JOHNSON v. WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00079-RMB-KMW
District Judge Renee Marie Bumb, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.

Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I

This docket is featured in the December 13, 2017 article Reality Check: Credit Acceptance Corporation, Part I.

Last Updated August 2, 2018 at 5:36 PM DT (3.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TIJUANA JOHNSON, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Locks Law Firm, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JAMES A. BARRY +1 856 663 8200 +1 856 661 8400 jbarry@lockslaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Palmer Bell +1 212 838 3333 +1 212 838 3735 abell@lockslaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Andrew Galpern +1 856 663 8200 +1 856 661 8400 MGalpern@lockslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by RILEY & SHAINE

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED CHARLES N. RILEY +1 856 667 4666 criley@rileysandilos.com
v.
No Logo NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space KEVIN M. MCKEON +1 215 575 2684 kmckeon@mdwcg.com
No Logo Wynn's Extended Care, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED KEVIN M. MCKEON +1 215 575 2684 kmckeon@mdwcg.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Office Camden
Filed 1/5/2012
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Notice of Removal- Fraud
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Statistical Closing
County Camden
Terminated 10/5/2017
Origin A
Reopened 12/16/2016
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Cases 15-1343[Third Circuit], CAM-L-5698-11[Camden County Superior Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags ADMCLOSED,RULE16,SCHEDO
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank  Terminated Case
***Civil Case Administratively Terminated. (ar1, )
    LREF
    Blank 98 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: 10/4/2017 OrderCourt Filing
    TEXT ORDER. In furtherance of this Court's prior Order {No. 97] the Clerk of the Court shall administratively terminate this matter. The matter will be reinstated to the Court's active docket consistent with the terms set forth in the prior Order. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/4/2017. (Bumb, Renee)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/16/2017, Entered: 2/16/2017 Order on Motion for Judgment on the PleadingsCourt Filing
      ORDER administratively terminating [78] Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, pending outcome of the questions certified to the NJ Supreme Court. ORDERED that the parties shall advise the Court within 5 days of the resolution of the relevant certified questions. ORDERED that the Court's Order staying discovery will remain in place. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/16/2017. (TH, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Letter
        Letter from Kevin M. McKeon re [94] Order. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/15/2017, Entered: 2/15/2017 Letter
          Letter from James A. Barry with Plaintiff's response to Court's intended course of action re [94] Order. (BARRY, JAMES)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: 2/7/2017 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER that the parties shall file their responses to the Court's intended course of action on or before 2/15/2017 re [78] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/7/2017. (TH, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: 12/16/2016 OrderCourt Filing
              LETTER ORDER reopening case and #78 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings re: [92] Letter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/16/2016. (TH, ) Modified on 12/16/2016 (TH).
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/14/2016, Entered: 12/14/2016 Letter
                Letter from Kevin M. McKeon, Esquire re: request to reopen matter re [91] Order of Dismissal. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/1/2016, Entered: 12/2/2016 Order of DismissalCourt Filing
                  ORDER that this matter is ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED pending the outcome of Mediation. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 12/1/2016. (TH, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: 11/17/2016 LetterCourt Filing
                    Letter from Kevin M. McKeon, Esq. addressed to Judge Bumb advising that the parties have agreed to Mediate this case. (TH, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: 8/15/2016 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                        REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. re [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Letter
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 8/5/2016, Entered: 8/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                            LETTER ORDER granting the [87] Letter request for an extension of time for Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.'s to file their Reply Brief to Plaintiff's Response re: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings to 8/15/2016. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/5/2016. (TH, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: 8/3/2016 Letter
                              Letter from Kevin M. McKeon, Esquire regarding request for extension of time to file Reply Brief re [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 86 Filed: 8/2/2016, Entered: 8/2/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                  TEXT ORDER. All discovery in this matter is STAYED pending the Court's decision on the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings {Docket No. 79]. So Ordered by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 08/02/16. (Bumb, Renee)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: 8/1/2016 Certification in Opposition to Motion
                                      CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON re [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Brief, # (6) Text of Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Letter
                                          Letter from from Andrew P. Bell on behalf of Plaintiff Tijuana Johnson. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Order
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/29/2016, Entered: 7/29/2016 Letter
                                              Letter from Kevin M. McKeon on behalf of defendant, Wynn's Extended Care, Inc.. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: 7/18/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's #80 Motion to Stay Discovery is DISMISSED for failure to comply with L. Civ. R. 37.1. Counsel shall meet and confer, and on or before 7/29/2016, submit a letter to the Court detailing any outstanding discovery disputes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 7/15/2016. (TH, )
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Blank  Discovery Hearing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Discovery Hearing held on 7/15/2016. (nz)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Letter
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                        AMENDED Set/Reset Deadlines as to [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing. (PER [81] Letter Rule 7.1) Motion set for 8/15/2016 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (TH, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                          Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing . (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: 7/12/2016, Terminated: 7/18/2016 Motion to Stay
                                                            MOTION to Stay Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P.26(c) by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Brief of Defendant Wynn's Extended Care, # (2) Certification, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit A, # (4) Exhibit Exhibit B, # (5) Exhibit Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit Exhibit D, # (7) Exhibit Exhibit E, # (8) Text of Proposed Order, # (9) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                              Set/Reset Deadlines as to [80] MOTION to Stay Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P.26(c). Motion set for 8/15/2016 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (TH, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: 7/6/2016, Terminated: 12/1/2016 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Text of Proposed Order, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) Letter, # (5) Exhibit A, # (6) Exhibit B, # (7) Exhibit C, # (8) Exhibit D)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                  Set/Reset Deadlines as to [79] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings resubmitted with pages missing from initial filing. Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (tf, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                    Set/Reset Deadlines as to [78] MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Motion set for 8/1/2016 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: 7/1/2016, Terminated: 2/16/2017 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings
                                                                      MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. Responses due by 7/18/2016 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Text of Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: 6/16/2016 Discovery Confidentiality OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        Discovery Confidentiality Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/15/2016. (TH, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: 6/15/2016 Affidavit in Support of Discovery Confidentiality Order
                                                                          AFFIDAVIT/Certification in support of discovery confidentiality order by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: 6/10/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                            LETTER addressed to Counsel; Re: affidavit or attorney certification in support of the proposed discovery confidentiality order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 6/10/2016. (tf, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: 6/8/2016 Letter
                                                                              Letter from Kevin M. McKeon, Esquire. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Blank 73 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated May 5, 2016 from James A. Barry, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, the Court hereby GRANTS the request to adjourn the telephone status conference previously set for May 6, 2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 5/5/2016. (Ramos, Nicole)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: 5/5/2016 Letter
                                                                                  Letter from James Barry advising there is no longer a dispute and May 6, 2016 call is no longer necessary. (BARRY, JAMES)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Blank 71 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: 4/27/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                    TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for May 6, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. to address the letters dated April 25, 2016 from Andrew P. Bell, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff [Doc. No. 69] and April 26, 2016 from Kevin M. McKeon, Esquire, counsel for defendant [Doc. No. 70]. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/27/2016. (Ramos, Nicole)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: 4/26/2016 Letter
                                                                                      Letter. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: 4/25/2016 Letter
                                                                                        Letter from Andrew P. Bell. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 7/15/2016 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2016. Pretrial Factual Discovery due by 10/31/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 4/6/2016. (TH, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Blank  Status Conference
                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams: Telephone Status Conference held on 3/28/2016. (nz)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES A. BARRY on behalf of TIJUANA JOHNSON (BARRY, JAMES)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 66 Filed: 3/8/2016, Entered: 3/8/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                TEXT ORDER The Court has scheduled a telephone status conference for March 28, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. to address the letter dated March 7, 2016 from Andrew P. Bell, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff. Counsel for plaintiff shall initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 3/8/2016. (Ramos, Nicole)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Order Reopening CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER REOPENING CASE. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/19/2016. (dmr)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: 2/19/2016 Letter
                                                                                                    Letter from Andrew P. Bell, Esq. submitting proposed Order to reopen case. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank  Mandate Notice
                                                                                                      Pursuant to Local Rule 79.4, notice is hereby given of the Appellate ruling filed on 1/6/2016.. In the event that the mandate or judgment provides for costs or directs a disposition other than an affirmance, the prevailing party shall prepare and submit an order implementing the mandate or judgment. (lec)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: 1/6/2016 USCA Mandate
                                                                                                        MANDATE of USCA issued. (Attachments: # (1) mandate letter, # (2) opinion)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015, Terminated: 1/6/2016 USCA Judgment(Use if Mandate will follow)
                                                                                                          USCA JUDGMENT ADJUDGED and ORDERED that the judgment of the District Court January 5, 2015, be and the same is hereby REVERSED IN PART and AFFIRMED IN PART. Costs taxed to Appellees.
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015, Terminated: 1/6/2016 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                            USCA Case Number 15-1343 for [60] Notice of Appeal (USCA) filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON. USCA Case Manager Tim (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3sb, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015, Terminated: 1/6/2016 Notice of Appeal (USCA)
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by TIJUANA JOHNSON. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0312-6188612. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. Appeal Record due by 3/19/2015. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/5/2015, Entered: 1/5/2015 Order on Motion to Remand to State CourtCourt Filing
                                                                                                                ORDER that Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety, with prejudice. ORDERED that Plaintiff's [50] Motion to Remand is withdrawn as moot and that Defendants' [57] Motion for Sanctions is withdrawn as moot. ORDERED that that the Clerk is directed to close the matter. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 1/5/2015. (TH, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank  Terminated Case
                                                                                                                  ***Civil Case Terminated. (TH, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 12/19/2014, Entered: 12/19/2014 Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal Dismissing Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint with Prejudice and to Enter Final Judgment by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                      Set Deadlines as to [57] MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11. Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014, Terminated: 1/5/2015 Motion for Sanctions
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 11 by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Certification, # (3) Exhibit A to Certification of Counsel, # (4) Exhibit B to Certification of Counsel, # (5) Exhibit C to Certification of Counsel, # (6) Exhibit D to Certification of Counsel, # (7) Text of Proposed Order, # (8) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 12/12/2014, Entered: 12/12/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          TEXT ORDER Upon letter application dated December 10, 2014 from Andrew P. Bell, Esquire, counsel for plaintiff, and it appearing that all counsel consent to the request to reschedule the in-person Initial Conference previously set for January 8, 2015, the Court hereby GRANTS the request. The new date and time of the in-person Initial Conference is February 10, 2015 at 11:30 a.m. in Room 2040 - Camden. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 12/12/2014. (Ramos, Nicole)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/10/2014 Letter
                                                                                                                            Letter from Plaintiffs requesting adjournment of the Initial Conference scheduled for January 8, 2015. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                              AMENDED Set Deadlines as to [50] MOTION to Remand First Count of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint to State Court. (per [54] Letter Rule 7.1) Motion set for 1/5/2015 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/24/2014, Entered: 11/24/2014 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [50] MOTION to Remand First Count of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint to State Court . (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/14/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                  AMENDED Order Initial Conference set for 1/8/2015 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/14/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Order Initial Scheduling Conference (Camden)Court Filing
                                                                                                                                    Order Initial Conference set for 1/8/2014 10:30 AM in Room 2040 before Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen M. Williams on 11/13/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint ("SAC") by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: 11/12/2014, Terminated: 1/5/2015 Remand to State Court
                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Remand First Count of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint to State Court by TIJUANA JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Certification of Andrew P. Bell in Support of Motion to Remand First Count to State Court, # (2) Brief, # (3) Text of Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                          Setting Deadlines as to [50] MOTION to Remand First Count of the Second Amended Class Action Complaint to State Court. Motion set for 12/15/2014 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (js)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank  Update Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                                                            Clerk`s Text Order - The document [49] Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC., NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/12/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: 10/28/2014 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                              Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER that Defendants' [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint is REINSTATED, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/15/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants'[29] Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/15/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 46 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 10/15/2014. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: 12/11/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Andrew P. Bell requesting Oral Argument, Pursuant to Rule 78 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Brief
                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF (Reply) of Defendants, Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. and National Casualty Company, to Plaintiff's Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: 12/9/2013 Brief
                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF (Supplemental Reply) by Plaintiff in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Brief
                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF (Supplemental) In Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Transcript, # (2) Exhibit B - TCCWNA Legis. History, # (3) Exhibit C - Deft. Corresp. dated Apr. 2, 2012, # (4) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: 11/25/2013 Brief
                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF (Supplemental) in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Off. Transcript of Hearing, # (2) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/2013, Entered: 9/26/2013 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER administratively terminating Defendants' [29] Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint, pending the parties' submission of supplemental briefing. ORDERED that on or before 11/25/2013 Plaintiff and Defendants may submit a supplemental brief, and on or before 12/9/2013 Plaintiff and Defendants may submit a reply, etc.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/25/2013. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: 9/16/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER ORDER: Oral argument as to [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint set for 9/25/2013 at 10:00 AM in Camden - Courtroom 3D before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 9/16/2013. (dmr)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: 8/6/2013 Response in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Support filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint responding to Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/31/2013, Entered: 7/31/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                      Letter from Andrew P. Bell, Esquire re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/2/2013, Entered: 5/2/2013 Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                        INDIVIDUAL RULES AND PROCEDURES JUDGE RENEE MARIE BUMB (tf, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: 4/9/2013 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/5/2013, Entered: 3/5/2013 Certification in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D, # (5) Brief, # (6) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: 2/20/2013 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting the [32] Letter request setting forth new dates for Plaintiff's response to Defendants' [29] Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint and Defendants' time to reply. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/19/2013. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/18/2013, Entered: 2/18/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Andrew P. Bell, Esquire, containing revised dates with regard to previous request for an extension of time to file an opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re [31] Letter. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: 2/15/2013 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                  Letter from Andrew Bell, Esquire Requesting an extension of time to file an opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED Set Deadlines as to [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. (per [30] Letter Rule 7.1) Motion set for 3/4/2013 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: 1/31/2013 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                      Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint . (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines as to [29] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Motion set for 2/19/2013 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: 1/18/2013, Terminated: 10/15/2014 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. Responses due by 2/5/2013 (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Certification of Kevin M. McKeon, Esquire, # (6) Text of Proposed Order, # (7) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/19/2012, Entered: 12/19/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC., filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON.(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES N. RILEY on behalf of TIJUANA JOHNSON (RILEY, CHARLES)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' [13] Motion to Dismiss, and Counts 1,3, and 4 are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. ORDERED that Plaintiff may file a second amended complaint on or before 12/19/2012, and Defendants may file a response on or before 1/18/2013. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/20/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 25 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: 11/21/2012 OpinionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  OPINION. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 11/20/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit "A" to Reply Brief, # (2) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER ORDER granting the request of Wynn's Extended Care, Inc. and National Casualty Company to file a Reply Brief that exceeds 15 pages to Plaintiff's [20] Certification in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 6/8/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Letter from Plaintiff Opposing Defendants' Request for Excess Page for Defendants' Reply Brief. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/8/2012, Entered: 6/8/2012 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Letter re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (SUPLEE, DOUGLAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/11/2012, Entered: 5/11/2012 Certification in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            CERTIFICATION in Opposition filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - Pridham Cert., # (2) Exhibit B - Halbfish Cert., # (3) Exhibit C - Gindele Cert., # (4) Exhibit D - Shiver Cert., # (5) Text of Proposed Order, # (6) Certificate of Service, # (7) Brief)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: 4/19/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER ORDER granting the request of Plaintiff to extend time to respond to Defendants [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on or before 5/11/2012 and Defendants' reply on or before 6/8/2012. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/18/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/17/2012, Entered: 4/17/2012 Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Letter from Plaintiff Seeking an Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2012, Entered: 4/2/2012 Brief in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Support filed by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service of Defendants' Supplemental Letter Brief)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/21/2012, Entered: 3/21/2012 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER that Defendant Wynn shall file a supplemental brief in support of its [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim on or before 4/3/2012 addressing the relevant standards set forth in Quilloin, 2012 WL 833742. Plaintiff may file her opposition by 4/20/2012, and Defendant may file its reply by 4/27/2012, etc.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 3/21/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/20/2012, Entered: 3/20/2012 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Renee Marie Bumb: Telephone Conference held on 3/20/2012. (Court Reporter Ted Formaroli) (ar1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Set Deadlines as to [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 4/2/2012 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: 3/16/2012 Letter Rule 7.1
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion re [13] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: 3/2/2012, Terminated: 11/20/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certification of Exhibits, # (3) Brief, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank  Update Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer the Amended Complaint - Document #12 submitted by Kevin McKeon on 2/14/2012 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 3/2/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/14/2012, Entered: 2/14/2012 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: 2/9/2012 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER dismissing as moot Defendant's [6] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/9/2012. (TH, ) Modified on 2/14/2012 (th).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Certification in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATION in Opposition re [6] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, # (3) Text of Proposed Order, # (4) Certificate of Service)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: 2/3/2012 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT against NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC., filed by TIJUANA JOHNSON. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/31/2012, Entered: 1/31/2012 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Exhibit B to [6] Motion to Dismiss, by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (MCKEON, KEVIN) Modified on 2/1/2012 (TH).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: 1/27/2012 Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by ANDREW P. BELL on behalf of TIJUANA JOHNSON (BELL, ANDREW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank  Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Set Deadlines as to [6] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim. Motion set for 2/21/2012 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: 1/26/2012, Terminated: 2/9/2012 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint for Failure to State a Claim by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Certification of Counsel in Support of Motion, # (3) Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # (4) Certificate of Service, # (5) Exhibit A, # (6) Exhibit B)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank  Update Answer Due Deadline
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CLERKS TEXT ORDER - The Application for a Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer - Document numbers 4 and 5 submitted by Kevin McKeon on 1/11/2012 has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 1/26/2012. (TH, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service Revised Application for Extension to Include Proposed Order)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2012, Entered: 1/11/2012 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service)(MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY identifying Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company as Corporate Parent.. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Corporate Disclosure Statement by WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. identifying Phoenix American Holdings, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (MCKEON, KEVIN)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/5/2012, Entered: 1/5/2012 Notice of Removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by NATIONAL CASUALTY COMPANY, WYNN'S EXTENDED CARE, INC. from Camden County Superior Court, case number CAM-L-5698-11. ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0312-4113805) (Attachments: # (1) Notice of Filing, # (2) Affidavit, # (3) Certificate of Service, # (4) Exhibit A, # (5) Exhibit B)(bdk, ) (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/5/2012) (bdk, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank  QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (bdk, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 336 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?