United States v. Jacquot
Criminal Case California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:08-cr-01171-W

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 7, 2019 at 12:45 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Faith A Devine +1 619 557 7173 +1 619 557 7055 Faith.Devine@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo David C. Jacquot, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by jenkinstaxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel Arthur Jenkins +1 619 713 0961 +1 619 713 5067 daniel@jenkinstaxlaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Office San Diego
Filed 4/15/2008
County San Diego
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7206A.F
Offense Level 4
267206(1) - Filing a False Tax Return
Def Custody Status Released
  Entries (43) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 6/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT as to David C. Jacquot (1): Count(s) 2, Custody of the BOP for a term of TIME SERVED followed by 1 year supervised release to run concurrently with case 10CR3256-WQH. No Fine. $100.00 S/A. Pay restitution in the amount of $89,148.00; Count(s) 1, Govts Oral Motion to Dismiss - GRANTED. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes. (mdc) (av1).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 4/30/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER denying 95 Motion to stay proceedings as to David C. Jacquot (1). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 4/30/09.(ct)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 41 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
      Minute Entry: Motion Hearing as to David C. Jacquot held on 9/8/2008 before Judge Whelan. Daniel A. Jenkins substitutes in as retained counsel for the defendant. The Court orders motion (15-1) to suppress moot; motion to modify conditions of release (26-1) granted; motion to dismiss/suppress/compel (27-1) denied in part as to dismissal, continued in part; motion to compel first supplemental (31-1) denied. Further Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 11/17/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan. (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson.)(Plaintiff Attorney Faith Devine).(Defendant Attorney Daniel A. Jenkins). (ct) Modified on 9/8/2008 to correct ruling on 27-1 (ct).
        LREF
        Legal Document 40 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008 Order on Motion to Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
        ORDER granting [34] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Daniel Arthur Jenkins for David C. Jacquot. Attorney David Jacquot terminated as to David C. Jacquot (1). Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 9/8/08.(ct)
          LREF
          Legal Document 39 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Certificate Of Service.
          Certificate of Service by David C. Jacquot re [38] Reply to Response, (Jacquot, David) (cap).
            LREF
            Legal Document 38 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Reply to Response
            REPLY to [35] RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David C. Jacquot by David C. Jacquot re [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel, [29] Exhibits in Support of [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [30] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [28] STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot (Jacquot, David) Modified on 9/4/2008 to edit attorney's docket text (cap).
              LREF
              Legal Document 37 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Response in Opposition
              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [26] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Devine, Faith)(cap).
                LREF
                Legal Document 36 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Response in Opposition
                DECLARATION of IRS-CI Supervisory Special Agent Sara Brana in Support of [35] Response in Opposition by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel, [29] Exhibits in Support of [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [30] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [28] STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [31] MOTION to compel First Supplemental (Devine, Faith) Modified on 9/2/2008, to edit attorney's docket text. (cap).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 35 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 8/29/2008 Response in Opposition
                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel, [29] Exhibits in Support of [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [30] Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [28] STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot, [31] MOTION to compel First Supplemental (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-C)(Devine, Faith) (cap).
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                  MOTION to Substitute Attorney by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/27/2008, notified attorney of discrepancies (cap).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                    Certificate of Service by David C. Jacquot re [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/27/2008 to correct attorney's docket text (cap).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Declaration
                      DECLARATION by David C. Jacquot in Support of [27] MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/26/2008, to correct attorney's docket text; attorney emailed regarding discrepancies found (cap).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 31 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Compel
                        MOTION to compel First Supplemental by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) (cap).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 30 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                          MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/26/2008 to correct attorney's docket text; attorney emailed regarding discrepancies found (cap).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                            EXHIBITS in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/26/2008 to correct attorney's docket text; attorney emailed regarding discrepancies found (cap).
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 28 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008, Terminated: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                              STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of [27] Motion to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/26/2008 to correct attorney's docket text; attorney emailed regarding discrepancies found (cap).
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/25/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                MOTION to Dismiss /Suppress/Compel by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 8/26/2008, notified attorney of s/ (cap).
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/6/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) (cap).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                    Filed ORDER granting [24] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to David C. Jacquot (1)(ct)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 24 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/3/2008 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                      MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) (cap).
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 23 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
                                        Minute Entry :Continuance of Motion Hearing as to David C. Jacquot held on 6/9/2008 before Judge Whelan. The Court grants defendant's motions to continue. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting continued to 9/8/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.). (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson.)(Plaintiff Attorney Steve Stone for Faith Devine).(Defendant Attorney David Jacquot). (ct)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                          Certificate of Service by David C. Jacquot Documents 14,15,16,19 (Jacquot, David) (aje).
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 21 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                            Certificate of Service by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [18] Response to Motion (Devine, Faith) (aje).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 20 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008 Certificate Of Service.
                                              Certificate of Service by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [17] Response to Motion (Devine, Faith) (aje).
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Reply to Response
                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by David C. Jacquot re [14] MOTION to Continue, [16] Supplemental MOTION to Continue (Jacquot, David) Modified on 6/5/2008, no proof of service. Notified defendant (aje).
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Response to Motion
                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [14] MOTION to Continue, [16] Supplemental MOTION to Continue (Devine, Faith) Modified on 6/5/2008, no proof of service. Notified atty (aje).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to David C. Jacquot re [15] MOTION to Suppress Evidence and Discovery (Devine, Faith) Modified on 6/5/2008, no proof of service. Notified atty (aje).
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                      Supplemental MOTION to Continue by David C. Jacquot. (Jacquot, David) Modified on 6/3/2008, no proof of service. Discrepancy order prepared (aje).
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 15 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Motion to Suppress Evidence
                                                        FIled defendant's MOTION to Suppress Evidence by David C. Jacquot. (ct)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008, Terminated: 6/9/2008 Motion to Continue
                                                          Filed defendant's MOTION to Continue by David C. Jacquot. (ct)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to David C. Jacquot held on 5/22/2008. The dft requests to proceed pro-se. The court grants this request. Court will not appoint appoint counsel. Dft will attempt to retain counsel. Court confirms MH/TS date of 6/9/08 at 2:00pm before Judge Whelan. (Tape #JMA08-01-15:14-15:23).(Plaintiff Attorney Faith Devine).(Defendant Attorney Thomas Sims). (r1r)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/21/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTE ORDER as to David C. Jacquot, Excludable(s) started as to David C. Jacquot: XT4 Continuance re counsel; Start date 5/20/08, End date 5/22/08. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 5/20/08. (aje)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 11 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/20/2008 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler: Thomas Sims provisionally appointed; Financial Affidavit due at the next court hearing.Attorney Appointment Hearing as to David C. Jacquot held on 5/20/2008.( Status re: Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 5/22/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler.) (Tape #JMA08-01-15:12-15:20).(Plaintiff Attorney Faith Devine).(Defendant Attorney Timothy Garrison, S/A). (r1r) Modified on 5/21/2008 to include the atty's name(r1r).
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING as to Defendant David C. Jacquot. Attorney Appointment Hearing set for 5/20/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom D before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler. (r1r)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 9 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008 Motion SettingCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry :Motion Setting as to David C. Jacquot held on 5/7/2008 before Judge Whelan. The Court orders the case set for Motion Hearing/Trial Setting on 6/9/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.) (Court Reporter Melissa Pierson).(Plaintiff Attorney Faith Devine).(Defendant Attorney Michael Littman S/A). (ct)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA
                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Faith A Devine appearing for USA. (Devine, Faith) (aje).
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                        MINUTE ORDER as to David C. Jacquot:Due to the closure of the courthouse, the Court orders the Motion Setting reset for 5/7/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.) (ct)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Abstract of OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ABSTRACT OF ORDER releasing David C. Jacquot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/23/08. (aje)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 BondCourt Filing
                                                                            P/S Bond Entered as to David C. Jacquot in amount of $ 35,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/23/08. (aje)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/24/2008 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for David C. Jacquot (1) P/S 35,000. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler on 4/23/08. (aje)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 3 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jan M. Adler:Arraignment as to David C. Jacquot (1) Count 1 held on 4/23/2008 Not Guilty plea entered. Special Appearance of attorney Michael Littman for David C. Jacquot. Bond set as to David C. Jacquot (1) $35,000 P/S. Bond paperwork approved and filed in court. Abstract issued to USM. ( Motion Setting set for 5/5/2008 09:00 AM in Courtroom 07 before Judge Thomas J. Whelan.) (Tape #JMA08-01-11:09-11:21).(Plaintiff Attorney Faith Devine/Valerie Chu).(Defendant Attorney Michael Littman, Special App). (r1r) Modified on 4/23/2008 to correct information regarding the defense atty(r1r).
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                  ARREST WARRANT ISSUED by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major in case as to David C. Jacquot. (aje)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Indictment
                                                                                    INDICTMENT as to David C. Jacquot (1) count(s) 1. (kmm)(jcj).
                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?