USA v. TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:12-cr-00808-SRC

Tags
Last Updated March 28, 2021 at 4:16 PM DT (3.7 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHRISTOPHER J. KELLY +1 973 645 2700 christopher.kelly2@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo TIGER ASIA MANAGEMENT, LLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC"

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1)
Office Newark
Filed 12/12/2012
County Essex
Terminated 12/12/2012
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 FRAUD BY WIRE, RADIO, OR TELEVISION dof 12/2008-1/2009
Defendant Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/14/2012, Entered: 12/14/2012 OrderCourt Filing
CONSENT JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF FORFEITURE as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/12/12. (jn, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/20/2012 judgmentCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1), Count(s) 1, SENTENCE: Imposition of sentence is hereby suspended and that the defendant is hereby placed on probation for a period of 1 year Consent Judgment and Order of Forfeiture filed in the amount of $16,257,918.00 Special Assessment $400.00 (due immediately). Consent Order of Judgment and Conviction shall be filed by the Government. Signed by Judge Stanley R. Chesler on 12/12/12. (msd)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 initial appearanceCourt Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Stanley R. Chesler:Initial Appearance as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC held on 12/12/2012, Plea Agreement Hearing as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC held on 12/12/2012, Plea entered by TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1) Count 1TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1) Guilty Count 1TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1) Count 1., Sentencing held on 12/12/2012 for TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1), Count(s) 1, SENTENCE: Imposition of sentence is hereby suspended and that the defendant is hereby placed on probation for a period of 1 yearConsent Judgment and Order of Forfeiture filed in the amount of $16,257,918.00Special Assessment $400.00 Consent Order of Judgment and Conviction shall be filed by the Government. (Court Reporter/Recorder KASHMER.) (tt, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 plea agreement
        PLEA AGREEMENT as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (tt, )
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 Waiver of Indictment
          WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (tt, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/13/2012 information - felony
            INFORMATION as to TIGER MANAGEMENT, LLC (1) count(s) 1. (tt, )
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 186 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?