Unknown
Criminal Case Nevada District Court, Case No. 2:89-cr-00253
District Judge Designated Philip M. Pro, presiding

Tags
Last Updated October 6, 2016 at 11:18 PM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DANIEL J. BOLES, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: CJA Appointment Theodore J. Manos +1 702 596 7209 +1 910 278 5312 tedjmanos@aol.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2004, Entered: None
JUDGMENT RELEASE OF ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT re D/Boles (Entered: 02/13/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/13/2004, Entered: None
    TRAVERSE no text (Entered: 02/13/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/1989, Entered: None
      INDICTMENT no text (Entered: 02/13/2004)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

        Space Space

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 72 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?