Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees v. KGI Bridgeport Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-01785
District Judge Alvin W. Thompson, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2019 at 6:03 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Amadeu Fernandes, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. William Gagne, Jr. +1 860 522 5049 +1 860 561 6204 jwgagne@snet.net
No Logo Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. William Gagne, Jr. +1 860 522 5049 +1 860 561 6204 jwgagne@snet.net
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED J. William Gagne, Jr. +1 860 522 5049 +1 860 561 6204 jwgagne@snet.net
No Logo Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. William Gagne, Jr. +1 860 522 5049 +1 860 561 6204 jwgagne@snet.net
No Logo Rudolph Valentine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space J. William Gagne, Jr. +1 860 522 5049 +1 860 561 6204 jwgagne@snet.net
v.
No Logo City of Bridgeport, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by City of Bridgeport

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John Patrick Bohannon, Jr. +1 203 254 6633 +1 203 254 4453 john.bohannon@bridgeportct.gov
No Logo KGI Bridgeport Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaclyn Karen Leung +1 203 977 7300 jleung@daypitney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwartz +1 203 977 7536 +1 203 977 7301 dlschwartz@daypitney.com
No Logo William Dunn, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaclyn Karen Leung +1 203 977 7300 jleung@daypitney.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Schwartz +1 203 977 7536 +1 203 977 7301 dlschwartz@daypitney.com
No Logo Francis Wood, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Jose Diaz, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Paul Garfalo, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
No Logo Peter Ferko, Intervenor Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Furniss & Quinn

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Rose Longo-McLean +1 203 562 9931 r.l.mclean@snet.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of John R. Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John R. Williams +1 203 562 9931 +1 203 776 9494 jrw@johnrwilliams.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (117) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 3/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MANDATE of USCA dated 3/13/14 Withdrawing 100 Notice of Appeal, filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 03/14/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: The Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for an Injunction Pending Appeal (Doc. No. 102 ) is hereby DENIED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/10/2014. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Memorandum in Opposition Defendant KGI Bridgeport Company's Sur-Reply In Opposition To Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion For Injunction Pending Appeal re 102 Emergency MOTION (injunction pending appeal) filed by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        REPLY to Response to 102 Emergency MOTION (injunction pending appeal) filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Memorandum in Opposition re 102 Emergency MOTION (injunction pending appeal) filed by City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Escrow Agreement, # 2 Millworks Decision)(Bohannon, John) (Entered: 12/17/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 12/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Memorandum in Opposition re 102 Emergency MOTION (injunction pending appeal) filed by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 12/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT of Service for Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal served on William Robinson on 12/10/2013, filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT OCR SEARCHABLE PDF) (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 12/13/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Emergency MOTION (injunction pending appeal) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 12/30/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 10/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Index to Record on Appeal by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine re 100 Notice of Appeal, 74 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, 19 First MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance For City of Bridgeport Attorney John P. Bohannon, Jr., Esq,., 27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 83 Stipulation, 71 Order,,, 55 MOTION to Amend/Correct 50 Order,,,, 90 Reply to Response to Motion, 32 MOTION to Intervene, 94 Stipulation, 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed), 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 18 Notice of Appearance, 91 Notice of Additional Authority, 84 Notice (Other), 17 MOTION for Extension of Time until (Up To And Including) February 15, 2013 To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 Complaint,, 92 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 53 Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, 16 Notice of Appearance, 60 Proposed Order, 80 Response, 73 Reply to Response to Motion, 86 Order on Motion for Leave to File, 78 Stipulation, 56 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct, 50 Order,,, 72 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 20 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2013 To Respond To Complaint, 23 First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 15, 2013 To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 Complaint,, 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed), 35 MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2013 To Respond To Complaint And Discovery, 79 Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, 5 Proposed Order, 81 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief, 54 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 93 Response, 52 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 99 Judgment, 69 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 21 Notice of Appearance, 75 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages, 31 Notice of Appearance, 46 Response, 70 Status Conference, 62 Proposed Order, 15 Summons Returned Executed,, 98 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Order on Motion for TRO, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Order on Motion for Permanent Injunction, Order on Motion in Limine,,,,,,, 82 Exhibit List, 1 Complaint, 4 Proposed Order, 68 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, 6 Proposed Order, 7 Proposed Order, 13 Electronic Summons Issued, 58 Order Referring Case to PJO, 26 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 76 Response, 88 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 96 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 22 Notice of Appearance, 47 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 49 Status Conference, 64 Proposed Order, 89 Notice (Other), 77 MOTION in Limine, 87 Response, 61 Proposed Order, 85 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 97 Order, 44 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 34 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 36 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint, 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim, 65 Proposed Order, 39 Reply to Response to Motion, 95 Order on Motion to Dismiss, 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint, 67 Proposed Order,. For docket entries without a hyperlink, contact the court to arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 10/10/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 99 Judgment, 97 Order by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0205-3018276. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      JUDGMENT entered in favor of KGI Bridgeport Company, and City of Bridgeport against Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Amadeu Fernandes, Rudolph Valentine. For Appeal Forms please go to the following website: http://www.ctd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms/appeals_forms Signed by Clerk on 9/12/13. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER: Motion to Intervene 32 denied as moot. Motion to Dismiss 36 denied as moot. Motion for Extension of Time 45 denied as moot. Motion for TRO 59 denied as moot. Motion for Preliminary Injunction 63 denied as moot. Motion for Permanent Injunction 66 denied as moot. Motion in Limine 77 denied as moot. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/3/13. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 9/3/2013. (Lamb, D.) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER: The Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Doc. No. 43 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. The City of Bridgeport has reported that it is withdrawing its motion to dismiss. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/28/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER: Defendant William Dunn's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 37 ) is hereby DENIED as moot. The plaintiffs have withdrawn all claims against Mr. Dunn. (See Doc. No. 89 ) It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 6/28/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 4/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Supplemental STIPULATION re 78 Stipulation, of Facts (Joint Stipulation of Facts) by City of Bridgeport, William Dunn, Amadeu Fernandes, KGI Bridgeport Company, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/17/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RESPONSE re 92 Memorandum in Support of 43 Motion to Dismiss filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) Modified on 5/8/2013 to edit the text to link document. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 4/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Memorandum in Support re 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim filed by City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5)(Bohannon, John) (Entered: 04/12/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Notice of Additional Authority re 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim filed by City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex 1 Liddell Decision, # 2 Exhibit Ex 2 Charter Provisions, # 3 Exhibit Ex 3 Ordinance)(Bohannon, John) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 4/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REPLY to Response to 77 MOTION in Limine filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/11/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine (NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AS TO WILLIAM DUNN) (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/10/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 77 MOTION in Limine filed by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE re 86 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Sur-Reply In Support of Defendant KGI Bridgeport's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Application for Injunctive Relief re 59 Motion for TRO, 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed). 66 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Schwartz, Daniel) Modified on 4/12/2013 to create link to Doc. Nos. 59, 63, 66 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 4/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File a Sur-Reply (Doc. No. 81 ) is hereby GRANTED. The defendant KGI Bridgeport Company shall file the sur-reply separately on the docket. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/9/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 04/09/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 81 MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE by City of Bridgeport Regarding Potential Hearing Testimony And Exhibits (Bohannon, John) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Joint STIPULATION regarding trial on April 11, 2013 by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Plaintiffs' Supplemental Exhibits by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Kevin Murphy, # 2 Murphy Affidavit Exhibits A-E, # 3 Murphy Affidavit Exhibits F-G, # 4 Affidavit Thomas Fascio, # 5 Fascio Affidavit Exhibits A-H)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Leave to File A Sur-Reply Brief by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE re 72 Memorandum in Opposition to 59 Motion for TRO, 63 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 66 Motion for Permanent Injunction, filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) Modified on 4/11/2013 to create link to Doc. Nos. 59, 63, 66 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 4/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: The Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (Doc. No. 75 ) is hereby GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 4/8/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 04/08/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Joint STIPULATION re 71 Order, of Facts and Exhibits by KGI Bridgeport Company, LOCAL 1303-362 OF COUNCIL 4, AFSCME, LOCAL 1303-459, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine, Amadeu Fernandes, City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-5, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 6-10, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 11-15, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 16-25, # 5 Exhibit Exhibits 26-41)(Schwartz, Daniel) Modified on 4/18/2013 to edit text to add filers. (Blue, A.). (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 4/5/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION in Limine by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 4/26/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RESPONSE re 74 Memorandum in Opposition to 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 63 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 66 Motion for Permanent Injunction filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) Modified on 4/9/2013 to create link to Doc. Nos. 59, 63, 66. (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 4/2/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiffs' Reply Brief, # 2 Exhibits R-U)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed), 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) filed by City of Bridgeport. (Part 2 - See Doc. No. 73 ) (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 04/02/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          REPLY to Response to 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim and Reply to Plaintiffs' claim for injuctive relief filed by City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bohannon, John) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 3/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Memorandum in Opposition re 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed), 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) filed by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Appendix A)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 03/28/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: The parties shall exchange (but not file) witness affidavits on or before March 28, 2013. The defendants shall file their oppositions to the Motions for Temporary Restraining Order, Preliminary Injunction and Permanent Injunction on or before March 28, 2013. The plaintiff shall file its reply, if any, on or before April 2, 2013. The parties shall file joint proposed findings of fact, including stipulated facts, on or before April 5, 2013. The plaintiff shall file motions in limine, if any, on or before April 5, 2013. The defendants shall file their oppositions to the motions in limine on or before April 9, 2013. The parties shall be prepared for a hearing on April 11, 2013. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/21/2013.(Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before James R. Hawkins II, ParaJudicial Officer: Status Conference held on 3/20/2013. Time: 2 hours (off the record). (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Memorandum in Opposition re 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-F, # 3 Exhibit G-N)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed), 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D, # 2 Exhibit E-F, # 3 Exhibit G-Q, # 4 Unreported Cases)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      PROPOSED ORDER re 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed) (Renewed Proposed Order for Permanent Injunction) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 4/9/2013 (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          PROPOSED ORDER re 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) (Renewed Proposed Order for Preliminary Injunction) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            PROPOSED ORDER re 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) (Renewed Order to Show Cause) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 4/9/2013 (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER (Renewed finding that no bond is necessary) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER re 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Proposed Order for Temporary Restraining Order) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Order to Show Cause) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Emergency)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/19/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER REFERRING CASE to PJO James R. Hawkins II for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/6/13.(Smith, S.) (Entered: 03/18/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Rose Longo-McLean on behalf of Jose Diaz, Peter Ferko, Paul Garfalo, Francis Wood (Longo-McLean, Rose) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER: The Motion to Amend Order (Doc. No. 55 ) is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiffs have until April 1, 2013 to file a reply brief. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/13/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/13/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct 50 Order,,, by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 4/1/2013 (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/11/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/8/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                First Memorandum in Opposition re 36 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint, 37 First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint filed by Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Francis Wood. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: The Motion for Permanent Injunction (Doc. No. 3 ) is hereby DENIED without prejudice to refiling. Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7(a)(1) requires that "[a]ny motion involving disputed issues of law shall be accompanied by a written memorandum of law..." It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/6/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER: The Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. No. 2 ) is hereby DENIED without prejudice to refiling. Local Rule of Civil Procedure 7(a)(1) requires that "[a]ny motion involving disputed issues of law shall be accompanied by a written memorandum of law..." It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/6/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 3/20/2013 at 2:00 PM before ParaJudicial Officer James R. Hawkins, II. The parties shall report to the South Chambers, Suite 240, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER: The plaintiff shall disclose to the defendants a list of trial witnesses and exhibits on or before March 15, 2013. The plaintiff shall notify counsel for the defendants regarding whether it intends to amend the complaint, either to add or remove a party by March 15, 2013. The plaintiff shall file a memorandum of law which includes the relevant contractual language and cases supporting its position on or before March 19, 2013. The defendant shall file a responsive memorandum of law on or before March 27, 2013. The plaintiff and defendant KGI Bridgeport and/or its successor shall meet with a labor mediator on or before April 1, 2013. NO EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/6/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before James R. Hawkins II, ParaJudicial Officer: Status Conference held on 3/5/2013. A followup status conference will be held on 3/20/2013. Time: 2 hours (off the record). (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/06/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 3/5/2013 at 4:30 PM before ParaJudicial Officer James R. Hawkins, II. The parties shall report to the South Chambers, Suite 240, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 03/04/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 42 ) is hereby GRANTED nunc pro tunc. The defendant City of Bridgeport has until February 26, 2013 to answer, or otherwise respond to, the complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/28/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 02/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 39 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time until March 5, 2013 for discovery responses and March 15, 2013 to exchange witness and exhibit lists by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Memorandum in Support re 43 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim filed by City of Bridgeport. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Bohannon, John) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and failure to state claim by City of Bridgeport.Responses due by 3/19/2013 (Bohannon, John) (Entered: 02/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until February 26, 2013 To Respond To Complaint by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John) (Entered: 02/25/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER: Defendant City's Consent Motion for Extension of Time 35 is hereby GRANTED, to February 25, 2013. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 2/22/13. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/20/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            ORDER: Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Discovery Requests 38 is hereby GRANTED, absent objection. Plaintiffs' responses to defendant KGI Bridgeport Company's discovery requests are due February 28, 2013. Defendant KGI Bridgeport Company's responses to plaintiffs' supplemental discovery requests are due February 28, 2013. Signed by Clerk on 2/20/13. (Smith, S.) (Entered: 02/20/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to 32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Jose Diaz, Peter Ferko, Paul Garfalo, Francis Wood. (Williams, John) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                First MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/28/2013 to Respond to Defendant KGI Bridgeport Company's Discovery Requests by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 02/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by William Dunn.Responses due by 3/10/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendant William Dunn's Motion to Dismiss)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Verified Complaint by William Dunn, KGI Bridgeport Company.Responses due by 3/10/2013 (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants KGI Bridgeport and William Dunn's Motion to Dismiss the Verified Complaint)(Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 02/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Extension of Time until February 25, 2013 To Respond To Complaint And Discovery by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION to Intervene filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceeding held before James R. Hawkins II, ParaJudicial Officer: Status Conference held on 1/18/2013. This case is related to Garfalo v. KGI Bridgeport, 12CV1364. A followup status conference will be held on 3/1/13. Time: 45 minutes (off the record)(Smith, S.) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene by Jose Diaz, Peter Ferko, Paul Garfalo, Francis Wood.Responses due by 2/16/2013 (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/26/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Williams on behalf of Paul Garfalo, Jose Diaz, Peter Ferko, Francis Wood (Williams, John) (Entered: 01/26/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Bohannon, Jr on behalf of City of Bridgeport (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Docket Entry Correction re 15 Summons Returned Executed: REPLACEMENT PDF - original pdf did not include case caption. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 01/24/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Ann Cuneo on behalf of Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine (Cuneo, Kimberly) (Entered: 01/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 23 ) is hereby GRANTED absent objection. Defendant William Dunn has until February 15, 2013 to answer, or otherwise respond to, the complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/17/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 20 ) is hereby GRANTED absent objection. The defendant City of Bridgeport has until February 15, 2013 to answer, or otherwise respond to, the complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/17/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time (Doc. No. 17 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant KGI Bridgeport Company has until February 15, 2013 to answer, or otherwise respond to, the complaint. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 1/17/2013. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL AND THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Status Conference set for 1/18/2013 AT 2:00 PM before ParaJudicial Officer James R. Hawkins, II. The parties shall report to the South Chambers, Suite 240, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. (Gallagher, Robyn) (Entered: 01/17/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 15, 2013 To Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 Complaint, by William Dunn. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Karen Leung on behalf of William Dunn (Leung, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwartz on behalf of William Dunn (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION for Extension of Time until February 18, 2013 To Respond To 1 Complaint by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John) Modified on 2/6/2013 to create link to Doc. No. 1 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/16/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      - ENTERED IN ERROR - First MOTION for Leave to Appear Appearance For City of Bridgeport Attorney John P. Bohannon, Jr., Esq,. by City of Bridgeport. (Bohannon, John) Modified on 1/24/2013 (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 01/16/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jaclyn Karen Leung on behalf of KGI Bridgeport Company (Leung, Jaclyn) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until (Up To And Including) February 15, 2013 To Answer Or Otherwise Respond To Plaintiffs' Complaint 1 Complaint, by KGI Bridgeport Company. (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Schwartz on behalf of KGI Bridgeport Company (Schwartz, Daniel) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Amadeu Fernandes, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees. City of Bridgeport served on 12/26/2012, answer due 1/16/2013; William Dunn served on 12/26/2012, answer due 1/16/2013; KGI Bridgeport Company served on 12/26/2012, answer due 1/16/2013. (Gagne, J.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2013: # 1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Ferguson, L.). (Entered: 12/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE re 11 Notice (Initial Discovery Protocol) filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *City of Bridgeport, William Dunn, KGI Bridgeport Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *J. William Gagne, Jr.* *J. William Gagne & Assoc* *970 Farmington Ave., Suite 207* *West Hartford, CT 06107*. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel initiating or removing this action is responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 9 Electronic Filing Order, 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 1 Complaint, filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 4 Proposed Order, filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 7 Proposed Order filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 6 Proposed Order filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 10 Standing Protective Order, 5 Proposed Order filed by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, 11 Notice Re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 12/21/12. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re Initial Discovery Protocols. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/12. (Attachments: # 1 Discovery Attachment)(Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/20/12. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 12/20/12. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 3/20/13. Amended Pleadings due by 2/18/2013 Discovery due by 6/21/2013 Dispositive Motions due by 7/21/2013. Signed by Clerk on 12/20/12. (Ferguson, L.) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED ORDER re 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, 1 Complaint, (Proposed Order For Permanent Injunction) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                PROPOSED ORDER re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 1 Complaint, (Proposed Order For Preliminary Injunction) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PROPOSED ORDER (Finding That No Bond Is Necessary) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROPOSED ORDER re 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, 3 MOTION for Permanent Injunction, 1 Complaint, (Order to Show Cause) by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine. (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Permanent Injunction by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 1/10/2013 (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amadeu Fernandes, Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME, Rudolph Valentine.Responses due by 1/10/2013 (Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against City of Bridgeport, William Dunn, KGI Bridgeport Company ( Filing fee $350 receipt number 0205-2723837.), filed by Local 1303-362 of Council 4, AFSCME, Amadeu Fernandes, Rudolph Valentine, Local 1303-459 of Council 4, AFSCME. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Affidavit Carlos Agosto-President of Local 1303-362, # 3 Affidavit Freddison Torres-President of Local 1303-459, # 4 Affidavit Amadeu Fernandes)(Gagne, J.) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Reset Deadlines as to 59 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, 66 MOTION for Permanent Injunction (Renewed), 63 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Renewed). Responses due by 3/28/2013. Replies due 4/2/2013. (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Answer deadline updated for City of Bridgeport to 2/26/2013. (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Answer deadline updated for City of Bridgeport to 2/25/2013. (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Answer deadline updated for William Dunn to 2/15/2013. (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Answer deadline updated for City of Bridgeport to 2/15/2013; KGI Bridgeport Company to 2/15/2013. (Smith, S.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Gagne, J.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Judge Alvin W. Thompson added. (Malone, P.)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 159 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?