Gburek v. Argent Mortgage et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-02639
District Judge Marvin E. Aspen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 21, 2016 at 7:14 AM DT (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Camille J Gburek, Plaintiff

Represented by Burke Law Offices, LLC

Toggle Switch Represented by Hauselman & Rappin Ltd

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/13/2006 Elizabeth Monkus +1 312 372 2020 +1 312 372 0404 emonkus@hrolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Keogh Law, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Keith James Keogh +1 312 726 1092 +1 312 726 1093 Keith@Keoghlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/04/2011 Ainat Natalie Margalit +1 312 726 1092 amargalit@keoghlaw.com
No Logo The Estate of deceased plaintiff Camille Gburek, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Argent Mortgage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Varga, Berger, Ledsky, Hayes & Casey

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2012 Harold B. Hilborn +1 312 341 9400 hhilborn@vblhc.com
TERMINATED: 05/16/2012 Jonathan N. Ledsky +1 312 341 9400 jledsky@vblhc.com
TERMINATED: 05/16/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY Craig Allen Varga +1 312 341 9400 cvarga@vblhc.com
No Logo FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Defendant
JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA JPMorgan Chase Bank, NA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnstein & Lehr, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2012 Raymond Marion Krauze +1 312 876 6945 +1 312 876 6221 rmkrauze@arnstein.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Leonard Street and Deinard, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/16/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY David A. Applebaum +1 612 335 1500 david.applebaum@leonard.com

Represented by Michael Best & Friedrich LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by SCANDAGLIA & RYAN

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/21/2006 Alan W. Nicgorski +1 312 580 2020 anicgorski@scandagliaryan.com
TERMINATED: 06/21/2006 Matthew Boyd Steffens +1 312 580 2020 msteffens@scandagliaryan.com
No Logo Residential Plus Mortgage Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelly & Karras, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/12/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY William Daniel Kelly, III +1 630 575 0202 +1 630 575 0221 billkelly@kellykarras.com
No Logo WMC Mortgage, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dykema Gossett, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy R. Jonker +1 312 750 3615 +1 312 698 4549 ajonker@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Arika Joy Osacky +1 312 876 1700 aosacky@dykema.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick Thomas Stanton +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 pstanton@dykema.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Sidney Weil +1 312 627 4600 +1 312 627 4601 eweil@dykema.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Federal Trade Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/26/2007, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED ROBERTO ANGUIZOLA +1 202 326 3284 ranguizola@ftc.gov
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit 890 - Other Statutes: Other Statutory Actions
  Entries (96) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/16/2012, Entered: None
MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), and Joint stipulation of dismissal of claims against defendants 96 all of plaintiff, The Estate of Deceased plaintiff Camille Gburek's claims against defendants Argent Mortgage and Grand Mortgage & JP Mortgage Chase Bank, N.A. are dismissed with prejudice. Each party shall bear their own costs and attorneys fees. Defendants expressly reserve all of its third-party claims in connection with the case being dismissed through this stipulation including, without limitation, any and all claims set forth in the fifth amended consolidated third-party complaint. Argent Mortgage and Grand Mortgage & JP Mortgage Chase Bank, N.A. terminated.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 05/16/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/15/2012, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) of (Gburek v. Argent Mortgage, et al., Cse No. 1:06-cv-02639) claims against Defendants (Davies, Joanne) (Entered: 05/15/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 1/3/2012, Entered: None
      STIPULATION of Dismissal against WMC Mortgage Corp. (Keogh, Keith) (Entered: 01/03/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 6/27/2011, Entered: None
        MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:The Estate of deceased plaintiff Camille Gburek's motion to substitute party 92 is granted. Party The Estate of deceased plaintiff Camille Gburek added. Camille J Gburek terminated. The motion hearing set for 6/30/11 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 06/27/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Motion by Keith James Keogh for presentment of motion to substitute party 92 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 6/30/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Keogh, Keith) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 6/22/2011, Entered: None
            MOTION by Plaintiff Camille J Gburek to substitute party (Keogh, Keith) (Entered: 06/22/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 4/4/2011, Entered: None
              MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Attorney Ainat Natalie Margalit's Motion to withdraw as attorney 89 for plaintiff is granted. Motion terminated. Attorney Ainat Natalie Margalit terminated. The motion hearing set for 4/5/11 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 04/04/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Motion by Ainat Natalie Margalit for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 89 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 4/5/2011 at 10:30 AM. (Margalit, Ainat) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 3/31/2011, Entered: None
                  MOTION by counsel for Plaintiff Camille J Gburek to withdraw as attorney (Margalit, Ainat) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 3/23/2011, Entered: None
                    SUGGESTION of Death as to Plaintiff, Camille J. Gburek (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 03/23/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 12/27/2010, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Jonathan N. Ledsky of Change of Address (Ledsky, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/27/2010)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/19/2010, Entered: None
                        MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Presently before us is a Motion to Establish Alternate Procedures for Rescission (Dkt. No. 3718) filed by defendant WMC Mortgage Corp. ("WMC") in one of the Opt-Out actions within the MDL (Indiv. Case No. 06C2639). For the reasons stated in the Statement section of this order, WMC's motion is denied. It is so ordered.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2010)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/21/2010, Entered: None
                          REPLY by Defendant WMC Mortgage to motion for miscellaneous relief 76 (Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 10/21/2010)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/12/2010, Entered: None
                            MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:William D. Kelly and Kelly & KaKarras's Motion to withdraw as attorney 80 for Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp, is granted. Motion terminated. Motion Attorney William Daniel Kelly, III terminated. The motion hearing set for 10/14/10 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 10/12/2010)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/6/2010, Entered: None
                              Amended NOTICE of Motion by William Daniel Kelly, III for presentment of before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/14/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Kelly, William) (Entered: 10/06/2010)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/5/2010, Entered: None
                                MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Counsel for defendant Residential Pus Mortgage's motion to withdraw as attorney 80 noticed for hearing for 10/12/10 is reset to 10/14/10 at 10:30 a.m The motion hearing set for 10/12/10 is stricken. :Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 10/05/2010)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Motion by William Daniel Kelly, III for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 80 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/12/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Kelly, William) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 9/14/2010, Entered: None
                                    MOTION by counsel for Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp. to withdraw as attorney of Record (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Filing)(Kelly, William) (Entered: 09/14/2010)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 9/13/2010, Entered: None
                                      MINUTE entry before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen:Any responses to Defendant WMC's motion to establish alternative procedures for rescission claimed by plaintiff under 15 U.S.C. 1634 76 and to require plainitff to proceed with rescission are to be filed on or before 10/6/2010. Defendant to reply by 10/21/2010. The motion hearing set for 9/16/10 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 09/13/2010)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Motion by Amy R Jonker for presentment of motion for miscellaneous relief 76 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 9/16/2010 at 10:30 AM. (Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                          MEMORANDUM by WMC Mortgage in support of motion for miscellaneous relief 76 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 through Exhibit 3)(Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/9/2010, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by Defendant WMC Mortgage to establish alternate procedures for rescission claimed by plaintiff under 15 U.S.C. § 1635 and to require plaintiff to proceed with rescission. (Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 09/09/2010)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/23/2010, Entered: None
                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage by Amy R Jonker (Jonker, Amy) (Entered: 06/23/2010)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/17/2010, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Ainat Natalie Margalit of Change of Address (Margalit, Ainat) (Entered: 06/17/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Camille J Gburek by Ainat Natalie Margalit (Margalit, Ainat) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE by Edward Sidney Weil of Change of Address (Weil, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE by Patrick Thomas Stanton of Change of Address (Stanton, Patrick) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE by Arika Joy Osacky of Change of Address (Osacky, Arika) (Entered: 07/11/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Marvin E. Aspen :Defendant WMC Mortgage Corp.'s Motion for leave to withdraw the appearance of attorney 67 Roberto Anguizola is granted. Attorney Roberto Anguizola terminated. Motion terminated. Attorneys Patrick T. Stanton, Edward S. Weil and Arika J. Osacky will remain as counsel for defendant WMC Mortgage. The motion hearing set for 10/30/07 is stricken.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 10/26/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Arika Joy Osacky for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 67 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 10/30/2007 at 10:30 AM. (Osacky, Arika) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by counsel for Defendant WMC Mortgage to withdraw as attorney The Appearance of Roberto Anguizola (Osacky, Arika) (Entered: 10/22/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage by Arika Joy Osacky (Osacky, Arika) (Entered: 08/07/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 5/23/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Marvin E. Aspen dated 5/23/07:Pursuant to stipulation, plaintiff's claims against JP Morgan Chase, N. A., FV-1, Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. are dismissed without costs. FV-1, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. terminated. This case will proceed forward on all remaining claims against all other parties.Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 05/23/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    STIPULATION of Dismissal for JP Morgan Chase, MERS and F-1, Inc., only (Burke, Alexander) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      APPLICATION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by David A. Applebaum; Order entered granting leave by Judge Marvin E. Aspen. Filing fee $ 50.00 paid, receipt number 10721526. (vkd, ) (Entered: 03/06/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Camille J Gburek by Alexander Holmes Burke Additional Appearance (Burke, Alexander) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Marvin E. Aspen dated 12/13/06: Elizabeth Monkus' motion to withdraw as counsel for plaintiff Gburek (Dkt. 59) is granted. Motion terminated. Attorney Elizabeth Monkus terminated. Keith J. Keogh of the Law Offices of Keth J. Keogh, Ltd., will remain as counsel for plaintiff. The motion hearing set for December 14, 2006 is stricken. Judicial staff mailed notice (gl, ) (Entered: 12/13/2006)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Elizabeth Monkus for presentment of motion to withdraw as attorney 59 before Honorable Marvin E. Aspen on 12/14/2006 at 10:30 AM. (Monkus, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 12/8/2006, Entered: None
                                                                              MOTION by Plaintiff Camille J Gburek to withdraw as attorney (Monkus, Elizabeth) (Entered: 12/08/2006)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to Judge Marvin E. Aspen for all further proceedings. Signed by Executive Committee on 10/27/06. (vkd, ) (Entered: 10/30/2006)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/27/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing set for 10/31/2006 before Judge Castillo is vacated. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 10/27/2006)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp.'s motion for leave to file answer and affirmative defense 54 is granted. Motion hearing set for 10/10/2006 is vacated. Status hearing set for 10/31/2006 at 9:45 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 10/06/2006)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by William Daniel Kelly, III for presentment of Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp.'s motion for leave to file answer and affirmative defense 54 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 10/10/06 at 9:45 a.m. (vkd, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/28/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp. for leave to file answer and affirmative defense.(Exhibit). (vkd, ) (Entered: 09/29/2006)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : All matters relating to the referral of this action having been concluded, the referral is closed and the case is returned to the assigned judge. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 09/26/2006)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                            ALIAS Summons Issued as to Abraham Beddaoui. (vkd, ) (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/19/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Settlement conference held. The parties are not able to reach a settlement agreement at this time. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 09/19/2006)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Status hearing held. Settlement conference remains set for 09/19/06 at 10:00 a.m. for counsel only. Notice mailed by judge's staff notice (ntf, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing held on 9/12/2006 and continued to 10/31/2006 at 9:45 AM. Plaintiff's oral motion for an extension of time to serve the remaining defendants is granted. Defendant to serve the remaining defendants by 10/13/2006. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 09/12/2006)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/6/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : At the court's direction, the status hearing set for 09/12/06 at 10:00 a.m. is stricken and reset to 09/12/06 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 09/07/2006)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/16/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Settlement conference with counsel held and continued to 9/19/06 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, FV-1 Inc and Mortgage Electronic Registration System is not required to attend the continued settlement conference. Status hearing set for 9/12/06 at 10:00 a.m. following the status hearing with the District Judge. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 08/17/2006)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp. by William Daniel Kelly, III. (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/15/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing held and continued to 9/12/2006 at 9:45 a.m. Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp's motion for leave to file an appearance and for other relief is granted. William D. Kelly of Kelly & Karras, Ltd. is granted leave to file his appearance. Defendant is given until 9/15/06 to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint. Motion hearing set for 8/22/2006 is vacated. Mailed notices (gcy, ) (Entered: 08/16/2006)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Defendant for presentment of motion for leave to file an Appearance and for Other Relief. 43 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 8/22/2006 at 09:45 AM. (rp, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/14/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Residential Plus Mortgage Corp. for leave to file an Appearance and for Other Relief. (rp, ) (Entered: 08/15/2006)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Status hearing held. Defendants' counsel of record shall serve responsive letters to the plaintiff's settlement letter by 08/14/06 with a copy to court. Settlement conference with counsel set for 08/16/06 at 2:00 p.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 08/07/2006)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/20/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : Status hearing held and continued to 08/07/06 at 8:45 a.m., plaintiff's primary counsel must be present. Plaintiff shall serve the settlement letter on defendants pursuant to paragraph one of this Court's standing order for settlement conference by 08/02/06, with a copy to the court at the time of service. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/13/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case referred to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown. Signed by Judge James F. Holderman on 7/13/06. (gcy, ) Modified on 3/30/2007 (gcy, ). (Entered: 07/17/2006)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/14/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE entry before Judge Geraldine Soat Brown : This matter having been referred to Magistrate Judge Geraldine Soat Brown for a settlement conference, an initial status hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Brown on 07/20/06 at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1812 for the purpose of setting a date for the settlement conference. Counsel for parties shall review Judge Brown's Standing Order for Settlement Conference before appearing for the initial status hearing. See www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/JUDGE BROWN. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 07/14/2006)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Status hearing held on 7/12/2006 and continued to 8/15/2006 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 07/12/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          NOTICE by all plaintiffs re status report 36 (Keogh, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            STATUS Report by Camille J Gburek (Keogh, Keith) (Entered: 07/11/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Complaint by Argent Mortgage(Ledsky, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/10/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/27/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage by Roberto Anguizola (Anguizola, Roberto) (Entered: 06/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage by Edward Sidney Weil (Weil, Edward) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by WMC Mortgage Answer to Complaint (Stanton, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by WMC Mortgage(Stanton, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant WMC Mortgage by Patrick Thomas Stanton (Stanton, Patrick) (Entered: 06/26/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          ALIAS Summonses Issued, two originals and two copies, as to Grand Mortgage Corp. and Residential Plus Mortgage Corp. (ar, ) (Entered: 06/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Raymond Marion Krauze (Krauze, Raymond) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Christopher R. Parker (Parker, Christopher) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo: Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc., and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.'s motion for substitution of counsel 24 is granted. Alan W. Nicgorski and Matthew Boyd Steffens of Scandaglia & Ryan are granted leave to withdraw and Christopher R. Parker and Raymond M. Krause of Michael Best & Friedrich LLP are granted leave to file their appearances on behalf of the defendants. Mailed (vmj, ) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Christopher R. Parker for presentment of motion to substitute attorney 24 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/21/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Parker, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to substitute attorney for Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Parker, Christopher) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/15/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Complaint by JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.(Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 06/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Defendant Argent Mortgage Company, LLC's motion for extension of time to file responsive pleading to plaintiff's complaint 20 is granted. Defendant to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint on or before 7/10/2006. Motion hearing set for 6/20/2006 is vacated. Status report filing date of 7/10/2006 and status hearing set for 7/12/2006 at 9:45 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 06/12/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Motion by Jonathan N. Ledsky for presentment of motion for extension of time 20 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/20/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Ledsky, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Defendant Argent Mortgage for extension of time to file responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Ledsky, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Argent Mortgage by Harold B. Hilborn ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC (incorrectly sued as "ARGENT MORTGAGE") (Hilborn, Harold) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Argent Mortgage by Craig Allen Varga ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC (incorrectly sued as "ARGENT MORTGAGE") (Varga, Craig) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Argent Mortgage by Jonathan N. Ledsky ARGENT MORTGAGE COMPANY, LLC (incorrectly sued as "ARGENT MORTGAGE") (Ledsky, Jonathan) (Entered: 06/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/7/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Defendants FV-1 Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.'s unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead 14 is granted. Defendants FV-1 Inc. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint on or before 6/15/2006. Motion hearing set for 6/13/2006 is vacated. Status report filing date of 7/10/2006 and status hearing set for 7/12/2006 at 9:45 a.m. will stand. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 06/07/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Boyd Steffens for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 14 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/13/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Matthew Boyd Steffens (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/6/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. by Alan W. Nicgorski (Nicgorski, Alan) (Entered: 06/06/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before Judge Ruben Castillo : Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.'s unopposed motion to extend time to answer or otherwise plead 9 is granted. Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. to answer or otherwise plead to the complaint on or before 6/15/2006. Motion hearing set for 6/6/2006 is vacated. Parties to file a joint status report on or before 7/10/2006. Status hearing set for 7/12/2006 at 9:45 AM. Mailed notice (rao, ) (Entered: 06/01/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Motion by Matthew Boyd Steffens for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer 9 before Honorable Ruben Castillo on 6/6/2006 at 09:45 AM. (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. for extension of time to file answer or otherwise plead (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Matthew Boyd Steffens (Steffens, Matthew) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/31/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. by Alan W. Nicgorski (Nicgorski, Alan) (Entered: 05/31/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A., FV-1 Inc. Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Argent Mortgage, WMC Mortgage, Grand Mortgage, Residential Plus Mortgage Corp., Abraham Beddaoui (cdy, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Camille J Gburek by Elizabeth A Monkus (cdy, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Camille J Gburek by Keith James Keogh (cdy, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              CIVIL Cover Sheet (cdy, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT filed by Camille J Gburek; Jury Demand.(cdy, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 190 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?