Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Waterloo Maple Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00817
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 4:07 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims by pltf against deft are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                    SUMMONS Issued as to Waterloo Maple Inc. and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against Waterloo Maple Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847529.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 550 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?