Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Industries Inc. v. Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki
Administrative Proceeding USPTO Trademark Trial and Appeal Board, Case No. 91208486-OPP

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Ingram Micro Ingram Micro, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Ingram Micro Inc., Ingram Industries Inc."

Toggle Switch Represented by Ip Strategies, P.c.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas M Champagne +1 703 248 9220 efiling@kmob.com
v.
No Logo Yaskawa Denki Seisakusho Kabushiki Kaisha, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kabushiki Kaisha Yaskawa Denki"

Represented by Sughrue Mion, PLLC

Type Opposition
Interlocutory Attorney YONG OH (RICHARD)KIM
Date in Location 17-DEC-12
Status Code 2
Location Code 845
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (41) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None T
Trial Dates Reset
    LREF
    Blank 6 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None T
    Stip For Ext
      LREF
      Blank 5 Filed: 2/8/2013, Entered: None W
      Extension Of Time Granted
        LREF
        Blank 4 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None W
        D's Mot To Susp Pend Setlmt Negotiations
          LREF
          Blank 3 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None T
          Pending, Instituted
            LREF
            Blank 2 Filed: 12/18/2012, Entered: None T
            Notice And Trial Dates Sent; Answer Due:
              LREF
              Blank 1 Filed: 12/17/2012, Entered: None N
              Filed And Fee
                LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 45 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?