Coach, Inc. et al v. Alice Nails 2, LLC et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Wisconsin Western District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-00221
Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker
Last Updated September 14, 2016 at 6:09 AM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coach Services, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
No Logo Coach, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
v.
No Logo Alice Nails 2, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Gegner Law Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thad Mitchell Gegner +1 715 834 4444 +1 715 834 4343 tgegner@gegnerlaw.com
No Logo Does 1-100, Defendant
No Logo Thuha Thi Pham, Defendant
Other Parties
No Logo Alice Nails 2, LLC, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Thuha Thi Pham, Cross-Claimant
No Logo Does 1-100, Cross Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker for all proceedings and entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge William M. Conley on 8/6/2012. (llj) (Entered: 08/08/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
Pretrial Conference Order - Amendments to Pleadings due 9/14/2012. Dispositive Motions due 3/11/2013. Settlement Letters due 7/3/2013. Motions in Limine due 7/12/2013. Response to Motion due 7/26/2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/7/2013 at 03:00 PM. Jury Selection and Trial set for 8/12/2013 at 09:00 AM.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/3/12. (rep) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Gegner, Thad) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
Disregard. Refiled as 13 . Modified on 8/3/2012 (jaf). (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/2/2012, Entered: None
Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 08/02/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/21/2012, Entered: None
ANSWER, CROSSCLAIM against Does 1-100 by Defendants Alice Nails 2, LLC, Thuha Thi Pham. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter) (Gegner, Thad) Modified on 6/22/2012 (jaf). (Entered: 06/21/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Defendant Alice Nails 2, LLC. Alice Nails 2, LLC waiver sent on 4/25/2012, answer due 6/25/2012. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/15/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: None
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (llj) (Entered: 04/17/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None
Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark (Attachments: # 1 Additional Trademarks) (Cole, Donald) Modified on 4/17/2012 (llj). (Entered: 04/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
Summons Issued as to Alice Nails 2, LLC, (Main Document); Thuha Thi Pham. (Attachments: # 1 Summons-Pham) (llj) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
Action Requested: Completion and electronic filing of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (llj) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
Notice of Appearance filed by Donald A. Cole for Plaintiffs Coach Services, Inc., Coach, Inc. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Coach Services, Inc. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Coach, Inc. (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against Alice Nails 2, LLC, Thuha Thi Pham (filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0758-957869) filed by Coach, Inc., Coach Services, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons as to Defendant Alice Nails 2, LLC, # 3 Summons as to Defendant Pham) (Cole, Donald) Modified on 3/29/2012 (llj). (Entered: 03/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 60 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?