District Appellate Supreme
Federal
New York Eastern District Court Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit United States Supreme Court

USA v. HSBC Bank USA, N.A. et al
Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cr-00763-AMD

Tags

Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd.

This docket is featured in the May 29, 2018 article Reality Check: Herbalife Nutrition, Ltd..

Last Updated March 9, 2018 at 8:02 PM ST (3.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cahill Gordon & Reindell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anirudh Bansal +1 212 701 3000 +1 212 269 5420 abansal@cahill.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Noel Kelley +1 212 701 3050 +1 212 269 5420 dkelley@cahill.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Samuel W. Seymour +1 212 558 3156 +1 212 558 3588 seymours@sullcrom.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alexander J. Willscher +1 212 558 4104 +1 212 358 9236 willschera@sullcrom.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (129) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Order
ORDER: The Court is in receipt of Mr. Moore's letter dated January 10, 2018, arguing that he should have been consulted before the Court dismissed the case against HSBC. As I explained in my April 10, 2017 Order, Mr. Moore has no standing in the disposition of the criminal case. The case has been dismissed and will not be reinstated. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 1/19/2018. (Winik, Sara)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: 1/18/2018 letterCourt Filing
    Letter dated 1/10/18 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr., interested party to Judge Donnelly re: reopening of this case. (Greene, Donna)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document 97 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
      ORDER Dismissing Information.Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 12/12/2017. (Greene, Donna)
        LREF
        Legal Document 96 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/12/2017 Motion to Dismiss
        First MOTION to Dismiss as Corrected by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Nestor, Julia)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017, Terminated: 12/12/2017 Motion to Dismiss
          First MOTION to Dismiss by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Nestor, Julia)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: 12/12/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Julia Nestor appearing for USA. (Nestor, Julia)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/7/2017, Entered: 12/7/2017, Terminated: 12/7/2017 Motion to withdraw as attorney
              Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by David A. Schulz.by Hubert Dean Moore, Jr as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order) (Schulz, David)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Blank  Order on Motion to withdraw as attorney
                ORDER: The granting David A. Schulz of Ballard Spahr LLP's [93] motion to withdraw as attorney for Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. in this action. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 12/7/2017. (Winik, Sara)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 92 Filed: 9/29/2017, Entered: 9/29/2017 letter
                  Letter Regarding Quarterly Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Nestor, Julia)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: 8/18/2017 Docket Annotation
                    USCA MANDATE - as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. Pursuant to this Court's Opinion issued in docket #s 16-308(L), 16-353, 16-1086, 16-1094 denying the Mandamus Petition in docket #16-2545 on page 19, foot note 2 of the Opinion. Issued: 8/14/17. Please Note: This Mandate was endorsed on USCA Opinion (August Term, 2016) (McGee, Mary Ann)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: 8/3/2017 USCA Mandate
                      MANDATE of USCA (certified copy) as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. It is Ordered that the Orders of the District Court are REVERSED. Issued as Mandate: 8/2/17. USCA #16-308(L), 16-353, 16-1068, 16-1094(CON). (McGee, Mary Ann)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/12/2017, Entered: 7/12/2017 USCA order
                        ORDER of USCA (certified copy) as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC re [79] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, [55] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory, [78] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment, [57] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. It is Ordered that the Orders of the District Court are Reversed. Certified Copy Issued 7/12/17 (Endorsed on USCA Opinion) PLEASE NOTE: THE MANDATE HAS NOT YET BEEN ISSUED. USCA #16-308(L), #16-353, #16-1068 and #16-1094.(Attachments: # (1) USCA Concurring Opinion) (McGee, Mary Ann) Mo
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: 6/30/2017 Status report
                          STATUS REPORT (Quarterly Report) by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Kessler, David)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE David K. Kessler appearing for USA. (Kessler, David)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/10/2017, Entered: 4/10/2017 letterCourt Filing
                              Letter dated 4/4/17 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to Judge Donnelly Re: HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Greene, Donna)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank  Order
                                ORDER: Judge Gleeson determined that Mr. Moore was an interested party in this criminal action for a limited purpose, which was the unsealing of the Monitor's report, and assigned him counsel for that limited purpose. The court is in receipt of an April 4, 2017 letter, filed pro se, in which Mr. Moore lays out various personal grievances against HSBC and its attorneys. Mr. Moore does not have standing in this criminal action to make what appear to be civil complaints against HSBC. Accordingly, the Court will not consider those claims. It also does not appear that Mr. Moore served his letter on opposing counsel. If he did not, he is reminded that he must serve all communications on opposing counsel. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 4/10/2017. (Greene, Donna)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: 3/31/2017 Status report
                                  STATUS REPORT (Quarterly Report) by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Solomon, Alexander)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Blank  Order
                                    ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: Dean Moore, an Interested Party, contacted the Court re filing a motion pro se. Mr. Moore was instructed to contact the Pro Se office and file any motions directly with the Clerk of the Court. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 3/21/2017. (Winik, Sara)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: 12/30/2016 Status report
                                      STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Solomon, Alexander)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 83 Filed: 9/30/2016, Entered: 9/30/2016 letter
                                        Letter Regarding Quarterly Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Nestor, Julia)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016 Status report
                                          STATUS REPORT Quarterly Report by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Solomon, Alexander)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: 5/4/2016 Memorandum/OpinionCourt Filing
                                            MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: HSBC's motion for certification of the January 28, 2016 and March 9, 2016 orders for interlocutory appeal and to seal a portion of the March 9, 2016 order (ECF 73) is DENIED . Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 5/4/2016. (Greene, Donna)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank  Status Conference
                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ann M Donnelly: Telephone Status Conference as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on 4/19/2016. Julia Nestor and Laura Billings for the government; Samuel Seymour, Alexander Willscher, and Judson Littleton for defendants; David Schulz and Max Mishkin for interested party Hubert Dean Moore. Case called. Discussions held. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Zainulbhai, Yasmin)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. Due to a change in the court's calendar, the telephone status conference scheduled to begin at 1:00 p.m. on April 19, 2016 will instead begin at 3:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 4/15/2016. (Zainulbhai, Yasmin)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: 4/12/2016 Notice - other
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                    Third Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC sent to US Court of Appeals [79] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: 4/8/2016, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC re [70] Order,. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0207-8520495. Appeal Record due by 4/22/2016. (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                        Second Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC sent to US Court of Appeals [78] Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: 4/7/2016, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Notice of Appeal -Final Judgment
                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC re [70] Order, (James, David)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 77 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: 4/1/2016 Status report
                                                            STATUS REPORT Quarterly Status Report by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Solomon, Alexander)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: 3/31/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Julia Nestor appearing for USA. (Nestor, Julia)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. As this case has been reassigned to the undersigned, a telephone status conference is scheduled for April 19, 2016 at 1:00 p.m. Defendants' counsel is to organize a conference call, and then phone my chambers with all counsel on the line. Ordered by Judge Ann M Donnelly on 3/31/2016. (Zainulbhai, Yasmin)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on 2-9-2016, before Judge Gleeson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Schwam, Telephone number 718-613-2268. Email address: LisaSchwam@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 4/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/23/2016. (Schwam, Lisa)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank  Order Reassigning Judge
                                                                    ORDER REASSIGNING CASE as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. Reassigned to Judge Ann M Donnelly. Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 3/14/2016. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: 3/11/2016 Response In Opposition
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Blank  Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                        Case as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC Reassigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto. Judge John Gleeson no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016, Terminated: 4/8/2016 motion for leave to appeal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: as set forth in the attached Order, the Monitor's Report and appended United States Country Report shall remain under seal, and the matter is stayed, pending appellate review. I have sent redacted copies of these documents to the Clerk's Office, and I respectfully direct it to file these copies under seal. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 3/9/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                              ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: I have been informed by the Clerk's Office that the parties cannot view sealed documents. Accordingly, the Monitor's Report and United States Country Report shall be filed in such a manner that the government and counsel for HSBC may view them, but counsel for the interested party and the public may not. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 3/9/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: 3/7/2016 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                REDACTION by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Attachments: # (1) Color - Part 1, # (2) Color - Part 2, # (3) Color - Part 3, # (4) Color - Part 4, # (5) Color - Part 5, # (6) Color - Part 6, # (7) Color - Part 7, # (8) Color - Part 8, # (9) Color - Part 9, # (10) Color - Part 10, # (11) Color - Part 11, # (12) Color - Part 12, # (13) Color - Part 13, # (14) Color - Part 14, # (15) Color - Part 15, # (16) Color - Part 16, # (17) Color - Part 17, # (18) Color - Part 18, # (19) Color - Part 19, # (20) Color - Part 20, # (21) Opaque - Full) (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                  ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: when the parties filed their copies of proposed redactions to the Monitor's Report on February 26, 2016, there may have been a brief period of time in which counsel for the interested party, David Schulz, may have had access to those copies. I have been informed by Mr. Schulz that he did not access or view the Monitor's Report within that time period. Further, Mr. Schulz's permissions and access have now been changed on the electronic docketing system such that he can no longer review those copies, or any other documents filed under seal. Additionally, the government informed me through my law clerk that it initially had been unable to file its proposed redactions on the electronic docketing system. I am grateful that the government timely filed its redactions with chambers, but respectfully direct it to file its sealed submissions on the electronic docketing system. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 3/7/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 letter
                                                                                    Letter regarding potential redaction of Monitor's Report filed on behalf of Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Schulz, David)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Blank 66 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 letter
                                                                                      Letter submitting proposed redactions to Monitor's Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Gatta, James)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: 2/26/2016 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE James Donald Gatta appearing for USA. (Gatta, James)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank  Add and Terminate Attorneys
                                                                                          Attorney updated in case as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. Attorney David A Schulz for Hubert Dean Moore, Jr added. (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Defendants represented by Alexander J. Willscher, Esq. and Samuel W. Seymour, Esq.. Interested party Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. present with his attorney David Schulz who was present via telephone. AUSA Daniel S. Silver, AUSA Alexander Solomon and Laura Billings, Esq. appear for the government. Status Conference as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC held on 2/9/2016 regarding the defendants' and the government's request for an extension of time to file the proposed redactions of the monitor reports and to stay this case pending appeal [54], [58]. The Court has granted the extension of time to file the proposed redactions, the new date is now set for 2/26/2016. The Court has given the parties further opportunity to file submissions as to why the Court should or should not stay this case pending appeal. (Court Reporter Lisa Schwam.) (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 64 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated February 8, 2016 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to Judge Gleeson, regarding releasing the Monitor's Report. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/8/2016. (Bensing, Kayla) (Piper, Francine).
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 63 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated February 8, 2016 from Michael Mason-Mahon to Judge Gleeson, regarding releasing the Monitor's Report. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/8/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 62 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated February 7, 2016 from Colvin Brown to Judge Gleeson, regarding releasing the Monitor's Report. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/8/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated February 4, 2016 from Hubert Moore to Judge Gleeson, requesting that the court reject the motion for a stay and maintain the redaction deadline of February 12. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: 2/8/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on 12/20/12, before Judge Gleeson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Marie Foley, Telephone number 718-613-2596. Email address: Marie_Foley@nyed.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (Foley, Marie)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: 2/5/2016 letter
                                                                                                        Letter from Gary M. Osen to the Hon. John Gleeson regarding the Government's Motion for a Stay of the Court's January 28, 2016 Order Pending Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Osen, Gary)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                          First Supplemental Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC sent to US Court of Appeals [57] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                            SECOND NOTICE OF CHANGE in Status Conference date and time as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC due to scheduling conflicts. The Status Conference is now adjourned to Tuesday, February 9, 2016 at 3:00 PM in courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. The Court will email Mr. Hubert Moore a copy of this notice. (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank  Notice of hearing
                                                                                                              NOTICE of ADJOURNMENT of the Status Conference as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC scheduled for this morning (2/5/2016) due to inclement weather. The new Status Conference date is now rescheduled to Friday, February 12, 2016 at 11:30 AM in courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. The Court has already notified Mr. Hubert Moore via telephone of the change in date. (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016 letter
                                                                                                                Letter Requesting Stay of Unsealing Order Pending Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: 2/4/2016, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on January 15, 2016, before Judge Gleeson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charleane M. Heading, Telephone number 718-613-2643. Email address: cheading@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.File redaction request using event "Redaction Request - Transcript" located under "Other Filings - Other Documents". Redaction Request due 2/24/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/3/2016. (Heading, Charleane)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Order
                                                                                                                      ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: the Clerk is respectfully directed to add Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to the docket as an interested party. His contact information is as follows: (484) 678-7026 (cell); dean.moore999@gmail.com (email address); 618 Meadow Drive, West Chester, PA 19380 (mailing address). Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/3/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC : The parties are to appear for a Status Conference scheduled for this Friday, February 5, 2016 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. The Court has notified Mr. Hubert Moore via telephone and he will be present in-person for this conference. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/3/2016. (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank  Electronic Index to Record on Appeal
                                                                                                                          Electronic Index to Record on Appeal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC sent to US Court of Appeals [55] Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (McGee, Mary Ann)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016, Terminated: 8/3/2017 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL (Interlocutory) by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC re [52] Order. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0207-8344737. Appeal Record due by 2/15/2016. (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 letter
                                                                                                                              Letter Requesting Stay Pending Appeal, or in the Alternative Extension of Time to Submit Redactions as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 letter
                                                                                                                                Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Submit Redactions as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 52 Filed: 1/28/2016, Entered: 1/28/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: the motion to unseal the Monitor's Report is granted to the extent set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 1/28/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/20/2016, Entered: 1/20/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated January 15, 2016 from Colvin Brown to Judge Gleeson, advising the court of false and misleading statements to the Hong Kong High Court. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated January 14, 2016 from Michael Mason-Mahon to Judge Gleeson, regarding the request to keep the Monitor's Report under seal. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Defendants represented by Samuel W. Seymour, Esq. and Alexander J. Willscher, Esq.. AUSA Daniel S. Silver, AUSA Laura Billings and AUSA Alexander Solomon appear for the government. Pro Se Movant Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. and his wife present. Oral Argument as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC held on 1/15/2016 regarding the movant's motion to unseal the monitoring reports [42]. The Court's decision is reserved and will be filed via ECF separately. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: I received, through my law clerk, a telephone call from HSBC shareholder Michael Mason-Mahmon, who wishes to file a letter in connection with the [42] application to unseal the Monitor's Report. I have given him permission to send us a letter, and I will upload the letter to the electronic docket when I receive it. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 1/13/2016. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: 1/5/2016 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated December 31, 2015 from Hubert Moore to Judge Gleeson, in response to HSBC and DOJ opposition to unseal the monitor's report. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: 1/4/2016 Status report
                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: 12/28/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated December 23, 2015 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to Judge Gleeson, reviewing the request to keep the Monitor's Report under seal. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: I respectfully direct the government and HSBC to send copies of the [45] and [46] letters in response to the application to unseal the monitor's report to Mr. Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 12/15/2015. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                    Letter in Response to Application to Unseal Monitor's Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                      Letter in Response to Application to Unseal Monitor Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 notice of attorney appearance - USA
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Laura Billings appearing for USA. (Billings, Laura)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 11/30/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated November 24, 2015 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to Judge Gleeson, updating the court of several items that have transpired within the last several days. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: I construe the [42] letter dated 11/3/15 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to be a motion to unseal the Monitor's Report filed under seal on June 1, 2015. His application, along with the application of any other person or entity that seeks access to the report, will be heard on the following schedule: any other application to unseal the Monitor's Report must be filed on or before November 25, 2015; any opposition to the application(s) must be filed on or before December 11, 2015; oral argument is scheduled for January 15, 2016 at 10:00 AM. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 11/6/2015. (Bensing, Kayla)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 42 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 11/3/15 from Hubert Dean Moore, Jr. to Judge Gleeson, writing advising of his current issues with HSBC and the potential impact of Michel Cherkasky's report from earlier this year. (Greene, Donna)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Blank 41 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: 10/1/2015 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE Providing Quarterly Report as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC re [23] Order, (Solomon, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: 7/1/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 39 Filed: 6/5/2015, Entered: 6/5/2015 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated May 25, 2015 from Colvin Brown to Judge Gleeson, advising the court of the circumstances of the situation with HSBC in Hong Kong. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 38 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter in Support of the United States' Motion for Leave to File Monitor's Report Under Seal as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT Monitor's First Annual Follow-up Report (Part II) by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015 1 - Sealed Document CR
                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT Monitor's First Annual Follow-up Report Part I by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 35 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: 6/1/2015, Terminated: 1/28/2016 Motion for Leave to file document
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to File Monitor's Report Under Seal by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit, # (2) Exhibit, # (3) Exhibit, # (4) Exhibit, # (5) Exhibit) (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. The government's request [34] for an extension of time of 30 days to respond to the Court's April 28, 2015 order is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 5/4/2015. (Garcia, Lynda)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. The government's request [34] for an extension of time of 30 days to respond to the Court's April 28, 2015 order is granted. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 5/4/2015. (Garcia, Lynda)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: 5/1/2015 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter Requesting 30 Days to Respond to Court's April 28th Order as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. The government is directed to file with the Court the "First Annual Follow-Up Review Report" referred to in the government's April 1, 2015 report [33]. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 4/28/2015. (Garcia, Lynda)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/1/2015, Entered: 4/1/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS REPORT (Quarterly Report) by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Solomon, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank 32 Filed: 1/2/2015, Entered: 1/2/2015 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                        STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                          STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: 7/1/2014 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 29 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: 4/1/2014 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                              STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/11/2014, Entered: 3/11/2014 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on February 15, 2013, before Judge Gleeson. Court Reporter/Transcriber Charleane M. Heading, Telephone number 718-613-2643. Email address: cheading@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/1/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/9/2014. (Heading, Charleane)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: 12/31/2013 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: 9/30/2013 Status report
                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by USA as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2013, Entered: 7/22/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Regarding Reporting Schedule as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER approving the reporting schedule proposed by the Government as set forth in their [24] letter to the Court. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 7/18/2013. (Kim, Scarlet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: 7/17/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter Regarding Reporting Schedule as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 23 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: 7/1/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER approving the DPA pursuant to the Court's supervisory power and granting the parties' [3] application to place the case in abeyance for five years pursuant to the Speedy Trial Act for the reasons stated in the attached Memorandum and Order. The Court will maintain supervisory power over the implementation of the DPA and directs the government to file quarterly reports with the Court while the case is pending. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 7/1/2013. (Kim, Scarlet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: 6/5/2013 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Advising Court of Monitor Selection as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2013, Entered: 5/30/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC from Marie Kerr to Judge Gleeson, regarding overturning the DPA with HSBC. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/7/2013, Entered: 5/7/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter to Judge John Gleeson as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/8/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated 5/2/13 from Liviu Vogel to Judge Gleeson, requesting that the court consider whether the approval of the proposed non-prosecution agreement should be conditioned upon HSBC's payment of some portion of the criminal forfeiture to the thousands of victims of Iranian terrorism. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: 3/28/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC dated 3/18/13 from Robert Warner to Judge Gleeson, requesting that the court reject the settlement agreement between the DOJ and HSBC. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: 3/25/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC from Berenice Mosca to Judge Gleeson, requesting that the court not approve the inadequate settlement offer. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC: I erred in the docket entry posted a few minutes ago. The parties' application to exclude time under the speedy trial act was granted at today's conference, but the Court has not yet approved or disapproved the proposed agreement disposing of the case. The application for approval of that agreement has been taken under advisement. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 2/15/2013. (Gleeson, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson: Case called. Defendants HSBC Bank USA, NA and HSBC Holdings PLC are represented by David N. Kelley, Esq. and Samuel W. Seymour, Esq. AUSA Daniel S. Silver; AUSA Alexander Solomon; Joseph Markel, Esq.; and Craig M. Timm, Esq. appear of behalf of the government. Status Conference as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. and HSBC Holdings PLC held on 2/15/2013. The Court has agreed to the joint proposed motion for a deferred prosecution in this case. The speedy trial time is excluded until further notice of this Court in light of the proposed deferred prosecution and due to the complexity of this case. (Court Reporter Charleane Heading.) (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: 2/19/2013 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC to Judge Gleeson, adding insight into the dealings at hsbc. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Kelley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/30/2013, Entered: 1/30/2013 Pretrial Memorandum
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM in Support of Deferred Prosecution Agreement as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [10] proposed briefing schedule. The government and defendants shall file separate submissions on January 30, 2013. The next conference date is set for February 15, 2013 at 11:30 AM. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 1/3/2013. (Kim, Scarlet)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/21/2012 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Letter Regarding Proposed Briefing Schedule as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Gleeson:Arraignment as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (1) Count 1-2 and HSBC Holdings PLC (2) Count 3,4 held on 12/20/2012, Status Conference as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on 12/20/2012, Initial Appearance as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC held on 12/20/2012, Plea entered by HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (1) Count 1-2 and HSBC Holdings PLC (2) Count 3,4. by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC Not Guilty to all counts. Order of Speedy Trial, Code XT, Start 12/20/12 - Stop 12/28/12. The court has given the parties until 12/28/12 to submit a joint submission regarding the status and proposed dates of the deferred prosecution agreement. Upon the receival of this submission, a new conference date will be given by the court. AUSA Alexander Solomon, Daniel Silver, Joseph Markel and Craig Timm. Defense Counsel, David Kelley and Samuel Seymour for Defendants. (Court Reporter Marie Foley.) (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 Waiver of IndictmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC before Judge Gleeson on 12/20/12. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: 12/26/2012 information - felony
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INFORMATION as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A. (1) count(s) 1-2, HSBC Holdings PLC (2) count(s) 3, 4. (Piper, Francine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2012, Entered: 12/16/2012 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of Craig M. Timm as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/16/2012, Entered: 12/16/2012 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph K. Markel as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank  Order Reassigning Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER REASSIGNING JUDGE as to HSBC Holdings PLC Reassigned toJudge John Gleeson. Judge I. Leo Glasser no longer assigned to the case.. Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/13/2012. (Davis, Kimberly)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC. The parties are to appear for a Status Conference set for Thursday, December 20, 2012 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6C South before Judge John Gleeson. Ordered by Judge John Gleeson on 12/13/2012. (Lee, Ilene)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: David Noel Kelley appearing for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Kelley, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Anirudh Bansal appearing for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Bansal, Anirudh)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Alexander John Willscher appearing for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Willscher, Alexander)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel Whitney Seymour appearing for HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Seymour, Samuel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter Requesting Filing of Deferred Prosecution Agreement and Order of Excludable Delay as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Attachments: # (1) Information, # (2) Deferred Prosecution Agreement, # (3) Exhibit Statement of Facts, # (4) Exhibit Corporate Monitor) (Silver, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Notice of Related CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Letter dated 12/11/2012 from Alexander A. Solomon and AUSA Daniel Silver to Judges Glasser and Gleeson pursuant to Local Rule 50.3.2 notifying the Court that the above-captioned case ("HSBC") is presumptively related to United States v. Julio Eduardo Chaparro Escobar. et al., No. 10 CR 54 (JG) ("Chaparro"). (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Notice Rule 7(b)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Intent to proceed under FRCrP 7(b) as to HSBC Bank USA, N.A., HSBC Holdings PLC (Attachments: # (1) Criminal Information Sheet) (Marziliano, August)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 5,050 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?