United States v. Moneygram International, Inc.
Criminal Case Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:12-cr-00291-CCC

Tags

Reality Check: Facebook, Inc.

This docket is featured in the January 24, 2019 article Reality Check: Facebook, Inc..

Last Updated March 15, 2021 at 10:57 PM DT (7.4 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kim Douglas Daniel +1 717 221 4482 kim.daniel@usdoj.gov
v.
MoneyGram International, Inc. MoneyGram International, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John K. Villa +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 jvilla@wc.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office Harrisburg
Filed 11/9/2012
County Dauphin
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 and 2. FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION
Count 2
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 5322A.F
Offense Level 4
355318(h) and 5322(b) and 31 1022.210(a) Failing to Maintain Effective Anti-Money Laundering Program
Defendant Custody Status
Flag WVNEED
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/27/2020 Notice - other
NOTICE Joint Notice of Second Amendment to Amendment to and Extension of Deferred Prosecution Agreement by Moneygram International, Inc. (Daniel, Kim)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/3/2020, Entered: 3/3/2020 Notice of Appearance - USA
    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Ravi R. Sharma appearing for USA. (Sharma, Ravi)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/25/2020, Entered: 2/25/2020 Notice - other
      NOTICE Joint Notice of Amendment to Amendment to and Extension of Deferred Prosecution Agreement by Moneygram International, Inc. (Daniel, Kim)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: 2/24/2020 Special Admissions Form ApprovedCourt Filing
        SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ephraim Wernick. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 2/24/2020. (ktt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Docket Annotation
          DOCKET ANNOTATION: Bar status verified for petitioner and associate counsel. (rw)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/21/2020, Entered: 2/21/2020 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
            PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION by Tracey McDevitt Hagan on behalf of Moneygram International, Inc. Attorney Ephraim Wernickis seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-5017241. (Hagan, Tracey)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document 35 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: 11/9/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
              ORDER granting joint motion [34] to extend prosecution & trial on the information to 5/10/21. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/09/18. (ki)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018, Terminated: 11/9/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                Joint MOTION to Amend and Extend the Deferred Prosecution Agreement by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) 1, # (2) Exhibit(s) 2, # (3) Exhibit(s) 3, # (4) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document 33 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: 11/5/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                  ORDER granting joint motion [32] to extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement & all its terms... for 4 days until 11/9/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/5/18. (ki)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: 11/2/2018, Terminated: 11/5/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                    Joint MOTION to Extend the Deferred Prosecution Agreement by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Daniel, Kim)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document 31 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                      ORDER granting joint motion [30] to extend deferred prosecution agreement to 11/6/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 9/14/18. (ki)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: 9/12/2018, Terminated: 9/14/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                        Joint MOTION Extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement for fifty (50) days by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: 6/19/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                          ORDER granting joint motion [28] to extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement & all of its terms inc. but not limited to tolling of Speedy Trial Act by 90 days, from 6/21/18 to 9/18/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 6/19/18. (ki)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: 6/18/2018 Document Filed
                            Joint MOTION Extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement for ninety (90) days by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: 5/7/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                              ORDER granting motion [26] to extend deferred prosecution agreement to 6/21/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable John E. Jones, III, for Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner, on 5/7/18. (ki)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: 5/3/2018, Terminated: 5/7/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                Joint MOTION Extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement re [25] Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: 3/21/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                  ORDER -IT IS ORDERED that [24]as to Moneygram International, Inc. (1) - the above captioned Deferred Prosecution Agreement and all its terms, including, but not limited to, the tolling of the Speedy Trial Act, is extended for forty-five (45) days, from March 23, 2018, to and including May 7, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 3/21/18. (sc)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: 3/20/2018, Terminated: 3/21/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                    Joint MOTION Extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement for forty-five (45) days by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                      ORDER re: stipulation [22] - It is hereby ORDERED that above-captioned deferred prosecution agmt & its terms... is extended for 45 days from 2/6/18 to & inc. 3/23/18. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 1/31/18. (ki)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/31/2018, Entered: 1/31/2018, Terminated: 1/31/2018 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                        Joint MOTION Extend Deferred Prosecution Agreement for forty-five (45) days by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/3/2017, Entered: 11/3/2017 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                          ORDER re: stip [20] directing that the deferred prosecution agreement & all of its terms.... be ext'd for 90 days from 11/8/17 to 2/6/18. ( See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 11/2/17. (ki)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017, Terminated: 11/3/2017 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                            Joint MOTION Extend the Deferred Prosecution Agreement by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Daniel, Kim)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Notice of Appearance - USA
                                              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE Margaret A Moeser appearing for USA. (Moeser, Margaret)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/5/2014, Entered: 6/5/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of initial appearance and arraignment of corporate designee of Moneygram International, Inc., held on 28 November 2012 before Judge Conner. Court Reporter: Wesley J. Armstrong, RMR (telephone number 717-542-5569). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it purchase is available through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2014.
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                  DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised to file the Brief in Support for doc. 739 as a separate entry. (pjr)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/4/2013, Entered: 12/4/2013 order on motion for miscellaneous reliefCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER denying non-parties' Carole Goldberg & Debra Patteron's motion to determine sufficiency of evidence to support remissions claim [15]. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Chief Judge Christopher C. Conner on 12/04/13. (ki)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013 Brief in Support
                                                      BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Carole Goldberg and Debra Patterson re [15] MOTION Determine Sufficiency of Evidence to Support Remissions Claim. Brief in Opposition due by 12/16/2013. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits)(pjr)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: 11/27/2013, Terminated: 12/4/2013 motion for miscellaneous relief
                                                        MOTION to Determine Sufficiency of Evidence to Support Remissions Claim filed by Carole Goldberg and Debra Patterson. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(pjr)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Waiver of Indictment
                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT executed by authorized rep for deft Moneygram International, Inc. on 11/28/12. (ki)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/29/2012 Special Admissions Form Approved
                                                            Motion for leave to appear & participate pro hac vice [9] re: David M. Zinn, Esquire granted. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/28/12. (ki)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/28/2012, Entered: 11/28/2012 Court Reporter NotesCourt Filing
                                                              COURT REPORTER NOTES - re: Moneygram International, Inc., filed by Wes Armstrong, of Rule 5 initial appearance hearing held before Judge Conner on 28 November 2012. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 753(b), I certify that these original notes are a true and correct record of proceedings in the United States District Court for the Middle District of PA before Judge Conner on 28 November 2012. By: s/ Wes Armstrong. (Court Reporter Notes are viewable by court staff only.)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by Moneygram International, Inc. (Boyle, Dennis)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: 11/27/2012 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION by Dennis E. Boyle on behalf of Moneygram International, Inc. Attorney David Zinnis seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-2635757. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Boyle, Dennis) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2012: # (2) Code of Professional Conduct) (ki).
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                    DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that Doc. 9 filed 11/27/12 is required to have the CODE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT attached. The Code may be filed separately as a DOCUMENT FILED. (gls)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank  Docket Annotation
                                                                      DOCKET ANNOTATION: Counsel is advised that Doc. 9 filed 11/27/12 is required to have the CODE OF PROFESSIONAL CONDUCT attached. The Code may be filed separately as a DOCUMENT FILED. (gls)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: 11/26/2012 Notice of Appearance - Defendant
                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE: Dennis E. Boyle appearing for Moneygram International, Inc. (Boyle, Dennis)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 summons returned executed
                                                                          Summons Returned Executed on 11/15/12. as to Moneygram International, Inc. (dh)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012 Order on Motion to continue
                                                                            ORDER granting gov't's unopposed motion [5] to reschedule Rule 5-Initial Appearance from 11/27/12 TO 11/28/2012 @ 09:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 11/14/12. (ki)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: 11/14/2012, Terminated: 11/14/2012 Motion to Continue
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Continue Initial Appearance Hearing by USA as to Moneygram International, Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order)(Daniel, Kim)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Summons issued
                                                                                Summons Issued in case as to Moneygram International, Inc. Arraignment/Initial appearance set for 11/27/2012 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (pm)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 plea agreement
                                                                                  Deferred Prosecution AGREEMENT as to Moneygram International, Inc. (Attachments: # (1) Statement of Facts)(pm)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 Criminal Cover Sheet (Restricted Access)
                                                                                    Criminal Cover Sheet (Access Restricted to Court Users) - First Defendant: Moneygram International, Inc. (pm)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: 11/9/2012 information - felony
                                                                                      Felony INFORMATION as to Moneygram International, Inc. (1) count(s) 1, 2. Arraignment set for 11/27/2012 10:00 AM in Harrisburg - Courtroom 2 before Honorable Christopher C. Conner. (pm)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                        Space Space

                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2,423 times.

                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                        Space
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                         
                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                        Need Password Help?