Pragmatus Telecom LLC v. RightNow Technologies Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00095
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 29, 2016 at 2:26 AM DT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com

Represented by Farnan LLP

No Logo Sirius Xm Radio Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo Sirius Xm Radio Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Connolly Bove Lodge & Hutz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith A. Walter, Jr. +1 302 252 4258 +1 302 658 5614 kwalter@cblh.com
No Logo Pragmatus Telecom, LLC, Counter-Defendant
No Logo Rightnow Technologies, Inc., Third Party Defendant

Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

No Logo Sirius Xm Radio Inc., Third Party Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kramer Levin Naftalis & Frankel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Anthony Baghdassarian +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 mbaghdassarian@kramerlevin.com
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan S. Caplan +1 212 715 9100 +1 212 715 8000 jcaplan@kramerlevin.com
TERMINATED: 09/11/2012, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Mark Frankel +1 212 715 7793 +1 212 715 8000 afrankel@kramerlevin.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2012, Entered: None
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum Order)(nms) (Entered: 09/21/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
    Letter to U.S. Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon from Denise S. Kraft regarding Third-Party Complaint against RightNow Technologies, Inc. n/k/a Oracle America, Inc. has been dismissed. Mediation scheduled for September 25 should be cancelled. - re 34 Order. (Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
      MEMORANDUM ORDER Granting 15 MOTION to Dismiss Third Party Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/11/2012. (nms) Modified on 9/21/2012 (nms). (Entered: 09/11/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER Granting 32 STIPULATION to Extend Certain Dates in the Scheduling Order, filed by RightNow Technologies Inc. (Reset Deadlines/Hearings: All Discovery due by 12/19/2012, Dispositive Motions due by 1/29/2013, A two day Jury Trial is set to commence on 8/5/2013, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews, A Pretrial Conference is set for 7/26/2013, at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 7/30/2012. (nms) (Entered: 07/31/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/30/2012, Entered: None
          STIPULATION TO EXTEND Certain Dates in the Scheduling Order by Approximately Two Months - filed by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Kraft, Denise) (Main Document 32 replaced on 7/30/2012) (nms). Modified on 7/30/2012 (nms). (Entered: 07/30/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER Setting Mediation Conferences: A Mediation Conference is set for 8/15/2012 at 11:30 AM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 7/9/2012. (lih) (Entered: 07/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Appearance by Brian A. Biggs on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Biggs, Brian) (Entered: 06/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Jonathan S. Caplan, Mark A. Baghdassarian, and Aaron M. Frankel - filed by Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (Walter, Keith) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: None
                  MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Nate McKitterick - filed by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Counsel, # 2 Text of Proposed Order, # 3 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 06/08/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF SERVICE of Oracle America, Inc.'s, as Successor-in-Interest to Third-Party Defendant RightNow Technologies, Inc., Initial Disclosure Pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF SERVICE of Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Sirius XM Radio Inc..(Walter, Keith) (Entered: 06/04/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER Setting Teleconference (Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate the call ): A Telephone Conference is set for 6/12/2012 at 02:00 PM before Judge Sherry R. Fallon to discuss ADR. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 5/31/2012. (lih) (Entered: 05/31/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Case referred to the Magistrate Judge for the purpose of exploring ADR. Joinder of Parties due by 8/31/2012. Amended Pleadings due by 8/31/2012. All Discovery due by 10/19/2012. Dispositive Motions due by 11/28/2012. Answering Brief due 12/12/2012. Reply Brief due 12/19/2012. A Pretrial Conference is set for 2/28/2013, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. A 2 day Jury Trial is set to commence on 3/14/2013, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/29/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/30/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                            REPLY BRIEF re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint Pursuant to 12 (b)(1), filed by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 5/25/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None
                              Joint PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling Order by RightNow Technologies Inc., Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (Walter, Keith) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                REQUEST for Oral Argument by Sirius XM Radio Inc. re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint. (Walter, Keith) Modified on 5/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/14/2012, Entered: None
                                  ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint, filed by Sirius XM Radio Inc..Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 5/24/2012. (Walter, Keith) Modified on 5/14/2012 (nms). (Entered: 05/14/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    Order Setting Rule 16(b) Conference: A Scheduling Conference is set for 5/29/2012, at 4:15 PM in Chambers before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 5/8/2012. (nms) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                      Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by RightNow Technologies Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Oracle Corporation, Other Affiliate Oracle America, Inc. for RightNow Technologies Inc... (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                        DECLARATION of Peter O'Rourke re 16 Opening Brief in Support, Motion To Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint Pursuant to 12(b)(1), by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 4/30/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None
                                          OPENING BRIEF in Support re 15 MOTION To Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint, filed by RightNow Technologies Inc..Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 5/14/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 4/30/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                            MOTION to Dismiss Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint Pursuant to 12(b)(1) - filed by RightNow Technologies Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) Modified on 4/30/2012 (nms). (Entered: 04/27/2012)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              SO ORDERED Granting 13 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC, Sirius XM Radio Inc. (Sirius XM Radio Inc. terminated). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/11/2012. (nms) (Entered: 04/11/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal of Sirius XM Radio Inc. by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                  STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Third Party Plaintiff Sirius XM Radio Inc.'s Third Party Complaint to April 27, 2012 - filed by RightNow Technologies Inc., Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (Walter, Keith) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Aleine Michelle Porterfield on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Porterfield, Aleine) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/10/2012, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Denise Seastone Kraft on behalf of RightNow Technologies Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Kraft, Denise) (Entered: 04/10/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sirius XM Radio Inc.. RightNow Technologies Inc. served on 3/21/2012, answer due 4/11/2012. (Walter, Keith) (Entered: 03/21/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                          Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1 filed by Sirius XM Radio Inc.. (Walter, Keith) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against RightNow Technologies, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM against Pragmatus Telecom LLC by Sirius XM Radio Inc..(Walter, Keith) (Entered: 03/20/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Andrew G. DiNovo, Adam G. Price, Chester J. Shiu, and James W. Coutu of DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint to 2/23/2012 - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/20/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. Sirius XM Radio Inc. served on 2/1/2012, answer due 2/22/2012. (Farnan, Brian) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,311,231 B1; US 6,668,286 B2; US 7,159,043 B2. (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction (lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        PLAINTIFF'S ORIGINAL COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Sirius XM Radio Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 0311-1013576.) - filed by Pragmatus Telecom LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(lih) (Entered: 01/30/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?