Abarta LLC v. Lincoln Electric Company

Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00680
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 11:29 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Abarta LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Spangler & Fussell PC

Represented by Spangler Law P.C. - Longview

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com

Represented by Weisbrod Matteis & Copley, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James A Fussell, III +1 202 499 7900 jfussell@wmclaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 30 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant, The Lincoln Electric Company, are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/15/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss "Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice" by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING E-DISCOVERY IN PATENT CASES -. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
DOCKET CONTROL ORDER - Amended Pleadings due by 12/9/2013., Joinder of Parties due by 5/17/2013., Markman Hearing set for 2/24/2014 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne., Motions in limine due by 6/30/2014., Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2014., Jury Selection set for 8/4/2014 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap., Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Mediation completion 3/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 5/7/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/07/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Abarta LLC, Lincoln Electric Company Proposed Order Regarding E-Discovery in Patent Cases. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
Submission of Proposed Agreed Docket Control/Scheduling order by Abarta LLC, Lincoln Electric Company. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
Submission of Proposed Agreed Discovery order by Abarta LLC, Lincoln Electric Company. (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Abarta LLC, Lincoln Electric Company Notice of No agreement of Mediator (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/3/2013, Entered: None
***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Submission of ds by Abarta LLC, Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Discovery Order, # 2 Exhibit B - Proposed E-Discovery Order, # 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Docket Control Order)(Saad, Terry) Modified on 5/6/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 19 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Ohio Responses due by 5/16/2013. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 5/1/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 05/01/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/29/2013, Entered: None
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Transfer Venue by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/29/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None
MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Ohio by Lincoln Electric Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Erin Tanner, # 2 Exhibit A-H to Declaration of Erin Tanner, # 3 Exhibit I-T to Declaration of Erin Tanner, # 4 Exhibit Declaration of Deanna Postlehwaite, # 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Utley, Jay) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE by Abarta LLC of Compliance with 3-1 and 3-2 (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - Scheduling Conference set for 4/19/2013 09:45 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and Honorable Roy Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/14/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John G Flaim on behalf of Lincoln Electric Company (Flaim, John) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Desmond McSpadden on behalf of Lincoln Electric Company (McSpadden, William) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Erin Marie Tanner on behalf of Lincoln Electric Company (Tanner, Erin) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lincoln Electric Company identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln Electric Holdings, Inc. for Lincoln Electric Company. (Utley, Jay) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
The Lincoln Electric Company's ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by Lincoln Electric Company.(Utley, Jay) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Terry Afif Saad on behalf of Lincoln Electric Company (Saad, Terry) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lincoln Electric Company.( Utley, Jay) (Entered: 12/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/26/2012, Entered: None
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Abarta LLC. Lincoln Electric Company served on 10/29/2012, answer due 12/19/2012. (ehs, ) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lincoln Electric Company.( Utley, Jay) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/25/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
SUMMONS Issued as to Lincoln Electric Company. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
CORRECTED Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 10/24/2012 (sm, ). (Entered: 10/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Pretrial proceedings to Magistrate Judge Roy S Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 10/23/12. (ehs, ) (Entered: 10/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James A Fussell, III on behalf of Abarta LLC (Fussell, James) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Abarta LLC (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lincoln Electric Company ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3842745.), filed by Abarta LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,224,326, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Spangler, Andrew) (Entered: 10/23/2012)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 73 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?