Lodsys Group, LLC v. Burberry Limited et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00750
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 22, 2016 at 11:40 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lodsys Group, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by KELLEY, GOLDFARB, HUCK & ROTH, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael A. Goldfarb +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 goldfarb@kdg-law.com
Space Christopher M. Huck +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 huck@kdg-law.com
Space Kit W Roth +1 206 452 0260 +1 206 397 3062 roth@kdg-law.com

Represented by The Davis Firm, PC-Longview

v.
No Logo Burberry Ltd., Defendant
Officially listed as "Burberry Limited"

Toggle Switch Represented by DLA Piper (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2013 John M. Guaragna +1 512 457 7125 +1 512 457 7001 john.guaragna@dlapiper.com
No Logo Dover Saddlery, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert Tauler

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/14/2013 Richard Edward Young +1 972 419 8300 ryoung@gpm-law.com
No Logo Freescale Semiconductor, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hanna Andersson, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/24/2013 Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER - granting 22 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Dft Hanna Andersson LLC is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/24/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice re 15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Burberry Limited and Dover Saddlery, Inc. terminated.. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/11/2013. (sm, ) (sm, ). (Entered: 01/14/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER granting 19 Notice of Dismissal. Dft Freescale Semiconductor Inc is hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/17/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN CLAIMS re 16 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/11/2013. (sm, ) (Entered: 01/14/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
              Defendant Freescale Semiconductor, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of certain claims by Lodsys Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) Modified on 1/10/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lodsys Group, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Huck, Christopher) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Burberry Limited.( Guaragna, John) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Dover Saddlery, Inc. served on 12/26/2012, answer due 1/28/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Hanna Andersson LLC.(Henry, Claire) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                          Defendant Godiva Chocolatier, Inc.'s Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dover Saddlery, Inc..( Young, Richard) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lodsys Group, LLC. Burberry Limited served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013; Freescale Semiconductor Inc served on 12/20/2012, answer due 1/10/2013; Godiva Chocolatier, Inc. served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013; Hanna Andersson LLC served on 12/19/2012, answer due 1/9/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Hanna Anderson, # 2 Freescale Semiconductor, # 3 Godiva Chocolatier)(ehs, ) (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                                ***FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE.***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Dover Saddlery, Inc..( Young, Richard) Modified on 12/28/2012 (ch, ). (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                  APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Christopher M Huck for Lodsys Group, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 02-1317) (bsw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                    APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kit W Roth for Lodsys Group, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 02-1317) (bsw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None
                                      APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Michael A Goldfarb for Lodsys Group, LLC. (APPROVED, FEE PAID 02-1317) (bsw, ) (Entered: 12/18/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Burberry Limited, Dover Saddlery, Inc., Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Hanna Andersson LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Dover Saddlery, # 2 Freescale, # 3 Godiva Chocolatier, # 4 Hanna Anderson)(ehs, ) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                          Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Davis, William) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lodsys Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lodsys Holdings Group, LLC for Lodsys Group, LLC. (Davis, William) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Burberry Limited, Dover Saddlery, Inc., Godiva Chocolatier, Inc., Hanna Andersson LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3899790.), filed by Lodsys Group, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,620,565, # 2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,222,078, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Davis, William) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 527 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?