United States of America et al v. Cleveland Clinic Foundation et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:07-cv-02786-SO
District Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 14, 2016 at 9:34 AM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Attorney General Of The United States, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "United States Attorney"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L. Bickett +1 330 761 0523 +1 330 375 5561 james.bickett@usdoj.gov
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo William Victor O'Boyle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Abu N. Syed, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Aristrocrat Berea Nursing Home, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Avtar Saran, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Bill Weisburg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Boras Royak, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Braeview Manor, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Canton Health Care, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Carrington Park, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Cityview Manor, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
The Cleveland Clinic Foundation The Cleveland Clinic Foundation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Cleveland Clinic Foundation"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Cleveland Rehab and Special Care Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo CommuniCare Health Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Denton Wyse, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Douglas McLaughlin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Franklin Plaza Extended Care, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Greenbrier Senior Living Community, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Gregory Hall, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Jung El Mallawany, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lakewood Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Laurelwood Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lutheran Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo M. Dayem, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo M.T. Sheth, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Manuel Gordillo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Marc Horowitz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
Marymount Hospital, Inc. Marymount Hospital, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Marymount Hospital"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Meridian Huron Road Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Northwestern Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Patrician Skilled Nursing Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Patrick Enders, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rae Ann Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rakesh Ranjan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Robert Smitley, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rosa Rosales So, MD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Rudwick Manor Special Care Center, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Saber Health Care Group, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Samuel A. Nigro, MD, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Saroj Brar, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo St. Vincent Charity Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Todd Gates, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
University Hospitals University Hospitals, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo University Manor Health Care Center, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Upma Dingrha, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
No Logo Windsor Hospital, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven J. Paffilas +1 216 622 3698 +1 216 522 2404 steven.paffilas@usdoj.gov
Office Cleveland
Filed 9/14/2007
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
Cause Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729 False Claims Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Plaintiff
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Cuyahoga
Terminated 3/2/2009
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Defendant Custody Status
Flags Cat12,Perelman,Termed
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/2/2009, Entered: 3/2/2009 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
Order of Case Dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 3/2/2009. (D,M)
    LREF
    Blank  Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
    Order [non-document] granting Motion to withdraw as attorney, Attorney Richard R. Renner removed from case. (Related Doc # [11]). Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 3/2/2009. (D,M)
      LREF
      Blank  Telephone Conference
      Minutes of proceedings [non-document] before Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr.Telephone Conference held on 2/24/2009. Order to follow. Time: 30 minutes. (D,M)
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2009, Entered: 2/19/2009, Terminated: 2/19/2009 Motion to attend by telephone
        Motion to attend February 24, 2009, Pretrial Conference by telephone filed by Plaintiff William Victor O'Boyle. (Renner, Richard)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank  Order on Motion to attend by telephone
          Order [non-document] granting Attorney Richard Renner's Motion to attend by telephone (Related Doc # [12]). Mr. O'Boyle may attend the pretrial conference by telephone as well. The Court instructs Attorney Renner to contact Mr. O'Boyle to inform him of the change and is further instructed to supply the Court with a phone number for Mr. O'Boyle, prior to the hearing. The Court will initiate the call. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 2/19/09. (B,IE)
            LREF
            Blank  Notice of Hearing or Conference
            Notice of [non-document] Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2009, at 10:00 AM in Chambers 17A before Judge Solomon Oliver Jr. Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel are required to appear to discuss Motion to for Leave to Withdraw and to discuss the lack of progress in case. (D,M)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: 2/9/2009, Terminated: 3/2/2009 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
              Motion (sealed) by Attorney Richard Renner to withdraw as counsel for Plaintiff. (D,M)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/4/2009, Entered: 2/5/2009 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                Motion for a 6 week extension of time to complete service of complaint and summons filed by Plaintiff William Victor O'Boyle. (B,B)(Document filed under seal)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank  Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines
                  Order [non-document] granting [8] in part Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 60 days to for the purpose of completing service of the complaint and summons in this matter. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 11/26/2008. (D,M)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/21/2008, Entered: 11/21/2008 Notice of Magistrate Consent form
                    Notice of Magistrate Consent form. (D,M)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2008, Entered: 11/20/2008, Terminated: 11/26/2008 Motion for Extension of Time - Other
                      Motion for extension of Time to Serve Complaint and Summons until March 11, 2009 filed by Plaintiff William Victor O'Boyle. (Renner, Richard)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008, Terminated: 9/4/2008 Sealed Motion +
                        SEALED Motion filed by Plaintiff William Victor O'Boyle for Extension of Time. (D,M)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank  Order on Sealed Motion +
                          Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's [7] Sealed Motion for Extension of Time Until 12/11/2008, to complete service. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 9/4/2008.(D,M)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008 Notice
                            Notice of declination of appearance of the United States filed by United States of America. (E,P) (LC,S).
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007 Complaint
                              Complaint with jury demand against all defendants ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 54660001103). Filed by William Victor O'Boyle. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(B,IE)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 76 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?