ALIPHCOM v. General Electric Co. et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:12-cv-06160-MMC

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 3:20 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aliphcom, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Feldman +1 650 801 5069 +1 650 801 5100 bobfeldman@quinnemanuel.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Neukom +1 650 470 4500 +1 650 470 4570 John.Neukom@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Shaham Kameron Parvin +Tel 650 801 5000 +1 650 801 5100 kameronparvin@quinnemanuel.com
v.
No Logo Cif Licensing, LLC, Defendant
General Electric Company General Electric Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "General Electric Co."
Unknown Role, Genpact Ltd.
Unknown Role, Gei, Inc.
Unknown Role, Sportstech, Inc.
Unknown Role, Superior Essex Inc.
Unknown Role, Genicom Corp
Unknown Role, Imatron Inc.
Unknown Role, Regal Beloit Corp
Unknown Role, Lockheed Martin Corp
Unknown Role, Lunar Corp
Unknown Role, Mecon Inc
Unknown Role, Positron Corp
Unknown Role, GE India Ventures LLC
Unknown Role, Townsquare Media, LLC
Unknown Role, Antares Capital Corp
Unknown Role, Bear Newco, Inc.
Unknown Role, Gopivotal, Inc.
Unknown Role, GRAND UNION CO /DE/
Unknown Role, Xoom, Inc.
Unknown Role, Plug Power, Inc.
Unknown Role, Hpsc, Inc.
Unknown Role, Ionics, Inc.
Unknown Role, Idx Systems Corp
Unknown Role, iVillage, Inc.
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/4/2013, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of All Defendants Under Rule 41(a) by Aliphcom (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 6/4/2013) (Entered: 06/04/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT. The deadline to serve defendant is continued to June 4, 2013. The Case Management Conference is continued from March 15, 2013 to July 19, 2013; all related deadlines are continued accordingly. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 27, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
      Ex Parte Ex Parte Application ALIPHCOM'S RENEWED EX PARTE MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT filed by Aliphcom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 2/22/2013) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 11 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
          Ex Parte Application re 9 Case Management Scheduling Order, for Relief from Case Management Conference Order filed by Aliphcom. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 12/21/2012) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
            CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/8/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/15/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on 12/20/12. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order of Judge Maxine M. Chesney)(tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2012) (Entered: 12/20/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Hon. Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd no longer assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 12/7/2012. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Howard R. Lloyd on 12/7/2012. (hrllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2012) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                  CORRECTED COMPLAINT against General Electrict Co, et al Filed by ALIPHCOM, INC. (Feldman, Robert) (Filed on 12/5/2012) Modified on 12/5/2012 (bwS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                    REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Patent Infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                      ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 3/5/2013. Case Management Conference set for 3/12/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2, 5th Floor, San Jose. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                        Summons Issued as to CIF Licensing, LLC. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                          Summons Issued as to General Electric Co. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                            ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 2, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2013)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/5/2012, Entered: None
                              COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment of Invalidity of U.S. Patents (Summons Issued); jury demand; against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 54611012908). Filed by ALIPHCOM (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2012) (Entered: 12/05/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?