UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GRAY et al
Criminal Case District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:00-cr-00157
District Judge Royce C. Lamberth, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 30, 2016 at 11:51 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KEVIN L. GRAY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/04/2003, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Mitchell Stuart Baer +1 202 347 1250 +1 202 628 7777 mitchellbaer@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Cozen O'Connor, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Lenard Barrett Boss +1 202 912 4800 +1 202 912 4830 bboss@cozen.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Evan Spencer Attorney At Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Maria Carlotta Mendoza +1 202 639 4488 mmen2039@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GILL SIPPEL & GALLAGHER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Julie Sippel Dietrich +1 301 251 9200 +1 301 762 6176 dietrich@gillandsippel.com

Toggle Switch Represented by GOTTESDIENER LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/28/2001, LEAD ATTORNEY, Designation: CJA Appointment Eli Gottesdiener +1 202 243 1000 +1 202 243 1001 eli@gottesdienerlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of David P. Baugh

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David P. Baugh

Toggle Switch Represented by LAW OFFICES OF FRANCIS D. CARTER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Francis Darron Carter +1 202 393 4330 frank@fdcarter.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'TOOLE, ROTHWELL, NASSAU & STEINBACH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/08/2000, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Jeffrey Brian O'Toole +1 202 775 1550 otoole@otrons.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (2537) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End

Since this appears to be a very large docket, we will only show 500 entries at at time.

Latest 500DividerNext 500DividerPrevious 500DividerEarliest 500

Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2584 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorenson for Transcript of proceeding held on August 13, 2004. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/6/14. (erd) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 2583 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
    MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR OTHERWISE CORRECT SENTENCE by CALVIN SMITH. (Stern, Richard) Modified on 1/10/2014 (erd). (Entered: 01/09/2014)
      LREF
      Blank 2582 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None
      MOTION TO VACATE, SET ASIDE OR OTHERWISE CORRECT SENTENCE by JOHN RAYNOR. (Kiersh, Steven) Modified on 1/10/2014 (erd) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2579 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER for Interim Payments to Appointment Counsels as to RODNEY L. MOORE (1), KEVIN L. GRAY (2), TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR (16), LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17). (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/13; and Designee Judge Brett M. Kavanaugh for the Chief Judge of the U.S. Court of Appeals Circuit on 9/23/13. (mpt) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2578 Filed: 9/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDERED that the 2575 Motion to Submit Interim Vouchers as to JOHN RAYNOR (5) is GRANTED. (See Image for Details). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/13; and Brett M. Kavanaugh Designee of Chief Judge United States Court of Appeals on 9/23/13. (mpt, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2577 Filed: 8/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 2574 Motion to Travel to Meet with Client in Bruceton Mills West Virginia as to JOHN RAYNOR (5). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/2013. (ad) (Entered: 08/29/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2576 Filed: 7/30/2013, Entered: None
              SUPPLEMENT in support of counsel's pending motion by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN re 2566 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. NO DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THE CIVIL 2255 ACTION. ALL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS CRIMINAL CASE (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(erd) (Entered: 07/31/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2575 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                Monthly MOTION for Standing Order Motion for Leave to Submit Interim Vouchers by JOHN RAYNOR. (Kiersh, Steven) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 2574 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Travel Motion for Leave to Travel to Meet with Client in Bruceton Mills West Virginia by JOHN RAYNOR. (Kiersh, Steven) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2573 Filed: 7/12/2013, Entered: None
                    Joint MOTION Request for Interim Billing For Appointed Counsel by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawlor, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 2572 Filed: 7/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                      CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT OF 4/2/04 STATUS HEARING in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan, held on April 2, 2004. Page Numbers: 1-25. Date of Issuance:7/9/13. Transcriber: Bryan Wayne, telephone number 202-354-3186. Court Reporter email address: bryanawayne@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/9/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/7/2013.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 07/09/2013)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2571 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Leave to Amend 2564 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 filed by KEVIN L. GRAY. (See Docket Entry 2570 to View Document.) (hsj, ) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2570 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: None
                          MOTION to Adopt the Motions of Co-Petitioners and to Amend re 2564 MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by KEVIN L. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Martin, Anthony) Modified on 6/28/2013 (hsj, ). (Entered: 06/27/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2569 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                            MOTION For Leave to Amend Petition and Adopt Issues Raised in 28 U.S.C.§ 2255 Petitions of Others by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lawlor, Michael) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank 2568 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION adopt petitions Kevin Gray, John Handy, Timothy Nunn by RODNEY L. MOORE. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Earnest, Ron) (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2567 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by RODNEY L. MOORE. NO DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THE CIVIL 2255 ACTION. ALL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS CRIMINAL CASE. (mlp) Civil case 1:13-cv-00915-RCL opened. (Main Document 2567 replaced on 6/27/2013) (zmlp, ). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2566 Filed: 6/17/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. NO DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THE CIVIL 2255 ACTION. ALL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS CRIMINAL CASE by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(erd) Civil case 1:13-cv-00914-RCL opened. (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                LREF
                                Blank 2565 Filed: 6/18/2013, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255 by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. NO DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THE CIVIL 2255 ACTION. ALL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS CRIMINAL CASE. Civil case 1:13-cv-00918-RCL opened. (Lawlor, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2013 (erd). (Entered: 06/18/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2564 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None
                                  FIRST MOTION to Vacate under 28 U.S.C. 2255. NO DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THE CIVIL 2255 ACTION. ALL DOCUMENTS ARE TO BE FILED IN THIS CRIMINAL CASE by KEVIN L. GRAY. Civil case 1:13-cv-00906-RCL opened. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement)(Martin, Anthony) Modified on 6/17/2013 (erd). (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 2563 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                  MOTION that Petitioners be Permitted to Adopt Issues Raised in Each of their respective 2255 Petitions by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Proctor, Gary) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2562 Filed: 6/7/2013, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gary E. Proctor appearing for LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (Proctor, Gary) (Entered: 06/07/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2557 Filed: 4/24/2013, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ron Earnest appearing for RODNEY L. MOORE by Appointment (Earnest, Ron) (Entered: 04/24/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Blank 2556 Filed: 4/16/2013, Entered: None
                                      LETTER from United States Court of Appeals to Angela Caesar, Clerk, U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia as to JOHN RAYNOR, CALVIN SMITH. Enclosed please find a copy of the Supreme Court's Judgment in this matter; Attachments (2). (erd) (Entered: 04/16/2013)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2551 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
                                        MOTION to Appoint Counsel to assist with filing a habeas petitionby RODNEY L. MOORE. (rje) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2550 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER granting motion 2551 to appoint counsel as to RODNEY L. MOORE. FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's motion is granted. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/19/13. (rje) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2549 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER granting 2548 Motion (Letter) for appointment of counsel as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1). A copy of defendant's letter and this Order shall be provided to the Federal Public Defender for the District of Columbia, who shall designate counsel to represent defendant in this post-trial motion. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/27/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter) (erd) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2548 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                              MOTION (Letter) for appointment of counsel by KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2547 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF CHANGE OF E-MAIL ADDRESS: by Sebastian K.D. Graber, Esquire, counsel for LARRY WILKERSON (15). Updated e-mail address is: skdgesq@gmail.com. (mlp) (Entered: 02/13/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2546 Filed: 2/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 12/17/12 in U.S.A. vs Kevin Gray, et al., CR 00-157-RCL. (electronic copy) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/1/13. (mlp) (Entered: 02/06/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2545 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION to Appoint Counsel by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2544 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender shall appoint counsel for Mr. Handy so that he (Mr. Handy) may pursue his motion to vacate as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. See Motion at docket # 2545. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/24/13. (rje, ) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2543 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER granting 2542 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17). ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender shall appoint counsel for Mr. Nunn. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/17/13. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (rje) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2542 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION to Appoint Counsel by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (rje) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2541 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            ORDER granting 2539 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposal for Conduct of Further Proceedings as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1), RODNEY L. MOORE (2), JOHN RAYNOR (5), TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16), LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/14/12. (rje) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank 2540 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                              STATUS REPORT Government's Proposal Regarding Future Proceedings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to KEVIN L. GRAY, RODNEY L. MOORE, JOHN RAYNOR, CALVIN SMITH, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lal, Arvind) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2539 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposal for Conduct of Further Proceedings by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lal, Arvind) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2537 Filed: 3/13/2003, Entered: None
                                                                Jury Notes (1) filed as to as to RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2536 Filed: 8/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  LETTER filed by JOHN RAYNOR dated 7/23/2012 Regarding Appointment of Counsel. "Let this be filed" by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/21/2012. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2535 Filed: 3/11/2003, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. Counsel shall present post-verdict motions to the court within this deadline. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/10/2003. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/14/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2534 Filed: 2/28/2001, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support of Defendant's Motion to Strike A/K?A Surplus from Indictment by CALVIN SMITH. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2533 Filed: 1/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued for Patrick Andrews to FCI, Gilmore, West Virginia as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS to appear before trial on 1/23/2003. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/21/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2532 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                          MOTION to withdraw defense counsel by KENNETH SIMMONS. (mlp) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2531 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                            JURY NOTES (3) as to LARRY WILKERSON. (mlp) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2530 Filed: 9/26/2003, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION to use stun belts during trial by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (Unsealed) (mlp) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2528 Filed: 9/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                Jury Notes (1) filed as to LARRY WILKERSON. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2527 Filed: 9/2/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                  FINAL Jury Instructions as to LARRY WILKERSON. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2526 Filed: 7/19/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                    ATTACHMENT for Contempt as to KEVIN L. GRAY, RODNEY L. MOORE, MAURICE ANDREWS, JERMAINE VICK, JOHN RAYNOR, OMAR WAZIR, FRANK HOWARD, DENNIS ROBINSON, BRYAN BOSTICK, DERRICK MOORE, ROY JOHNSON, KENNETH SIMMONS, WILFORD OLIVER, CALVIN SMITH, LARRY WILKERSON, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, RONALD C. ALFRED, JAMES W. ALFRED, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, DEON OLIVER regarding the arrest of Antonio Johnson. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2525 Filed: 5/18/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by KEVIN L. GRAY re 283 Motion for Discovery of Mental Health Evidence. (hsj, ) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2524 Filed: 9/13/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                        FIRST MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. (mlp) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2523 Filed: 6/25/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by CALVIN SMITH re 367 Motion for Specific Performance of Plea Agreement. (mlp) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2522 Filed: 2/8/2000, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING by DEON OLIVER, discovery letter to counsel for U.S.A., dated 2/7/01. (mlp) Modified on 8/15/2012 (mlp) Modified on 8/30/2012 (erd, ). (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2521 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              LETTER filed by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. Regarding Appointment of Counsel for the purpose of filing a 2255 motion. "Let this be filed" by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/23/2012. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/06/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2518 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT OF 3/4/2004 STATUS HEARING in case as to LARRY WILKERSON, before Judge Thomas F. Hogan, held on March 4, 2004. Page Numbers: 1-48. Date of Issuance: 6/12/2012. Transcriber: Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186. Court Reporter Email Address: bryanawayne@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/3/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/13/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/10/2012.(Courtrep, ) (Entered: 06/12/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2517 Filed: 5/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal to USCA, Copy of CJA 24 ordering transcript on appeal as to KENNETH SIMMONS re 2325 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, USCA Case Number 07-3003. (erd) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2516 Filed: 5/18/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to KENNETH SIMMONS: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorenson for Transcript of proceeding held on 1/4/07. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/17/12. (erd) (Entered: 05/21/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2515 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA In Forma Pauperis motion was denied. USCA No. 04-3039 as to KENNETH SIMMONS re 2514 Order, 2325 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, 2512 MOTION to proceed In forma Pauperis. USCA Case Number 04-3039. (erd) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2514 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER as to KENNETH SIMMONS re 2512 denying MOTION to Appear In forma Pauperis filed by KENNETH SIMMONS, 2513 denying MOTION regarding newly discovered evidence filed by KENNETH SIMMONS. That the defendant's motion 2512 be filed on the public record, with copies to the United States Attorney's Office. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/12. (erd) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2513 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION regarding newly discovered evidence by KENNETH SIMMONS; Attachment. (erd) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2512 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MOTION to Proceed In forma Pauperis by KENNETH SIMMONS. (erd) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2511 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2510 Sealed Motion to unseal pleadings, orders, opinions and transcripts (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS (20). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/10/12. (rje) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2509 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lisa B. Wright appearing for CALVIN SMITH (Wright, Lisa) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2508 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lisa B. Wright appearing for JOHN RAYNOR (Wright, Lisa) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2507 Filed: 12/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    MANDATE of USCA, issued 12/22/11, as to RODNEY L. MOORE. (USCA Number 05-3050, colidated with 05-3051, 05-3052, 05-3053, 05-3054, and 05-3064) (mlp) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2506 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT of USCA, filed on 7/29/11, as to RODNEY L. MOORE re 2157 Notice of Appeal; these causes are affirmed in part, vacated in part, and remanded for further proceedings in accordance with the attached opinion of the court. (Attachment: # 1 U.S. Court of Appeals Opinion) (USCA Number: 05-3050, consolidated with 05-3051, 05-3052, 05-3053, 05-3054, 05-3064)(mlp) (Entered: 12/30/2011)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2505 Filed: 12/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        MOTION for production of additional transcript for proceedings held on 1/4/07 by KENNETH SIMMONS. (mlp) (Entered: 12/22/2011)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2504 Filed: 8/4/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 03/25/09; Page Numbers: 1-26. Date of Issuance:8/4/11. Court Reporter/Transcriber Catalina Kerr, Telephone number 202-354-3258, Court Reporter Email Address : catykerr@msn.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/25/2011. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/4/2011. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2011.(Kerr, Catalina) (Entered: 08/04/2011)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2503 Filed: 3/4/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS re 2320 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. That within 14 days of the date of this order, appellant file an updated transcript status report addressing: (1) Court Reporter Sorensen's representation that the transcripts have been prepared and are awaiting pickup; and (2) appellant's efforts to obtain the Novemeber 1 transcript. Appellant's failure to respond with specificity to the terms of this order will be referred to the court for action. (hsj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2011)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2502 Filed: 1/11/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to DEON OLIVER re 2318 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Dismissing the motion for appropriate relief. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2501 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 7/6/00, arraignment of Derrick Moore, (CR No. 00-157-10-RCL). Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2500 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim for transcript of proceeding held on 5/14/04, status hearing. Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2499 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Miller Reporting Company (Jackie Wood) for transcript of proceeding held on 4/2/04, status hearing re Larry Wilkerson. Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2498 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 10/25/02, status hearing as to Group 2 defendants, (CR No. 00-157-RCL). Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2497 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 1/11/02, status hearing as to all defendants, (CR No. 00-157-RCL). Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2496 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 7/10/00, detention hearing of Derrick Moore (CR No. 00-157-10-RCL). Electronic Version Requested. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2495 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 2/27/02, motion hearing as to Kevin Gray, Calvin Smith (Chief Judge Lamberth) (2nd portion of hearing which reconvened at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10) (Re 12/23/93 AWIK of Maurice Willis) Electronic Version Requested Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/3/10. (mlp) (Entered: 09/10/2010)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2494 Filed: 8/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Crystal Pilgrim for transcript of motions hearing proceeding held on 5/28/04. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/13/10. (mlp) (Entered: 08/27/2010)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2493 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of proceeding held on 5/21/03 as to All Group 2 Defendants. (Electronic version requested) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/1/10. (mlp) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2492 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Cathryn Jones for transcript of proceeding held on 6/24/04. (Electronic Version Requested) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/27/10. (mlp) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2491 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Wendy Ricard for transcript of proceeding held on 1/15/09 as to Jermaine Vick (CR 00-157-04-RCL). (Electronic version requested) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/1/10. (mlp) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2490 Filed: 8/17/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Catalina Kerr for transcript of proceeding held 3/25/09. (Electronic version requested) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/1/10. (mlp) (Entered: 08/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2489 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 10/5/09; Page Numbers: 1-9. Date of Issuance:8/16/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda L Russo, Telephone number 941.400.8787, Court Reporter Email Address : lindalrusso@gmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2010.(Russo, Linda) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2488 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 5/25/04; Page Numbers: 1-60. Date of Issuance:8/16/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda L Russo, Telephone number 941.400.8787, Court Reporter Email Address : lindalrusso@gmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2010.(Russo, Linda) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2487 Filed: 8/16/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 6/4/04; Page Numbers: 1-95. Date of Issuance:8/16/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Linda L Russo, Telephone number 941.400.8787, Court Reporter Email Address : lindalrusso@gmail.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/7/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/15/2010.(Russo, Linda) (Entered: 08/16/2010)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2486 Filed: 8/11/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LARRY WILKERSON before Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 6/10/04; Page Numbers: 1 - 55. Date of Issuance:08/09/10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bryan A. Wayne, Telephone number 202-354-3186, Court Reporter Email Address : bryanawayne@yahoo.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 9/1/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/13/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/9/2010.(Wayne, Bryan) (Entered: 08/11/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2485 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Miller Reporting Company for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 9/22/00 as to Jermaine Vick in CR 00-157-04-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2484 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcripts of arraignment/detention hearing proceeding held on 5/15/00 as to defendant Maurice Andrews in CR 00-157-03-RCL and arraignment/detention hearing proceeding held on 5/17/00 as to defendant Kevin Gray, CR 00-157-01-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10.(mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2483 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of arraignment/detention hearing proceeding held on 9/26/00 as to defendant Frank Howard, CR 00-157-07-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2482 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 12/11/01 as to all defendants in CR 00-157-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2481 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 11/14/01 as to defendant Kevin Gray in CR 00-157-01-RCL and status hearing proceeding held on 11/26/10 as to defendants Calvin Smith and Lionel Nunn in CR 00-157-14,17-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2480 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 9/21/10 as to all defendants in CR 00-157-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2479 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 4/20/01 as to all defendants in CR 00-157-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/26/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2478 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 7/27/01 as to all defendants in CR 00-157-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2477 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding held on 8/27/01 as to all defendants in CR 00-157-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2476 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding as to Calvin Smith, CR 00-157-14-RCL, held on 10/16/01. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/10. (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2475 Filed: 7/20/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of status hearing proceeding re defendant Frank Howard in CR 00-157-07-RCL held on 1/19/01. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/29/10. (mlp) Modified on 7/21/2010 (mlp) (Entered: 07/20/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2474 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to RONALD C. ALFRED re 2355 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Ordered on the court's own motion, that within 14 days of the date of this order Court Reporters Beverly Byrnes, John Hundley, and Theresa Sorenson provide to the court the following information: (1) which of the transcripts listed as outstanding in appellant Alfred's transcript report remains outstanding; and (2) the date on which any outstanding transcripts will be completed. (See order for details) (erd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2473 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to JAMES W. ALFRED re 2312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Ordered on the court's own motion, that within 14 days of the date of this order Court Reporters Theresa Sorenson and Beverly Byrnes provide to the court the following information: (1) whether the transcript listed as outstanding in appellant Alfred's transcript report remains outstanding; and (2) if so, the date on which that transcript will be completed. (See order for details) (erd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2472 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to KENNETH SIMMONS re 2325 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Ordered on the court's own motion, that within 14 days of the date of this order Court Reporters Beverly Byrnes and Theresa Sorenson provide to the court the following information: (1) which of the transcripts listed as outstanding in appellant Simmons' transcript report remains outstanding; and (2) the date on which any outstanding transcripts will be completed. (See order for details) (erd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2471 Filed: 7/13/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS re 2320 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Ordered on the court's own motion, that within 14 days of the date of this order Court Reporter Theresa Sorenson provide to the court the following information: (1) which of the transcripts listed as outstanding in appellant Seeger's transcript report remains outstanding; and (2) the date on which any outstanding transcripts will be completed. (See order for details) (erd) (Entered: 07/13/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2470 Filed: 7/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT OF Arraignment/Detention Hearing PROCEEDINGS in case as to RODNEY L. MOORE before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 5/26/00. Page Numbers: 1-3. Date of Issuance: 7/6/10. Court Reporter: Bill McAllister. For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/4/2010. (mlp) (Entered: 07/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2469 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of arraignment/guilty plea hearing held on 12/10/01 as to Frank Howard, USA vs Frank Howard, CR 00-157-07-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2468 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcripts status hearing held on 12/8/00 as to all defendants and status hearing held on 12/13/00 as to Rodney Moore, USA vs Rodney Moore, CR 00-157-02-RCL. (Electronic Versions) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2467 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcripts of status hearings held on 1/1/01 and 1/8/01 of Kevin Gray, USA vs Kevin Gray, CR 00-157-01-RCL. (Electronic Versions) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2466 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of 11/28/00 detention hearing of Calvin Smith, USA vs Calvin Smith, CR 00-157-14-RCL. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2465 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcripts of 9/20/00 status hearing of Kevin Gray, USA vs Gray, CR 00-157-01 and 9/26/00 status hearing of Dennis Robinson, US vs Robinson, CR 00-157-08. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2464 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Dennis Dinkel for transcripts 11/8/00 status hearing of Jermaine Vick, USA vs Vick, CR 00-157-04-RCL (unsealed 8/13/04) and 3/4/04 status hearing of Larry Wilkerson, CR 00-157-15-TFH. (Electronic Versions) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2463 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Frank Rangus for transcript of detention hearing of Frank Howard, USA vs Frank Howard, CR 00-157-07-RCL, held on 10/2/00. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2462 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter William D. McAllister for transcript of arraignment/detention hearing of Rodney Moore, U.S.A. vs Rodney Moore, CR 00-157-02-RCL, held on 5/26/00. (Electronic/digital version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) Modified on 6/15/2010 (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2461 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Linda Russo for transcripts of 5/25/04 motions hearing, 6/4/04 motions hearing (copy needed), and 10/5/09 status hearing proceedings. (Electronic Versions) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/14/10. (mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2460 Filed: 6/14/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Bryan Wayne for transcript of motions/status hearing proceeding held on 6/10/04. (Electronic Version) Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on June 14, 2010.(mlp) (Entered: 06/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2459 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of arraignment and detention hearing proceeding for Jermaine Vick, CR 00-157-04-RCL, held on 5/18/00; electronic version. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/24/10. (mlp) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2458 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Theresa Sorensen for transcript of arraignment proceeding held on 1/2/01; electronic version. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/24/10. (mlp) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2457 Filed: 5/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Susan Tyner for transcript of sentencing proceeding held on 4/20/10; electronic version. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/27/10. (mlp) (Entered: 05/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2456 Filed: 5/12/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to JERMAINE VICK before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on Jauary 15, 2009; Page Numbers: 1-14. Court Reporter/Transcriber Wendy Ricard, Telephone number 202-354-3111, Court Reporter Email Address : Wacricard@aol.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/2/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2010.(Ricard, Wendy) (Entered: 05/12/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2455 Filed: 5/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed, and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals docketing fee was not paid because the fee was an Appeal by a CJA court appointed attorney as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2454 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (znmw, ) (Entered: 05/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2454 Filed: 5/1/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by LARRY WILKERSON re 2450 Judgment. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/01/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2452 Filed: 4/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                AMENDED STATEMENT OF REASONS as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2450 Judgment. Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/22/10. (mlp) (Entered: 04/28/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2451 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATEMENT OF REASONS as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2450 Judgment. Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/22/10. (mlp) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2450 Filed: 4/22/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to LARRY WILKERSON. Statement of Reasons Not Included. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/22/10. (mlp) (Entered: 04/23/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2447 Filed: 4/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Relating to Sentencing by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DoC Statistics Re Inmate Assaults, ADP stats, # 2 Exhibit Excerpts GAO Report Re DC Jail Conditions 2000-2004, # 3 Exhibit BOP Recidivism Rates by Age, # 4 Exhibit Article Re BOP Assault Rates, # 5 Exhibit DC Code Murder Penalties 1992, 1993, # 6 Exhibit Findings of Hearing on Disciplinary Report Re Apr. 15, 2007, Altercation (NG Finding))(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 04/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2446 Filed: 4/6/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3-11-02; Page Numbers: 1-109. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/27/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/7/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) (Entered: 04/06/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2445 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 2436 Defendants' Fourth Motion to Continue as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4-5-10. (lctfh3) (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2444 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 9-21-01; Page Numbers: 86. Date of Issuance:4-5-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2443 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 8-27-01; Page Numbers: 8. Date of Issuance:4-5-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2442 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 4-20-01; Page Numbers: 86. Date of Issuance:4-5-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2441 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11-28-00; Page Numbers: 19. Date of Issuance:4-5-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2440 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11-22-00; Page Numbers: 10. Date of Issuance:4-5-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2439 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11-22-00; Page Numbers: 10. Date of Issuance:4-4-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 301-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2438 Filed: 4/5/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ENTERED IN ERROR.....TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS in case as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY before Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11-20-00; Page Numbers: 5. Date of Issuance:4-4-10. Court Reporter/Transcriber Theresa Sorensen, Telephone number 202-354-3118, Court Reporter Email Address : theresams@erols.com.For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at ww.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 4/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/6/2010.(Sorensen, Theresa) Modified on 4/6/2010 (erd). (Entered: 04/05/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2437 Filed: 4/4/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM by LARRY WILKERSON re 2436 Final MOTION to Continue Sentencing Date and Briefing Schedule. (Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 4/5/2010 (mlp) (Entered: 04/04/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2436 Filed: 3/31/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Final MOTION to Continue Sentencing Date and Briefing Schedule by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/31/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2435 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Recommendation of PSI Report prepared by USPO Crystal Lustig as to LARRY WILKERSON. re 2434 Final Presentence Investigation Report Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy.(McGill, Kathie) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2433 Filed: 3/18/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part 2431 Defendant's Third Motion to Continue as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3-18-2010. (lctfh3) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2432 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to set a hearing on departure issues by LARRY WILKERSON. (See Docket Entry 2431 to view document) (mlp) (Entered: 03/18/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2431 Filed: 3/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Third MOTION to Continue Sentencing by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/17/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2430 Filed: 3/15/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2426 Sentencing Memorandum, 2427 Sentencing Memorandum (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 03/15/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2427 Filed: 3/3/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Table of Recidivism Rates, U.S. Sentencing Commission)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/03/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2426 Filed: 3/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 03/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2425 Filed: 2/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 2421 Motion to Contact Jurors as to LARRY WILKERSON; directing Clerk to place motion and accompanying exhibits under seal (15). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 2/26/10. (lin, ) (Entered: 02/26/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2424 Filed: 2/24/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Recommendation of PSI Report as to LARRY WILKERSON. Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy.(Stevens-Panzer, Deborah) (Entered: 02/24/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2422 Filed: 2/19/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2421 MOTION Motion for Leave to Contact Jurors Regarding Juror Misconduct Issues Government's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Contact Jurors Regarding Misconduct Issues (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 02/19/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2420 Filed: 2/2/2010, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second MOTION to Continue Sentencing and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 02/02/2010)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2418 Filed: 11/17/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing Date by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/17/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2417 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 2192 Motion for Discovery as to LARRY WILKERSON (15); denying 2196 2198 [2342} Motions for New Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON (15); denying 2201 Motion for New Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON (15); denying 2203 Motion for Judgment NOV as to LARRY WILKERSON (15); denying 2269 motion to compel; setting status conference for 10/5/09 at 11:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/18/09. (lin, ) (zlin, ). (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2416 Filed: 9/22/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION as to LARRY WILKERSON. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/18/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 09/22/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2415 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 2405 Motion for New Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/14/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2414 Filed: 9/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION as to LARRY WILKERSON. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/14/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 09/16/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2413 Filed: 9/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying 2390 Motion to Reduce Sentence re Crack Cocaine Offense - 18:3582 as to ROY JOHNSON (11). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/10/09. (rje) (Entered: 09/11/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2412 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY in Support by LARRY WILKERSON re 2409 MOTION for New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct (Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 8/31/2009 (mlp) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2411 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ENTERED IN ERROR.....REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2409 MOTION for New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct (Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 8/31/2009 (mlp) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2410 Filed: 8/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2409 MOTION for New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 08/28/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2409 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Filed as a Motion Pursuant to Court Order filed 8/24/09.....MOTION for New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: March 2005 Letter from Juror, # 2 Exhibit 2: Seating Chart of Jurors, # 3 Exhibit 3: Voir Dire of Juror 1324, # 4 Exhibit 4: Voir Dire of Juror 2354, # 5 Exhibit 5: Voir Dire of Juror 1384, # 6 Exhibit 6: Voir Dire of Juror 2035)(mlp) (Entered: 08/25/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2408 Filed: 8/24/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting nunc pro tunc to July 1, 2009 2367 Defendant's Renewed Motion for Hearing to Investigate Alleged Jury Misconduct as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Further ordered that the Clerk of Court shall docket defendant's post-hearing supplemental brief filed July 31, 2009 (Docket #2405) as a Motion for a New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct. Further ordered that defendant shall have until August 28, 2009 to file a reply brief in support of his Motion for a New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct (Docket #2405). See Order for further specifics. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 8/24/2009. (mm) (Entered: 08/24/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2407 Filed: 8/20/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT LIST (Motion Hearing of 7/1/09) (lin, ) (Entered: 08/20/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2406 Filed: 8/13/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2195 MOTION for New Trial Based on Improper Removal of Juror. (Lieber, Rachel) Modified on 8/14/2009 (mlp) (Entered: 08/13/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2405 Filed: 7/31/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Post-Hearing Memorandum of Points and Authorities Relating to Defendant's 2195 Motion for a New Trial Based on Juror Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: March 2005 Letter from Juror, # 2 Exhibit 2: Seating Chart of Jurors, # 3 Exhibit 3: Voir Dire of Juror 1324, # 4 Exhibit 4: Voir Dire Juror 2354, # 5 Exhibit 5: Voir Dire Juror 1384, # 6 Exhibit 6: Voir Dire Juror 2035)(Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 8/3/2009 (mlp) (Entered: 07/31/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2404 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying 2195 Motion for New Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/9/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2403 Filed: 7/10/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OPINION as to LARRY WILKERSON. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/9/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2402 Filed: 7/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Susan Tyner for Transcript of hearing on juror misconduct proceeding held on 7/1/09. Special authorization: expedited. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/7/09. (mlp) (Entered: 07/10/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2401 Filed: 7/2/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON, ( supplemental briefing due by 7/31/2009.). Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 7/1/09. (lin, ) (Entered: 07/02/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2400 Filed: 7/1/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Voir Dire by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 07/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2399 Filed: 6/26/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Defendant Larry Wilkerson's Proposed Questions for Juror 0552 Regarding Hearing to Investigate Alleged Jury Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Transcript, of Voir Dire Proceedings, July 14, 2004 AM, at 82-97 (voir dire of Juror 1324), # 2 Exhibit 2: Seating Chart of Petit Jury, Tr. 7/20/04 AM, at 38)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/26/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2398 Filed: 6/1/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER on Hearing set for July 1, 2009 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 25A before Judge Thomas F. Hogan as to LARRY WILKERSON, Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/1/09. (hs) Modified on 6/2/2009 (mlp) (Entered: 06/01/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2397 Filed: 5/28/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for production of additional transcripts by KENNETH SIMMONS. (erd) (Entered: 05/29/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2395 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; as to LARRY WILKERSON. Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/5/09. (hs) (Entered: 05/05/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2394 Filed: 3/30/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to WILFORD OLIVER (Rees, Thomas) (Entered: 03/30/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2393 Filed: 3/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER; Memorializing Rulings from the Bench as to LARRY WILKERSON, Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/26/09. (hs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/27/2009: # 1 Order) (zhs, ). (Entered: 03/27/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2391 Filed: 1/15/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT (Revocation) as to JERMAINE VICK; Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/15/09. (erd) (Entered: 01/23/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2390 Filed: 1/12/2009, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 by ROY JOHNSON. (erd) (Entered: 01/14/2009)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2389 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM & ORDER as to WILFORD OLIVER: denying 2372 MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 filed by WILFORD OLIVER. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/08. (rje) (Entered: 12/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2388 Filed: 12/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received- (Formerly Rule 40 Documents Received) as to JERMAINE VICK from Eastern Distirct of Missouri Case Number 0:08Mj1286 TIA (erd) (Entered: 12/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2387 Filed: 12/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Arvind Kumar Lal appearing for USA. (Lal, Arvind) (Entered: 12/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2386 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; denying 2383 Motion to Permit as to LARRY WILKERSON ; denying 2384 Motion to Permit as to LARRY WILKERSON Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/26/08. (hs) (zhs, ). (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2385 Filed: 11/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER to Concur with Recommendation of the Probation Office "Issue a Bench Warrant and Schedule a Hearing on Violation" as to JERMAINE VICK. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/24/08. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2384 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Emergency MOTION to Permit Mr. Wilkerson to Attend the Funeral Service for His Deceased Mother (corrected - signed by counsel) by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2383 Filed: 11/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Emergency MOTION to Permit Mr. Wilkerson to Attend the Funeral Service for His Deceased Mother by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/26/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2382 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas S. Rees appearing for USA. (Rees, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2381 Filed: 11/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Memorandum in Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to WILFORD OLIVER re 2372 MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 (Rees, Thomas) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2380 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to RONALD C. ALFRED. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/12/08. (rje) (Entered: 11/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2379 Filed: 11/12/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER; denying 2377 Motion to Permit as to LARRY WILKERSON (15), Signed by Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/12/08. (hs) (Entered: 11/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2378 Filed: 11/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Memorandum in Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2377 MOTION to Permit Defendant Larry Wilkerson to Visit His Critically Ill Mother at United Medical Health Center (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 11/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2377 Filed: 11/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Permit Defendant Larry Wilkerson to Visit His Critically Ill Mother at United Medical Health Center by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2376 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2375 Motion for Extension of Time as to WILFORD OLIVER (13). Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/15/08. (rje) (Entered: 10/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2375 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond To Defendant's Motion For Modification Sentence Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. 3582(c)(2) / Amendment 706 by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to WILFORD OLIVER. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rees, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2374 Filed: 10/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Thomas S. Rees appearing for USA. (Rees, Thomas) (Entered: 10/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2373 Filed: 9/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER to the Court, from Juror 0552, as to LARRY WILKERSON. "Let this be filed, 9/11/08" Hogan, J. (mlp) (Entered: 09/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2372 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Retroactive Application of Sentencing Guidelines to Crack Cocaine Offense 18 USC 3582 by WILFORD OLIVER; Attachments. "Let this be filed with attached 'Motion for Notification'. Provide copy to USAO Special Proceedings Chief. USA to respond in 30 days." by Chief Judge Lamberth. (erd) Modified on 9/22/2008 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2371 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPPLEMENT by LARRY WILKERSON re 2367 Second MOTION for Hearing to Investigate Alleged Jury Miscondeuct and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities (Supplemental Memorandum of Law) (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2370 Filed: 8/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER denying reconsideration of payment authorized for investigative services as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. Signed by Chief Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 8/27/08. (rje) (Entered: 09/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2369 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to RONALD C. ALFRED re 2368 MOTION to Access Sealed Transcripts on Appeal via Motion to Unseal the Record for Limited Purposes (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for attached Motion)(Lal, Arvind) (Entered: 08/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2368 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Access Sealed Transcripts on Appeal via Motion to Unseal the Record for Limited Purposes by RONALD C. ALFRED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Gregory) (Entered: 06/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2367 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION for Hearing to Investigate Alleged Jury Miscondeuct and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Letter of Juror #9 to Court, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Tommy Edelin Motin for Appropriate Relief, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Excerpts of Vick Testimony from Trial Re Prior Superior Court Convictions, # 4 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2366 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER regarding reduction of sentence by DERRICK MOORE. "Let this be filed by Chief Judge Lamberth" (erd) (Entered: 05/30/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2361 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/7/08. (rje) (Entered: 02/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2360 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER of USCA on the court's own motion, that within 30 days of the date of this order the court reporters provide to the court transcripts with respect out all outstanding transcript request as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 12/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2359 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              STATEMENT OF REASONS as to RONALD C. ALFRED. re 2358 Judgment Not for public disclosure per Judicial Conference Policy; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/07. (erd) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2358 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT as to RONALD C. ALFRED. Statement of Reasons Not Included; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/07. (erd) (Entered: 12/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2357 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER on scheduled sentencing hearing by RONALD C. ALFRED, "leave to file granted by Judge Lamberth" (rje) Modified on 12/12/2007 (rje). (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2356 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER on judgment and sentence by RONALD C. ALFRED , "leave to file granted by Judge Lamberth" (rje) Modified on 12/12/2007 (rje). (Entered: 12/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2355 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SECOND NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by RONALD C. ALFRED re Sentencing imposed on 11/20/07 and entered on 11/27/07. Appeal Reference RONALD C. ALFRED,count(s) 1rr, 3rr, 30rr, 31rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 76rr, 92rr, 96rr. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statement not received. Fee Status: No Fee Paid, CJA. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2354 Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by RONALD C. ALFRED re Sentencing held on 11/20/07. No filing fee paid, CJA. Parties have been notified. No docketing statement received. (erd) (Entered: 11/27/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2353 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT (SUPPLEMENT) of Jury Trial Proceedings, day 89, afternoon session, as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/29/04. Page Numbers: 96-131. Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (mlp) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2352 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT (SUPPLEMENT) of Jury Trial Proceedings, day 83, afternoon session, as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/17/04. Page Numbers: 1-8. Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (mlp) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2351 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT (SUPPLEMENT) of Jury Trial Proceedings, day 80, afternoon session, as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/12/04. Page Numbers: 1-9. Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (mlp) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2350 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT (SUPPLEMENT) of Jury Trial Proceedings, day 78, afternoon session, as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/10/04 Page Numbers: 1-17. Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (mlp) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2349 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Proceedings, day 78, afternoon session, as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS, DEON OLIVER before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/10/04. Page Numbers: 1-105. Court Reporter: Crystal Pilgrim. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (mlp) Modified on 11/16/2007 (mlp) (Entered: 11/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2348 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to RONALD C. ALFRED re 2345 MOTION full sentencing hearing (Lal, Arvind) (Entered: 10/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2347 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 2337 Motion to Amend/Correct as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/11/07. (rje) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2346 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to appellant for Production of additional transcript by KENNETH SIMMONS. (erd) (Entered: 10/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2345 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION full sentencing hearing by RONALD C. ALFRED. (Tuminelli, Arcangelo) (Entered: 10/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2344 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Corrected Exhibit 7 to Motion for New Trial Based on Newly Discovered Evidence and Request for a Hearing on the Issue of Immunity by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7 (Letter dated 11-10-06 to Atty Nichols))(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2343 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ENTERED IN ERROR.....NOTICE of Filing of Correct Exhibit 7 (at request of clerk) by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Corrected Exhibit 7.Letter to Atty Nichols)(Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 9/25/2007 (nmw, ). (Entered: 09/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2342 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for New Trial Based on Newly Discovered Evidence and Request for a Hearing on the Issue of Immunity by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for New Trial Based on Newly Discovered Evidence# 2 Exhibit List of Exhibits# 3 Exhibit 1: Declaration of Sebastian K.D. Graber, Esq.# 4 Exhibit 2: Letter dated July 1, 2004, from SG to Atty Nichols# 5 Exhibit 3: Fax dated Aug. 26, 2004, from SG to Atty Nichols# 6 Exhibit 4: Transcript Excerpts of Hg on Aug. 27, 2004# 7 Exhibit 5: Trial Exhibit - 6th Joint Stipulation re Ws's at CTF# 8 Exhibit 6: Transcript Excerpts of Hg Aug. 31, 2004# 9 Exhibit 7: Letter dated Nov. 10, 2006, from SG to Atty Nichols# 10 Exhibit 8: Transcript Excerpts of Status Hg Bench Conference, Jan 18, 2007# 11 Exhibit 9: Letter dated June 7, 2007, from SG to Judge Hogan# 12 Exhibit 10: Trial Exhibit D-JV-3: Vick Letter to Ronald Alfred re CTF# 13 Exhibit 11: Excerpts of Trial testimony of James Faison in US v. Edelin, Cr.No. 98-264 (RCL)# 14 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2341 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER as to RONALD C. ALFRED Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 09/14/2007. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2340 Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT; of Status Hearing Proceeding as to BRYAN BOSTICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 5/14/04 pages 1-6. Court Reporter: Jacqueline Wood - Miller Reporting Company. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (hs,) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2339 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing as to LARRY WILKERSON (15) before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 1/18/07 (pages 1-33); Court Reporter: Cathryn J. Jones. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (kk) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2338 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Hearing as to LARRY WILKERSON (15) before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 9/5/06 (pages 1-21); Court Reporter: Cathryn J. Jones. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (kk) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2337 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Amend/Correct Fine and Special Assessment Payment Order by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Zwerling, John) (Entered: 06/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2336 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Case Number as to JAMES W. ALFRED 07-3065 for 2312 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by JAMES W. ALFRED. (cp, ) (Entered: 06/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2335 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for production of transcript by KENNETH SIMMONS. "Let this be filed granted voucher signature date by Judge Lamberth" (erd) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2334 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Receipt and Acknowledgment of Supplemental Record on Appeal as to LARRY WILKERSON Appeal Case Number: 02-3032. Receipt of documents: Copy of CJA 24 requesting transcripts on appeal. (cp, ) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2333 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal to USCA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 752 Notice of Appeal (USCA #02-3032). Copy of CJA 24 requesting transcript on appeal. (zcp, ) (Entered: 04/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2332 Filed: 3/30/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 24 as to LARRY WILKERSON: Order Authorizing Payment to Court Reporter Cathryn Jones for Transcript of Status Hearings held on 9/5/06 and 1/18/07. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/30/07. (cp, ) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2331 Filed: 2/5/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that the Court will proceed with its appointment of Michael Lawlor to represent the defendant at sentencing. The Status Conference remains scheduled for 3/12/07 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/5/07. (rje) (Entered: 02/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2330 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT as to KENNETH SIMMONS. Statement of Reasons Not Included. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/11/07. (erd) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2329 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT as to JAMES W. ALFRED. Statement of Reasons Not Included. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/11/07. (erd) (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2328 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT as to DEON OLIVER. Statement of Reasons Not Included. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/11/07. (erd) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2327 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS. Statement of Reasons Not Included. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/11/07. (erd) (Entered: 01/18/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2326 Filed: 1/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number as to KENNETH SIMMONS 07-3003 for 2325 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by KENNETH SIMMONS. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2325 Filed: 1/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by KENNETH SIMMONS re Sentencing imposed on 1/4/07 and entered on 1/5/07. Appeal reference KENNETH SIMMONS, count(s) 1rrs, 3rrs, 53rrs, 54rrs, 70rrs, 71rrs, 87rrs, 95rrs. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statement received. Fee Status: No Fee Paid, CJA. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2324 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to KENNETH SIMMONS. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2323 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by KENNETH SIMMONS. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2322 Filed: 1/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Case Number as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS 07-3001 for 2320 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2321 Filed: 1/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to RONALD C. ALFRED that, based on the oral request of the Federal Public Defender for additional time to find conflict-free new counsel who can be appointed to represent the defendant at sentencing, the hearing set for January 4, 2007, at 9:30a.m. is hereby CONTINUED until 2:00p.m. on January 17, 2007. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/3/07. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2320 Filed: 12/29/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by FRANKLIN SEEGERS Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 12/29/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2319 Filed: 12/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number as to DEON OLIVER 06-3193 for 2318 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by DEON OLIVER. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2318 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by DEON OLIVER re Sentencing imposed on 12/15/06 and entered on 12/19/06. Appeal reference DEON OLIVER, count(s) 3rr, 53rr, 54rr, 68rr, 69rr, 83r, 87rr, 94rr. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statement not received. Fee Status: No Fee Paid, CJA. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2317 Filed: 12/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER; granting in part and denying in part [#2200] Defendant's Motion for a Hearing as to LARRY WILKERSON, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/20/06. (hs,) (Entered: 12/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2316 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by JAMES W. ALFRED. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2315 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by DEON OLIVER. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2314 Filed: 12/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2313 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Wartel/Daniel by Matthew Wartel. by RONALD C. ALFRED. (Wartel, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2312 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL - Final Judgment by JAMES W. ALFRED Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Davis, Mary) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2311 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS (Jeffress, Amy) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2310 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by JAMES W. ALFRED (Woll, David) (Entered: 12/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2309 Filed: 12/11/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting re 2308 MOTION to Continue Sentencing filed by KENNETH SIMMONS. Sentencing reset for 1/4/2007 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 22A before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/8/06. (rje) (Entered: 12/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2308 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Continue Sentencing by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order order to continue sentencing)(Sidell, Gary) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2307 Filed: 12/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by FRANKLIN SEEGERS (Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 12/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2306 Filed: 12/5/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER dismissing as moot the defendant's 1999 Motion to terminate representation and noting the Federal Public Defender's Office designated counsel to represent the defendant, pursuant to the Court's Order dated 5/8/2006.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/5/06. (rje) (Entered: 12/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2305 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER DENYING 2291 Motion to Dismiss Case as to KENNETH SIMMONS ; DENYING 2291 Motion for New Trial as to KENNETH SIMMONS. See Order for Details.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/04/06. (rje) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2304 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER DENYING 2290 MOTION for Leave to Appear Informa Pauperis filed by KENNETH SIMMONS. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/4/06. (rje) (Entered: 12/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2303 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING motion 2295 by defendant KENNETH SIMMONS (12) to Compel Grand Jury Concurrence Form. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/4/06. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2302 Filed: 12/4/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER finding as moot defendants' Motions 2293 and 2294 for Sentencing Date submitted by defendants JAMES W. ALFRED (19) and FRANKLIN SEEGERS (20). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/4/06. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 12/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2301 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to MAURICE ANDREWS before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 9/29/06. Court Reporter: Theresa M. Sorensen. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2300 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to FRANK HOWARD before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 11/1/05. Court Reporter: Theresa M. Sorensen. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2299 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to JERMAINE VICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 3/9/05. Court Reporter: Theresa M. Sorensen. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2298 Filed: 11/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BRYAN BOSTICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 6/14/04. Court Reporter: Theresa M. Sorensen. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (Original Transcript filed in Criminal Case No. 98-264-16) (hsj, ) Modified on 11/6/2006 (hsj, ). (Entered: 11/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2297 Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for departure from sentencing guideline range by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to MAURICE ANDREWS. (For scanned image see document 2296 ). (erd) (Entered: 09/28/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2295 Filed: 8/30/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Grand Jury Concurrence Form by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(hsj, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2294 Filed: 9/13/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION sentencing date by JAMES W. ALFRED. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woll, David) (Entered: 09/13/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2293 Filed: 9/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION For Sentencing Date (Corrected) by FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 09/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2292 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION For Sentencing Date by FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2291 Filed: 8/2/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Indictment for Prosecutorial Misconduct; or MOTION for New Trial/Evidentiary Hearing by KENNETH SIMMONS. (cp, ) (Entered: 08/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2290 Filed: 6/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Proceed in Informa Pauperis by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Facts# 2 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis# 3 Receipt for Property Received/Returned/Release/Seized)(hsj, ) (Entered: 07/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2289 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Of Defendants Request For The Entry Of A Payment Schedule by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (Zwerling, John) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2288 Filed: 5/23/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER to Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan from Juror Number 9 regarding jury trial of defendant, as to LARRY WILKERSON. "Let this be filed, U.S. v. Larry Wilkerson, CR No. 00-157-15" (mlp) (Entered: 05/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2287 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Reply to Government's Oppostion to Motion for New Trial Based on the Court's Improper Removal of Juror #0552 and Motion for New Trial Based on Alleged Jury Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2286 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2198 MOTION for New Trial Regarding US Misconductt Regarding USG Witness Donney Alston (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2285 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to KENNETH SIMMONS (12)denying 2215 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; denying 2275 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 2243 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney; granting 2279 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Joseph Edmund Beshouri and Alexandra Negin Christ withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/8/06. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2284 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2201 MOTION for New Trial Based on the Government's Failure to Disclose Brady Evidence Regarding Rodman Lee and for Asserting Inconsistent Prosection Theories Regarding the Alleged Conspiracy, And Request for FBI 302s re Rodman Lee (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2283 Filed: 5/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2203 MOTION for Judgment NOV And to Vacate the Verdicts as Being Against the Weight of the Evidence (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2282 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS; that all motions [200, 217, 218, 221, 1857, 1873, 1875, 1987, 1997, 2009, 2014, 2015, 2043, 2046, 2113, 2168, 2267] to join, adopt or amend of for leave to late file shall be granted. That defendant Seegers' motion 2032 shall be granted as to his request to adopt co-defendants' motions and denied as to his request for a new trial. That defendant Simmons' motion 1994 shall be granted as to his request to adopt co-defendants' motions and denied as to his request for a new trial. That defendant Seegers' motion 2033 to dismiss counts and his motion 2264 to treat his motion to dismiss as conceded shall be granted as to his request that the counts be dismissed and denied as to his request that the dismissal be with prejudice. That counts 45-47 and 84, and Racketeering Act 42 be dismissed without prejudice as to defendant Seegers. That all motions [206, 1678, 1850, 1858, 1870, 1965, 1975, 1983, 1989, 1991, 1995, 2032, 2103] for acquittal or for a new trial shall be denied. That defendant Oliver's motion 1946 to vacate or for a hearing shall be denied; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/2/06. (erd) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2281 Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/2/06. (erd) (Entered: 05/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2280 Filed: 5/7/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by LARRY WILKERSON re 2196 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Motion for a New Trial Based on the Court's Rulings Denying Him an Opportunity to Present Exculpatory Evidence Regarding the Christopher Burton Homicide (Attachments: # 1 # 2 # 3 # 4 # 5 # 6 # 7 # 8 # 9)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 05/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2279 Filed: 4/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Joseph Beshouri. by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1)(Beshouri, Joseph) (Entered: 04/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2278 Filed: 4/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON; Ordering The Defendant is to file his reply to the Government's Omnibus Opposition to the Defendant's Motion for a New Trial on or Before May 8, 2006, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 4/5/06. (hs,) (Entered: 04/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2277 Filed: 3/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Government's Omnibus Opposition to Defendant's Motions for a New Trial on or before May 8, 2006 by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2276 Filed: 3/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing Letter Requesting Processing of Unpaid Vouchers or to Provide Explanation for the Court's Failure to Pay for Trial-Related Services and Expenses and for Post-Trial Motions and Request for Hearing Regarding Compensation Issues by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2275 Filed: 3/3/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION requesting that Joseph Beshouri be withdrawn as defendant's Attorney by KENNETH SIMMONS. (cp, ) (Entered: 03/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2274 Filed: 2/24/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Memorandum in Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON re 2201 MOTION for New Trial Based on the Government's Failure to Disclose Brady Evidence Regarding Rodman Lee and for Asserting Inconsistent Prosection Theories Regarding the Alleged Conspiracy, And Request for FBI 302s re Rodman Lee, 2198 MOTION for New Trial Regarding US Misconductt Regarding USG Witness Donney Alston, 2192 MOTION for Discovery of Devin Ebron 302s, 2196 Amended MOTION for Leave to File, 2202 MOTION for Leave to File Offers of Proof Relating to Appeal and to Post-Trial Motions on or Before June 30, 2005, 2203 MOTION for Judgment NOV And to Vacate the Verdicts as Being Against the Weight of the Evidence, 2209 Second MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Offers of Proof On or Before July 29, 2005, 2194 MOTION for Hearing Regarding Jury Misconduct, 2200 MOTION for Hearing Based on Alleged Juror Misconduct, 2195 MOTION for New Trial Based on Improper Removal of Juror (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 02/24/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2273 Filed: 2/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing an Additional Exhibit in Support of Mr. Wilkerson's Offer of Proof Relating to the Anthony Dent Murder and Impeachment of Government Witness Maurice Andrews by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 25: Eyewitness Statements of Leo Benbow and Police Reports - Bates Nos. 12,422 - 12,429)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 02/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2272 Filed: 9/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          VERDICT FORM as to LARRY WILKERSON. (mlp) (Entered: 02/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2271 Filed: 7/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RETYPED SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FOR USE IN TRIAL as to LARRY WILKERSON (15) counts 1rrrss, 3rrrss, 6rrrss, 7rrrss, 10rrrss, 11rrrss, 13rrrss, 14rrrss, 15rrrss, 16rrrss, 17rrrss. (mlp) (Entered: 02/08/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2270 Filed: 2/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BRYAN BOSTICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on August 26, 2003. Court Reporter: Katherine K. Moomey. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. This transcript has been filed in 98cr264. (cp, ) (Entered: 02/03/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2269 Filed: 1/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing of Motion to Compel the Government to Disclose The Complete Grand Jury Testimony of Rodman Lee Provided in the Kevin Gray Case, as Required by Brady v. Maryland, or, in the Alternative, Rodman Lee's Grand Jury Testimony Regarding his Relationship with Kevin Gray and the Zebrowski Drug Trafficking Organization by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Face Sheet: Jencks/Giglio Material for "Ricardo Bailey Murder";# 2 Exhibit 2: Letter Dated July 15, 2002, from AUSA Amy Jeffress to Group I Counsel regarding Rodman Lee Grand Jury Testimony provided with the Jencks Material re the Ricardo Baily Murder;# 3 Exhibit 3: Excerpts of Rodman Lee Grand Jury Testimony provided in Kevin Gray Investigation at 52-56, 85-87;# 4 Exhibit 4: DEA 6 Report of Investigation dated Sept. 9, 1996, re Debriefing of Rodman Lee Regarding drug debts owed to Lee by Customers (including Kevin Gray);# 5 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 01/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2268 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Filing of Additional Exhibits in Support of Offer of Proof Relating to the Anthony Dent Murder and Impeachment of Government Witness Maurice Andrews by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 5: Defense Trial Exhibit D-AD-302 (aerial photo of 15th Place, SE)# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 6: PD 251 dated October 9, 1990, prepared by MPD Officer James Somers# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 7: MPD 123, Report of Investigation dated October 9, 1990# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 8: Crime Scene Photo depicting red cap laying on blood stained ground# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 9: Excerpts of Testimony of Evidence Technician Rodney Armstrong, Group I Tr. May 23, 2002 AM, at 30-41;# 6 Exhibit Exhibit 10: Crime Scene Diagram of Dent Murder;# 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11: Evidence Report dated October 9, 1990 prepared by Evid Technician Rodney Armstrong;# 8 Exhibit Exhibit 12: Excerpts of Testimony of Det. George Taylor, Group I Trial Tr. May 23, 2002 AM, at 74-79;# 9 Exhibit Exhibit 13: MPD 120, Death Report dated October 9, 1990, prepared by Det. George Taylor;# 10 Exhibit Exhibit 14: Testimony of Evidence Technician Curtis E. Lancaster from Group I Trial Tr. May 23, 2002 AM, at 67-74;# 11 Exhibit Exhibit 15: Supplemental Evidence Report dated October 9, 1990, prepared by Evid. Technician Curtis Lancaster;# 12 Exhibit Exhibit 16: Subpoena for Medical Examiner Dr. Marie Pierre-Louis;# 13 Exhibit Exhibit 17: Autopsy Report of Anthony Dent;# 14 Exhibit Exhibit 18: Autopsy Body Diagram of Anthony Dent from Autopsy Report;# 15 Exhibit Exhibit 19: Excerpts of Trial Testimony of Dr. Jonathan Arden, Medical Examiner from Group I Trial Tr. June 4, 2002 AM, at 6-24;# 16 Exhibit Exhibit 20: Excerpts from Treatise, W. Spitz & Fisher, Medicolegal Investigation of Death (3d ed. 1993), at 370-371 ("Physical Activity Following Fatal Injury by Gunfire");# 17 Exhibit Exhibit 21: MPD Firearms Identification Section Report dated Nov. 5, 1990, prepared by Firearms Examiner Drake C. Powers (concluding all three expended bullets were from the same gun);# 18 Exhibit Exhibit 22: Excerpts of Trial Testimony of FBI Firearms Examiner Steve Casper from Group I Trial Tr. June 24, 2002 AM, at 28-37, 74-76;# 19 Exhibit Exhibit 23: FBI Ballistics Report dated Nov. 5, 2001, prepared by FBI Firearms Examiner Steve Casper;# 20 Exhibit Exhibit 24: Letter Writted by Maurice Andrews to Norman Thompson;)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2267 Filed: 1/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SUPPLEMENT by JAMES W. ALFRED re 2261 MOTION for Acquittal Addendum to government's omnibus opposition (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Woll, David) (Entered: 01/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2266 Filed: 1/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing Offer of Proof Relating to the Anthony Dent Murder and Impeachment of Government Witness Maurice Andrews by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Exhibits to Larry Wilkerson's Offer of Proof Relating to the Murder of Anthony Dent and Impeachment of Government Witness Maurice Andrews# 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Excerpts of testimony of Maurice Andrews, Trial Tr. August 11, 2004 AM at 7, 120-129# 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2: Excerpts of trial testimony of Maurice Andrews from the Group I Trial Tr. July 10, 2002 PM, at 1-5, 29-32;# 4 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Excerpts of Trial Proceedings of August 24, 2004 AM, at 1-5, 37-41 (Oral Offer of Proof; USG Objection; Defense Argument of Admissibility; Court's Ruling Excluding Evidence Under FRE 608(b));# 5 Exhibit Exhibit 4: Excerpts of Trial Proceedings of August 24, 2004 PM, at 90 (releasing Medical Examiner Dr. Pierre Louis from Subpoena);)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 01/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2265 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION to Motion by FRANKLIN SEEGERS re 2032 MOTION for judgment of acquittal, or, in the alternative, motion for new trial and motion to adopt co-defendant's motions (Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2264 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION Treat Post Trial Motion To Dismiss Counts Not Decided By Jury And Not Prosecuted By Government As Conceded by FRANKLIN SEEGERS. (Retureta, Manuel) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2263 Filed: 1/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY in Support by RONALD C. ALFRED re 1995 MOTION for Acquittal /New Trial/Dismissal (Wartel, Matthew) (Entered: 01/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2262 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 2260 Motion as to JAMES W. ALFRED (19); denying 2259 Motion for Release from Custody as to RONALD C. ALFRED (18). Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/19/06. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2261 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Acquittal by JAMES W. ALFRED. (Woll, David) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2260 Filed: 1/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Emergency MOTION Temporary Release by JAMES W. ALFRED. (Woll, David) (Entered: 01/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2259 Filed: 1/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Release from Custody /Temporary Compassionate Release to Attend Granmother's Funeral by RONALD C. ALFRED. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment)(Wartel, Matthew) (Entered: 01/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2258 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BRYAN BOSTICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 5/14/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (erd) (Entered: 01/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2257 Filed: 12/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, KENNETH SIMMONS re 2103 MOTION for New Trial, 1989 MOTION for New Trial, 1975 MOTION for New Trial, 2014 MOTION to join Ronald Alfred's motion for judgment of acquittal, motion to dismiss, and in the alternative, motion for a new trial, 2032 MOTION for judgment of acquittal, or, in the alternative, motion for new trial and motion to adopt co-defendant's motions, 1995 MOTION for Acquittal, 1987 MOTION for Joinder, 2015 MOTION to join Kenneth Simmons' motin for new trial based on the cumulative effect from trial errors, 1965 MOTION for New Trial, 2043 MOTION to join in and adopt in part Franklin Seeger's Omnibus Motion for Judgment of Acquittal or in the alternative, Motion for New Trial, 1997 MOTION to join Kenneth Simmons' motion for new trial based on the cumulative effect from trial errors, 2046 MOTION to join Franklin Seegers' motion for judgment of acquittal, or, in the alternative, motion for new trial and motio to adopt co-defendants' motions, 1994 MOTION for New Trial, 1873 MOTION for Joinder, 1875 MOTION for Joinder, 1983 MOTION for New Trial, 1858 MOTION for Acquittal, 2133 MOTION to Adopt Certain Post-Trial Motions filed by Co-defendants, 1850 MOTION for New Trial, 1991 MOTION for Acquittal, 2009 MOTION to adopt in part motion for new trial based on cumulative effect from trial errors filed by Codefendant Ronald Alfred, 1870 MOTION for New Trial, 2168 First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1994 MOTION for New Trial filed by KENNETH SIMMONS,, 2113 MOTION to join and adopt in part, 1946 MOTION to Vacate (Pan, Florence) (Entered: 12/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2256 Filed: 12/20/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY requiring the Government to file its oppositions to the Group II defendants' post-trial motions by 12/30/05; any replies must be filed by 1/20/06. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/2/05. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 12/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2255 Filed: 11/30/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File OPPOSITIONTO DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS FOR NEW TRIAL by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 ORDER)(Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 11/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2254 Filed: 11/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Additional Undisclosed Brady Documents Which Supplement Defendant Larry Wilkerson's Motion for a New Trial Based on the Government's Failure to Disclose Brady Evidence Regarding Rodman Lee, and Request to be Provided with All Rodman Lee FBI 302s and All DEA 6's Relating to the Ricardo Bailey Murder and/or Lee's Business Dealings with Kevin Gray and the Zebrowski Drug Trafficking Organization and Incorporated Memorandum of Points and Authorities by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit DEA-6 (ROI) dated August 29, 1996, Re Interview of Rodman Lee pertaining to the murder of Ricardo Bailey# 2 Exhibit 2: DEA-6 (ROI) dated Oct. 10, 1996, re Debriefing of Rodman Lee re Cell Phone calls on date of Ricardo Bailey Murder# 3 Exhibit 3: DEA-6 (ROI) dated Oct. 10, 1996 Re Interview of Rodman Lee re Lee's drug trafficking with the "ZEBROWSKI cocaine trafficking organization"# 4 Exhibit 4: Face Sheet Listing Documents Disclosed to Gray Group I Counsel as "Jencks/Giglio Material for Ricardo Bailey Murder")(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2253 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Filing Renewed Request for Payment of Counsel's Pending Vouchers for Services Relating to Trial and Post-Trial Motions by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2252 Filed: 11/22/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to File Remaining Post-Trial Offers of Proof On or Before January 25, 2006 by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 11/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2251 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to RODNEY L. MOORE; due to clerical error, the Judgment and Commitment Order originally filed in this case omitted Count 82 from the listing of counts of which the defendant was convicted. On 10/6/05, the Court issued an amended judgment and commitment order in this matter listing Count 82 as one of the counts of which the defendant was convicted. In all other respects, the Amended Judgment and Commitment Order is identical to the original order issued. That all terms and conditions as set forth in the original order and the amended order remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/6/05. (erd) (Entered: 11/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2250 Filed: 10/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT as to RODNEY L. MOORE (2), Count(s) 100s, 12s, 85s, 88s, 8s, 90s, 97s, 98s, 99s, 9s, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Count(s) 1rrs, ENTIRE SENTENCE AS TO THE REMAINING COUNTS LISTED HEREIN: Sentencing as to RODNEY L. MOORE held on 3/9/2005. Sentence: LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, and 61rrs; Thirty (30) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 8rrs, 21rrs, 23rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 32rrs, 43rrs, 45rrs, 48rrs, 50rrs, and 60rrs; Ten (10) years incarceration as to Counts 49rrs and 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years incarceration as to Counts 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs. Counts 3rrs, 4rrs, 5rrs, 8rrs, 9rrs, 21rrs, 22rrs, 23rrs, 24rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 27rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 43rrs, 44rrs, 45rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 48rrs, 49rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, and 60rrs shall be served concurrently with Count 2rrs; Count 77rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 2rrs; Count 82rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 77rrs; Counts 84rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 82rrs; Count 85rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 84rrs; Count 86rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 85rrs; Count 90rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 86rrs. A Fine in the amount of $70,000.00 is imposed on Count 2rrs and is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on fine is waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each of Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 49rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 61rrs, 77rrs, 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs for a total of $2,100.00 as to the U.S. Code offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 4rrs, 8rrs, 21rrs, 23rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 32rrs, 43rrs, 45rrs, 48rrs, 50rrs and 60rrs for a total of $1,200.00 on the D.C. Code offenses. Supervised release for a term of Five (5) years as to each of Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 49rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 61rrs, 77rrs, 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs, to be served concurrently. Count 1rrs is dismissed by the Court. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 28rrs, 29rrs, 37rrs, 38rrs, 79rrs, Jury verdict of not guilty rendered. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/6/05. (erd) (Entered: 11/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2249 Filed: 11/4/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT as to FRANK HOWARD (7), Count(s) 1, 101s, 103s, 14, 15, 18, 19, 1s, 20, 36s, 37s, 3s, 40s, 41s, 42s, 45, 47, DISMISSED BY ORAL MOTION OF THE GOVERNMENT.; Count(s) 1ss, Defendant is sentenced to Eight (8) Years incarceration. Special Assessment of $100.00 imposed and is due immediately. Fine is waived. Upon release from incarceration, the defendant will be placed on Supervised Release for a Period of Five (5) Years.; Count(s) 82s, 83s, 84s, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/2/05. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2248 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2247 Filed: 11/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt and Acknowledgment of Presentence Investigation Report by FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 11/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2246 Filed: 10/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD (Jeffress, Amy) (Entered: 10/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2245 Filed: 10/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                FACTUAL PROFFER Relating to Defense Witness William Hill by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Attachments to William Hill Offer of Proof# 2 Exhibit Attachment A:Excerpts of Trial Testimony of Jermaine Vick,Trial Tr. Aug. 4, 2004 AM# 3 Exhibit Attachment B: Excerpts of Trial Proceedings of Aug. 23, 2004 PM (testimony of Evans Harrison, Ruling of Court, Testimony of William Hill)# 4 Exhibit Attachment C: Excerpts of Testimony of Timothy Parker from Trial Tr. Aug. 23, 2004 AM# 5 Exhibit Attachment D: Letter from Maurice Andrews admitted as Def. Exhibit D-MA-LTR-3)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2244 Filed: 10/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to File Post-Trial Offers of Proof On or Before November 22, 2005, And Request for Payment of Pending Vouchers for Services Relating to Trial and Post-Trial Motions by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 10/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2243 Filed: 10/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Lexi Negin Christ. by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Negin Christ, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2242 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting Defendant's Consent Motion 2241 to Move Sentencing as to FRANK HOWARD (7); Sentencing shall be scheduled for 11/1/05 at 9:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/3/05. (lcrcl2, ) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2241 Filed: 10/3/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent MOTION to Continue Sentencing Date by FRANK HOWARD. (McCarthy, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2240 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2239 Motion to Continue as to FRANK HOWARD ; sentencing is reset for 11/4/05, 9:30am (7)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 9/23/05. (mon, ) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2239 Filed: 9/23/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Continue Sentencing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Olsen, Matthew) (Entered: 09/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2238 Filed: 9/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting # 2237 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to LARRY WILKERSON (15),Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 09/07/05. (hs,) (Entered: 09/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2237 Filed: 8/8/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Opposition to Defendant's Motion for New Trial by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 08/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2236 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Intent to File Post-Trial Offers of Proof on or Before October 19, 2005 by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 07/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2235 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to FRANK HOWARD. That the record in this case be unsealed. The Sentencing in this case is rescheduled for 9/27/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/27/05. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2234 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2233 Unopposed Motion to Continue Sentencing as to FRANK HOWARD (7). The Court reschedules the sentencing in this case for 4/28/05 at 9:30 a.m.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/24/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2233 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) Modified on 7/25/2005 (hsj, ). (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2232 Filed: 7/27/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2231 Unopposed Motion to Continue Sentencing as to FRANK HOWARD (7). The Court hereby reschedules the sentencing in this case for 12/16/04 at 9:30 a.m.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 7/27/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2231 Filed: 7/21/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) Modified on 7/25/2005 (hsj, ). (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2230 Filed: 5/12/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2229 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to FRANK HOWARD (7). The Court hereby reschedules the sentencing in this case for 7/30/04 at 10:00 a.m. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2229 Filed: 5/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                UNOPPOSED MOTION to Continue Sentencing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2228 Filed: 2/19/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 2227 Motion requesting a limited Unsealing of the Plea Agreement and Plea Transcript as to FRANK HOWARD (7). The Clerk of the Court unseal the plea agreement and transcript of the plea proceeding for the limited purpose of providing tdhem to the attorney for the United States in connection with the prosecution of United States v. Kevin Gray, et al, Criminal Case 00-157. The Court Reporter provide a transcript of the plea proceedings to the attorney for the United States.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/13/02. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2227 Filed: 2/13/2002, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION requesting a limited Unsealing of the Plea Agreement and Plea Transcript by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2226 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2225 Motion to transfer prisoner as to FRANK HOWARD (7. The Defendant, FRANK HOWARD be removed from the D.C. Jail that he not be placed at the Northern Nect Regional Jail, the Centrial Virginia Regional Jail, the Rappahanock County Jail, or the Loudon County Jail. Any other separation requests by the United States should be maintained.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/01. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2225 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to transfer prisoner by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2224 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2223 Motion to Seal as to FRANK HOWARD (7). The Order, and the attached Government's Motion to seal, the Government's motion to transfer prisoner and order granting that motion shall to be filed under seal in the Criminal Clerk's Office until further order of this Court.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/01. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2223 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal the Accompanying Motion to Transfer Prisonerby UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2222 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2221 Motion to Seal the Criminal Information and Other Pleadings, Records, Proceedings, and files and to delay entry on the public docket of the filing of this motion to seal as to FRANK HOWARD (7).Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/01. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2221 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal the Criminal Information and Other Pleadings, Records, Proceedings, and files and to delay entry on the public docket of the filing of this motion to seal by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to FRANK HOWARD. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2220 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROFFER of Evidence as to by FRANK HOWARD. "Let this be filed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth" (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2219 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PLEA AGREEMENT as to FRANK HOWARD. "Let this be filed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth" (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2218 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by FRANK HOWARD. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/01. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2217 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        WAIVER of Right to Trial by Jury as to FRANK HOWARD. Approved by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/01. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2216 Filed: 12/10/2001, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUPERSEDING INFORMATION as to FRANK HOWARD (7) count(s) 1ss. (hsj, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2215 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION requesting withdrawal of counsel Joseph Beshouri by KENNETH SIMMONS. (erd) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2214 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to BRYAN BOSTICK before Judge Royce C. Lamberth held on 6/14/04 Court Reporter: Theresa Sorensen. The public may view the document in the Clerk's Office between the hours of 9:00 a.m. and 4:00 p.m., Monday through Friday. (Original filed in CR 98-264) (erd) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2213 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER that page 51 of the presentence investigation report be deemed amended to read "$100 each (for a total of $900)" and that the pronounced sentence be amended so that defendant owes a special assessment totaling $900 as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR; Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2212 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  JUDGMENT as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17), Count(s) 115rr-116rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 118rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 126rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 129rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 1rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 3rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 64rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 65rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 66rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 72rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 73rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 92rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 96rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, and 73rr; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 64rr and 72rr; Forty-Eight (48) months for each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; Ten (10) years as to Count 92rr; Twenty-Five (25) years as to Count 96rr; Counts 1rr, 3rr, 64rr, 65rr, 66rr, 72rr, 73rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr shall be served concurrently; Count 92rr shall be served consecutively to Count 1rr; and Couont 96rr shall be served consecutively to Count 92rr. A Fine of $2,000.00 as to Count 1rr; a Fine of $1,000.00 on each of Counts 3rr, 5rr, 65rr, 73rr, 92rr, 96rr, 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; total Fine of $13,000.00 is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the Fine is waived; A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code counts for a total of $1,200.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code counts for a total of $200.00. Total special assessment is $1,400.00. Supervised release for Five (5) years as to each of Counts 1rr, 3rr, 65rr, 66rr, 73rr, 92rr and 96rr; Three (3) years as to each of Counts 115rr, 116rr, 118rr, 126rr, and 129rr; all terms of supervised release to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2211 Filed: 6/3/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to JERMAINE VICK (4), Count(s) 1, 26, 30, 31, 42, 50, 52, 53, 62, 63, DISMISSED UPON MOTION BY THE GOVERNMENT; Count(s) 1s, Defendant is sentenced to 120 months incarceration; followed by 5 years of supervised release; $100.00 special assessment imposed. Count(s) 8, 9, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 6/3/05. (erd) (Entered: 06/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2210 Filed: 6/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Correction to Mr. Wilkerson's Motion for a New Trial Based on the Government's Failure to Disclose Brady Evidence Regarding Rodman Lee and for Asserting Inconsistent Prosecution Theories Regarding the Alleged Conspiracy by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2209 Filed: 6/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION for Leave to File Post-Trial Offers of Proof On or Before July 29, 2005 by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2207 Filed: 6/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Defendant Larry Wilkerson's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of his Motion for New Trial Based on the Court's Rulings Denying HIm an Opportunity to Present Exculpatory Evidence Regarding the Christopher Burton Homicide with said Memorandum conforming to the Local Rule Regarding Page Limitations as per the Court's Order (filed June 10, 2005) by LARRY WILKERSON (Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2206 Filed: 4/27/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Receipt and Acknowledgment of Supplemental Record on Appeal as to KEVIN L. GRAY re attached docket sheet. Appeal Case Number: 05-3064. (hsj, ) (Entered: 06/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2205 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON; ORDER Denying Defendant's Larry Wilkerson's Motion for Leave to exceed the page limitations applicable to a Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of a New Trial, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/05. (hs,) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2204 Filed: 6/10/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER; Order denying # 2196 Motion for Leave to File as to LARRY WILKERSON (15)Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 6/10/05. (hs,) (Entered: 06/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2203 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Judgment NOV And to Vacate the Verdicts as Being Against the Weight of the Evidence by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit 1:Maurice Andrews Letter# 3 Exhibit 2: Police Report Re Carjacked Impala)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2202 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File Offers of Proof Relating to Appeal and to Post-Trial Motions on or Before June 30, 2005 by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2201 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for New Trial Based on the Government's Failure to Disclose Brady Evidence Regarding Rodman Lee and for Asserting Inconsistent Prosection Theories Regarding the Alleged Conspiracy, And Request for FBI 302s re Rodman Lee by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit List of Exhibits# 3 Exhibit 1: Excerpts of AUSA Closing Argument re Conspiracy# 4 Exhibit 2: Rodman Lee Plea Agreement 12-12-96# 5 Exhibit 3: Factual Proffer of Rodman Lee in Support of Guilty Plea to CCE# 6 Exhibit 4: Statement of Facts Supporting Criminal Complaint# 7 Exhibit 5: Excerpts of Rodman Lee Guilty Plea Transcript# 8 Exhibit 6: Face Page & Witness List from George Foreman Aug. 1997 Trial# 9 Exhibit 7: Face Page & Witness List from November 1997 George Foreman Trial# 10 Exhibit 8: Documents Showing Lee was at CTF at time of Trial)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2200 Filed: 6/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Hearing Based on Alleged Juror Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Attachment A: Juror Letter to Court)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2199 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibit to Wilkerson Motion for New Trial Re Errors in the Christopher Burton Case by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment J: Torrence Police Report)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2198 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for New Trial Regarding US Misconductt Regarding USG Witness Donney Alston by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit List of Attachments# 3 Exhibit A: Alston Grand Jury Testimony# 4 Exhibit B: Group I Tran. 6-4-02 pm# 5 Exhibit C: Group I Tran. 6-6-02am# 6 Exhibit D: ; Group I Tran. 6-10-02am# 7 Exhibit E: Group I Tran. 6-10-02 pm# 8 Exhibit F: Group I Tran. 6-11-02 am# 9 Exhibit G: Group I Tran. 6-17-02 am# 10 Exhibit H: Alston 302# 11 Exhibit I: USA Opp. to Def Grand Jury Abuse Motion# 12 Exhibit USA Propose Jury Instr re Withdrawal# 13 Exhibit K: LW Trial Tr. 9-2-04am re Withdrawal)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2197 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing Additional Exhibits to Burton New Trial Motion by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit G-TL-24: photo pf close up of.380 caliber Taurus# 2 Exhibit G-TL-26: photo of close up of.9mm Taurus# 3 Exhibit G-TL-26: Photo of.380 &.9mm cal guns# 4 Exhibit H: Thomas Carthens Statement# 5 Exhibit I: Map of SE DC:Burton crime scene# 6 Exhibit K-1:poloce photo of Honda rear# 7 Exhibit K-2:Photo - side view of Honda# 8 Exhibit K-3: Photo of gun on floor of Honda# 9 Exhibit L: Photo of Burtons blue Station Wagon# 10 Exhibit M: Sixth Joint Stipulation re dates CWs were at CTF# 11 Exhibit N: Maurice Andrew Letter (DX D-MA-LTR-3))(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2196 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Amended MOTION for Leave to File by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Motion for New Trial Based on Errors inBurton Case# 2 Exhibit Memo of Law in Support# 3 Text of Proposed Order Granting excess pages# 4 Text of Proposed Order # 5 Exhibit Attachment Lsit# 6 Exhibit A: Brady Letter re Ebron & Diggs# 7 Exhibit B: Letter from Graber to Atty Nichols# 8 Exhibit C: Nichols Letter to Graber# 9 Exhibit CB-DE-1:Docket entries: US v. Ebron# 10 Exhibit CB-DE-2:; Information in Ebron case# 11 Exhibit CB-DE-3:Ebron Plea Agreement# 12 Exhibit CB-DE-4:Proffer of Evid# 13 Exhibit CB-DE-5:Ebron Release Motion# 14 Exhibit CB-DE-6:Detention Memo re Owens# 15 Exhibit CB-DE-7:Continuance Motion re Ebron# 16 Exhibit CB-DE-8:2d Continuance Motion# 17 Exhibit CB-DE-9:3d Continue Motion# 18 Exhibit CB-DE-10: Ebron Sentencing# 19 Exhibit D: US Motion to Dismiss Ebron Sup Ct case# 20 Exhibit E:; Aerial Photo Robinson Place# 21 Exhibit F: CTF Records re Vick & Ebron# 22 Exhibit G: Lyman Affidavit# 23 Exhibit G-TL-08:photo of.9mm &.380 guns# 24 Exhibit G-TL-09: Photo of Taurus.9mm & Beretta.380# 25 Exhibit G-TL-22:Photo close up of Beretta.380)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2195 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for New Trial Based on Improper Removal of Juror by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Voir Dire Tran# 3 Exhibit Attachment B - Juror Note)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2194 Filed: 6/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ENTERED IN ERROR.....MOTION for Hearing Regarding Jury Misconduct by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 6/7/2005 (mlp) (Entered: 06/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2193 Filed: 6/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      FACTUAL PROFFER Relating to Christopher Burton Charges by LARRY WILKERSON (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List of Attachments to Chris Burton Proffer# 2 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-1# 3 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-2:Diggs Autopsy Rprt# 4 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-3.Transfer of Docs Form# 5 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-4.Autopsy Photo# 6 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-5.Diggs Photo# 7 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-6.Super Ct F-12350-92# 8 Exhibit Attachment CB-RD-7. Gun Conviction)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2192 Filed: 6/5/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Discovery of Devin Ebron 302s by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 06/05/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2191 Filed: 5/27/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting in part and denying in part # 2184 Motion for Extension of Time to File as to LARRY WILKERSON (15)Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 5/27/05. (hs,) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2190 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDGMENT as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. (16), Count(s) 1rr, Defendant sentenced to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Fine in the amount of $3,000.00 imposed as to count 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently.; Count(s) 3rr, Defendant sentenced to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Fine in the amount of $3,000.00 imposed as to count 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently. Count(s) 53rr, Defendant sentenced to Twenty Five (25) Years to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Count(s) 54rr, Defendant sentenced to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Fine in the amount of $3,000.00 imposed as to count 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently. Count(s) 55rr, Defendant sentenced to Ten (10) Years, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Three (3) Years imposed, terms to run concurrently. Count(s) 56rr, Defendant sentenced to Twenty Five (25) Years to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Count(s) 57rr, Defendant sentenced to LIFE, counts 1, 3, 53, 54, 55, 56, 57 shall be served concurrently. Fine in the amount of $3,000.00 imposed as to count 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently. Count(s) 82, 83, 84, Dismissed upon order of the Court.; Count(s) 87rr, Defendant sentenced to Ten (10) Years, count shall be served consecutive to count 1rr. Fine of $2,000.00 each as to count 87rr and 88rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interestof interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently.; Count(s) 88rr, Defendant sentenced to Twenty Five (25) Years, count shall be served consecutive to count 87rr. Fine of $2,000.00 each as to count 87rr and 88rr. Total fine of $16,000.00 due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on the fine is waived. Special Assessment of $100.00 for each count for a total of $800.00 imposed. Supervised Release of Five (5) Years imposed on counts 1rr, 3rr, 54rr, 57rr, 87rr, and 88rr, terms to run concurrently. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2189 Filed: 4/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number as to KEVIN L. GRAY 05-3064 for 2167 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2188 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JUDGMENT as to JOHN RAYNOR (5), Count(s) 1, 100s, 132s, 3s, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Count(s) 110rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 120rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 124rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 131rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 1rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 28rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 29rrs, Verdict of not guilty rendered by the jury.; Count(s) 32rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Count(s) 33rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 3rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 50rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 51rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 52rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 68rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 69rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 72rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 73rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 74rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 75rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 77rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 86rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 94rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 96rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 97rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, and 75rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs; Ten (10) years as to Count 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years as to each of Counts 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Twenty (20) years as to Count 110rrs; Four (4) years as to each of Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 28rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 68rrs, 69rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs shall be served concurrently; Counts 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs shall be served consecutively to each other and consecutive to Count 1rrs. A Fine of $1,000.00 as to each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, and 120rrs for a total Fine of $15,000.00 which is due immediately; interest and penalties on the Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each U.S. Code offense (Couts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 110rrs, 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs) for a total of $1,700.00; a special assessment of $100.00 on each D.C. Code offense (Counts 28rrs, 32rrs, 50rrs, 68rrs, 72rrs, and 74rrs) for a total of $600.00. Total special assessment: $2,300.00. Supervised release of Five (5) years on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 69rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 77rrs, 86rrs, 94rrs, 96rrs, and 97rrs; Three (3) years supervised release as to Count 110rrs; One (1) year each as to Counts 120rrs, 124rrs, and 131rrs; the terms of supervised release are to run concurrently. Defendant committed/commitment issued. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/26/2005 (erd, ). (Entered: 05/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2187 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rachel Carlson Lieber appearing for USA. Substituting for AUSA Amy Jeffress (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2186 Filed: 5/25/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Rachel Carlson Lieber appearing for USA. Substituting for AUSA Amy Jeffress (Lieber, Rachel) (Entered: 05/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2185 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      JUDGMENT as to RODNEY L. MOORE (2), Count(s) 100s, 12s, 85s, 88s, 8s, 90s, 97s, 98s, 99s, 9s, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Count(s) 1rrs, ENTIRE SENTENCE AS TO THE REMAINING COUNTS LISTED HEREIN: Sentencing as to RODNEY L. MOORE held on 3/9/2005. Sentence: LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, and 61rrs; Thirty (30) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 8rrs, 21rrs, 23rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 32rrs, 43rrs, 45rrs, 48rrs, 50rrs, and 60rrs; Ten (10) years incarceration as to Counts 49rrs and 77rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years incarceration as to Counts 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs. Counts 3rrs, 4rrs, 5rrs, 8rrs, 9rrs, 21rrs, 22rrs, 23rrs, 24rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 27rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 43rrs, 44rrs, 45rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 48rrs, 49rrs, 50rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, and 60rrs shall be served concurrently with Count 2rrs; Count 77rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 2rrs; Count 82rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 77rrs; Counts 84rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 82rrs; Count 85rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 84rrs; Count 86rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 85rrs; Count 90rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 86rrs. A Fine in the amount of $70,000.00 is imposed on Count 2rrs and is due immediately; payment of interest and penalties on fine is waived. A special assessment of $100.00 on each of Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 49rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 61rrs, 77rrs, 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs for a total of $2,100.00 as to the U.S. Code offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 4rrs, 8rrs, 21rrs, 23rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 32rrs, 43rrs, 45rrs, 48rrs, 50rrs and 60rrs for a total of $1,200.00 on the D.C. Code offenses. Supervised release for a term of Five (5) years as to each of Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 33rrs, 44rrs, 46rrs, 47rrs, 49rrs, 51rrs, 52rrs, 61rrs, 77rrs, 82rrs, 84rrs, 85rrs, 86rrs, and 90rrs, to be served concurrently. Count 1rrs is dismissed by the Court. Defendant committed/commitment issued.; Count(s) 28rrs, 29rrs, 37rrs, 38rrs, 79rrs, Jury verdict of not guilty rendered. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) (Entered: 05/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2184 Filed: 5/20/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post Trial Motions by June 14, 2005 by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachment: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) Modified on 5/23/2005 (mlp) (Entered: 05/20/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2183 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          JUDGMENT as to CALVIN SMITH (14), Count(s) 15rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 16rrs, Not guilty verdict rendered by the jury.; Count(s) 19rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 1rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 20rr, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 3rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 4rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 5rrs, Sentenced to LIFE imprisonment as to Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs; Twenty-Five (25) years to LIFE as to Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; all counts to be served concurrently. A Fine of $10,000.00 on each of Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, for a total Fine of $30,000.00, due immediately; interest and penalties on Fine are waived. A special assessment of $100.00 for each of Counts 1rrs and 3rrs and $50.00 for Count 5rrs; a total of $250.00 due immediately on U.S. Code Offenses. A special assessment of $100.00 each for each of Counts 4rrs, 15rrs, 19rrs, and 20rrs; a total of $400.00 due immediately on D.C. Code Offenses. Supervised release of Five (5) years for Counts 1rrs, 3rrs, and 5rrs, to run concurrently.; Count(s) 85, 94, 96, Dismissed upon order of the Court. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) (Entered: 05/19/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2182 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER denying 2154 Motion to Amend/Correct Judgment and Commitment as to RODNEY L. MOORE (2)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (cp, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2181 Filed: 5/11/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              JUDGMENT as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1), Count(s) 104rrs, 111rrs, 123rrs, 15rrs, 16rrs, 17rrs, 18rrs, 67rrs, 70rrs, 71rrs, 93rrs, 95rrs, Verdict of not guilty rendered. Count(s) 123s, dismissed by motion of the government.; Count(s) 12s, 20s, 21s, 22s, 82s, 83s, 84s, 85s, 86s, 88s, 89s, 8s, 90s, 91s, 92s, 94s, 95s, 97s, 98s, 99s, 9s, Dismissed upon order of the Court.; Count(s) 1rrs, Defendant sentenced to Life Imprisonments as to Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 9rrs, 11rrs, 14rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 31rrs, 33rrs, 36rrs, 36rrs, 40rrs, 42rrs, 44rrs, 59rrs, 61rrs, 63rrs, 65rrs, 66rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 101rrs, and 108rrs, Thirty years to Life as to Counts 4rrs, 6rrs, 8rrs, 10rrs, 12rrs, 13rrs, 21rrs, 23rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 30rrs, 32rrs, 34rrs, 39rrs, 41rrs, 43rrs, 58rrs, 60rrs, 62rrs, 64rrs, 72rrs and 74rrs; 480 Months as to Count 103rrs; 240 months as to Count 110; 48 months as to each of counts 113rrs through 118rrs, 120rrs, 121rrs, 122rrs, 124rrs, 126rrs, 128rrs, 129rrs and 131rrs; these terms shall be imposed concurrently; 10 years as to Count 76rrs; 25 years as to each of Counts 77rs, 78rrs 80rrs, 81rrs, 82rrs, 89rrs 90rrs, 91rrs, 92rrs, 92rrs, 96rrs and 97rrs; Count 76 shall be imposed consecutively to Counts 2rrs, 3rrs, 4rrs, 5rrs, 6rrs, 7rrs, 8rrs, 9rrs, 10rrs, 11rrs, 12rrs, 13rrs, 14rrs, 15rrs, 16rrs, 17rrs, 18rrs, 19rrs, 20rrs, 21rrs, 21rrs, 22rrs, 23rrs, 24rrs, 25rrs, 26rrs, 27rrs, 28rrs, 29rrs, 30rrs, 31rrs, 32rrs, 33rrs, 34rrs, 35rrs, 36rrs, 37rrs, 38rrs, 39rrs, 40rrs, 40rrs, 41rrs, 42rrs, 43rrs, 44rrs, 58rrs, 59rrs, 60rrs, 61rrs, 62rrs, 63rrs, 64rrs 65rrs, 66rrs, 72rrs, 73rrs, 74rrs, 75rrs, 101rrs, 103rrs, 108rrs, and 110rrs; Count 77rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 76rrs; Count 78rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 77rrs; Count 80rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 78rrs; Count 81rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 80rrs, Count 82rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 81rrs; Count 89rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 82rrs. Count 90rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 89rrs. Count 91rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 90rrs. Count 92rrs shall be served consecutively to Count 96rrs. Count 97rrs shall be served consecutively to COunt 96rrs. A fine of $130,000 is imposed on Count 2rrs; payment is due immediately; interest and penalties on fine is waived. A special asssessment is imposed on each Count(s) 5rrs, 7rrs, 9rrs, 11rrs, 14rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 31rrs, 76rrs, 77rrs and 101rrs for a toral of $600.00. A special assessment of $100.00 is imposed on each Count(s) 2rrs, 3rrs, 33rrs, 35rrs, 36rrs, 40rrs, 42rrs, 44rrs, 59rrs, 61rrs, 63rrs, 65rrs, 66rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 78rrs, 80rrs, 81rrs, 81rrs, 892rrs, 89rrs, 90rrs, 91rrs, 92rrs, 96rrs, 97rrs, 103rrs, 108rrs, 110rrs, 113rrs through 118rrs, 120rrs, 121rrs, 122rrs, 124rrs, 126rrs, 128rrs, 129rrs, and 131rrs for a total of $4,200. A special assessment of $100.00 is imposed on each DC Code Offense for a total of $2,200. Total special assessment $7,000. Supervised release for Five years on each count(s) 2rrs, 3rrs, 5rrs, 7rrs, 9rrs, 11rrs, 14rrs, 22rrs, 24rrs, 27rrs, 31rrs, 33rrs, 35rrs, 36rrs, 40rrs, 42rrs, 44rrs, 59rrs, 61rrs, 63rrs, 65rrs, 66rrs, 66rrs, 73rrs, 75rrs, 76rrs, 77rrs, 78rrs, 80rrs, 81rrs, 82rrs, 89rrs, 90rrs, 91rrs, 92rrs, 96rrs, 101rrs, 103rrs, and 108rrs; Three years as to Count 110rrs; and One year as to each of Counts 113rrs through 118rrs, 120rrs, 121rr, 122rrs, 124rrs, 126rrs, 128rrs, 129rrs and 131rrs; the term of supervised release shall be served concurrently. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (erd) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2005 (jeb, ). (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2180 Filed: 5/12/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY directing that certain victim impact statements presented to the Court at sentencing on 3/9/05 be filed in the record. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 5/11/05. (mon, ) (Entered: 05/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2179 Filed: 4/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to FRANK HOWARD: Granting government's Motion to Unseal Case as to Frank Howard and Motion to Continue Sentencing; Sentencing reset for 9/27/2005 09:30 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Royce C. Lamberth. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 4/27/05. (mon, ) (Entered: 04/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2178 Filed: 4/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION Government's Motion From Departure From Sentencing Guideline Range by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to JERMAINE VICK. (Jeffress, Amy) (Entered: 04/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2177 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Receipt and Acknowledgment of Supplemental Record on Appeal as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN re 2162 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. Appeal Case Number: 05-3054. Receipt of documents: Docketing statement (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2176 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        USCA Case Number as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN 05-3054 for 2162 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2175 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          USCA Case Number as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR 05-3053 for 2156 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR.. (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2174 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            USCA Case Number as to CALVIN SMITH 05-3052 for 2165 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment filed by CALVIN SMITH. (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2173 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              USCA Case Number as to JOHN RAYNOR 05-3051 for 2158 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by JOHN RAYNOR. (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2172 Filed: 4/1/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                USCA Case Number as to RODNEY L. MOORE 05-3050 for 2157 Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, filed by RODNEY L. MOORE. (erd) (Entered: 04/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2171 Filed: 3/8/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting the government's motion to vacate order governing extrajudicial statements as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, KENNETH SIMMONS, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY; vacating the Court's Order of 6/14/01 and the parties may comment on this case, consistent with Local Criminal Rule 57.7. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 03/08/05. (jeb, ) (Entered: 04/14/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2170 Filed: 3/7/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying 2129 Second Motion for New Trial as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16); denying 2147 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16); denying 2147 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the government's opposition as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 3/4/05. (jeb, ) (Entered: 04/13/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2169 Filed: 12/21/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON. That Defendant Wilkerson is granted leave of Court to file his post-trial motions on or before 1/31/05. The government shall file its response to said motions on or before 3/31/05, and Mr. Wilkerson shall file his reply to the government's response on or before 4/30/05. Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/20/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 04/09/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2168 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDMENT to motion for new trial 1994 MOTION for New Trial filed by KENNETH SIMMONS, by KENNETH SIMMONS. (Beshouri, Joseph) Modified on 4/7/2005 (erd). (Entered: 04/06/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2167 Filed: 3/17/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by KEVIN L. GRAY re Sentencing held on 3/9/05 and entered on 3/31/05. No Filing fee paid, CJA. Docketing statement received. Parties notified. (erd) (Entered: 03/31/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2166 Filed: 3/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON; Order Granting the Defendant Larry Wilkerson's Fourth Motion for an extension of time in which to file defendant's post-trial motions, Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 3/29/05. (hs,) (Entered: 03/30/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2165 Filed: 3/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by CALVIN SMITH re judgment of conviction and order of sentence imposed on 3/9/05, entered on 3/29/05. CJA - no filing fees paid. Docketing statement not received. Parties notified. (mlp, ) (Entered: 03/29/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2164 Filed: 3/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Transmitted Supplemental Record on Appeal to USCA as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN re a Copy of a Docket Sheet.(hsj, ) (Entered: 03/28/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2163 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, KENNETH SIMMONS, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. Granting government's motion to vacate order governing extrajudicial statements. The Court's Consent Order of 6/14/01 is hereby vacated, and the parties may comment on this case, consistent with Local Criminal Rule 57.7. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 03/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2162 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN re: conviction and sentence imposed on 3/9/05 and entered on the docket sheet on 3/24/05. (Copy of Notice of Appeal is docketed in lieu of misplaced original) Filing fees remain to be paid. Docketing statement not submitted. Parties notified. (mlp, ) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2161 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER request of Government to permit the victims and family mmebers to address the Court at the time of sentencingas to KEVIN L. GRAY (1); RODNEY L. MOORE (2), CALVIN SMITH (14), TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16), LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/31/05. (jeb, ) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2160 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying Francis D. Carter's Motion for Leave to Withdraw as Defense Counsel as to KEVIN L. GRAY Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/31/05. (jeb, ) (Entered: 03/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2159 Filed: 1/31/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying KEVIN GRAY'S motion 1376 to Reconsider his Previous Moiton to Communicate with Jurors; denying KEVIN GRAY'S motion 1368 for Entry of Verdict; granting 1646 KEVIN GRAY's Motion for Sentencing date insofar as it requests a sentencing date and denying as moot 1646 insofar as it requests a presentence investigation; denying 2038 CALVIN SMITH's Motion to compel review of FBI-I Drive Files for Brady and Giglio Information and Motion to Preserve Case Materials as to CALVIN SMITH (14); denying 1981 Motion to Dismiss all Counts and references to Cocaine Base or Crack Cocaine as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1); denying 1982 Second Motion for New Trial as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1); denying 2048 Third Motion for New Trial as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1); granting KEVIN GRAY's Motion 1377 for dismissal of Count One; Dismissing Count 1 as to defendants Kevin Gray and Rodney Moore; denying KEVIN GRAY's motion 1876 to Dismiss for Violation of Rule 32 and Right to Speedy Trial.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 1/31/05. (jeb, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2158 Filed: 3/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by JOHN RAYNOR re: guilty verdicts, as listed for sentences imposed on 3/9/05, and all evidentiary and other rulings on defendant's motions and sentences. (Sentence docketed 3/24/05) CJA - no filing fees paid. Docketing statement received. Parties notified. (mlp) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2157 Filed: 3/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by RODNEY L. MOORE re: all evidentiary and other rulings prior to and during the defendant's trial; the verdicts of guilty returned by the jury; the rulings on defendants' post-trial motions; and all of defendant's sentences imposed on 3/9/05, which cumulatively, impose life without parole; sentence docketed on 3/23/05. Filing fees $255 paid, receipt number 132892. Docketing statement not received. Parties notified. (mlp, ) (Entered: 03/24/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2156 Filed: 3/10/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR re Sentencing imposed on 3/9/05 and entered on 3/23/05. Appeal reference TIMOTHY P. HANDY, counts 1rr, 3rr, 53rr, 54rr, 55rr, 56rr, 57rr, 87rr, 88rr. Counsel and defendant notified. Docketing Statement received. Filing fee: CJA. (hsj, ) (Entered: 03/23/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2155 Filed: 3/21/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to Post Trial Motions by LARRY WILKERSON. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Graber, Sebastian) (Entered: 03/21/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2154 Filed: 3/16/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Amend/Correct 2153 Order on Motion to Continue, (Motion to Supplement Judgment and Commitment Order) by RODNEY L. MOORE. (Coburn, Barry) (Entered: 03/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2153 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2142 Motion to Continue Sentencings as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1), RODNEY L. MOORE (2), JOHN RAYNOR (5), CALVIN SMITH (14), TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR. (16), LIONEL DEWITT NUNN (17); Sentencings set for 3/9/05 at 2:00 p.m.Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 2/23/05. (nmw, ) (Entered: 03/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2152 Filed: 2/2/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER as to RODNEY L. MOORE granting Rodney L. Moore's motion for leave to adopt Post-Trial motions filed by other defendants, but denies all adopted motions, except for the motion to dismiss Count One, which the court granted in its Order dated 21/28/2005; the Court's reasons for these actions are set forth in its Memorandum and Order in this case dated 1/28/2005. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 2/1/2005. (bm) (Entered: 03/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2151 Filed: 1/25/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 2134 Motion for Extension of Time to file post-trial motions as to LARRY WILKERSON (15)Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 1/25/05. (cp, ) (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2150 Filed: 2/1/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION For leave to Adopt Post-Trial Motions filed by other Defendants by RODNEY L. MOORE. "Leave to file without proposed order Granted by Judge Lamberth." (lm). (Entered: 03/08/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2149 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SENTENCING MEMORANDUM and Letters by CALVIN SMITH. (hsj, ) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2148 Filed: 3/4/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY (bm) (Entered: 03/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2147 Filed: 2/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue March 9,2005 Sentencing Date and MOTION for Leave to File a reply to the government's opposition to defendant's second new trial motions by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR. (jeb, ) Modified on 3/4/2005 (jeb, ). (Entered: 03/04/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2146 Filed: 2/28/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Position of Defendant With Respect to Sentencing Factors by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (hsj, ) (Entered: 03/01/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2145 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR re 2129 MOTION for New Trial, newly discovered evidence of Brady Violations. (hsj, ) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2144 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings of Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 9/1/04 - AM Session Court Reporter: Cathyrn A. Jones. (jeb, ) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2143 Filed: 2/24/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings of Trial as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/27/04 -PM Session Court Reporter: Cathyrn J. Jones. (jeb, ) (Entered: 02/25/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2142 Filed: 2/15/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Continue Sentencing Dateby UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR, CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY. (bm) (Entered: 02/16/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2141 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Presentence Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to KEVIN L. GRAY. (hsj, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2140 Filed: 2/14/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Defendant Gray's Objection to the Presentence Report by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to KEVIN L. GRAY. (hsj, ) (Entered: 02/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2139 Filed: 2/7/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Continue his sentencing date by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (erd) (Entered: 02/11/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2138 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 2106 U.S.A.'s motion to vacate Order governing extrajudicial statements as to LARRY WILKERSON (15).Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 12/15/04. (mlp, ) (Entered: 02/07/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2137 Filed: 12/15/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 2121 Motion join in Defendant LARRY WILKERSON'S Opposition to the as to JAMES W. ALFRED (19).Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/15/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 02/03/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2136 Filed: 1/26/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Change of Address by Francis Darron Carter: New Address: Zuckerman Spaeder, LLP, 1201 Connecticut Avenue, N.W., Twelfth Floor, Washington, D.C. 20036-2638, Telephone No. (202) 778-1856. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/27/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2135 Filed: 12/13/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 2107 Motion for Order for an order of approval of his outstanding motions as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1). The government has until 12/7/04 within which to file its response to defendants' outstanding pretrial motions, nunc pro tunc.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/10/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2134 Filed: 1/18/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION (Third) for an extension of time in which to file defendant's post-trial motions by LARRY WILKERSON. (tb) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2133 Filed: 1/19/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Adopt Certain Post-Trial Motions filed by Co-defendants by KENNETH SIMMONS. (bm) (Entered: 01/26/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2132 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 2124 defendant's motion to modify conditions of confinement as to KEVIN L. GRAY (1). Defendant is allowed telephone access (between 12/24/04 and 1/1/05) to his family members. (See Order for specific guidelines)Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/9/04. (mlp, ) (Entered: 01/18/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2131 Filed: 1/11/2005, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by JAMES W. ALFRED. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/15/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2130 Filed: 12/1/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to BRYAN BOSTICK (9), Count(s) 1, 1rrs, 21, 22, 3rrs, 41rrs, 42rrs, 43rrs, 44rrs, 48, 81rrs, 82rrs, Dismissed on motion of the U.S.A.; Count(s) 12s, Dismissed upon order of the Court.; Count(s) 1ss, Sentenced to One Hundred Eighty (180) months incarceration; this sentence is to run concurrently with any other sentence being served. Five (5) years supervised release is to run concurrently with supervised release imposed in CR 98-264. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 12/1/04. (hsj, ) (Entered: 01/10/2005)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2129 Filed: 12/20/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION (second) for a New Trial, newly discovered evidence of Brady violations by TIMOTHY P. HANDY, JR; Exhibits 31. (erd) (Entered: 12/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2128 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 2111 UNOPPOSED MOTION to continue sentencing as to JERMAINE VICK (4); sentencing set for 4/28/05 at 9:30 AM.Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 11/24/04. (erd) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2127 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SECOND MOTION for Extension of Time in which to file post-trial motions by LARRY WILKERSON. (erd) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2126 Filed: 12/17/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by DEON OLIVER. (erd) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2125 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION or leave to adopt and conform his co-defendant's objections to the presentence investigation report and Mr. McGill's additional objections to the by KEVIN B. MCGILL; Attachment. (Defendant in criminal case number 02-45) (erd) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2124 Filed: 11/29/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Modify conditions of confinement by KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 12/21/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2123 Filed: 12/10/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CONSENT MOTION by defendant KEITH B. MCGILL for enlargement of time within which to file motion for judgment of acquittal or, in the alternative, for a new trial. (mlp, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2122 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to defendant's posttrial motions as to RODNEY L. MOORE, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, KEVIN L. GRAY, TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR., CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR; Attachments 8. (erd) (Entered: 12/09/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2121 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION join in Defendant LARRY WILKERSON'S Opposition to the Government's Motion to vacate order governing extra judicial statements by JAMES W. ALFRED. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2120 Filed: 12/3/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to join in Defendant LARRY WILKERSON'S Opposition to the Government's Moiton to vacate order governing extra judical statements by JAMES W. ALFRED. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2119 Filed: 12/2/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE by KEVIN L. GRAY re Memorandum in Opposition re 2107 MOTION for an order of approval of his outstanding motions. (hsj, ) (Entered: 12/03/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2118 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to adopt defendant Franklin Seegers' opposition to the government's motion to vacate Order governing extrajudicial statements (filed 11/15/04) by LARRY WILKERSON. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2117 Filed: 11/24/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Memorandum in Opposition by LARRY WILKERSON re 2106 U.S.A.'sMOTION to vacate Order governing extrajudicial statements. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2116 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Omnibus Response to Defendants' Post-Trial Motions by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to RODNEY L. MOORE, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, KEVIN L. GRAY, TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR., CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2115 Filed: 11/26/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Opposition by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to RODNEY L. MOORE, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, KEVIN L. GRAY, TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR., CALVIN SMITH, JOHN RAYNOR re 2107 MOTION for an order of approval of his outstanding motions by KEVIN L. GRAY. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/29/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2114 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to adopt and conform 2108 Franklin Seegers' opposition to government's motion to vacate order governing extrajudicial statements by RONALD C. ALFRED. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2113 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to join and adopt in part 2032 Franklin Seegers' omnibus motion for judgment of acquittal, or, in the alternative, motion for a new trial by RONALD C. ALFRED. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2112 Filed: 11/19/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to adopt and conform Calvin Smith's I-Drive Motion 2037 by RONALD C. ALFRED. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2111 Filed: 11/23/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          UNOPPOSED MOTION to continue sentencing by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to JERMAINE VICK. (mlp, ) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2110 Filed: 11/22/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to adopt post-trial motions of codefendants by LIONEL DEWITT NUNN. (erd) (Entered: 11/24/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2109 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 2105 Motion for Extension of Time in which to file post trial motions as to LARRY WILKERSON (15). Postrial motions due on or before 12/24/04. That the government shall file its response to motions on or before 12/5/05, defendant shall file his reply to the government's response on or before 2/14/04; Signed by Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 11/9/04. (erd) (Entered: 11/22/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2108 Filed: 11/15/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE by FRANKLIN SEEGERS re 2106 motion to Vacate order governing extra judicial statements. (erd) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2107 Filed: 11/9/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for an order of approval of his outstanding motions by KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 11/16/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2106 Filed: 11/4/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Vacate order governing extra judicial statements by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, RODNEY L. MOORE, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, KEVIN L. GRAY, TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR., LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, KENNETH SIMMONS, JOHN RAYNOR; Attachment. (erd) (Entered: 11/10/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2105 Filed: 11/5/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time in which to file post trial motions by LARRY WILKERSON. (erd) (Entered: 11/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2104 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO VACATE FINDING OF CONTEMPT as to FRANKLIN SEEGERS: upon oral motion of counsel, the Court vacates the 11/12/03, finding of contempt against attorney Jon W. Norris; Mr. Norris was acting as co-counsel on behalf of defendant Franklin Seegers. The Court's earlier ruling was at the transcript for 11/12/03 P.M. session at page 54 and lines 10-20 and the Court docket for 11/12/03. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/22/04. (mlp, ) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2103 Filed: 10/25/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for new trial by KEITH B. MCGILL. (Original docketed in CR 02-45-01-RCL) (mlp, ) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2102 Filed: 10/22/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to DEON OLIVER, FRANKLIN SEEGERS, JAMES W. ALFRED, RONALD C. ALFRED, LIONEL DEWITT NUNN, TIMOTHY P. HANDY JR., LARRY WILKERSON, CALVIN SMITH, WILFORD OLIVER, KENNETH SIMMONS, ROY JOHNSON, DERRICK MOORE, BRYAN BOSTICK, DENNIS ROBINSON, FRANK HOWARD, OMAR WAZIR, JOHN RAYNOR, JERMAINE VICK, MAURICE ANDREWS, RODNEY L. MOORE, KEVIN L. GRAY: granting defendant KEITH B. MCGILL's motion for a supplemental enlargement of time within which to complete the filing of a motion for a new trial; the motion is due by 11/11/04. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth on 10/21/04. (Original Order filed in CR 02-045-01-RCL) (mlp, ) (Entered: 10/26/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2101 Filed: 10/18/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA to defendant Gray's opposition to govenment's request for scheduled proceeding to permit victim to address the Court as to KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 10/20/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2100 Filed: 9/16/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to adopt post-trial motions of codefendants by CALVIN SMITH. (erd) (Entered: 10/15/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2099 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to adopt and conform Kevin Gray's Motion for New Trial by JOHN RAYNOR. (hsj, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2098 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to adopt and conform Calvin Smith's Motion to comple review of Federal Bureau of Investigation I-Drive files for Brady and Giglio Information and Motion to Preserve Case Materials by JOHN RAYNOR. (hsj, ) (Entered: 10/13/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2097 Filed: 10/8/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for leave to adopt and join in Mr. Gray's Third Motion for New Trial or in the alternative for Dismissal of Counts: Newly discovered evidence from a Brady Violation by CALVIN SMITH. (hsj, ) (Entered: 10/12/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2096 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to LARRY WILKERSON: granting defendant's oral motion to extend time for filing of post-verdict motions by sixty days. Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth for Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/22/04. (mlp, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2095 Filed: 9/23/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 2045 defendan'ts motion for leave of Court to speak with members of the jury, or with alternate jurors, after their discharge as to LARRY WILKERSON (15).Signed by Judge Royce C. Lamberth for Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan on 9/22/04. (mlp, ) (Entered: 10/08/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2094 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/30/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2093 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/25/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2092 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/21/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2091 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/24/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2090 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/11/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2089 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/10/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2088 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/9/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2087 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/5/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2086 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/4/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2085 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/3/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2084 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/2/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2083 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/28/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2082 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/27/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2081 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/26/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2080 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/21/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2079 Filed: 10/5/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/20/04 Court Reporter: Miller Reporting Co., Jacqueline Wood. (erd) (Entered: 10/06/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2078 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 9/15/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2077 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 9/8/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2076 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 9/7/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2075 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/31/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2074 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/29/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2073 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/27/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2072 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/26/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2071 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/25/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2070 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/24/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2069 Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to adopt and conform Calvin Smith's motion to compel review of Federal Bureau of investigation I-Drive files for Brady and Giglio information and motio to preserve case materials by KEVIN L. GRAY. (erd) (Entered: 10/04/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2068 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/23/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2067 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/13/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2066 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/11/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2065 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/10/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2064 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/9/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2063 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/5/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2062 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/3/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2061 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/2/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2060 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 8/4/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 10/01/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2059 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/28/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2058 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/27/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2057 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/26/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2056 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/21/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2055 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/20/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2054 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/19/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2053 Filed: 9/29/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to LARRY WILKERSON before Chief Judge Thomas F. Hogan held on 7/16/04 Court Reporter: Cathryn Jones. (erd) (Entered: 09/30/2004)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 741 times.