Elmore v. Integrated Electrical Services Inc et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Southern District Court, Case No. 4:04-cv-03842
District Judge David Hittner, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 3:01 PM DT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James Elmore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MEL E. LIFSHITZ +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218

Toggle Switch Represented by The Bilek Law Firm, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
On Behalf of Himself and All Others Similarly Situated Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Emerson Bilek +1 713 227 7720 +1 713 227 9404 tbilek@hb-legal.com
v.
No Logo Herbert Allen, Defendant
No Logo Integrated Electrical Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey Pugh, Defendant
No Logo William W Reynolds, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/16/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER that this case is consolidated with H-04-3342 and this case is hereby closed. All further pleadings must be filed in H-04-3342.( Signed by Judge David Hittner ) Parties notified.(ealexander, ) (Entered: 11/19/2004)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons Initial Conference set for 2/4/2005 03:00 PM in Courtroom 9B before Judge Sim Lake. Parties notified.(mholland, ) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/4/2004, Entered: None
      COMPLAINT against Jeffrey Pugh, Integrated Electrical Services Inc, Herbert Allen, William W Reynolds (Filing fee $ 150) filed by James Elmore.(mholland, ) (Entered: 10/05/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 76 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?