoft Press Computer Dictionary Definition of Storage)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text to note that document is missing a signature page on 1/29/2015 (H,KR) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                  Exhibits (no signature page) in Support of 100 Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DI - # 1 U.S. Patent 6,847,822, # 2 Exhibit DI - # 2 Declaration of Thomas A. Stansell Jr, # 3 Exhibit DI - # 3 07.09.1992 Office Action, # 4 Exhibit DI - # 4 10.08.1992 Response to 07.09.1992 Office Action, # 5 Exhibit DI - # 5 Declaration of John Moring, # 6 Exhibit DI - # 6 Excerpts of F. Iwaki Article, # 7 Exhibit DI - # 7 U.S. Patent 5,669,061, # 8 Exhibit DI - # 8 C. Driscoll Article, # 9 Exhibit DI - # 9 U.S. Patent 5,548,583, # 10 Exhibit DI - # 10 Excerpts of Exh. 1 to EMSAT and LBS Res. to Def. Joint Invalidity Claim Chart, # 11 Exhibit DI - # 11 U.S. Patent 5,479,4782, # 12 Exhibit DI - # 12 Excerpts of Belove Article)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). Modified text, added link and noted that document is missing a signature page on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                      Markman Hearing Exhibits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49)(Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                                        Notice of Appearance by Timothy E. Grochocinski filed on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                                          Joint Proposal Regarding Markman Hearing filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/23/2015, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Appearance by Paul C. Filon filed on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Filon, Paul) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/23/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Kenneth S. Luchesi filed on behalf of All Defendants. (Luchesi, Kenneth) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                Notice Regarding Teleconference with Court filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text on 1/22/2015 (P, S). (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Joint Motion (request) for clarification or teleconference regarding claim construction tutorial and hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text and event on 1/9/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                    Reply in support of 100 Motion for summary judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 - U.S. Patent No. 5,548,583 to Bustamante, # 2 Exhibit 10 - Excerpts of Emsat Response to Joint Invalidity Claim Chart, # 3 Exhibit 11 - U.S. Patent No. 5,479,482 to Grimes, # 4 Affidavit of John C. Evans, Esq.)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Identification of Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence, # 2 Exhibit B - Defendants' Proposed Constructions and Identification of Supporting Intrinsic and Extrinsic Evidence for U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822)(Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                          Responsive Markman Brief filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 101 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9 U.S. Patent No. 5,548,583, # 2 Exhibit 10 Excerpts of Emsat Response to Joint Invalidity Claim Chart, # 3 Exhibit 11 Dictionary Definition of Storage) (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 12/16/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                            Opposition to 100 Motion for summary judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - '822 Patent, # 2 Exhibit 2 - '633 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 3 - '317 Patent, # 4 Exhibit 4 - September 29, 2014 Declaration of John Moring, # 5 Exhibit 5 - December 14, 2014 Declaration of John Moring, # 6 Exhibit 6 - '118 Patent, # 7 Exhibit 7 - Loran-C Vehicle Tracking, # 8 Exhibit 8 - October 6, 1999 - FCC Third Report and Order, # 9 Exhibit 9 - August 1, 2006, Sprint Nextel Corporation e911 Deployment Status Report, # 10 Exhibit 10 - e911, Where are You?, # 11 Exhibit 11 - '915 Patent, # 12 Exhibit 12 - '610 Patent, # 13 Exhibit 13 - '623 Patent, # 14 Exhibit 14 - Computerworld, # 15 Exhibit 15 - InfoWorld, # 16 Exhibit 16 - Microsoft Press Computer Dictionary, # 17 Exhibit 17 - Dictionary of Computing, # 18 Exhibit 18 - Newton's Telecom Dictionary, # 19 Exhibit 19 - Dictionary of Computing, # 20 Exhibit 20 - March 4, 2004 Office Action, # 21 Exhibit 21 - '822 Notice of Allowability, # 22 Exhibit 22 - Decision on Request for Reexamination, # 23 Exhibit 23 - Notice of Intent to Issue Ex Parte Reexamination, # 24 Exhibit 24 - October 8, 1992 - Office Action Response, # 25 Exhibit 25 - November 3, 1992 Notice of Allowability, # 26 Exhibit 26 - Patel Invalidity Contentions Chart, # 27 Declaration of T. Krieger)(Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Brief in Opposition to 102 Defendants' Opening Markman Brief filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 13- Nelson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 14- Responsive Brief of Defendants (excerpted), # 3 Exhibit 15- Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 4 Exhibit 16- Memorandum and Order) (Nelson, Edward) Modified text and added link on 12/16/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Opening Markman Brief filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822, # 2 Exhibit U.S. Patent No. 5,235,633, # 3 Exhibit cited excerpts of '633 file history, # 4 Exhibit excerpts of Emsat Infringement Contentions, # 5 Exhibit Stansell Decl re exact geographic location, # 6 Exhibit Dictionary Definitions of Exact, # 7 Exhibit dictionary definition of provisioning, # 8 Exhibit MPEP Section 2181)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 11/18/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed by all Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1- Nelson Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2- Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 3 Exhibit 3- Memorandum Opinion and Order, # 4 Exhibit 4- U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822, # 5 Exhibit 5- U.S. Patent No. 5,235,633, # 6 Exhibit 6- Office Action Response, # 7 Exhibit 7- Figure 17, # 8 Exhibit 8- Moring Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9- Stansell Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10- Notice of Allowability, # 11 Exhibit 11- Decision Denying Request, # 12 Exhibit 12- Notice of Intent to Issue Certificate) (Nelson, Edward) Modified text on 11/18/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      Motion for summary judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit U.S. Pat. 6847822, # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Thomas A. Stansell, Jr., # 3 Exhibit 07/09/1992 Office Action, # 4 Exhibit 10/08/1992 Amendment, # 5 Exhibit Declaration of John Moring, # 6 Exhibit Iwaki et al Article, # 7 Exhibit U.S. Pat. 5,669,061, # 8 Exhibit Driscoll Article, # 9 Affidavit of John C. Evans, Esq.)(Ducatman, Robert) Modified text and exhibit names due to capitalization on 11/18/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                        Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Reply in support of 93 Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Plan Part 1 filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Opposition to 93 Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Plan Part 1 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III, # 2 Exhibit 1-NIRC Second '822 Re-exam, # 3 Exhibit 2- MPEP s2258.37 CFR 1.552, # 4 Exhibit 3-NIRC Third '822 Re-exam)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Answer to 86 Defendant's Counterclaims to 82 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaintfiled by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text on 6/6/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Joint Motion for extension of time regarding Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims and Parties Contentions filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text on 5/30/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Answer to 82 Amended complaint, and, Counterclaim against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 5/6/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Address Change Notice by Vincent J. Belusko, Martin M. Noonen, Alex P. Yap filed on behalf of All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text for attorney name on 5/6/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Joint Motion for extension of time until 05/05/2014 to answer Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. Related document(s) 82 . (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          First Amended complaint against Cellco Partnership. Filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - United States Patent No. 6,847,822, # 2 Exhibit B - Printout from Defendant's Website regarding E911 Program) (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Case Management Plan Part I. Case is assigned to the complex track. Claim Construction Tutorial scheduled for 1/29/2015 at 9:00 AM; Claim Construction hearing scheduled for 1/30/2015 at 9:00 AM. (See Order for All Dates and Deadlines.) Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2014. (P,J) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Motion by Timothy E. Grochocinski to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 03/11/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Joint Proposed Schedule filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance by John Charles Evans filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Evans, John) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Motion for attorney Timothy D. Krieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6416373, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Timothy D. Krieger, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Motion for attorney Stephanie H. To to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6416284, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stephanie H. To, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified to add attorney's last name on 2/24/2014 (G,CA). (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Michael P. Kella to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6416209, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michael P. Kella, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Benjamin R. Askew to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6416132, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Benjamin R. Askew, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Reply in support of 69 Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Reassignment filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/20/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Opposition to 69 Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Combined Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for extension of one day for the parties' to submit a report of the parties' planning meeting filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/13/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Revised Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/20/2014 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 526 before Judge Sara Lioi with counsel only; parties not required to attend or participate. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/29/2014. (S,He) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Motion to lift stay of Proceedings filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit March 15, 2010 PTO Denial, # 2 Exhibit June 5, 2009 PTO Order, # 3 Exhibit February 20, 2013 PTO Reexamination Certificate, # 4 Exhibit July 29, 2013 PTO Reexamination Certificate)(Hill, John) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          Order directing the Clerk to statistically close this case. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/12. (P, S) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Filing of Request for Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 7,289,763 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, Detailed Request for Inter Partes Reexamination filed 12-14-10 # 2 Exhibit B, Request for Inter Partes Reexamination Transmittal Form filed 12-14-10 # 3 Exhibit C, Electronic Acknowledgement Receipt dated 12-14-10 (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 12/20/2010 (P,G). (Entered: 12/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Order of Recusal. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Sara Lioi for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster and Judge Sara Lioi on 12/6/10. (P,R) Modified text on 12/6/2010 (B,B). (Entered: 12/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Address Change Notice filed by Anthony G. Simon on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 11/3/2010 (B,B). (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Motion for attorney Edward R. Nelson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276989, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Motion for attorney Christie B. Lindsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276875, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Motion for attorney Barry J. Bumgardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276552, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276158, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Timothy Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4275984, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Hahn Loeser & Parks, LLP and adding attorney John F. Hill filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Hill, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Motion for leave of Court to File Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Hill, John) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion to vacate stay (Related Doc # 47 ). Judge Peter C. Economus on 8/20/10.(BR,S) (Entered: 08/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Notice Re PTO Order Granting Request for Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822 filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 12/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Filing of Request for Inter Partes Reexamination of U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822 filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 09/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Filing of Petitions in Reexamination Proceedings filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 07/08/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        Reply to response to 47 Motion to vacate Stay of Proceedings filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - 404 Decision on Reexam Request, # 2 Exhibit 2 - MPEP Section 2248)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 07/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Opposition to 47 Motion to vacate Stay In Light of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office's Denial of the Requests for Reexamination of the Claims at Issue filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Plaintiffs' Response to Defendants' Notice of Action in Reexamination Proceedings filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Related document(s) 48 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 06/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Action in Reexamination Proceedings filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 6/11/2009 (P,G). (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                Motion to vacate Stay filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Related document(s) 46 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Order granting Defendants' Motion to stay the case (Related Doc # 36 ) and denying as Moot Defendants' Motion to Stay and extend the schedule (Related document 45 ). Defendants shall inform the Court upon the conclusion of the re-examination process. Judge Peter C. Economus on 5/21/09.(BR,S) (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    Motion to stay and Extend the Schedule filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Brief in Support of Motion to Stay and Extend the Schedule, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 05/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Reply to response to 36 Motion to stay proceedings pending reexamination of the patents-in-suit by the United States Patent and Trademark Office filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 4/27/2009 (P,G). (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Reply Markman Brief filed by all defendants. Related document(s) 34 . (Attachments: # 1 Appendix B, # 2 Exhibit 12, # 3 Exhibit 13, # 4 Exhibit 14, # 5 Exhibit 15, # 6 Exhibit 16, # 7 Exhibit 17, # 8 Exhibit 18, # 9 Exhibit 19, # 10 Exhibit 20, # 11 Exhibit 21, # 12 Exhibit 22)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          Reply Markman Brief filed by all plaintiffs. Related document(s) 33 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, # 2 Exhibit 17, # 3 Exhibit 18, # 4 Exhibit 19, # 5 Exhibit 20, # 6 Exhibit 21, # 7 Exhibit 22)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            Opposition to 36 Motion to stay proceedings pending reexamination of the patents-in-suit by the USPTO filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Errata 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 12, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Diaz, Robert) (Entered: 04/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/9/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              Order denying Plaintiffs' Motion for relief from Defendants' misconduct related to page limits (Related Doc # 35 ). Judge Peter C. Economus on 4/9/09.(BR,S) (Entered: 04/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply to response to 35 Motion for relief From Defendants' Misconduct Related to Page Limits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Gaum, R.) (Entered: 04/06/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Motion to vacate Stay of Proceedings Pending Opportunity to Submit Brief on the Merits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Related document(s) 36 ,. (Gaum, R.) (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Opposition to 35 Motion for relief From Defendants' Misconduct Related to Page Limits filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan B. McCrum)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Motion to stay proceedings pending reexamination of the patents-in-suit by the USPTO filed by Counter-Claimant Cellco Partnership, Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for relief From Defendants' Misconduct Related to Page Limits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of R. Eric Gaum, # 2 Exhibit 2 - March 12, 2009 E-mail, # 3 Exhibit 3 - March 23, 2009 Letter to Noonan - Ducatman, # 4 Exhibit 4 - March 24, 2009 Letter to Gaum)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Markman Brief filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit US 5,235,633, # 2 Exhibit US 5,946,611, # 3 Exhibit US 6,324,404, # 4 Exhibit US 6,847,822, # 5 Exhibit US 7,289,763, # 6 Exhibit Defendandts' Proposed Constructions, # 7 Exhibit Declaration of Richard A. Chandler, # 8 Exhibit Improving the Civilian GPS, # 9 Exhibit Communication Systems Analysis and Design, # 10 Exhibit American Heritage Dictionary, # 11 Exhibit Webster's New Twentieth Century Dictionary, # 12 Exhibit LORAN-C User's Handbook, # 13 Exhibit Webster's II Dictionary, # 14 Exhibit triangulation - dictionary, # 15 Exhibit Declaration of R. Eric Gaum)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Markman Brief filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Exhibit 5, # 7 Exhibit 6, # 8 Exhibit 7, # 9 Exhibit 8, # 10 Exhibit 9, # 11 Exhibit 10, # 12 Exhibit 11)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice Joint Claim Construction Statement filed by Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint Motion for Removal of Page Limits for Markman Briefing filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance by Robert P. Ducatman filed by on behalf of Cellco Partnership. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Appearance by Ryan B. McCrum filed by on behalf of Cellco Partnership. (McCrum, Ryan) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Order: The parties agree to the dates set forth in the Proposed Order. Judge Peter C. Economus on 1/26/09. (BR,S) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/14/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion to attend Status Conference by Telephone, or, in the Alternative, be Excused filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Ridings, Matthew) Modified duplicate text on 1/15/2009 (S,L). (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Motion to continue events preceding January 22, 2009 status conference and to confirm that parties need not attend in person filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Gaum, R.) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing: A Status Conference is set for 1/22/2009 at 1:30 PM in Chambers 313 before Judge Peter C. Economus. (BR,S) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint Motion for to Amend Scheduling Order filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Exhibit A - Stipulation and Proposed Amended Scheduling Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Comparison of Scheduling Orders, # 3 Exhibit C -- Chart showing three-week extension of certain due dates)(Gaum, R.) (Entered: 12/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer to Cellco Partnership's First Amended Answer and Counterclaims (Jury Trial Demanded) filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Related document(s) 22 . (Gaum, Richard) (Entered: 12/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  First Amended Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, Counterclaim against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ridings, Matthew) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed Motion for leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim Instanter filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Ridings, Matthew) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Stipulated Protective Order: The parties shall abide by the terms and conditions set forth in the Protective Order. Judge Peter C. Economus on 11/7/08. (BR,S) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Stipulation for Protective Order filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Gaum, Richard) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Stipulation and Order Regarding Case Schedule: The parties shall abide by the deadlines established in the scheduling order. This case is assigned to the complex track; discovery due by 9/23/2009; parties to be joined and pleading amendments due by 11/17/2008; pretrial conference is set for 2/1/2010 10:00 a.m.; jury trial set for 3/2/2010 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 351 before Judge Peter C. Economus. Signed by Judge Peter C. Economus on 8/5/08. (R,Li) Modified docket text on 8/5/2008 (R,Li). (Entered: 08/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Proposed Order (and Stipulation) Regarding Case Schedule filed by all parties. Related document(s) 16 . (Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Supplemental Report of Parties' Planning Meeting with stipulated proposed order attached. Parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge. filed by all parties. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Garvin, Michael) Modified text on 7/23/2008 (H,LA). (Entered: 07/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Report of Parties' Planning Meeting Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and LR 16.3(b). Parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge filed by all parties. Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gaum, Richard) Modified attachment description on 7/15/2008 (S,L). (Entered: 07/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Cellco Partnership. (Ridings, Matthew) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Notice of Magistrate Consent form (BR,S) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 7/10/2008 at 11:00 AM at Chambers 313 before Judge Peter C. Economus. Judge Peter C. Economus on 6/13/08. (Attachments: # 1 Planning Report)(BR,S) (Entered: 06/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Alex S. Yap to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 06470000000003041873, filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Zych, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Vincent J. Belusko to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 06470000000003041846, filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Zych, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Motion for attorney Martin M. Noonen to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 06470000000003041783, filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Zych, Thomas) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cellco Partnership. (Zych, Thomas) Modified text on 5/21/2008 (S,L). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 6/26/2008 to answer plead or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' 1 complaint filed by Defendant Cellco Partnership. (Zych, Thomas) Modified to add link on 5/21/2008 (S,L). (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Return of Service Executed upon Cellco Partnership by certified mail ( no date of delivery )filed on behalf of all plaintiffs (C,KA) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Location Based Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Patent Acquisition Corporation for Location Based Services LLC. filed by Location Based Services LLC. (H,LA) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (H,LA) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel. (H,LA) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Summons issued to plaintiff at counter for service upon Cellco Partnership. (H,LA) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Complaint with jury demand against Cellco Partnership filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 44660001018. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons) (H,LA) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?