USA v. Laskin, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 4:90-cv-00483
District Judge Alvin I. Krenzler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 1, 2016 at 5:08 AM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Northern District of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arthur I. Harris +1 216 622 3711 +1 216 522 4542

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED George Van Cleve +1 202 633 4760
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott Eder +1 202 514 1307
v.
No Logo Abex Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Albert's Automotive, Defendant
No Logo Alco Industries, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Alvin F Laskin, Defendant
No Logo American Cyanamid, Defendant
No Logo Anchor Motor Freight Inc., Defendant
No Logo Arco Station, Defendant
No Logo Arco-Erie, Defendant
No Logo Ashtabula Gasoline & Oil Co., Defendant
No Logo Ashtabula Rubber Co., Defendant
No Logo Atlantic Richfield Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Atlantic Richfield Co."
No Logo Avis Truck Rental, Defendant
No Logo B F Goodrich Tire Center, Defendant
No Logo Be- Kan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Beazer Materials, Defendant
No Logo Bob Mayberry Chevrolet-Toyota, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Borden Inc., Defendant
No Logo Bridgestone Americas, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bridgestone/Firestone, Inc."
No Logo Browning-Ferris Industries of Ohio, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Burich Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Calhio Chemicals Inc., Defendant
No Logo Carlisle Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Carlisle Corp."
No Logo Chuck's Arco, Defendant
No Logo Chuck's Mobil Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Clarkson's American, Defendant
No Logo Cleveland Electric Illuminating Company,, Defendant
No Logo Coleman Young Motors, Defendant
No Logo Combustion Engineering, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Commercial Intertech Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Commercial Intertech Corp."
No Logo Cooperweld Steel Co., Defendant
No Logo Dale's Sohio, Defendant
No Logo Damascus Metals, Defendant
No Logo Deemer's Arco, Defendant
No Logo Dick's Gulf, Defendant
No Logo Dick's Sohio, Defendant
No Logo Diver Steel City Auto Crusher Inc., Defendant
No Logo Duff Truck Lines Inc., Defendant
No Logo EAGLE-PICHER INDUSTRIES, INC., Defendant
No Logo East Ohio Gas Co., Defendant
No Logo Elwell Brothers Inc., Defendant
No Logo Erie Industrial Trucks, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Erie Press, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Eriez Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Eriez Manufacturing Co."
No Logo Fairview Chrysler Plymouth, Defendant
No Logo Fairview Evergreen Nursery, Defendant
No Logo Fox Oil, Defendant
No Logo Frank & Jim's Service Center, Defendant
No Logo Fred-Vincent Volkswagon, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Freeport Gas Coal Company, Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric Co."
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
General Motors Corporation General Motors Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Motors Corporation, Hydra-Matic Division"
Unknown Role, General Motors Co
Unknown Role, Panamsat Corp
No Logo General Tire, Defendant
No Logo Girard Auto Sales, Defendant
No Logo Girard Plastics Co., Inc., Defendant
No Logo Goodyear Auto Service Center, Defendant
No Logo Gulf & Western Industries, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Gulf & Western Industries"
No Logo Gus' Service, Defendant
No Logo Harbison-walker Refractories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hardinger Transfer Company, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Harshman & Sons Inc., Defendant
No Logo Helmerich Drive-It-Yourself, Defendant
No Logo Horner Tractor Sales, Inc., Defendant
No Logo I & H Cushenan, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Import Motors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Interlake Steamship Co., Defendant
International Paper Company International Paper Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "International Paper Co."
No Logo J.c. Penney Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "J C Penney Co."
No Logo J. I. Case, Defendant
No Logo Jim Sarvas Dodge Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnny's Service Inc., Defendant
No Logo Junction Auto Sales, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Kaiser Aluminum And Chemical Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kaiser Aluminum & Chemical Corp."
No Logo Keifer's Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Kincaid Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Kingsville-Ninety Auto-Truck Stop, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lend Lease Trucks Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lexington Precision Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Lexington Precision Corp."
No Logo Litton Great Lakes Corp., Defendant
No Logo Luther's Sohio, Defendant
Mallinckrodt Group Inc. Mallinckrodt Group Inc., Defendant
No Logo Marenchin Transmission, Defendant
No Logo Mentor Center Shell, Defendant
No Logo Midway-Pontiac, Chevrolet & Buick, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mildred Laskin, Defendant
No Logo Mills Nissan, Defendant
No Logo MOBIL OIL CORP, Defendant
No Logo Mohn Sohio Service, Defendant
No Logo Molded Fiber Glass Tray Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Molded Fiber Glass Tray Co."
No Logo Moores Farm Supply, Defendant
No Logo Morton International, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Autoliv Inc.
No Logo Murray Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Murray Corp."
No Logo Navistar International Transportation Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Niagara Plastics, Defendant
No Logo Nicholas Brunner Auto Service, Defendant
No Logo North East Service Plaza, Inc., Defendant
No Logo O & P Oil and Gas, Inc., Defendant
No Logo O'Connor's Amoco, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ohio Broach & Machine Company, Defendant
No Logo Ohio Edison Company, Defendant
No Logo Parker White Metal Co., Defendant
No Logo Parker-Hannifin Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Parmco Ohio, Defendant
No Logo Pennsylvania Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Pennsylvania Electric Co."
No Logo Perry Ship Building Corp., Defendant
No Logo Pittsburgh and Lake Erie Railroad Co., Defendant
No Logo Plumpton Buick, Defendant
No Logo Poplar Thruway Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Poplar White Truck, Inc., Defendant
No Logo PPG Industries, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "PPG Industries"
No Logo Premix, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Reed Manufacturing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Reed Manufacturing Co."
No Logo Reese's Sunoco, Defendant
No Logo Reliance Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Reliance Electric Co."
No Logo Richcreek Amoco, Defendant
No Logo Rick Case Motors, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rmi Company, Defendant
No Logo Rockwell International Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Rudy Sims Buick, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Russ' Service Station, Defendant
No Logo Ryder Truck Rental, Inc., Defendant
No Logo S.e. Nichols Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sal's Arco, Defendant
Royal Dutch Shell PLC Royal Dutch Shell PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Shell Oil Company"
Unknown Role, Codexis, Inc.
Unknown Role, Cosan Ltd.
No Logo Southway Service, Defendant
No Logo Spear Chrysler Plymouth, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Standard Oil Company, Defendant
No Logo Stapleton Sohio, Defendant
No Logo Steve Hudak Amoco Service, Defendant
No Logo Suburban Volkswagon, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Sun Refining & Marketing Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Sun Refining & Marketing Co."
No Logo Swanson-erie Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Swanson-Erie Corp."
No Logo T.W. Truesdell Trucking, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tel-o-post Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Tel-O-Post Co."
No Logo Tennessee Gas Pipeline Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Tennessee Gas Pipeline Co."
Texaco, Inc. Texaco, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Chevron Corp
Chevron USA, Inc. Unknown Role, Chevron USA, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ngc Corp
No Logo Tim Brown Chevrolet, Defendant
No Logo Trans Plastics Co. of Pennsylvania, Defendant
TRW, Inc. TRW, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Endwave Corp
Unknown Role, Nng Inc
Unknown Role, Smartire Systems Inc.
Unknown Role, Richmond Uk Inc
Unknown Role, Richmond Tai Inc
No Logo Union Carbide Chemicals & Plastics Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Union Carbide Chemicals and Plastics Co., Inc."
United Parcel Service United Parcel Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "United Parcel Service, Inc."
No Logo United Telephone Company of Ohio, Defendant
No Logo Urban's Fam Auto Ctr, Defendant
No Logo USX Corp, Defendant
No Logo Village Gulf Station, Defendant
No Logo W.E. Moore Ford, Defendant
No Logo Wean Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Wean Incorporated"
No Logo West Gate Ford Truck Sales, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Western Reserve Transit Authority, Defendant
No Logo Willco Inc., Defendant
No Logo Zayre Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Zurn Industries, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 9607
Nature of Suit 893 - Environmental Matters
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/24/1992, Entered: None
MARSHAL RETURN OF SERVICE unexecuted - attempted as to defendant Alvin F Laskin; wrong address and phone given; Fee: $75.00 ( 2 pgs) (E,E) (Entered: 02/24/1992)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/3/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: withdrawing motion for relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) [24-1] and withdrawing motion for order reducing the amt of gallonage as a Settling De Minimis Party, reducing the amt its monetary participation. [24-2]; Hardinger Transfer stated that it would seek resolution of this dispute pur to Item XV of the Consent decree which was previously entered. All parties agreed that Hardinger has raised this dispute in a timely fashion. (issued on 12/3/91) ( 1 pgs) Judge Alvin I. Krenzler (K,V) (Entered: 12/03/1991)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/21/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES of proceedings: before Judge Alvin I. Krenzler; Court reporter Renee Baker; Hrg on Hardinger's mot for relief from judgment and for action in equity; Both ptys have agreed to submit dispute to the alternative dispute resolution mechanism in the consent decree (1 pg) (E,E) (Entered: 11/25/1991)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/31/1991, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER: scheduling hrg to present oral argument and evidence on motion for relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) [24-1] at 1:30 11/21/91 and on motion for order reducing the amt of gallonage as a Settling De Minimis Party, reducing the amt its monetary participation. [24-2] at 1:30 11/21/91 (issued on 11/4/91) ( 1 pgs) Judge Alvin I. Krenzler (K,V) (Entered: 11/04/1991)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/30/1991, Entered: None
          REPLY BRIEF of deft Hardinger Transfer in support of relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) [24-1] ( 23 pgs) (E,E) (Entered: 10/30/1991)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
            RESPONSE by defendant Beazer Materials to motion for relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) [24-1], to motion for order reducing the amt of gallonage as a Settling De Minimis Party, reducing the amt its monetary participation. [24-2] ( 7 pgs) (K,V) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/18/1991, Entered: None
              OPPOSITION by plaintiff USA to motion for relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) [24-1], to motion order reducing the amt of gallonage as a Settling De Party, reducing the amt its monetary participation [24-2] (11 pgs + exh) (H,C M) (Entered: 10/21/1991)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/2/1991, Entered: None
                MOTION of Laskin Trustee and Agent for Settling defts to extend time until 10/18/91 to resp to deft Hardinger's Rule 60(b) mot ( 3 pgs) (E,E) (Entered: 10/04/1991)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/30/1991, Entered: None
                  MOTION by plaintiff USA to extend time until 10/18/91 to file resp to Hardinger Tsfr mot ( 3 pgs) (K,V) (Entered: 10/01/1991)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/16/1991, Entered: None
                    POST-JUDGEMENT MOTION by defendant Hardinger Transfer for relief from judgment pur to Rule 60(B) , or in the alt for order reducing the amt of gallonage as a Settling De Minimis Party, reducing the amt its monetary participation. ( 14 pgs) (K,V) (Entered: 09/17/1991)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/14/1990, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CONSENT JUDGMENT terminating case Judge Alvin I. Krenzler (E,E) (Entered: 09/17/1990)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/10/1990, Entered: None
                        MOTION by plaintiff USA for leave to file proposed consent decree with memo in supp and includ 3 vol of exh A-C (4 pgs + app of exh) (K,V) (Entered: 09/10/1990)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/10/1990, Entered: None
                          MOTION by plaintiff USA for provisional remedy to permit ltd srv of mot to enter consent decree. ( 3 pgs) (K,V) (Entered: 09/10/1990)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Reliance Elec Co on 5/9/90 by cert mail. (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Intl Paper Co, and Bob Mayberry Chevrolet-Toyota, Inc. on 4/30/90 by cert mail. (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Coleman Young Mtrs on 4/14/90 by cert mail. (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants' Gulf & Western Ind, Johnny's Service Inc, Luther's Sohio, Mills Nissan, Parmco Ohio, Stapleton Sohio, Tim Brown Chevrolet, and defendant RMI Company on 4/9/90 by cert mail (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Rudy Sims Buick Inc on 4/7/90 by cert mail (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                      RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants' Be-Kan Inc, Harbison Walker Refr, Junction Auto Sales, Pennsylvania Elec, Zayre Corp, and defendant Bob Mayberry Inc all on 3/26/90 by cert mail (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                        RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Frank & Jim's Srv, Fred-Vincent Volks, and defendant Ryder Trk Rental Inc on 3/24/90 by cert mail (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                          RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon Calhio Chem Inc, Combustion Eng Inc, Damascus Metals, Elwell Bros Inc, Jim Sarvas Dodge Inc, Kincaid Srv Station, Poplar White Trk Inc, Willco Inc, J C Penney Co, UPS Inc on 3/23/90 (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                            RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants' Abex Corp, American Cyanamid, Arco-Erie, Beazer Materials, CEI, Cooperweld Steel Co, Diver Steel Cty Auto, Duff Trk Lines Inc, Erie Press Inc, Eriez Mfg Co, GMC, Girard Auto Sales, Helmerich Drive-It-,I&H Cushenan Inc, Intl Minerals & Chem, Kaiser Alum & Chem, Keifer's Srv Station, Litton Great Lakes, Marenchin Transmiss, O & P Oil and Gas, Parker White Metal, Pittsburgh and Lake, Reed Mfg Co, S. E. Nichols, Inc, Southway Srv, Tel-O-Post Co, USX Corp, Vil Gulf Sta, Moores Farm Supply all on 3/22/90 by cert mail. (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                              RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants' Horner Tractor Sales, Parker-Hannifin Corp, PPG Industries, Spear Chrysler (no date given on cert cards) (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/22/1990, Entered: None
                                                RETURN OF SERVICE executed upon defendants' Alvin F Laskin, Mildred Laskin,Albert's Automotive, Alco Indus Inc, Anchor Mtr Frt, Arco Station, Ashtabula Gasoline &, Ashtabula Rubber Co, Atlantic Richfield, Avis Trk Rental, Borden Inc, Bridgestone/Fireston, Browning-Ferris Ind, Burich Srv Sta, Calhio Chem Inc, Carlisle Corp, Chuck's Arco, Clarkson's American, Dale's Sohio, Deemer's Arco, Dick's Gulf, Eagle-Picher Ind, East Ohio Gas Co, Erie Indus Trks Inc, Fairview Chrysler, Fairview Evergreen, Fox Oil, GE, Gen Tire, Girard Auto Sales, Goodyear Auto Srv, Hardinger Transfer, Harshman & Sons Inc, Import Mtrs Inc, Interlake Steamship, Intl Minerals & Chem, J.I. Case, Kingsville-Ninety, Lend Lease-Trucks, Lexington Precision, Mentor Ctr Shell, Mobil Oil Corp, Mohn Sohio Srv, Molded Fiber Glass, Morton Intl Inc, Murray Corp, Niagara Plastics, Nicholas Brunner, North East Srv Plaza, O'Connor's Amoco Inc, Ohio Edison Company, Perry Ship Bldg Corp, Plumpton Buick, Poplar Thruway Srv, Premix, Inc, Reese's Sunoco, Richcreek Amoco, Rick Case Motors Inc, Rockwell Intl Corp, Russ' Srv Sta, Sal's Arco, Shell Oil Co, Standard Oil Co, Steve Hudak Amoco, Suburban Volkswagon, Sun Refining & Mktg, Swanson-Erie Corp, Texaco Inc., Trans Plastics Co of, TRW INC, T.W. Truesdell Trk, Un Carbide Chem &, Wean Inc, W.E. Moore Ford, West Gate Ford Trk, Wstrn Rsrv Transit, and Zurn Indus Inc all on 3/21/90 by certified mail. (K,V) (Entered: 05/23/1990)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/2/1990, Entered: None
                                                  PRAECIPE: by plaintiff for issuance of alias summ, issd 5/3/90 ( 1 pgs) (K,V) (Entered: 05/03/1990)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/25/1990, Entered: None
                                                    PRAECIPE: by plaintiff; alias summons issd to International Paper Co 4/25/90. ( 1 pg) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 04/25/1990)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                      PRAECIPE: by plaintiff alias summons issd 4/20/90. ( 1 pg) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 04/23/1990)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/13/1990, Entered: None
                                                        PRAECIPE: by plaintiff; alias summons issd ( 1 pg) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 04/13/1990)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/6/1990, Entered: None
                                                          PRAECIPE by plaintiff; alias summonses issd to Johnny's Srv, Luther's Sohio, Gulf & Western Industries, Rudy Sims Buick, Stapleton Sohio, Tim Brown Chevrolet, Parmco Ohio, & Mills Nissan (W,Gloria) Modified on 04/09/1990 (Entered: 04/06/1990)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/2/1990, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION by plaintiff to substitute parties by interlineation & to permit limited service of this motion re: defts Bob Mayberry Chevrolet & RMI Company. ( 3 pgs) (W,Gloria) Modified on 04/09/1990 (Entered: 04/09/1990)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by plaintiff to extend time to answer deadlines. ( 3 pgs) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 03/28/1990)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by plaintiff of lodging of proposed consent decree pending solicitation of public comment by US Dept of Justice. ( 3 pgs) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 03/28/1990)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/1990, Entered: None
                                                                  COMPLAINT (Summons(es), magistrate consent form issued) ( 12 pgs) (W,Gloria) (Entered: 03/28/1990)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 293 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?