Molinari et al v. Bloomberg et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:08-cv-04539
District Judge Charles P. Sifton, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 30, 2017 at 1:09 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfonso Quiroz, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrea Rich, Plaintiff
No Logo Ari Hoffnung, Plaintiff
No Logo Betsy Gotbaum, Plaintiff
De Blasio, Bill De Blasio, Bill, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Bill De Blasio"
No Logo Charles Barron, Plaintiff
No Logo Eric Snyder, Plaintiff
No Logo Gloria Smith, Plaintiff
No Logo Guy Molinari, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman H. Siegel +1 212 532 7586 +1 212 448 0066 siegelnorman@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Bierschbach rbierschbach@gibsondunn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gabriel Herrmann +1 212 351 3974 +1 212 351 6251 gherrmann@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jim Walden +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 4035 jwalden@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Ida Sanoff, Plaintiff
No Logo Jo Anne Simon, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Plaintiff
No Logo Kenneth J. Baer, Plaintiff
No Logo Kent Lebsock, Plaintiff
No Logo James, Letitia, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Letitia James"
No Logo Luvenia Suber, Plaintiff
No Logo Mark Winston Griffith, Plaintiff
No Logo Mike Long, Plaintiff
No Logo New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovells LLP-Chicago

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M. Behrman +1 212 909 0600 +1 212 858 1000 andrew.behrman@lovells.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Pieter H.B. Van Tol, III +1 212 909 0661 +1 212 909 0666 pieter.vantol@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Peter Gleason, Plaintiff
No Logo Philip Foglia, Plaintiff
No Logo Phillip DePaolo, Plaintiff
No Logo Rosalie Caliendo, Plaintiff
No Logo Stanley Kalathara, Plaintiff
No Logo Tom Long, Plaintiff
No Logo U.S. Term Limits, Plaintiff
No Logo William C. Thompson, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard A. Bierschbach
No Logo Ydanis Rodriguez, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Board of Electrions in the City of New York, Defendant
No Logo Christine C. Quinn, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
No Logo James J. Sampel, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael R. Bloomberg"

Toggle Switch Represented by City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen Edward Kitzinger +1 212 788 0849 +1 212 788 8877 SKitzing@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan L. Pines +1 212 788 0933 +1 212 788 0940 jpines@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Douglas Weber +1 212 788 0957 +1 212 788 0940 stweber@law.nyc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Ann Wells +1 212 788 0898 +1 212 788 0940 ewells@law.nyc.gov
No Logo New York City Council, Defendant
No Logo Fulani, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Lenora B. Fulani, Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Harry Kresky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Harry Kresky +1 212 581 1516 +1 212 581 1352 hkresky@harrykreskylaw.com
No Logo NYC Organizations of the Independence Party, Amicus Curiae
No Logo Partnership for New York City, Inc., Amicus Curiae

Toggle Switch Represented by Cravath, Swaine & Moore, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert D Joffe +1 212 474 1000 +1 212 474 3700 rjoffe@cravath.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 441 - Civil Rights: Voting
  Entries (94) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 19, 2008, before Judge Sifton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald E. Tolkin, Official Court Reporter, Telephone number 718-613-2647. Email address: ronald_tolkin@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/30/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/9/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2013. (Tolkin, Ronald) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 72 Notice of Appeal,, filed by New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., Kenneth J. Baer, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio, Ida Sanoff, Mark Winston Griffith, Peter Gleason, Ari Hoffnung, Luvenia Suber, Stanley Kalathara, Kent Lebsock, Tom Long, Mike Long, Ydanis Rodriguez, Philip Foglia, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, U.S. Term Limits, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Charles Barron, William C. Thompson, Jr., Alfonso Quiroz, Jo Anne Simon, Letitia James, Andrea Rich, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo. It is Ordered, Adjudged and Decreed that the judgment of the District Court is Affirmed. Issued as Mandate: 5/19/09. USCA#09-0331-cv. (Attachments: # 1 Molinary Decision) (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 06/11/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/9/2009, Entered: None
      MANDATE of USCA as to 71 Notice of Appeal filed by Jose Adames. Appellant moves for leave to withdraw his appeal without prejudice to reinstatement in order that he may return to the District Court to file a motion for reconsideration. It is Ordered that the motion is denied and the appeal is dismissed because it lacks an arguable basis in law or fact. Issued as Mandate: 5/28/09. USCA:09-0355-cv. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 06/10/2009)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: The motion by Jose Adames to intervene as a plaintiff in this action having been denied on January 13, 2009, the motion by Mr. Adames for a Default Judgment is denied for the reasons set forth in this Court's Orders of March 17, 2009, March 20, 2009, and April 7, 2009. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 4/22/2009. C/M to Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 04/24/2009)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None
          ORDER of USCA as to 72 Notice of Appeal,, filed by New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., Kenneth J. Baer, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio, Ida Sanoff, Mark Winston Griffith, Peter Gleason, Ari Hoffnung, Luvenia Suber, Stanley Kalathara, Kent Lebsock, Tom Long, Mike Long, Ydanis Rodriguez, Philip Foglia, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, U.S. Term Limits, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Charles Barron, William C. Thompson, Jr., Alfonso Quiroz, Jo Anne Simon, Letitia James, Andrea Rich, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo. The District Court was without jurisdiction in this action until 3/17/09, the date upon which the Dept. of Justice issued its determination in fulfillment if its responsibility under section 5 of the Voting Rights Act. After consultation with the parties, we remand to the District Court for the sole purpose of allowing it to affirm in full its prior judgment filed 1/14/09. Within 3 days of the docketing of the affirmed judgment of the District Court, the parties will provide the Clerk with written notice of their intention to reassert the identical pleadings and arguments previously filed in the appeal. Certfied 3/30/09. USCA USCA#09-0331-cv. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER affirming this Court's prior judgment dated January 14, 2009. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 4/7/2009. (Sifton, Charles) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/6/2009, Entered: None
              MOTION for Entry of Default "Notation of Default" by Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: The motion by Jose Adames to intervene as a plaintiff in this action having been denied on 1/13/09, Mr. Adames lacks standing to make a "2nd Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law," dated March 23, 2009. The motion is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 3/30/2009. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None
                  Second MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law /Answer to Mr. Andrew Berhman's Delcaration by Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER: Jose Adames ("Adames") having submitted a motion on February 26, 2009 for reconsideration of this Court's January 13, 2009 denial of his motion to intervene in the above named action, the motion is untimely, pursuant to Local Rule 6.3, and is lacking in merit. The motion is denied. To the extent that the motion asserts that Mayor Bloomberg is not the true mayor of New York City and that Adames is the mayor, the motion is in apparent violation of the Order by Judge Kaplan of the Southern District of New York, dated January 14, 2009, in Adames v. Bloomberg, 08CV3804, which states that Adames is "permanently enjoined and restrained from commencing any action in any federal court... relating to his claim that he should be mayor of the City of New York." Further motions by Adames appearing to be in violation of Judge Kaplans order will be referred to the appropriate United States Attorneys Office. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 3/19/2009. C/M. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER: The motion by Jose Adames to intervene as a Pltff in this action having been denied by Memorandum and Order on January 13, 2009, Mr. Adames lacks standing to make motions "to Stop Bloomberg From the Continue Annihilation of Our Economy," "to remove Bloomberg from City Hall," for judgment as a matter of law, and for sanctions, dated March 13, 2009 and March 17, 2009. The motions are denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 3/18/2009. C/M. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 3/20/2009, Entered: None Motion for Sanctions
                        MOTION for Sanctions /Motion for Judgment as a matter of law/Urgent motion to stop Boomberg from the continue annihilation of our economy/To Reiterate the need of immediate removal of Bloomberg from City Hall/Answer to Declaration of Steven D. Weber by Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 03/20/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 3/18/2009, Entered: None
                          AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration Motion to Re-instate Order to Show Cauise and Reconsideration Andrew M. Behrman filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Certificate of Service) (Behrman, Andrew) (Entered: 03/18/2009)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/17/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER: The motion by Jose Adames to intervene as a Pltff in this action having been denied by Memorandum and Order dated January 13, 2009, Mr. Adames lacks standing to make a "Motion to Evict Mayor Bloomberg" (Docket # 77, filed March 9, 2009). The motion is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 3/16/2009. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 03/17/2009)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 75 MOTION for Reconsideration Motion to Re-instate Order to Show Cauise and Reconsideration filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Weber, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/12/2009, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Douglas Weber on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Weber, Steven) (Entered: 03/12/2009)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 3/10/2009, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service re: service of Motion to Evict filed by Jose Adames. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/9/2009, Entered: None
                                    "AN URGENT MOTION to Evict Immediately Mayor Michael Bloomberg," filed by Jose Adames. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 03/11/2009)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the motion by pro se plaintiff Jose Adames, annexed hereto, the parties are directed to show cause in writing, on or before 3/18/09, why the relief requested should not be granted. Responses, if any, are to be served and filed on or before 3/25/09. C/M. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 3/4/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Motion by Jose Adames) (Chee, Alvin) (Entered: 03/05/2009)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 2/26/2009, Entered: None
                                        Motion to Re-instate Order to Show Cause and Reconsideration, filed by Jose Adames. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 03/02/2009)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton: Motion Hearing held on 1/5/2009. Case called. Counsel for all parties present. Decision reserved on the motions for Lenora B. Fulani, the New York Independence Party and the Partnership for New York City, Inc., for leave to file an amicus curiae brief. Decision reserved on the motions of Jose Adames for leave to intervene and for a notation of the default of the defendants. The motion of Dfts City of New York, Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn and the New York City Council for dismissal of the amended complaint is argued. Decision reserved. The cross-motions of the Pltffs and the Dfts for summary judgment are argued - decision reserved. (Court Reporter Marie Foley) (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 1/29/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 70 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 1/29/2009. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 01/29/2009)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 68 Clerk's Judgment, 67 Memorandum & Opinion, by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, Luvenia Suber, Stanley Kalathara, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Filing fee $ 455.00. Receipt# 362296. Service done via ECF. (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 1/22/2009, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 68 Clerk's Judgment, by Jose Adames. No Fee Paid. IFP motion sent to Chambers. NOA served by the Court. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 1/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                  First MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis IFP by Jose Adames. (Gonzalez, Mary) (Entered: 01/26/2009)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 1/20/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 1-5-09, before Judge Sifton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marie Foley, Telephone number 718-613-2596. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/10/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/20/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/20/2009. (Foley, Marie) (Entered: 01/20/2009)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None
                                                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT: It is Ordered and Adjudged that Pltffs take nothing of the Dfts; that Dfts' motion for summary judgment is granted on all claims; that the motions to file briefs as amici curae by the Partnership for New York City, Inc., Lenora B. Fulani, and New York City Organizations of the Independence Party are dismissed as moot; and that judgment is hereby entered dismissing Pltffs' complaint. Ordered by Clerk of Court on 1/14/2009. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 01/15/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: For the reasons stated herein, the Applicant's motions are denied. The Clerk is hereby directed to transmit a copy of the within to the parties and the Magistrate Judge. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 1/13/2009. (Sifton, Charles) (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/13/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MEMORANDUM AND OPINION: Defendants' summary judgment motion is granted. Plaintiffs' summary judgment motion is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 1/12/2009. (Sifton, Charles) (Palmer, Douglas). (Entered: 01/13/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/8/2009, Entered: None
                                                            "Urgent Motion, or Aplication to Entering the requested Entering of Default to the immediate removal of Michael Bloomberg from the Office of the Mayor of NYC," by Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) Fwded to Chambers. (Entered: 01/08/2009)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/7/2009, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth A. Wells on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Wells, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/07/2009)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2009, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan L. Pines on behalf of Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Pines, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/06/2009)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 4, 2008, before Judge Sifton. Court Transcriber Typewrite Word Processing Service, Telephone number 718-966-1401. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/6/2009. (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 01/05/2009)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Entry of Default /Request to Enter Default by Jose Adames. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/31/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                      Letter to the Honorable Charles P. Sifton from Randy M. Mastro re the parties dispositive cross-motions by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 12/29/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. (Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 12/26/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 22 MOTION to Intervene /"Permission for Intervenor Consolidation and Interpleader," by Jose Adames "Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion of Jose Adames for Intervenor, Consolidation and Other Relief and Non-Opposition to Order Relieving Attorney Edward Fagan of Obligations" filed by all plaintiffs. (Behrman, Andrew) (Entered: 12/24/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Herrmann on behalf of Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (notification declined or already on case) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Randy M. Mastro on behalf of Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (notification declined or already on case) (Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 25 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by all plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 89, # 2 Exhibit 90, # 3 Exhibit 91, # 4 Exhibit 92, # 5 Exhibit 93, # 6 Exhibit 94, # 7 Exhibit 95, # 8 Exhibit 96, # 9 Exhibit 97, # 10 Exhibit 98) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  RULE 56.1 STATEMENT in Response to Pls.' Rule 56.1 Statement filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Wells, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Support re 25 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by all plaintiffs. (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION in Opposition re 25 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment of Stephen Kitzinger filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G) (Wells, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                        REPLY in Support re 25 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss [Document No. 40] filed by all plaintiffs. (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 25 Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Wells, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief of the Partnership for New York City, Inc. in Support of Defendants by Partnership for New York City, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Brief of the Partnership for New York City, Inc. as Amicus Curiae in Support of Defendants, # 2 Affidavit of Kathryn S. Wylde with Statement of Interest of the Partnership for New York City, Inc., as Amicus Curiae, # 3 Certificate of Service) (Joffe, Robert) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              Amicus Curiae APPEARANCE entered by Harry Kresky on behalf of Fulani, NYC Organizations of the Independence Party (Kresky, Harry) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                MOTION to Intervene as amici curiae by Lenora B. Fulani, NYC Organizations of the Independence Party. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Affidavit in Support, # 4 Proposed Order, # 5 Certificate of Service) (Kresky, Harry) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for amicii Filing fee $ 25, receipt number 02070000000003300121. by Lenora B. Fulani, NYC Organizations of the Independence Party. (Kresky, Harry) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    CORRECTED MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the Dfts' motion to transfer venue is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 12/22/2008. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/22/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the reasons stated herein, the Dfts' motion to transfer venue is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 12/15/2008. See attached. (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                        First MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Randy M. Mastro in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 86, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 40 Notice of MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                            First MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Timothy D. Swain in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3A, # 4 Exhibit 3B, # 5 Exhibit 3C, # 6 Exhibit 3D, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Complaint by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                First MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Peter Gleason in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Summary Judgment Declaration of Howard Rich in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Richard Briffault in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Jo Anne Simon in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Henry J. Stern in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Fred Siegel in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Corey Bearak in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Bill de Blasio in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Michael R. Long in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Letitia James in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Kent Lebsock in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      First MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Guy Molinari in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        First MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Statement Pursuant to Local Rule 56.1 in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          First MOTION for Summary Judgment Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for Summary Judgment by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. Responses due by 12/22/2008 (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Upon the letter by Randy Mastro, annexed hereto as Exhibit A, and the exhibits attached thereto, the parties are directed to show cause in Courtroom 6A, on 1/5/09, at 4:30 p.m. before the undersigned why attorney Edward Fagan should not be relieved of the obligations of representing Pltff intervenors and why other relief, annexed hereto as exhibit B, should not be granted. Opposition papers, if any, are to be served and filed on or before 12/24/08. Reply papers, if any, are directed to be served and filed on or before December 30, 2008. Ordered by Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton on 12/12/2008. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                Letter to Judge Sifton regarding Scheiner et al. v. Bloomberg et al., 08 Civ. 9072 (SHS) by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Intervene /"Permission for Intervenor Consolidation and Interpleader," by Jose Adames. (Attachments: # 1 "Letter to Magistreate Theodore H. Katz, Demanding for the jury trial requested", # 2 "Default on Summary Judgment Order from Judge Lewis A. Kaplan," # 3 "Order from Magistrate Theodore H. Katz", # 4 "Docket From the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York, No. 1:08-CV-03804(LAK)(THK)," # 5 "Summons and Complaint from 1:08-CV-03604", # 6 Exhibits # 1-52) (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton: Civil Cause for Motion held on 12/4/2008. Case called for Order to Show Cause. Counsel for all parties present. Dfts' motion for transfer of this action to the Southern District of New York, as related to Scheiner vs. Bloomberg, CV-08-9072 (SHS) argued. Decision reserved. The parties are to file cross-motions for summary judgment by 12/12/08, made returnable on 1/5/09 at 4:30 p.m. Responses are to be filed by 12/22/08. (Court Reporter Christine Rocco) (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue filed by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Response to Order to Show Cause Concerning Venue filed by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York. (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York (Attachments: # 1 Letter concerning scheduling) (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            DECLARATION re 16 Response to Order to Show Cause, of Randy M. Mastro by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10) (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on November 19, 2008, before Judge Sifton. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ronald E. Tolkin, Official Court Reporter, Telephone number 718-613-2647 ronald_tolkin@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/11/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/22/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/18/2009. (Tolkin, Ronald) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Charles P. Sifton: Status Conference held on 11/19/2008. Case called. All parties present. Dfts' application for an extension of time to answer the complaint is granted on consent. Dfts' time is extended to 12/12/08. All parties are Ordered to Show Cause why the action should (or should not) be transferred to the Southern District of New York as related to Scheiner, et.al. v. Bloomberg, et. al., CV-08-9072 (SHS). All parties are to respond in writing by 12/2/08. Any replies to be filed by 12/3/08. Oral argument is set for 12/4/08, at 4:30 p.m. The parties are ordered to show cause why the application of the Pltff in Scheiner v. Bloomberg case for leave to intervene in this case should not be granted, on the same schedule. (Court Reporter Ron Tolkin) (Abdallah, Fida) (Entered: 11/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Judge Charles P. Sifton in Response to November 17, 2008 Letter from Corporation Counsel by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 11/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter to the Honorable Charles P. Sifton from Randy M. Mastro, Esq. re Rule 16 Pretrial Conference Request by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Mastro, Randy) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio, Luvenia Suber, Stanley Kalathara. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Mastro, Randy) Modified on 1/26/2009 (McGee, Mary Ann). (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        Letter to Judges Sifton and Orenstein in response to Nov. 13 letter from Edward Fagan and Nov. 14 letter from Randy Mastro by Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Letter to Judge Sifton re: Request for Rule 16 Pretrial Conference by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/14/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Behrman on behalf of New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Behrman, Andrew) (Entered: 11/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER -- For the reasons set forth in the attached document, and with the consent of the parties, I respectfully direct the Clerk to assign this case to a district judge by random selection. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on November 13, 2008. (Fick, Sarah) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter to Magistrate Judge Orenstein re: November 13, 2008 Letter from Edward D. Fagan, Esq. by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen Edward Kitzinger on behalf of all defendants (aty to be noticed) (Kitzinger, Stephen) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter to Magistrate Judge Orenstein in Response to November 12, 2008 Order, by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, New York Public Interest Research Group, Inc., U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio (Herrmann, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER -- For the reasons set forth in the attached document, I order the plaintiffs in the instant case to show cause in writing, no later than November 19, 2008, why I should not direct the Clerk to reassign the case to a randomly selected judge. Any party wishing to respond to any such submission may do so in writing no later than November 26, 2008. I further direct the plaintiffs' counsel immediately to provide a copy of this order, and of any subsequent submission on the instant matter, to counsel for each defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James Orenstein on November 12, 2008. (Fick, Sarah) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        Notice of Related Case Assignment/Designation (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/10/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against Michael R. Bloomberg, Christine C. Quinn, New York City Council, City of New York, James J. Sampel, Board of Electrions in the City of New York $ 350, filed by Letitia James, Charles Barron, Rosalie Caliendo, Phillip DePaolo, Philip Foglia, Kent Lebsock, Andrea Rich, Mike Long, Tom Long, Ida Sanoff, Guy Molinari, Gloria Smith, Eric Snyder, Kenneth J. Baer, Kenneth A. Diamondstone, Peter Gleason, Mark Winston Griffith, Ari Hoffnung, Alfonso Quiroz, Ydanis Rodriguez, Jo Anne Simon, U.S. Term Limits, William C. Thompson, Jr, Betsy Gotbaum, Bill De Blasio. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/10/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 182 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?