Smart Options, LLC v. Jump Rope, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02498
District Judge Amy J. St. Eve, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 17, 2017 at 2:50 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Smart Options, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Smart Options, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Geoffrey Andrew Baker +1 708 707 8778 geoffb@optionit.com
v.
No Logo Jumprope, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KrausFlaming LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Todd H. Flaming +1 312 447 7217 todd@krausflaming.com
Space Kenneth E. Kraus +1 312 447 7216 +1 312 236 9201 ken@krausflaming.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Tom Weathered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stephen David Scallan +1 312 201 8969 stevescallan@covad.net
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Office Chicago
Filed 4/4/2012
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Cook
Terminated 11/13/2012
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags AO279,APPEAL,MARTIN,PATENT PROGRAM,TERMED
  Entries (108) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: 6/23/2014 Order on Motion for Writ
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 6/23/2014. Defendant's motion for writ of execution [102] is withdrawn. Defendant's oral motion to terminate all outstanding liens and close all citation proceedings is granted. Mailed notice (kef, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014 Notice of Motion
    NOTICE of Motion by Stephen David Scallan for presentment of motion for writ[102] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 6/23/2014 at 08:30 AM. (Scallan, Stephen)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 6/11/2014, Entered: 6/11/2014, Terminated: 6/23/2014 ~Motion for Writ
      MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for writ Of Execution Or Alternative Relief (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3, # (4) Exhibit 4, # (5) Exhibit 5)(Scallan, Stephen)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: 5/23/2014 other
        MANDATE by the United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit. Seventh Circuit Appeal no. 13-1116, 13-1218. (tg, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 In-Court Hearing
          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Case called for a citation hearing on 5/14/14. Plaintiff/judgment debtor failed to appear. Plaintiff/judgment debtor shall produce the documents requested in the citation by 5/21/14 and sit for deposition by 5/30/14. Mailed notice (kef, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/14/2014, Entered: 5/14/2014 notice of filing
            NOTICE by Jump Rope, Inc. Of Filing (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Citation Notice, # (2) Exhibit Citation, # (3) Exhibit Proof Of Service)(Scallan, Stephen)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/24/2014 citation issued
              CITATION to Discover Assets issued as to Geoffrey Andrew Baker (Notice Filed). (Attachments: # (1) Citation Notice) (jmp, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: 4/22/2014 Attorney Appearance
                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. by Stephen David Scallan (Scallan, Stephen)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/16/2014, Entered: 4/17/2014 USCA Judgment
                  USCA for the Federal Circuit: JUDGMENT regarding notice of appeal[77], notice of appeal[61] ; USCA No. 2013-1116, -1218 (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Entry of Judgment Without Opinion, # (2) Questions and Answers, # (3) Information Sheet)(tg, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 95 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013 other
                    DECLARATION of Peter K. Braxton Unredacted version of Declaration (per Aug. 7, 2013 minute order) by Jump Rope, Inc. (Flaming, Todd) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/3/2013) (np, ).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/30/2013, Entered: 8/30/2013, Terminated: 9/19/2013 Motion to Stay
                      MOTION by Jump Rope, Inc. to stay discovery pending resolution of its motion for summary judgment of non-infringement Unredacted version of Motion to Stay (per Aug. 7, 2013 minute order) (Flaming, Todd) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 9/3/2013) (np, ).
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant's unopposed motion for leave to file unsealed version of document previously filed under seal [91] is granted. Defendant is given leave to file the unredacted version of its motion to stay and supporting declaration of Peter K. Braxton. No appearance is required on the 8/19/13 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013 Notice of Motion
                          NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief[91] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/19/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/7/2013, Entered: 8/7/2013, Terminated: 8/7/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                            MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc.UNOPPOSED Motion to File Unsealed Versions of Documents Previously Filed Under Seal (Flaming, Todd)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 90 Filed: 5/8/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court awards Jump Rope the $60,935 in fees that it requested in its Petition for Fees [79]. [For further details, see minute order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/30/2013, Entered: 3/30/2013 Reply
                                REPLY by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. to motion for miscellaneous relief[79] Reply in Support of Defendant's Petition for Fees (Flaming, Todd)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: 3/29/2013 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant's motion for leave to file reply brief instanter [86] is granted. Counsel shall separately file the reply brief upon receipt of this order. No appearance is required on the 4/2/13 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013 Notice of Motion
                                    NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for leave to file[86] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 4/2/2013 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/26/2013, Entered: 3/26/2013, Terminated: 3/29/2013 Motion for Leave to File
                                      MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for leave to file Reply Brief INSTANTER (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Reply Brief))(Flaming, Todd)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 Response
                                        RESPONSE by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC to motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                          DECLARATION of Steven P. Mandell regarding motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Flaming, Todd)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                            DECLARATION of Cary S. Kappel regarding motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Flaming, Todd)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                              DECLARATION of Michael A. Jacobs regarding motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Flaming, Todd)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                                DECLARATION of Patrick Richards regarding motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Flaming, Todd)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013 Declaration
                                                  DECLARATION of Todd H. Flaming regarding motion for miscellaneous relief[79] (Flaming, Todd)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: 3/4/2013, Terminated: 5/8/2013 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc.Defendant's Petition for Fees (Flaming, Todd)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/22/2013 transmitted short record to USCA
                                                      TRANSMITTED to the Federal Circuit the short record on notice of appeal[77]. Notified counsel (smm)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 2/21/2013, Entered: 2/21/2013 Notice of Appeal
                                                        NOTICE of appeal by Smart Options, LLC regarding orders [76] Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-8069837. (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Blank 76 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Memorandum, Opinion & Order
                                                          MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 2/11/2013:Mailed notice(kef, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: 2/11/2013 Order on Motion for Sanctions
                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants Defendant Jump Rope, Inc.'s motion for sanctions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 11 [64]. The Court grants Jump Rope leave to file a petition detailing its attorneys' fees in this action, along with affidavits or declarations supporting the rates charged and time spent defending this action, on or before 3/4/13. Smart Options may file a response one or before 3/25/13. [For further details, see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 2/3/2013, Entered: 2/3/2013 Transcript
                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 8/28/12 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 2/3/2013, Entered: 2/3/2013 Transcript
                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 7/26/12 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 2/3/2013, Entered: 2/3/2013 Transcript
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 5/30/12 before the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve. Court Reporter Contact Information: Joseph Rickhoff, 312-435-5562, joseph_rickhoff@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 2/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/6/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2013. (Rickhoff, Joseph)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: 1/24/2013 Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                    REPLY by Jump Rope, Inc. to response in opposition to motion, [70] for Rule 11 sanctions (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: 1/10/2013 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                      RESPONSE by Smart Options, LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for sanctions (RULE 11 SANCTIONS)[64] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. 1, # (2) Exhibit Ex. A, # (3) Exhibit Ex. B, # (4) Exhibit Ex. C, # (5) Exhibit Ex. D, # (6) Exhibit Ex. E, # (7) Exhibit Ex. F, # (8) Exhibit Ex. G, # (9) Exhibit Ex. H (part I), # (10) Exhibit Ex. I, # (11) Exhibit Ex. J (part I), # (12) Exhibit Ex. J (part II), # (13) Exhibit Ex. H (part II))(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Motion Hearing
                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Motion hearing held on 12/20/2012. Defendant's motion for Rule 11 sanctions [64] is entered. Response shall be filed by 1/10/13. Reply by 1/24/13. Ruling by mail. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 USCA Order
                                                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the USCA for the Federal Circuit regarding notice of appeal[61] ; Appellate case no. : 2013-1116. (mr, ) Modified on 2/12/2013 (lcw, ).
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT from the USCA for the Federal Circuit regarding notice of appeal 61 ; Appellate case no. : 2013-1116. (mr, ) Modified on 2/12/2013 (lcw, ). (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Notice of Correction
                                                                              NOTICE of Correction regarding transmitted short record to USCA[63]. The incorrect document [pdf] was linked to the entry. Transmittal to USCA was incorrect. The correct document [pdf] has been linked to the entry. Case has been transmitted to the Federal Circuit. (smm)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for sanctions[64] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 12/20/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012, Terminated: 2/11/2013 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for sanctions (RULE 11 SANCTIONS) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 transmitted short record to USCA
                                                                                    TRANSMITTED to the Federal Circuit the short record on notice of appeal[61] via email. Notified counsel (smm) Modified on 12/13/2012 (smm). (Modified on 12/14/2012 (smm).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 notice of appeal due letter
                                                                                      NOTICE of Appeal Due letter sent to counsel of record. (smm)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Notice of Appeal
                                                                                        NOTICE of appeal by Smart Options, LLC regarding orders [58] Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0752-7846747. (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 Patent/Trademark Report
                                                                                          MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Terminate HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Judge Honorable Daniel G. Martin no longer referred to the case.Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 entered judgment
                                                                                              ENTERED JUDGMENT Signed by the Deputy Clerk on 11/13/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 58 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Memorandum, Opinion & Order
                                                                                                MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/13/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Order on Motion to Strike
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: The Court grants Defendant Jump Rope, Inc.'s motion for summary judgment of non-infringement [24] and motion to strike [51]. All pending dates and deadlines are stricken. Civil case terminated. [For further details see separate Memorandum Opinion and Order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 58 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 11/13/2012:Mailed notice(kef, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      RESPONSE by Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Filings [51] (Baker, Geoffrey) (Docket Text modified by Clerks' Office.)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Daniel G. Martin:In light of defendant's pending motion for summary judgment, parties joint telephonic request to reset the 10/30/2012 status hearing to 11/27/2012 at 09:30 a.m. is granted. No appearance is required for 10/30/2012.Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: 10/29/2012 Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant's motion to strike [51] is entered. Response by 11/5/12. No appearance is required on the 10/30/12 notice date. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/18/2012, Entered: 10/18/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion to strike[51] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/30/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion to strike[51] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 10/23/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: 10/17/2012, Terminated: 11/13/2012 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. to strike (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: 10/11/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Daniel G. Martin: Status hearing set for 10/29/2012 is stricken and reset for 10/30/2012 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (lxs, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Supplement
                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT to Response[41] (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: 10/10/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement[24] SUPPLEMENTAL (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2012, Entered: 10/7/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement[24] (Signed) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: 10/3/2012 referring case to magistrate judgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that Daniel G. Martin has entered on duty as a Magistrate Judge for the Northern District of Illinois, with a duty station in Chicago, Illinois, effective October 1, 2012; therefore Pursuant to Internal Operating Procedure 17, the attached list of civil cases previously pending before Magistrate Judge Morton Denlow are hereby reassigned to Magistrate Judge Martin. It is further ordered that the attached list of civil referrals previously before Magistrate Judge Denlow are hereby transferred to Magistrate Judge Martin. It is further ordered that Magistrate Judge Martin is to become the designated magistrate judge pursuant to Local Rule 72.1 in any pending civil or criminal case where Magistrate Judge Denlow was the designated magistrate judge as of September 30, 2012. It is further ordered that, unless otherwise ordered by Magistrate Judge Martin, all hearing dates, deadlines, and schedules set by Magistrate Judge Denlow in the attached list of cases are to remain in effect. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this order is to become effective on October 1, 2012. Case referred to the Honorable Daniel G. Martin. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/1/2012. Mailed notice (td, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Statement
                                                                                                                            Reply to Plaintiff's LR 56.1(b)(3)(C) Statement of Additional Facts STATEMENT by Jump Rope, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: 9/28/2012 Reply
                                                                                                                              REPLY by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. to memorandum in opposition to motion[40] and in support of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement[24] Declaration of Geoffrey A. Baker (Attachments: # (1) Ex. A - Dep Notice of Braxton, # (2) Ex. B - Dep Notice of Bryant, # (3) Ex. C - Flaming emails, # (4) Ex D.1 - Ora subpoena, # (5) Ex. D.2 - Ora subpoena proof of service, # (6) Ex. E - Ora website excerpt re JumpRope, # (7) Ex. F.1 - Fitzpatrick emails, # (8) Ex. F.2 - Fitzpatrick emails)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement[24] Declaration of Ryan J. Gartner (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A - 539 Patent, # (2) Exhibit Ex. B - J. Lefkow's Claim Construction, # (3) Exhibit Ex. C - Initial Infringement Contentions, # (4) Exhibit Ex. D - Cover charge examples)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Response
                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Plaintiff Smart Options, LLC RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S LR 56.1 STATEMENT OF FACTS AND ADDITIONAL FACTS REQUIRING THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BE DENIED (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/18/2012, Entered: 9/18/2012 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Smart Options, LLC in Opposition to motion for summary judgment[24] (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: 9/12/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Status hearing set for 11/15/12 is stricken and reset to 11/19/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/10/2012, Entered: 9/10/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Status hearing set for 9/11/2012 is stricken by agreement and reset to 10/29/2012 at 10:00 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Motion hearing held on 8/28/2012. Plaintiff failed to appear. Defendant's motion to stay all discovery pending resolution of its motion for summary judgment [30] is granted. Defendant's motion for summary judgment of non-infringement [24] is entered. Response shall be filed by 9/18/12. Reply by 9/28/12. Status hearing set for 9/19/12 is stricken and reset to 11/15/12 at 8:30 a.m. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 other
                                                                                                                                              RESTRICTED DOCUMENT PURSUANT TO LR 26.2 (A court order is required to view a sealed/restricted document.) (ph, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/28/2012 other
                                                                                                                                                RESTRICTED DOCUMENT PURSUANT TO LR 26.2 (A court order is required to view a sealed/restricted document.) (ph, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: 8/24/2012 Order on Motion For Leave to File.
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Defendant's motion for leave to file under seal [32] is granted. Defendant is given leave to file under seal an unredacted version of defendant's motion to stay discovery and the declaration of Peter Braxton. Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for leave to file[32] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012, Terminated: 8/24/2012 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for leave to file Under Seal (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion to stay, [30] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: 8/23/2012, Terminated: 8/28/2012 Motion to Stay
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. to stay Discovery Pending Resolution of its Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (public version) (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B (public version), # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Notice of Motion
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Todd H. Flaming for presentment of motion for summary judgment[24] before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 8/28/2012 at 08:30 AM. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Todd H. Flaming regarding motion for summary judgment[24] of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B part 1, # (3) Exhibit B part 2, # (4) Exhibit B part 3, # (5) Exhibit B part 4, # (6) Exhibit B part 5, # (7) Exhibit C, # (8) Exhibit D, # (9) Exhibit E)(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Peter K. Braxton regarding motion for summary judgment[24] (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Exhibit E)(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 statement in support
                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc.in Support of MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement[24] (Rule 56.1(a) Statement) (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Jump Rope, Inc. in support of motion for summary judgment[24] of Non-Infringement (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: 8/20/2012, Terminated: 11/13/2012 Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. for summary judgment of Non-Infringement (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/9/2012, Entered: 8/9/2012 Terminate Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow: Status hearing is set for 9/11/2012 at 09:45 AM.: NOTE TIME CHANGE from 10:00 AM to 9:45 AM.Mailed notice (ldg, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/26/2012, Entered: 7/26/2012 status hearing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 7/26/2012 and continued to 9/19/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/14/2012, Entered: 6/15/2012 magistrate judge status hearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:Magistrate Judge Status hearing held on 6/14/2012. Status hearing is continued to 9/11/2012 at 10:00 AM. because the parties are currently engaged in direct settlement negotiations.Mailed notice (ldg, )
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2012, Entered: 6/1/2012 Set/Reset HearingsCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Honorable Morton Denlow:This case has been referred to Judge Denlow to conduct a settlement conference. The parties are directed to review and to comply with Judge Denlow's Standing Order Setting Settlement Conference. Copies are available in chambers or through Judge Denlow's web page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Judge Denlow requires full compliance with this standing order before conducting a settlement conference. Failure to comply with the provisions of the Court's Standing Order Setting Settlement Conference may result in the unilateral cancellation of the settlement conference by the Court. The parties shall jointly contact the courtroom deputy, Linda Garth at 312/435-5857, with mutually agreeable dates or appear at 10:00 a.m. on 6/14/2012 to set a settlement conference date. Because of the volume of settlement conferences conducted by Judge Denlow, once a settlement conference date has been agreed upon, no continuance will be granted without a motion showing extreme hardship. Parties are required to deliver to chambers or fax to chambers (312/554-8547) copies of their most recent settlement demands and offers at least (3) business days prior to the settlement conference. Mailed notice (ldg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 referring case to magistrate judge
                                                                                                                                                                                EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to the Honorable Morton Denlow for Settlement Conference. Signed by Executive Committee on 5/30/2012. (ph, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 Order
                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve on 5/30/2012:Mailed notice(kef, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/30/2012, Entered: 5/30/2012 status hearing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve:Status hearing held on 5/30/2012 and continued to 7/26/2012 at 08:30 AM.Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2012, Entered: 5/27/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS Report CORRECTED TO INCLUDE MISSING EXHIBIT ONLY by Smart Options, LLC (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, Claim Construction - 09-CV-7375)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: 5/25/2012 Status Report
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS Report Joint Initial Status Report by Smart Options, LLC (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. by Kenneth E. Kraus (Kraus, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 notification of affiliates pursuant to local rule 3.2
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Jump Rope, Inc. (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jump Rope, Inc.(Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2012, Entered: 5/3/2012 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. by Todd H. Flaming (Flaming, Todd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: 4/20/2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Honorable Amy J. St. Eve: Joint Status Report due by 5/25/2012. Initial status hearing set for 5/30/2012 at 08:30 AM in courtroom 1241. Local patent rules will apply in this case. [For further details see minute order.] Mailed notice (kef, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 assigning/reassigning Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: It appearing that 12 C 2498, Smart Options v. Jump Rope, Inc., pending before the Hon. Ronald A. Guzman, has been identified for transfer to the Patent Case Pilot Program in which this Court is participating, therefore It is hereby ordered that 12 C 2498, Smart Options v. Jump Rope, Inc., is to be reassigned by lot to one of the district judges participating in the pilot program. Case reassigned to the Honorable Amy J. St. Eve for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 4/18/12. (ef, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: 4/16/2012 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Smart Options, LLC as to Jump Rope, Inc. on 4/12/2012, answer due 5/3/2012. (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/13/2012, Entered: 4/13/2012 text entry
                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Ronald A. Guzman: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this case to the Patent Case Pilot Program. Mailed notice (cjg, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Jump Rope, Inc. (lcw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Patent/Trademark Report
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MAILED Patent report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (ph, ) (Main Document 6 replaced on 4/5/2012) (ph, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 other
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LR 3.4 Notice of Claims Involving Patents by SMART OPTIONS, LLC (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 Attorney Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff SMART OPTIONS, LLC by Geoffrey Andrew Baker (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Attorney Appearance by SMART OPTIONS, LLC (Duplicate filing of entry no. [4].) (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2012, Entered: 4/5/2012 civil cover sheet
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Case Assigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ronald A. Guzman. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Martin C. Ashman. (jn, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: 4/4/2012 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed by SMART OPTIONS, LLC; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0752-7018489. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Ex. A, USPN 7313539)(Baker, Geoffrey)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?