EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC v. Virgin Mobile USA, L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:09-cv-02815
District Judge Sara Lioi, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 15, 2019 at 5:50 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buckingham, Doolittle & Burroughs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John F. Hill +1 330 376 5300 +1 330 258 6559 jhill@bdblaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hahn Loeser & Parks LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/01/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert J Diaz +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 8151 rjdiaz@hahnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/01/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Garvin +1 216 621 0150 +1 216 241 2824
TERMINATED: 09/01/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED R. Eric Gaum +1 330 864 5550 +1 330 864 7986 regaum@hahnlaw.com
TERMINATED: 09/01/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason R Strobel +1 216 621 0150 jstrobel@hahnlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by InnovaLaw, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/29/2012, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy E Grochocinski +1 314 853 8146 teg@innovalaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Eric M. Albritton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 bbumgardner@nbclaw.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon Law Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony Gerard Simon +1 314 241 2929 +1 314 241 2020 ipteam@simonlawpc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
TERMINATED: 02/08/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED T John Ward +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 tjw@wsfirm.com
No Logo Kajeet, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Kajeet, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Virgin Mobile USA, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones Day Reavis & Pogue

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/08/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE MARK V. CAMPAGNA +1 404 581 8978 +1 404 581 8330 mcampagna@jonesday.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Ducatman +1 216 586 3939 +1 216 579 0212 rducatman@jonesday.com
TERMINATED: 02/04/2010, PRO HAC VICE Jeffrey L. Waters +1 404 607 9991 +1 404 581 8330 jwaters@jonesday.com

Toggle Switch Represented by zanadaclothing.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/15/2009, LEAD ATTORNEY Guy N Harrison +1 903 758 7361 +1 903 753 9557 guy@gnhlaw.com
No Logo Emsat Advanced Geo-location Technology, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (186) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/20/2015, Entered: None
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (K,Ca) (Entered: 04/20/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: None
      Joint Proposed Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 04/09/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: None
        Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 03/16/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
          Notice of Supplemental Authority Regarding Definiteness filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 03/11/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None
            Plaintiffs' Notice of Election filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              Transcript of Claims Construction Hearing held on January 29, 2015 before Judge Sara Lioi. To obtain a bound copy of this transcript please contact court reporter Caroline Mahnke at 330-252-6021. [244 pages] Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Parties requesting that privacy information be redacted must file a notice of intent to redact with the court by 2/24/2015. Redaction Request due 3/10/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/20/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2015. (M,Ca) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 2/2/2015, Entered: None
                Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/02/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: None
                  Notice of Contemporaneous, Collective and Concurrent Filing of Amended Exhibits to Defendants' Markman Briefing and Defendants' Amended Exhibits in Support of Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/30/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None
                    Amended Markman Hearing Exhibits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. Related document(s) 174 . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 50)(Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 1/30/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/29/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 1/29/2015, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                        Notice of Contemporaneous, Collective and Concurrent Filing of Exhibits to Defendants' Markman Briefing and Defendants' Exhibits in Support of Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                          Markman Hearing Exhibits filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49)(Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance by Timothy E. Grochocinski filed on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Grochocinski, Timothy) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/28/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None
                              Joint Proposal Regarding Markman Hearing filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 1/22/2015, Entered: None
                                Notice of Appearance of Counsel by Kenneth S. Luchesi filed on behalf of All Defendants. (Luchesi, Kenneth) Modified text on 1/29/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/22/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None
                                  Plaintiffs' Notice Regarding Teleconference with Court filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                    Joint Motion (request) for clarification or teleconference regarding claim construction tutorial and hearing filed by All Plaintiffs. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text and event on 1/9/2015 (H,KR). (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Contemporaneous, Collective and Concurrent Filing of Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None Order
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 12/22/2014, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Joint Filing of Joint Claim Construction and Pre-Hearing Statement filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 12/22/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Contemporaneous, Collective and Concurrent Filing of Responsive Markman Brief filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                              Notice of Contemporaneous Filing of Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity for Indefiniteness filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                Notice of Contemporaneous Filing of Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Opening Markman Brief filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Notice of Contemporaneous Filing of Opening Brief on Claim Construction filed by All Plaintiffs. (Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                      Notice of Contemporaneous, Collective and Concurrent Filing of Markman Brief and Motion for Summary Judgment filed by All Defendants. Related document(s) 141 .(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                        Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 10/20/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            Opinion and Order: Defendants' motion to modify the Revised Case Management Plan is denied. Moreover, defendants' motion for summary judgment on the issue of priority is denied without prejudice. (Related Doc # 153 , 152 ). Judge Sara Lioi on 9/30/2014. (P,J)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                              Reply in support of 153 Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Plan Part 1 filed by All Defendants. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 9/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                                Opposition to 153 Motion to Modify Case Management Conference Plan Part 1 filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Declaration of Edward R. Nelson, III, # 2 Exhibit 1-NIRC Second '822 Re-exam, # 3 Exhibit 2- MPEP s2258.37 CFR 1.552, # 4 Exhibit 3-NIRC Third '822 Re-exam)(Nelson, Edward) (Entered: 09/18/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 09/15/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Order
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                          Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 6/16/2014, Entered: None
                                                                            Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text on 6/16/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 06/16/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              Answer to 146 Defendant's Counterclaims to 143 Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text and added link on 6/6/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 06/05/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 5/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                Joint Motion for extension of time regarding Plaintiffs' Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims and Parties Contentions filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) Modified text on 5/30/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 05/29/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 5/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Answer to 143 First Amended complaint and Counterclaim against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified text on 5/6/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 05/05/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    Joint Status Report filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/30/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 4/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      Joint Motion for extension of time until 05/05/2014 to answer Amended Complaint filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc.. Related document(s) 143 . (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        First Amended complaint against Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc.. Filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 6,847,822, # 2 Exhibit B - Virgin Mobile User Manual - LG Optimus, # 3 Exhibit C - Virgin Mobile User Manual - Shuttle Slider, # 4 Exhibit D - Amended Compliance Plan) (Krieger, Timothy) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed Motion for extension of time to file an amended complaint; Defendants to file an amended answer until April 7, 2014; April 23, 2014 filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 4/1/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 3/17/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            Case Management Plan Part I. Case is assigned to the complex track. Claim Construction Tutorial scheduled for 1/29/2015 at 9:00 AM; Claim Construction hearing scheduled for 1/30/2015 at 9:00 AM. (See Order for All Dates and Deadlines.) Attorneys are cautioned not to rely on the docket entry only. Read the attached Order for additional information and requirements. Judge Sara Lioi on 3/17/2014. (P,J) (Entered: 03/17/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              Joint Proposed Schedule filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/28/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                Attorney Appearance by John Charles Evans filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (Evans, John) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance by Ryan B. McCrum filed by on behalf of All Defendants. (McCrum, Ryan) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Motion for attorney Timothy D. Krieger to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6417136, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Timothy D. Krieger, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Motion for attorney Stephanie H. To to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6417132, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Stephanie H. To, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified to add attorney's last name on 2/24/2014 (G,CA). (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Michael P. Kella to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6417127, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Michael P. Kella, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Benjamin R. Askew to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number 0647-6417115, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Benjamin R. Askew, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Reply in support of 129 Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions for Reassignment filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/20/2014 (R,Sh). (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              Opposition to 129 Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Combined Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/14/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for extension of one day for the parties' to submit a report of the parties' planning meeting filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) Modified text on 2/13/2014 (H,KR). (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 2/4/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    Motion to reassign case to Judge Adams filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      Revised Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 2/20/2014 at 9:00 AM in Chambers 526 before Judge Sara Lioi with counsel only; parties not required to attend or participate. Judge Sara Lioi on 1/29/2014. (S,He) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Motion to lift stay of Proceedings filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit March 15, 2010 PTO Denial, # 2 Exhibit June 5, 2009 PTO Order, # 3 Exhibit February 20, 2013 PTO Reexamination Certificate, # 4 Exhibit July 29, 2013 PTO Reexamination Certificate)(Hill, John) (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Order staying case and directing the Clerk to statistically close this matter. Nothing contained in this order shall be considered a dismissal or disposition of this matter, and should further proceedings in it become necessary or desirable, any party may initiate it in the same manner as if this order had not been entered. Judge Sara Lioi on 9/27/12. (P, S) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Notice of Withdrawal of Timothy Grochocinski filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Grochocinski, Timothy) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Sara Lioi for all further proceedings as related to 4:08cv818. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 12/1/2010. (D,M) (Entered: 12/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                Status Conference Order/minutes of Telephone Conference held on 11/22/2010. All of the parties agreed that 4:08cv816, 4:08cv818, 4:08cv821 and 4:09cv2815 involve the same technology and the same patents and are related. The court will speak with the judges who are assigned to the these cases and determine whether they are related and how they should be managed. Time: 30 minutes. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/30/2010. (D,M) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  Notice [non-document] of Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/22/2010 at 3:30 PM before Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. The telephone conference will be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. After all counsel are on line, plaintiff's counsel is to place the call to the Chambers of Chief Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. at (216) 357-7171. (B,IE) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Address Change Notice by Anthony G. Simon filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Simon, Anthony) (Entered: 11/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Motion for attorney Anthony G. Simon to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276257, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 9/7/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Timothy Grochocinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-4276080, filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Defendant Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., Counter-Claimant Virgin Mobile USA, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B Certificate of Good Standing, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hill, John) Modified exhibit text on 9/8/2010 (G,CA). (Entered: 09/07/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 9/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Substitution of Counsel removing attorney Hahn Loeser & Parks, LLP and adding attorney John F. Hill filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Hill, John) (Entered: 09/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 8/30/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Motion for leave of Court to File Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Hill, John) (Entered: 08/30/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              Order denying Joint Motion to consolidate cases (Related Doc # 104 ). Judge Peter C. Economus on 3/2/10.(BR,S) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 2/5/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Motion by T. John Ward, Jr. and Jack Wesley Hill to withdraw as attorney filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(P,G) (Entered: 02/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Motion for attorney Brent N. Bumgardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-3943111, filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Brent N. Bumgardner)(Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Motion by Mark V. Campagna and Jeffrey L. Waters to withdraw as attorney filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Waters, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 2/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Motion by Guy N. Harrison to withdraw as attorney filed by Defendant Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., Counter-Claimant Virgin Mobile USA, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Waters, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Motion for attorney Christie B. Lindsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-3934970, filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Christie B. Lindsey)(Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Motion for attorney Barry J. Bumgardner to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-3934961, filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Barry J. Bumgardner)(Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Motion for attorney Edward R. Nelson, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0647-3934941, filed by Plaintiff EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Edward R. Nelson, III)(Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Attorney Appearance by Jason R. Strobel filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Strobel, Jason) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Attorney Appearance by Robert J. Diaz filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Diaz, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance by R. Eric Gaum filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Gaum, R.) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney Appearance by Michael J. Garvin filed by on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Garvin, Michael) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Joint Motion to consolidate cases filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc., EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC and Location Based Services LLC. (Ducatman, Robert) Modified filers on 1/19/2010 (JLG). (Entered: 01/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Order of Reassignment. This case is returned to the Clerk for reassignment to Judge Peter C. Economus for all further proceedings. Further, granting in part joint 102 motion to change/transfer venue to Judge Economus as a related case and postpone the scheduled case management conference Judge John R. Adams on 1/13/10. (K,C) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/8/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Joint Motion to change/transfer venue to Judge Economus as a related case and postpone the scheduled case management conference filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc.. (Ducatman, Robert) (Entered: 01/08/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 1/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 1/28/2010 at 11:30 AM at Courtroom 575 before Judge John R. Adams. Signed by Judge John R. Adams on 1/6/10. (Attachments: # 1 Report of Parties' Planning Meeting, # 2 Local Rules, # 3 Consent to Magistrate form, # 4 Estimated Budget of Fees and Expenses, # 5 ECF Policies and Procedures)(A,E) (Entered: 01/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 12/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Texas Eastern. Case number 2:09-cv-00091. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 12/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 96 Motion to Sever; granting 96 Motion to Change Venue. Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. and Kajeet, Inc. and transfer venue to the Northern District of Ohio. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 12/1/09. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 12/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jennifer L. Gregor by 7-Eleven, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Yarbrough, Herbert) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 94 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/25/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      Joint MOTION to Sever Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. and kajeet, Inc., Joint MOTION to Change Venue by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC, Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Waters, Jeffrey) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 1/5/2010., Joinder of Parties due by 1/5/2010. Other deadlines set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 11/16/09. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ***REPLACES # 93 ***Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsey, Christie) Modified on 11/17/2009 (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ***FILED IN ERROR. FILED UNDER WRONG EVENT. PLEASE IGNORE.***Agreed MOTION to Amend/Correct 91 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings,, by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lindsey, Christie) Modified on 11/16/2009 (ch, ). [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Amendment to Initial Disclosures (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 11/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Claim Construction Hearing set for 6/24/2010 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2011., Claim Construction Conference set for 9/9/2009 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Final Pretrial Conference 10/3/2011 before Judge David Folsom. All other deadlines are set forth herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/21/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/21/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/21/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hesha Abrams, Esq. at 7616 Burns Run, Suite 180, Dallas, Texas 75248-2322 Phone: (972) 702-9066 Facsimile: (972) 702-0656. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/14/09. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/14/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 10/14/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Hill, Jack) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Agreement on Mediator (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/9/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Protective Order by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 10/09/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by 7-Eleven, Inc. of Supplemental Initial Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by Ztar Mobile, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Disclosure by Circle K Stores, Inc. (Initial Disclosures) (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Disclosure by 7-Eleven, Inc. Regarding Initial Disclosures (Yarbrough, Herbert) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Disclosure by Tracfone Wireless, Inc. of Initial Disclosures (Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Disclosure by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC of Compliance with P.R. 3-1 and P.R. 3-2 (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Disclosure by GreatCall, Inc. re: Initial Disclosures (Pickett, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Disclosure by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. (Waters, Jeffrey) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/18/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Disclosure by kajeet, Inc. (Waters, Jeffrey) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/18/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2009. (Jan Lockhart, ECRO.) (jml) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 9/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 9/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Louis Waters on behalf of Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., kajeet, Inc. (Waters, Jeffrey) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 09/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Elaine Gunter on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Gunter, Debra) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 8/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE(Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2009 10:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on August 12, 2009. (jml) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Change of Address by Brent Nelson Bumgardner (Bumgardner, Brent) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Barry Bumgardner (Bumgardner, Barry) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Change of Address by Christie Brow Lindsey (Lindsey, Christie) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Change of Address by Edward R Nelson, III (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 8/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/9/2009 10:00 AM in Mag Ctrm (Marshall) before Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. (jml) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 08/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 59 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant TracFone Wireless, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 51 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Ztar Mobile, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 46 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Kajeet, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 45 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Tracfone Wireless, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent America Movil for Tracfone Wireless, Inc.. (Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/19/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint,, COUNTERCLAIM against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC by Tracfone Wireless, Inc..(Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/19/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by kajeet, Inc. (Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/16/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. (Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 50 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Guy N Harrison terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/15/09. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by 7-Eleven, Inc. (Augustine, Andrea) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by 7-Eleven, Inc..(Augustine, Andrea) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrea M Augustine on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Augustine, Andrea) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ztar Mobile, Inc. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC by Ztar Mobile, Inc..(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Guy N. Harrison by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Guy) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/11/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 44 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant TracFone Wireless, Inc. to file a pleading responsive to Plaintiffs Original Complaint is extended until June 19, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham on 6/11/09. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GreatCall, Inc. (Pickett, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant GreatCall, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by GreatCall, Inc..(Pickett, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC by kajeet, Inc..(Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC by Virgin Mobile USA, L.P..(Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/10/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by Tracfone Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/4/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 38 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Circle K Stores, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/04/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Herbert A Yarbrough, III on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Yarbrough, Herbert) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melvin R Wilcox, III on behalf of 7-Eleven, Inc. (Wilcox, Melvin) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 06/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. as to deft MGA Entertainment Inc personally served on4/9/09 (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Circle K Stores, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alimentation Couche-Tard Inc, Other Affiliate Circle K Corporation for Circle K Stores, Inc.. (Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC by Circle K Stores, Inc..(Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ztar Mobile, Inc..( Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 7-Eleven, Inc..( Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GreatCall, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Tracfone Wireless, Inc..( Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Virgin Mobile USA, L.P..( Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER re 30 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, MGA Entertainment, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/09. (mrm, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER re 29 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Location Based Services LLC, EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Ace Cash Express, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 5/12/09. (mrm, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/12/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant MGA Entertainment, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Defendant Ace Cash Express, Inc. by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/11/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re kajeet, Inc..( Campagna, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 05/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. Tracfone Wireless, Inc. served on 4/6/2009 by servind Meedra Surratte, Managing Agent authorized to accept service, answer due 5/27/2009. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/29/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. kajeet, Inc. served on 4/6/2009 by serving Mary Drummond, Managing Agent authorized to accept service, answer due 4/27/2009. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/27/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re MGA Entertainment, Inc..( Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Circle K Stores, Inc..( Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/23/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ztar Mobile, Inc..( Kennerly, Christopher) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. Ace Cash Express, Inc. served on 4/7/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. Virgin Mobile USA, L.P. served on 4/7/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. Ztar Mobile, Inc. served on 4/7/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. GreatCall, Inc. served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. 7-Eleven, Inc. served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Returned Executed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. Circle K Stores, Inc. served on 4/6/2009, answer due 4/27/2009. (ch, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re GreatCall, Inc..( Pickett, John) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/21/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re 7-Eleven, Inc..( Gregor, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/21/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint by Tracfone Wireless, Inc..( Israel, Sharon) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed first Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Virgin Mobile USA, L.P..( Harrison, Guy) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/15/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brent Nelson Bumgardner on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Bumgardner, Brent) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christie Brow Lindsey on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Lindsey, Christie) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward R Nelson, III on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Nelson, Edward) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/3/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Bumgardner, Barry) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/03/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/2/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric M. Albritton on behalf of EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (Albritton, Eric) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Consent Form Mailed to EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE for pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Charles Everingham. Signed by Judge David Folsom on 4/1/09. (ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            E-GOV SEALED SUMMONS Issued as to Ace Cash Express, Inc., Ztar Mobile, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., 7-Eleven, Inc., MGA Entertainment, Inc., Circle K Stores, Inc., GreatCall, Inc., kajeet, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Ace Cash Express, # 2 Circle K Stores, # 3 GreatCall, # 4 kajett Inc, # 5 MGA Entertainment, # 6 TracFone Wireless, # 7 Virgin Mobile, # 8 Ztar Mobile)(ehs, ) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Location Based Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Acacia Research Corporation, Other Affiliate Acacia Patent Acquisition LLC for Location Based Services LLC. (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC identifying Corporate Parent None for EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC. (Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against Ace Cash Express, Inc., Ztar Mobile, Inc., Virgin Mobile USA, L.P., 7-Eleven, Inc., MGA Entertainment, Inc., Circle K Stores, Inc., GreatCall, Inc., kajeet, Inc., Tracfone Wireless, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 05400000000001941046.), filed by EMSAT Advanced Geo-Location Technology, LLC, Location Based Services LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ward, Thomas) [Transferred from txed on 12/3/2009.] (Entered: 04/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?