U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. East Hawaii Veterinary Center, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:10-cv-00559
District Judge DAVID ALAN EZRA, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 8, 2016 at 12:28 PM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Equal Employment Opportunity Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael J. Farrell +1 213 894 3668 michael.farrell@eeoc.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lorena Garcia-Bautista +1 213 894 1108 +1 213 894 1301 Lorena.garcia@eeoc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Derek W. Li +1 213 894 1077 +1 213 894 1301 lado.legal@eeoc.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory Lee McClinton +1 808 541 3122 +1 808 541 3390 Gregory.McClinton@eeoc.gov
v.
No Logo East Hawaii Veterinary Center, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Torkildson Katz Moore Hetherington & Harris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tamara M. Gerrard +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 tmg@torkildson.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kendra K. Kawai +5236 523 523 6000 +5236 523 523 6001 kkk@torkildson.com
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 2000
Nature of Suit 442 - Civil Rights: Employment
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
CONSENT DECREE AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA on 6/2/2011. (afc) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). All Participants are registered to receive electronic notifications. (Entered: 06/02/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/2/2011, Entered: None
    EP: 20 [Proposed] Consent Decree and Order.Mr. Michael Farrell and Ms. Lorena Garcia-Bautista participated by phone.Hearing held.Court finds this to be a fair and reasonable resolution, therefore approves the consent degree. (Court Reporter Gloria Bediamol.) (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, )No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 06/02/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
      EO: Status Conference re: 20 [Proposed] Consent Decree and Order set for 6/2/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. (JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA)(tl, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 05/20/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2011, Entered: None
        SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT [Proposed] Consent Decree and Order; Exhibit A; Exhibit B - by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Park, Anna) Docket text modified on 5/18/2011 referencing exhibits: Exhibits not submitted as separate PDF-attachments as pursuant to Local Rule 100.2.6 "Exhibits." NEF re-generated. (afc) (Entered: 05/17/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/9/2011, Entered: None
          EO: Pursuant to the request of counsel, the Court grants an extension of the deadline to file a consent decree 18 until May 17, 2011. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI) (agh) (Entered: 05/09/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/26/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
            EP: Settlement on the Record held on 4/26/2011. Essential terms of the settlement placed on the record. Consent Decree shall be submitted to the Court within 10 days. The following dates are hereby vacated:Final Pretrial Conference: September 20, 2011, Judge Puglisi. Jury Trial: November 1, 2011, Judge Ezra (Court Reporter FTR - C6) (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)No COS issued for this docket entry (Entered: 04/26/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/8/2011, Entered: None
              EO: Per counsel's request and agreement, the Settlement on the record is CONTINUED from 4/11/2011 to 4/26/2011 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 04/08/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/24/2011, Entered: None
                EO: Settlement on the Record set for 3/29/2011 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI is continued to 4/11/2011 at 09:30 AM before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/24/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None
                  EO: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI will be held before JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry Modified on 3/23/2011 (wnn, ). (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/22/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                    NOTICE of Case Reassignment; Magistrate Judge Richard L. Puglisi is now the assigned Magistrate Judge to this case. Please reflect new case number CV 10-00559 DAE-RLP on all further pleadings. (gab, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 03/22/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2011, Entered: None
                      EO: Settlement on the Record set for 3/14/2011 is continued to 3/29/2011 09:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 03/11/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/16/2011, Entered: None
                        EP: Early Settlement Conference with counsel only held on 2/16/2011. Settlement on the Record set for 3/14/2011 at 10:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. (Court Reporter In Chambers-No Record) (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 02/16/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None
                          EO: Re 8 Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Minutes and 10 Scheduling Order. There was an inadvertent typographical error, the correct name of the Defendant is East Hawaii Veterinary Center, LLC. not East West Veterinary Center, LLC. (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                            RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI on 1/12/11. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/12/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/28/2010, Entered: None
                              NOTICE by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission Notice of Association of Counsel for Government Attorney Lorena Garcia-Bautista U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Service)(Garcia-Bautista, Lorena) (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                                EP: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held on 12/27/2010. Jury Selection/Trial set for 09:00 AM on 11/1/2011 before JUDGE DAVID ALAN EZRA. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/20/2011 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. Early Settlement Conference [with Counsel only] set for 2/16/2011 09:30 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. Motions due by 6/1/2011. Discovery due by 9/2/2011. (Court Reporter Courtroom 7-No Record) (JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI)(wnn, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2010, Entered: None
                                  ANSWER to 1 Complaint, by East Hawaii Veterinary Center, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Gerrard, Tamara) (Entered: 12/21/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/20/2010, Entered: None
                                    Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant East Hawaii Veterinary, LLC's Scheduling Conference Statement & Certificate of Service. (Kawai, Kendra) (Entered: 12/20/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                      Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Separate Scheduling Conference Statement Pursuant to LR 16.2(b). (McClinton, Gregory) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/15/2010, Entered: None
                                        REPORT of Planning Meeting Rule 26(F) Report of Meeting and Proposed Discovery Plan. (McClinton, Gregory) (Entered: 12/15/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/24/2010, Entered: None
                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. All Defendants. (McClinton, Gregory) (Entered: 11/24/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                            Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 12/27/2010 before JUDGE LESLIE E KOBAYASHI. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 9/29/2010. (Attachments: # 1 Corporate Disclosure Memo) (afc) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2010, Entered: None
                                              COMPLAINT-CIVIL RIGHTS; EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION - filed by U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission against East Hawaii Veterinary Center, LLC; Does 1-10. (Attachments: # 1 Jury Trial Demand, # 2 Summons (issued), # 3 Civil Cover Sheet) (afc) (Entered: 10/01/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 62 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?