Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. et al v. Autodesk, Inc.,
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00966
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 2:37 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Uniloc Luxembourg SA, Plaintiff

Represented by Albritton Law Firm

Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

No Logo Uniloc USA, Inc., Plaintiff
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. All claims by pltfs against deft are dismissed with prejudice; deft's counterclaims are dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs, expenses and attys' fees. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/25/13. cc:attys 3-25-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 03/25/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/21/2013, Entered: None
    MOTION to Dismiss Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Autodesk, Inc. With Prejudice by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/21/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/15/2013, Entered: None
      RESPONSE to 15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Plaintiffs' Reply to the Counterclaims of Defendant Autodesk, Inc. filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 03/15/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. of Request for Scheduling Conference (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 02/27/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Autodesk, Inc., (DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/22/2013, Entered: None
            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. by Autodesk, Inc.,.(DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/22/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/23/2013, Entered: None
              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Autodesk, Inc.,.( DeRieux, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/23/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2013, Entered: None
                Return of Service Executed as to Autodesk, Inc., on 1/3/2013, by cert mail; answer due: 1/24/2013. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/15/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L Etheridge on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Etheridge, James) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER granting 10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Decker A Cammack terminated. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 01/07/13. cc:attys 1-08-13 (mll, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/4/2013, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiffs Uniloc USA, Inc. and Uniloc Luxembourg S.A. by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cammack, Decker) (Entered: 01/04/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Steven Wayne Hartsell on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Hartsell, Steven) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jaime Kate Olin on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Edward E Casto, Jr on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Casto, Edward) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barry Bumgardner on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Bumgardner, Barry) (Entered: 01/03/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Miller Albritton on behalf of Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc. (Albritton, Eric) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/26/2012, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                    SUMMONS Issued as to Autodesk, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) (Entered: 12/26/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                      Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                        COMPLAINT against Autodesk, Inc., ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3927543.), filed by Uniloc Luxembourg S.A., Uniloc USA, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - US Patent 7,024,696)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 816 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?