Bitton v. Chitrid
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-05359
District Judge Carol B. Amon, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 1:01 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Danielle Bitton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by P.O. Box 302

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Danielle Bitton +1 347 392 8622
v.
No Logo 9/11 Commission Report, Defendant
American International Group, Inc. American International Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "A.I.G."
Unknown Role, Ipcs, Inc.
Unknown Role, Perini Corp
Unknown Role, Ipc Holdings Ltd
Unknown Role, Selmer Industries Inc
Unknown Role, Blackstone Group Lp
Unknown Role, AIG BG Holdings LLC
Unknown Role, Tidewater Inc.
Unknown Role, On Minerals Co Inc
No Logo Admiral of Navy of China, Defendant
No Logo Admiral of Navy of France, Defendant
No Logo Admiral of Navy of Israel, Defendant
No Logo Admiral of Navy of Japan, Defendant
No Logo Admiral of Navy of Sweden, Defendant
No Logo Admiral of Royal Navy UK & Commonwealth, Defendant
No Logo Admiral US Navy, Defendant
No Logo Adrianne Maidenbaum, Defendant
No Logo AFA, ALPA, Teamsters, Defendant
No Logo AFL - CIO, Defendant
No Logo Agent Bugsby, Defendant
No Logo Albacao Development, Defendant
No Logo Alliant Credit Union, Defendant
No Logo Allstate Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Allstate Insurance"
No Logo Ameena Meer, Defendant
American Airlines, Inc. American Airlines, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "American Airlines"
AMR Corporation Unknown Role, AMR Corporation
Unknown Role, Orbitz Inc
American Express Company American Express Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "American Express Bank"
No Logo Andrew Greene, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Melnick, Defendant
No Logo Ann Friedfertig, Defendant
No Logo Armand Zackery, Defendant
No Logo Armfield Miller Real Estate Agency, Defendant
No Logo Asserson Law Firm, Defendant
No Logo Office of the New York Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "Attorney General of NY"
No Logo Attorney General of Canada, Defendant
No Logo Attorney General of MA, Defendant
No Logo Attorney General of MD, Defendant
No Logo Office of the Texas Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "Attorney General of Texas"
No Logo Attorney General of VA, Defendant
No Logo Australia Admiral of Navy & Military, Defendant
No Logo Aventura Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Bain Capital, Defendant
No Logo Baltimore Port Authority, Defendant
Bank of America, NA Bank of America, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bank of America"
Unknown Role, Oneida Ltd.
Unknown Role, NATIONSBANK CORP
Unknown Role, Nb Holdings Corp
No Logo Bank Of Chicago, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of Japan, Defendant
No Logo Bank of Luxenburg, Defendant
No Logo Bank Of Ny Mellon, Defendant
Barclays Bank PLC Barclays Bank PLC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barclays Bank"
No Logo Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Benjamin Netanyahu, Defendant
No Logo Beyonce' Knowles, Defendant
Clinton, William Jefferson Clinton, William Jefferson, Defendant
Officially listed as "Bill Clinton"
No Logo Bill Milling, Defendant
No Logo Biton Family from NJ, Defendant
BlackRock BlackRock, Defendant
Officially listed as "Blackrock Group"
No Logo Blackwater, Defendant
No Logo Blue Cross And Blue Shield, Defendant
No Logo Brian Conoly, Defendant
No Logo Britain Bank of Trustees, Defendant
No Logo British Embassy, Defendant
BP Corporation North America, Inc. BP Corporation North America, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "British Gas Petroleum"
No Logo British Intelligensia, Defendant
No Logo British Parliment, Defendant
No Logo Brooklyn Tabernacle Church, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Ratner, Defendant
No Logo Bruce Reznick, Defendant
United States Central Intelligence Agency United States Central Intelligence Agency, Defendant
Officially listed as "C.I.A."
No Logo Canada Parliment, Defendant
Capital One Financial Corporation Capital One Financial Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Capital One"
No Logo Carlton Group, Defendant
No Logo Carnegie Mellon Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Catholic Archdiocese of America, Defendant
No Logo Charles Hynes, Defendant
Chase Bank USA, NA Chase Bank USA, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Chase Bank"
No Logo Chief Judge Loretta Preska, Defendant
No Logo Child Interstate Support NY Department, Defendant
No Logo Christyne Quinn, Defendant
No Logo Church of Mormon, Defendant
No Logo Cipriani, Defendant
No Logo Clinton Estate, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner Goodman, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner of France, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner of Ireland, Defendant
No Logo Commissioner of Miramar, FLorida, Defendant
No Logo Commonwealth of VA Department of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo Community Board of NYC, Defendant
No Logo Community Board of NYC , Defendant
No Logo Composto & Composto, Defendant
No Logo Corporation Counsel, Defendant
Credit Suisse AG Credit Suisse AG, Defendant
Officially listed as "Credit Suisse"
No Logo Cunard Cruise Lines, Defendant
Vance, Jr., Cyrus R. Vance, Jr., Cyrus R., Defendant
Officially listed as "D.A. Cy Vance"
No Logo D, E A., Defendant
No Logo Dan McKirgan, Defendant
No Logo Dana Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Silberman, Defendant
No Logo David Glazer, Defendant
No Logo DEP, Defendant
No Logo Department Of Agriculture, Defendant
No Logo Department of Currency, Defendant
United States Department of Energy United States Department of Energy, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Energy"
No Logo Department of Highway Safety State of Florida, Defendant
No Logo California Department of Transportation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Transportation"
No Logo Detective Adcock, Defendant
No Logo Dhl, Defendant
No Logo Dina from NJ, Defendant
No Logo District Attorney of Los Angeles, Defendant
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald Trump"
Unknown Role, Riviera Holdings Corp
No Logo Douglas Elliman, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Beraka, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Ira F. Inegold, Defendant
No Logo Eastbank, Defendant
No Logo Ed Dweck, Defendant
No Logo Ehud Barak, Defendant
No Logo Eliott Sutton, Defendant
No Logo Elizabeth Harris, Defendant
No Logo EPA, 401 M. ST., S.W, Defendant
Officially listed as "EPA"
Equifax, Inc. Equifax, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Equifax"
No Logo Eric Holder, Defendant
No Logo Eric Rothstein, Defendant
No Logo Estate of Charles Harris, Defendant
No Logo Estate of Mr. Safra, Defendant
Experian Corporation Experian Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Experian"
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "F.B.I."
No Logo Faa, Defendant
No Logo Fdny, Defendant
No Logo Fed-Ex, Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Defendant
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Defendant
Officially listed as "Federal Reserve Board Division of Consumer & Community Affairs"
Federal Trade Commission Federal Trade Commission, Defendant
No Logo F.t.c., Defendant
No Logo George White, Defendant
No Logo GM Corporation, Defendant
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Goldman Sachs"
No Logo Governor Cuomo, Defendant
No Logo Governor Kristy, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Arizona, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Colorado, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Louisiana, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Minnesota, Defendant
No Logo Governor of Texas, Defendant
No Logo Greenpoint Bank, Defendant
No Logo Greenspoon and Marder, Defendant
No Logo Gsa, Defendant
H&R Block, Inc. H&R Block, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "H&R Block"
No Logo Harvard Club, Defendant
No Logo Harvey Keitel, Defendant
No Logo Harvey Ruvin, Defendant
No Logo Hilton Hotels, Defendant
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Homeland Security"
HSBC Bank USA, NA HSBC Bank USA, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "HSBC N.A."
No Logo Hud, Defendant
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "IBM"
No Logo Ireland Bank of Trustees, Defendant
No Logo Irs, Defendant
No Logo Israel Bank of Trustees, Defendant
No Logo James Hubbard, Defendant
No Logo James Story, Defendant
No Logo Janet Russo, Defendant
No Logo Jay Dankberg, Defendant
No Logo Jay Z, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Feinberg, Defendant
No Logo Joe Bidden, Defendant
No Logo Joe Turco, Defendant
No Logo John Charles Dibbs, Defendant
No Logo John McKirgan, Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "JP Morgan"
No Logo Julie Menin, Defendant
No Logo Kanye West, Defendant
No Logo Kathleen Carla Alexander, Defendant
No Logo Keane & Marlow, Defendant
No Logo Kenyan & Kenyan, Defendant
No Logo Kevin McKirgan, Defendant
FedEx Corporation FedEx Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Kinkos"
No Logo Lindsay Friedfertig, Defendant
No Logo Lloyd's of London, Defendant
No Logo Lubavitch Association, Defendant
No Logo Lynn University, Defendant
No Logo Mark Chapman, Defendant
No Logo Mark O'Brian, Defendant
No Logo Mark Settlement, Defendant
No Logo Marriot Hotels, Defendant
No Logo Martin Shaw, Defendant
No Logo Marty Moskowitz, Defendant
No Logo Maryland Department of Highway Safety, Defendant
No Logo Marymount Manhattan College, Defendant
MasterCard International, Inc. MasterCard International, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mastercard and Visa"
No Logo Matthew Aboulafia, Defendant
No Logo Matthews, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mayor Bloomberg"
No Logo Mayor Gotlieb, Defendant
No Logo Mayor Gotlieb, Defendant
No Logo Mayor of Chicago, Defendant
No Logo Mayor of Madrid, Defendant
No Logo McDonald Douglas Airbus, Defendant
No Logo McKinsey Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MD Dept. of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo Media Takeout, Defendant
No Logo Meir Dagan, Defendant
No Logo Meir Fhima, Defendant
No Logo Merchants Marine, Defendant
No Logo Metlife Insurance Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "Met Life"
No Logo Miami Port Authority, Defendant
No Logo Michelle Obama, Defendant
No Logo Mirmar Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Romney, Willard Mitt, Defendant
Officially listed as "Mitt Romney"
No Logo Morgan Melhuish Abrutyn, Defendant
United States Coast Guard United States Coast Guard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Morocco Coast Guard"
No Logo Morocco Government, Defendant
No Logo Mosaic Lodge, Defendant
No Logo Mossad, Defendant
No Logo Moti Zilber, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Broadway, Defendant
No Logo Mt. Sinai, Defendant
No Logo Mta, Defendant
No Logo Nancy Sunshine, Defendant
National Aeronautics & Space Administration National Aeronautics & Space Administration, Defendant
Officially listed as "NASA"
National Credit Union Administration National Credit Union Administration, Defendant
No Logo NATO, Defendant
No Logo Newark Liberty Airport, Defendant
No Logo Noble Ventures, Defendant
No Logo Nsa, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Banking, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Bldgs, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Finance, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Insurance, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Mental Health, Defendant
No Logo NY Dept. of Taxation, Defendant
No Logo NY DMV, Defendant
No Logo NY Municipal Parking Authority, Defendant
No Logo N.y. State Board Of Elections, Defendant
No Logo Nycta, Defendant
No Logo Occupation Propaganda of Robert DeNeiro, Defendant
No Logo Office of Deputy Administrator-Gipsa, Defendant
No Logo Office of Financial Managment, Defendant
No Logo Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Compliance Management, Defendant
No Logo Office of Thrift Supervision Consumer Complaints, Defendant
No Logo OSHA, Defendant
No Logo Pacer System, Defendant
No Logo Pastor of Church Wholesale Mortgages and made False Charity, Defendant
No Logo Paul Fineman, Defendant
No Logo Peter Miller, Defendant
No Logo Peter Nissman, Defendant
Pfizer, Inc. Pfizer, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Pfizer Pharmaceutical"
Unknown Role, Arqule, Inc.
Unknown Role, Icagen, Inc.
Unknown Role, Zoetis Inc.
Unknown Role, Celladon Corp
Unknown Role, Pfizer Production LLC
Unknown Role, Icu Medical Inc/de
Unknown Role, Upjohn Inc
Unknown Role, Insite Vision, Inc.
Unknown Role, pSivida LTD
Unknown Role, Cortexyme, Inc.
Unknown Role, Imara Inc.
Unknown Role, Bioatla, Inc.
No Logo Pinhas and Colby Zackery, Defendant
No Logo Port Authority Of Ny & Nj, Defendant
No Logo President Obama, Defendant
No Logo President Raul Castro, Defendant
No Logo President of Iran, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Australia, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Brazil, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of China, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of France, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Germany, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Greece, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Holland, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of India, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Ireland, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Italy, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Japan, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Spain, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Sweden, Defendant
No Logo Prime Minister of Switzerland, Defendant
No Logo Prince Andrew, Defendant
No Logo Prince Charles of Wales, Defendant
No Logo Probeck Consruction, Defendant
Proskauer Rose LLP Proskauer Rose LLP, Defendant
Officially listed as "Proskauer Rose"
No Logo Prudential, Defendant
No Logo R. Gross Dairy Restaurant, Defendant
No Logo Ralph DeNeiro, Defendant
No Logo Raluca & Michael Lippert, Defendant
No Logo Ray, Kelly, Defendant
No Logo Ray Levy, Defendant
No Logo REPUBLIC OF CHINA, Defendant
No Logo Ritz-Carlton,, Defendant
No Logo Ritz-carlton Hotels,, Defendant
No Logo Robert DeNeiro, Defendant
No Logo Robert Frazier, Defendant
No Logo Robert Woloshen, Defendant
No Logo Rockefellar Foundation, Defendant
No Logo Rothschild Bank, Defendant
No Logo Royal Norwegian Caribbean Cruise Lines, Defendant
No Logo Ruth Eckdish, Defendant
No Logo S,W. Student SVCS, Defendant
No Logo Safra Synagogue, Defendant
No Logo Sallie Mae, Defendant
No Logo Sandy Becher, Defendant
No Logo Sanitation Department, Defendant
No Logo Schlesinger and Jasper, Defendant
No Logo Scotland Bank of Trustees, Defendant
United States Department of Commerce United States Department of Commerce, Defendant
Officially listed as "Secretary of Commerce"
No Logo Secretary of State of Arizona, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of State of Colorado, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of State of Delaware, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of State of Oklahoma, Defendant
No Logo Secretary of State of Texas, Defendant
No Logo Secretary to UN, Defendant
No Logo Senator Kennedy, Defendant
No Logo Senator Daniel Squadron, Defendant
No Logo Senators of Arizona, Defendant
No Logo Sharon Brock, Defendant
No Logo Shimon Peres, Defendant
No Logo Shin Bet, Defendant
No Logo Sid Miller, Defendant
Sidley Austin LLP Sidley Austin LLP, Defendant
No Logo Signature Bank, Defendant
No Logo Simon Chitrid, Defendant
No Logo SL Green Realty Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "SL Green Realty Corp."
No Logo Sovereign Bancorp, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Sovereign Bank"
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "State Farm Insurance"
No Logo State of MD Dept. of Transportation, Defendant
No Logo State Of Ny, Defendant
No Logo Steve Friedfertig, Defendant
No Logo Steven Eckerberg, Defendant
No Logo Stonewall Construction, Defendant
No Logo Stuart Gold, Defendant
No Logo Suny, Defendant
No Logo Swedish Intelligence, Defendant
No Logo Sybil Rappaport Trust, Defendant
No Logo Sysco Corporation, Defendant
TD Bank, NA TD Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "TD Bank"
T-Mobile USA, Inc. T-Mobile USA, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "TMobile"
No Logo Tracey McKirgan, Defendant
TransUnion Corporation TransUnion Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Trans Union"
No Logo Tribeca Film Festival, Defendant
No Logo Tribeca Network, Defendant
No Logo Trinity Church, Defendant
No Logo Trump Casinos, Defendant
No Logo Tsa, Defendant
No Logo Turnberry Residential Condominium, Defendant
No Logo UK Customs & Immigration, Defendant
No Logo United Continental Airlines, Defendant
No Logo United Continental Holding, Defendant
No Logo United Court System of NY, Defendant
No Logo United Federal Teachers Union, Defendant
No Logo United States Methodist Church, Defendant
No Logo UPS, Defendant
No Logo US Armed Forces, Defendant
No Logo US Bank of Trustees, Defendant
No Logo United States Courts, Defendant
Officially listed as "US Bankruptcy Court"
No Logo US Customs & Immigration, Defendant
No Logo US Marshals, Defendant
No Logo US Pentagon, Defendant
No Logo US Trade Court, Defendant
No Logo Victor Trigger, Defendant
No Logo Wachovia Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "Wachovia"
No Logo Warner Bros. Entertainment, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Warner Brothers"
Washington Mutual Bank Washington Mutual Bank, Defendant
No Logo Weitz & Luxenberg, PC, Defendant
Officially listed as "Weitz Luxenberg"
No Logo Wilmer Grier, Defendant
The World Bank The World Bank, Defendant
Officially listed as "World Bank"
No Logo Yale Club, Defendant
No Logo Yuval Diskin, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None
    MANDATE of USCA as to 11 Notice of Appeal filed by Danielle Bitton. The following cases are consolidated for the purpose of this Order: 13-1167, 13-1168, 13-1170, 13-1181. Appellant, pro se, moves for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in U.S.C.A. dkt. no. 13-1168 and in U.S.C.A. dkt. no. 13-1170. Those motions are deemed as also having been filed in U.S.C.A. dkt. no. 13-1167, and U.S.C.A. dkt. no. 13-1181. It is ORDERED that the motions are DENIED and the appeals are DISMISSED. This Mandate pertains to the following cases: 12-cv-5426,12-cv-5331 12-cv-5359, 12-cv-5234. Issued as Mandate: 3/13/14 (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 03/13/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      Letter dated 5/16/13 to Chief Judge Amon from Danielle Biton regarding cases. (Fernandez, Erica) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/22/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 10 Judgment, by Danielle Bitton. No fee paid. IFP denied for purposes of appeal. (Attachments: # 1 Request for IFP) (McGee, Mary Ann) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          FINAL JUDGMENT & FILING INJUNCTION: The Court has carefully reviewed Biton's extensive prior history of litigation related to this matter and has considered the burden on the Court and its personnel of continued filing and the likelihood that Biton will continue to abuse the judicial process. Accordingly, the Court orders that: (1) Biton is enjoined from filing any new in forma pauperis action in this Court without first obtaining leave of Court; (2) the Clerk of Court is directed to return to Biton, without filing, any action that is received without an application seeking leave to file; (3) if the Court grants Biton leave to file a new action, the civil action shall be filed and assigned a civil docket number; (4) if leave to file is denied, Biton's submission shall be filed on the Court's miscellaneous docket. Nothing herein shall be construed to prohibit plaintiff from filing an appeal of this Order. Nevertheless, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon, on 2/28/2013. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff with appeals packet. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None
            Letter dated 2/26/13 from Danielle Bitton a/k/a Crystal Bitton to Clerk of Court, in support of Pltff's 8 letter motion to vacate. (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None
              Letter MOTION to Vacate, MOTION for Rehearing; filed by pro se Danielle Bitton. W/Attachments. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None
                MOTION for Reconsideration; filed by pro se Danielle Bitton. W/Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Letter to Experian, # 3 Letter to the Office of Comptroller of the Currency Customer.(Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  MEMORANDUM & ORDER: For the reasons set forth above, the complaints are dismissed. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Biton, furthermore, is ordered to show cause, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why she should not be barred from filing any new actions under the in forma pauperis statute without first obtaining the Court's permission to do so. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C.§ 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S.438, 444-45 (1962). So Ordered by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 12/28/2012. (c/m to pro se) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/6/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MEMORANDUM & ORDER: Plaintiff Danielle Bitton requests an order to show cause for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order seeking, inter alia, to prevent defendants from "funding of crimes against humanity from the Bank of Israel to the Bank of England," and the "immediately release [of Bitton's] family from illegal detention/concentration camp/to give back our identities that FBI... illegally stole.... " Bitton has neither demonstrated a likelihood of success on the merits nor made a showing of immediate or irreparable harm. Accordingly, her 4 request for an order to show cause is denied. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Carol Bagley Amon, on 11/6/2012. C/mailed to pro se Plaintiff. (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                      Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Danielle Bitton (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                        In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Danielle Bitton. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None
                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Danielle Bitton. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/25/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 625 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?