Kreisberg v. Healthbridge Management, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01299-RNC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2021 at 2:25 PM ST (4.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Status Report
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Status Report
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Status Report
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Status Report
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 10/21/2015, Entered: None Status Report
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 111 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                ORDER: Re 58 First MOTION for Contempt filed by Jonathan B. Kreisberg. Please see attached Ruling and Order for details. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/23/2013.(Rickevicius, L.)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 55 Filed: 12/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Memorandum Opinion re 52 Corrected ORDER granting Petition For Injunction Under Section 10(j). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/14/2012. (Gillenwater, J)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 46 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER granting 1 Petition For Injunction Under Section 10(j). Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 12/11/2012. (Gillenwater, J)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 22 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?