Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00809
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 1:22 AM DT (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

v.
No Logo Dassault Systemes Solidworks Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Potter Minton PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Edwin Jones +1 903 597 8311 +1 903 593 0846 mikejones@potterminton.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims by pltfs against deft are dismissed with prejudice; deft's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own atty's fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/13/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Allen Franklin Gardner on behalf of Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation (Gardner, Allen) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 2/12/2013, Entered: None
      MOTION to Change Venue to the District of Massachusetts Pursuant to 28 USC Sec. 1404(a) by Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of R. Welch, # 2 Declaration of C. Rodriguez, # 3 Exhibit 1 - US5579222, # 4 Exhibit 2 - Boston-Globe, # 5 Exhibit 3 - US4937863, # 6 Exhibit 4 - US5204897, # 7 Exhibit 5 - US5260999, # 8 Exhibit 6 - US4924378, # 9 Exhibit 7 - Bob Wyman, # 10 Exhibit 8 - '222 Prosecution History excerpts, # 11 Exhibit 9 - SKM&T LLP web pages, # 12 Exhibit 10 - LexisNexis excerpts, # 13 Exhibit 11 - Sean Burdick Decl, # 14 Exhibit 12 - uniloc-assignment, # 15 Exhibit 13 - '222 maintenance fee, # 16 Exhibit 14 - In re EMC II, # 17 Exhibit 15 - GeoTag, # 18 Text of Proposed Order)(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 02/12/2013)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/29/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carlos A Rodriguez on behalf of All Defendants (Rodriguez, Carlos) (Entered: 01/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
            RESPONSE to 13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation re 19 Notice of Attorney Appearance AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL (Pennypacker, Evette) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evette D Pennypacker on behalf of All Defendants (Pennypacker, Evette) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claude M Stern on behalf of All Defendants (Stern, Claude) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER granting 12 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Dassault Systemes SA for Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation. (Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, and, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation.(Jones, Michael) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 11 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None
                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation.( Jones, Michael) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None
                                  Return of Service Executed as to Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation on 11/1/2012, by service on the Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 11/22/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/26/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                  Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                    COMPLAINT against Dassault Systemes SolidWorks Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847471.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 652 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?