Johnson v. School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-02950-MSK-MEH

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 25, 2016 at 12:07 PM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Lisa M. Johnson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colorado Education Association

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bradley Charles Bartels +1 303 837 1500 +1 303 861 2039 bbartels@coloradoea.org
Space Sharyn E. Dreyer +1 303 837 1500 +1 303 861 2039 sdreyer@coloradoea.org
v.
No Logo Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, Defendant
No Logo School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Semple, Farrington & Everall, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Brent Case +1 303 595 0941 +1 303 861 9608 bcase@smmpc.com
Space Mary Barham Gray +1 303 595 0941 +1 303 861 9608 mgray@smmpc.com
Space Holly Eileen Ortiz +1 303 595 0941 +1 303 861 9608 hortiz@smmpc.com
No Logo Susan Greene, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Levine Sullivan Koch & Schulz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas B. Kelley +1 303 376 2400 +1 303 376 2401 tkelley@lskslaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (105) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 90 Motion for Sanctions. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/13/2014.(klyon, ) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/12/2014, Entered: None
    BRIEF in Support of 93 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Information and Documents Sought in Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-Vaughn deposition, # 2 Exhibit 2-Plaintiff's 1st set of discovery, # 3 Exhibit 3-Defendants discovery resp, # 4 Exhibit 4-Bamberger deposition, # 5 Exhibit 5-Dieter deposition, # 6 Exhibit 6-Watson deposition, # 7 Exhibit 7-Muller deposition, # 8 Exhibit 8-Bansch-Schott deposition, # 9 Exhibit 9-Hurrieta deposition, # 10 Exhibit 10-B. Ellis email, # 11 Exhibit 11-Greene declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12-DPS witness list)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 03/12/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None
      BRIEF in Support of 90 MOTION for Sanctions For Defendants' Failure to Make Timely Identification of Witnesses filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 100 Filed: 2/25/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 80 Motion to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served upon Non-Party Witness Susan Greene and for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/25/2014. (mehcd) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None
          RESPONSE to 93 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Information and Documents Sought in Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N)(Gray, Mary) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Summary Judgment. Extension granted up to and including March 14, 2014. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/24/14. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/22/2014, Entered: None
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 02/22/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/14/2014, Entered: None
                REPLY to Response to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order filed by Movant Susan Greene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11 (Closing Argument [DPS], In re Johnson TA, 2008-0011), # 2 Exhibit 12 (Recommended Decision, In re Johnson, TA, 2008-0011), # 3 Exhibit 13 (Excerpts from Johnson Dep.), # 4 Exhibit 14 (Meyer, Panel OKs Teacher Bill, Denver Post, May 7, 2010), # 5 Exhibit 15 (Donohue v. Hoey, No. 97-M-2959 (D. Colo. Aug. 7, 2002)), # 6 Exhibit 16 (Excerpts from Vaughn Dep.), # 7 Exhibit 17 (Excerpts from Muller Dep.), # 8 Exhibit 18 (Broker's Choice v. NBC, No. 09-cv-717 (D. Colo. Jan. 7, 2010) Order and Tr.), # 9 Exhibit 19 (Broker's Choice v. NBC (D. Colo. Jan. 11, 2011)))(Kelley, Thomas) (Entered: 02/14/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                  RESPONSE to 90 MOTION for Sanctions For Defendants' Failure to Make Timely Identification of Witnesses filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Gray, Mary) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMORANDUM regarding 93 MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Information and Documents Sought in Plaintiff's Discovery Requests filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/3/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Compel Defendants to Produce Information and Documents Sought in Plaintiff's Discovery Requests by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Brief in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MEMORANDUM regarding 90 MOTION for Sanctions For Defendants' Failure to Make Timely Identification of Witnesses filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/30/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/28/2014, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Sanctions For Defendants' Failure to Make Timely Identification of Witnesses by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/28/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER granting 87 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Reply in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena Served upon Susan Greene. Ms.Greene may file a reply in support of the pending motion to quash on or before February 14, 2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/24/2014.(klyon, ) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MEMORANDUM regarding 87 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order filed by Susan Greene. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/24/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 1/22/2014, Entered: None
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order by Movant Susan Greene. (Kelley, Thomas) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTE ORDER granting 83 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond in Opposition to Motion to Quash Subpoena. Plaintiff shall file a response to the pending motion to quash on or before 1/21/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/21/2014.(klyon, ) (Entered: 01/22/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 83 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/21/14. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 80 MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order filed by Susan Greene. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/30/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of SUSAN GREENE regarding MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order 80 by Movant Susan Greene. (Attachments: # 1 (Soc'y of Prof. Journalists - Code of Ethics))(Kelley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 12/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Quash Subpoena Duces Tecum Served on Non-Party Witness and for Protective Order by Movant Susan Greene. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Notice of Deposition & Subpoena Duces Tecum), # 2 Exhibit 2 (article - S. Greene- Tenure War Lacks Clear Way Out), # 3 Exhibit 3 (Denver Post Commentary - S. Dreyer), # 4 Exhibit 4 (12-4-13 Email from S. Dreyer), # 5 Exhibit 5 (12-9-13 Email from T. Kelley), # 6 Exhibit 6 (12-9-13 Email from S. Dreyer w attachments)), # 7 Exhibit 7 (12-11-13 Email from S. Dreyer), # 8 Exhibit 8 (12-13-13 Email from T. Kelley), # 9 Exhibit 9 (12-16-13 Email from S. Dreyer), # 10 Exhibit 10 (DPS Bd of Educ Org Chart))(Kelley, Thomas) (Entered: 12/27/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to Response to 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    ORDER granting 77 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion for Reconsideration. Extension granted up to and including December 2, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/5/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 11/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 72 MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 11/05/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                        RESPONSE to 70 MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, and Alteration/Amendment of Judgment Dismissing Her Due Process and Breach of Contract Claims< filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 73 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/30/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2013.(klyon, ) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 73 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/18/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to of Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER denying 70 Motion for Reconsideration for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.1.A. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/11/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 10/11/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/8/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, and Alteration/Amendment of Judgment Dismissing Her Due Process and Breach of Contract Claims by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 10/08/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER denying 68 Motion for Reconsideration for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1.A. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/3/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 10/03/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION for Reconsideration re 65 Order on Report and Recommendations,,, Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          Defendant's ANSWER to 66 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado.(Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 10/02/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Second AMENDED COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, filed by Lisa M. Johnson.(klyon, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              Opinion and ORDER adopting the Recommendation In Part and Granting In Part and Denying In Part Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Court DECLINES to adopt the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (# 37 ) in its entirety. The Defendants Motion to Dismiss (# 21 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court DECLINES to adopt the Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge (# 54 ) and the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint (# 40 ) is GRANTED. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/23/2013.(klyon, ) (Entered: 09/25/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                RESPONSE to Objection to 54 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint filed by Lisa M. Johnson filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 61 Plaintiff's Motion for Extensions of Disclosure, Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/4/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 12/4/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 7/3/2013.(klyon, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 7/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 61 First MOTION for Extension of Time to of Disclosure, Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/3/2013. Text Only Entry. (klyon, ) (Entered: 07/03/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 7/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                      First MOTION for Extension of Time to of Disclosure, Discovery and Dispositive Motions Deadlines by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 07/02/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        ORDER granting 59 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Extension granted up to and including July 5, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 6/26/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 54 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint filed by Lisa M. Johnson by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 06/26/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            OBJECTION to 54 Report and Recommendations and Response to Defendants' Objections to May 16, 2013 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 06/13/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/29/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              OBJECTION to 54 Report and Recommendations dated May 16, 2013 filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 05/29/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                ORDER granting 55 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Written Objections and for Reconsideration of Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Extension granted up to and including June 14, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/24/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Written Objections and for Reconsideration of Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 40 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint filed by Lisa M. Johnson be granted in part and denied in part. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/16/2013. (klyon, ) (Entered: 05/17/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part 51 Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/16/2013.(klyon, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM regarding 51 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/16/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/16/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Expert Witness Disclosure Deadlines by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 05/15/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 50 Filed: 5/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of her Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Court will consider the amended Exhibit 2 in its consideration of the pending motion to amend. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/2013. (mehcd)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 50 Filed: 5/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER granting 47 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of her Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The Court will consider the amended Exhibit 2 in its consideration of the pending motion to amend. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/13/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 05/14/2013)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Objection to 37 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Col filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/13/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM regarding 47 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of her Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 46 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/13/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 05/13/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amended Reply in Support of her Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 46 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 05/06/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 44 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Recommendation of U.S. Magistrate Judge. Extension granted up to and including May 13, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/26/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 04/26/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/23/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 37 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE re 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Col by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 04/23/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 04/22/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              OBJECTION to 37 Report and Recommendations of United States Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 40 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/3/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify 13 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 04/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 38 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections. Extension granted up to and including April 15, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/29/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Objections to Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE that 21 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint be granted, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 3/18/2013. (mehcd) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 3/4/13. (msksec, ) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/26/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 9/26/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/25/2013. (klyon, ) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2013. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-501. (mehcd) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER granting 30 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Motion for Extension of Time. The Defendants shall file a reply brief in support of their motion to dismiss on or before February 28, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/11/13. (kfinn, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM regarding 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to filed by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 2/11/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time to by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gray, Mary) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Proposed Scheduling Order Corrected by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition to 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM regarding 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/15/13. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint. Extension granted up to and including January 28, 2013. by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/3/13. Text Only Entry(msksec, ) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 21 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      BRIEF in Support of 21 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 12/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Plaintiff's Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/25/2013 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/14/2012. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM regarding 18 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by Lisa M. Johnson. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/14/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 12/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER REGARDING CUSTODY OF EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITIONS USED IN EVIDENTIARY HEARINGS AND TRIALS: Any exhibits and depositions used during evidentiary hearings or trials, counsel for the parties shall retrieve the originals of such exhibits and depositions from the Court following the evidentiary hearing or trial, and shall retain same for 60 days beyond the later of the time to appeal or conclusion of any appellate proceedings. The Court will retain its copy of the exhibits for the same time period after which the documents will be destroyed. by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/11/12. Text Only Entry (mskcd) (Entered: 12/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/7/2012. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 15 Filed: 12/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2012. (mehcd) (Entered: 12/06/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM regarding 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 12/5/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT PLAINTIFF'S AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Lisa M. Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND)(Dreyer, Sharyn) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to:(1)Convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling Order, and resolve discovery matters;(2)ADR: Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding;(3)Hear and determine referred matters in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B). by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 11/30/12. Text Only Entry (msksec, ) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF in Support of 10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado. (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly Eileen Ortiz on behalf of Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado (Ortiz, Holly) (Entered: 11/29/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re 4 Complaint by Defendants Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, Plaintiff Lisa M. Johnson. (Gray, Mary) Modified on 11/16/2012 to correct text (klyon, ). (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to 6 Memorandum Returning Case. This case is reassigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. All future pleadings should be designated as 12-cv-02950-MSK-MEH. Text Only Entry (sgrim) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE for reassignment by Judge John L. Kane. (sgrim) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued. (ccovi, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Board of Education of School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, School District No. 1 in the County of Denver and State of Colorado, filed by Lisa M. Johnson. (ccovi, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Case assigned to Judge John L. Kane and drawn to Magistrate Judge Micheal E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (ccovi, ) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE State Court Docket Sheet by Defendants School District No. 1 in the City and County of Denver, School District No. 1, Board of Education (Gray, Mary) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 15 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/6/2012. (mehcd)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF REMOVAL by School District No. 1, Board of Education, School District No. 1 in the City and County of Denver from Denver District Court, Case Number 2012CV6363. (Filing fee $ 350, Receipt Number 1082-3102804), filed by School District No. 1, Board of Education, School District No. 1 in the City and County of Denver. (Attachments: # 1 State Court Complaint, # 2 State Court Summons DPS, # 3 State Court Summons BOE, # 4 State Court Entry of Appearance (Case), # 5 State Court Entry of Appearance (Gray), # 6 State Court Delay Reduction Order, # 7 State Court Notice to Elect Exclusion from 16.1, # 8 State Court Civil Coversheet, # 9 Civil Cover Sheet, # 10 Supplemental civil Cover Sheet)(Case, Michael) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 56 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?