Norman IP Holdings, LLC v. ZTE (USA) Inc, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 6:12-cv-00525
District Judge Leonard Davis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 31, 2017 at 4:51 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DiNovo Price Ellwanger & Hardy LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James W Coutu +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 jcoutu@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Gerald DiNovo +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 adinovo@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam G Price +1 512 539 2626 +1 512 539 2627 aprice@dpelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chester J. Shiu +1 512 539 2626 cshiu@dpelaw.com
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Counter-Claimant
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
ZTE USA, Inc. ZTE USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dentons (US) LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew Paul Harper +1 214 969 1700 +1 214 999 9162 matthew.harper@snrdenton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Taber Estes Thorne & Carr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anthony P. Miller +1 214 599 4000 +1 214 599 4099 amiller@estesokon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Thompson & Wright

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Ciccarelli +1 214 969 1599 max@tklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED +1 214 969 1211 +1 214 999 1565 justin.cohen@tklaw.com
ZTE Solutions, Inc. ZTE Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Norman IP Holdings, LLC, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
FINAL JUDGMENT that the parties take nothing and that all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All costs are to be borne by the party that incurred them. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED with prejudice in their entirety. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims and counterclaims between Plaintiff and Defendants are DISMISSED with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs in connection herewith. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/26/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/26/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/15/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER that Max Ciccarelli and Justin Cohen are withdrawn as counsel for ZTE and ECF notifications are to be terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 07/15/13. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Everett McClyde Upshaw on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Upshaw, Everett) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge John D. Love to conduct pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 03/27/13. cc:attys 3-27-13(mll, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/9/2012, Entered: None
            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Justin S. Cohen on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Cohen, Justin) (Entered: 11/09/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
              NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/13/2012, Entered: None
                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Massimo Ciccarelli on behalf of ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc. (Ciccarelli, Massimo) (Entered: 08/13/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                  ANSWER to 3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaims by Norman IP Holdings, LLC.(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE Solutions Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by ZTE (USA) Inc. (mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                        ANSWER to 2 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Norman IP Holdings, LLC by ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc..(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None
                          COMPLAINT against ZTE (USA) Inc., ZTE Solutions Inc., filed by Norman IP Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: (1) Exhibit 1, (2) Exhibit 2, (3) Exhibit 3, (4) Exhibit 4, (5) Exhibit 5)(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/10/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER severing defendants ZTE (USA) Inc and ZTE Solutions Inc from Civil Action 6:11cv495 and assigning to a new case. Signed by Judge Leonard Davis on 08/10/12. cc:attys 8-10-12(mll, ) (Entered: 08/12/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 153 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?