American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. et al v. Aereo, Inc

Federal Court Proceeding California Northern District Court, Case No. 5:12-mc-80300
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 9, 2016 at 10:25 AM EDT (8.5 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Plaintiff
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Plaintiff
CBS Studios, Inc. CBS Studios, Inc., Plaintiff
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Plaintiff
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.
NBC Studios, LLC NBC Studios, LLC, Plaintiff
NBCUniversal Media, LLC NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Public Broadcasting Service, Plaintiff
No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Plaintiff
No Logo Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Plaintiff
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Univision Television Group, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo WNET, Thirteen, Fox Television Stations, Inc, Plaintiff
No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Plaintiff
No Logo Wpix, Inc., Plaintiff
No Logo Aereo, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alison M Norris +1 858 202 2700 +1 858 457 1255 anorris@goodwinprocter.com
American Broadcasting Companies, Inc. American Broadcasting Companies, Inc., Counter-Claimant
CBS Broadcasting, Inc. CBS Broadcasting, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Disney Enterprises, Inc. Disney Enterprises, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, DC Holdco, Inc.
Officer/Director, Infoseek Corp /de/
Officer/Director, Active Network, Inc.,
Officer/Director, A.b.c. Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC, Inc.
Officer/Director, ABC Holding CO Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Holding Company, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn, Inc.
Officer/Director, Espn Enterprises, Inc.
Officer/Director, ESPN Digital Media, Inc.
No Logo MNET, Thirteen, Fox Television Stations, Inc, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
NBC Studios, LLC NBC Studios, LLC, Counter-Claimant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC NBCUniversal Media, LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Public Broadcasting Service, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
No Logo Telemundo Network Group LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo The Univision Network Limited Partnership, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
No Logo Twentieth Century Fox Film Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
No Logo Universal Network Television, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Universal Network Television, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Universal Network Television, LLC
No Logo Univision Television Group, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
No Logo WNET, Thirteen, Fox Television Stations, Inc, Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
No Logo WNJU-TV Broadcasting LLC, Counter-Claimant
No Logo Wpix, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie A Shepard +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5180 jshepard@jenner.com
Space Richard L. Stone +1 310 785 4600 +1 310 785 4601 rlstone@hhlaw.com
v.
No Logo Aereo, Inc., Defendant
Other Parties
CBS Studios, Inc. CBS Studios, Inc., Cross-Claimant
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2013, Entered: 4/10/2013 Order on Motion to QuashCourt Filing
ORDER RE AEREO'S MOTION TO QUASH by Judge Paul S. Grewal denying 1 Motion to Quash (psglc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2013)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: 1/25/2013 Clerks Notice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: 1/22/2013 Reply to Opposition/Response
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 9 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 ~Notice (other)
LREF
Blank 8 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Opposition/Response to Motion
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: 1/9/2013 Order on Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Renotice motion hearing
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: 1/8/2013 Notice of Appearance
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: 1/3/2013 Stipulation
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/23/2012 Received Document
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/23/2012 Affidavit
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: 12/23/2012 Motion to Quash
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 85 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?