Uniloc USA, Inc. et al v. Altera Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00807
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated September 20, 2016 at 6:11 PM DT (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

v.
No Logo Altera Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams, Morgan & Amerson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian K Buss +1 713 934 4087 +1 713 934 7011 bbuss@wmalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaison Chorikavumkal John +1 713 934 4060 +1 713 934 7011 jjohn@wmalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Wynne Morehan +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 dmorehan@wmalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Danny L. Williams +1 713 934 7000 +1 713 934 7011 dwilliams@wmalaw.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. All claims by pltfs against deft are dismissed with prejudice; deft's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall each bear their own attys' fees, expenses and costs. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-styled cases shall be consolidated for pretrial issues only, with the exception of venue. The earliest filed civil action 6:12cv806 shall serve as the lead case for consolidated issues. The Clerk shall add the consolidated defendants to the lead case, as well as Lead and Local Counsel only. Any other counsel who wishes to appear in the lead case shall file a notice of appearance in that case. The individual cases will remain active for venue motions and trial. All motions, other than venue motions, shall be filed in the consolidated lead case. Parties shall submit a single Docket Control, Discovery, ESI, and Protective Order and each of the respective orders shall be filed in the lead case. All parties to the consolidated case are ORDERED to meet-and-confer and submit uniform Docket Control, Protective, and Discovery Orders which will govern the consolidated case, regardless of whether the same have previously been entered in individual actions. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 02/01/13. cc:attys 2-04-13(mll, ) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to 17 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim of Defendant Altera Corporation filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
              DEFENDANT ALTERA CORPORATIONS ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Altera Corporation.(Williams, Danny) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Complaint by Altera Corporation. (John, Jaison) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian K Buss on behalf of Altera Corporation (Buss, Brian) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Wynne Morehan on behalf of Altera Corporation (Morehan, David) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaison Chorikavumkal John on behalf of Altera Corporation (John, Jaison) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Danny Lloyd Williams on behalf of Altera Corporation (Williams, Danny) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                            Return of Service Executed as to Altera Corporation on 11/1/2012, by service on Texas Secretary of State; answer due: 11/22/2012. (mll, ) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Decker A Cammack on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Altera Corporation and emailed to pltf for service. (klb) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Uniloc Corporation Pty. Limited. for Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT against Altera Corporation ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3847430.), filed by Uniloc USA, Inc., Uniloc Luxembourg S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 5,579,222)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 549 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?