Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Avid Technology, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00967
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated December 21, 2016 at 3:24 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
Space Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Eric M. Albritton +1 903 757 8449 +1 903 758 7397 ema@emafirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Etheridge Law Group

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James L Etheridge +1 817 470 7249 +1 817 887 5950 jim@etheridgelaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Friedman, Suder & Cooke

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Decker A. Cammack +1 817 334 0400 +1 817 334 0401 cammack@fsclaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry J Bumgardner +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 barry@nbclaw.net
Space Edward E Casto, Jr. +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 ecasto@nbclaw.net
Space Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skiermont Derby LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Wayne Hartsell +1 214 978 6600 steven.hartsell@skiermontpuckett.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WARD SMITH & HILL PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jack Wesley Hill +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 wh@wsfirm.com
v.
No Logo Avid Technology, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fish & Richardson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven R Katz +1 617 542 5070 +1 617 542 8906 katz@fr.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Dismiss. All claims asserted in this suit between Uniloc and Avid are hereby dismissed with prejudice. All attorneys' fees and costs are to be borne by the Party that incurred them. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/20/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Avid Technology, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None
      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Avid Technology, Inc..( Katz, Steven) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
        Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Avid Technology, Inc..( Katz, Steven) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None
          Return of Service Executed as to Avid Technology, Inc. on 1/7/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/28/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                              SUMMONS Issued as to Avid Technology, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                  COMPLAINT against Avid Technology, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3928045.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 475 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?