United States v. Alavi
Criminal Case Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:07-cr-00429
District Judge Neil V. Wake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 12, 2019 at 5:32 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Mohammad Reza Alavi, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 01/28/2010, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained David H. Laufman +1 202 342 8400 +1 202 342 8451 dlaufman@kelleydrye.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kimerer & Derrick PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/03/2010, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jason Mark Kalafat +1 602 279 5900 +1 602 264 5566 jkalafat@kimerer.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Michael D Kimerer +1 602 279 5900 +1 602 264 5566 MDK@kimerer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Miller & Chevalier Chartered

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Dawn Elise Murphy-Johnson +1 202 626 6050 +1 202 626 5801 dmurphyjohnson@milchev.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/28/2008, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Milagros Anais Cisneros +1 602 382 2700 +1 602 382 2800 milagros_cisneros@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (251) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 439 Filed: 3/26/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER denying 427 Defendant's Motion for Relief from Order of Supervised Release as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/26/10.(LSP) (Entered: 03/26/2010)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION: Michael D. Kimerer appearing Mohammad Reza Alavi. Attorney Jason Mark Kalafat terminated. (Kimerer, Michael) Modified on 2/3/2010 INCORRECT DOCUMENT EVENT SELECTED; THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Notice of Substitution by USA) TO (Notice of Substitution); FILER ADDED TO TEXT (REW). (Entered: 02/03/2010)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 2/3/2010, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Dawn E Murphy-Johnson appearing for Mohammad Reza Alavi (Murphy-Johnson, Dawn) (Entered: 02/03/2010)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 1/28/2010, Entered: None
        NOTICE of Withdrawal by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 01/28/2010)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 1/13/2010, Entered: None
          MOTION for Modification of Sentence Relief From Order of Supervised Release by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List and Transcript of Sentencing Resumed, # 2 Exhibit Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Birth Certificate of A. Mofarahi, # 4 Exhibit Letter from Mohammad E. Saneipour of Behbood Charkhesh E. Kara)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 01/13/2010)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 5/12/2009, Entered: None
            DISCHARGE OF LIEN: the lien imposed on real estate located in the County of Orange, State of California described as follows, is hereby fully DISCHARGED and the bond exonerated. (NOTE: see attached pdf for full details)(ESL) (Entered: 05/13/2009)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 4/7/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER exonerating the bonds posted for the defendant on 6/4/07. Specifically, a $200,000.00 bond secured by a Deed of Trust 64 and a $200,000.00 bond secured by Defendant's Agreement to Forfeit a 401(k) 67 are ordered exonerated as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/6/09.(TLJ) (Entered: 04/07/2009)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                  TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Sentencing-resumed held on 12/16/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 3/4/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Sentencing held on 12/15/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/25/2009. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2009. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2009. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/04/2009)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 2/27/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM Transcripts Requested: Sentencing by Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 12/15/08-12/16/08 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Laufman, David) (Entered: 02/27/2009)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None
                          PLEA AGREEMENT as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (SAT) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                            JUDGMENT AND COMMITMENT ISSUED as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1), Count(s) 1, 1s, 4s, Dismissed on government's oral motion at sentencing. Count(s) 2s, and 3s, Committed to custody of BOP for term of FIFTEEN (15)MOS on Counts Two and Three, concurrent, followed by supervised release for term of THREE (3) YRS on Counts Two and Three, concurrent. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 12/17/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 12/17/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 410 Filed: 12/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Sentencing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 12/16/2008. Sentence imposed. Judgment to issue.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 12/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Sentencing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 12/15/2008. Separate sealed minute entry for today's hearing also filed. Sentencing continued to 12/16/08 at 9:00 a.m. See text of minute entry. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 12/16/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 404 Filed: 12/10/2008, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 12/10/2008)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 12/9/2008, Entered: None
                                    SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 12/09/2008)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 402 Filed: 12/3/2008, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE re 399 Objection to Presentence Investigation Report by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 12/03/2008)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 401 Filed: 11/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER granting 400 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). ORDER that the Court's May 31, 2007, order regarding Mr. Alavi's conditions of release is modified (see order for details). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/4/08.(TLJ) (Entered: 11/05/2008)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/3/2008, Entered: None
                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Defendant's Motion to Modify Order Regarding Conditions of Release by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 11/03/2008)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 10/9/2008, Entered: None
                                            OBJECTION TO PRESENTENCE INVESTIGATION REPORT by Mohammad Reza Alavi Defendant's Objection to Draft Presentence Report (Laufman, David) (Entered: 10/09/2008)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 10/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER granting 397 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Sentencing is hereby continued from 10/20/08 to 12/15/08 at 2:30 p.m. before Judge Neil V. Wake. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/2/08.(SJF) (Entered: 10/02/2008)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 10/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                MOTION to Continue Sentencing by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 10/01/2008)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 8/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  ORDER denying 390 Ex Parte Motion to Seal Ex Parte Memorandum as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Defendant may file the Memorandum Re: Sealing of Memorandum 391 unsealed if he wishes. FURTHER ORDERED that the Memorandum of 6/16/08 381 isunsealed. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/25/08.(MAP) (Entered: 08/26/2008)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                    JUDGMENT entered in favor of the United States of America against Mohammad Reza Alavi in the amount of $7,550.00, plus post- judgment interest at the federal rate of 2.18% (DMT, ) (Entered: 08/19/2008)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 393 Motion to Continue Sentencing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Sentencing is hereby continued from 9/29/08 to 10/20/08 at 1:30 PM before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION to Continue Sentencing Hearing by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ORDER that Defendant Mohammad Reza Alavi pay the sum of $7,550.00 to the FPD by 8/15/08, as compensation for defense service, re 386 Order to Show Cause. Dft shall file proof of payment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or after 8/18/08, the Clerk shall enter judgment in favor or the United States against Dft Mohammad Reza Alavi in the amount of $7,550,00, plus post-judgment interest, if Dft has not before then paid and filed proof of that payment. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 7/14/08.(LSP) (Entered: 07/15/2008)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Change of Plea Hearing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 6/24/2008, Mohammad Reza Alavi enters plea of guilty to count(s) 2s.. Sentencing set for 9/29/2008 11:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (Attachments: # 1 lodged plea agreement)(DMT, ) (Entered: 06/25/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi: Change of Plea Hearing is hereby set for 6/24/2008 at 02:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/19/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                RESPONSE re 349 Memorandum, Response to Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of His Motion For Judgment Of Acquittal On Count Three of the Superseding Indictment by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 386 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to Mohammad Reza Alavi that Defendant show cause by 7/3/08, why he should not be ordered to pay $7,550.00 to the Federal Public Defender and judgment entered against him accordingly FURTHER ORDERED that the Defendant and the Federal Public Defender show cause by then why the Memorandum of 6/16/08 381 should be maintained under seal. The Clerk shall electronically serve this order upon the Federal Public Defender, Milagros Cisneros. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/17/08.(MAP) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                    MOTION To Modify Jury Instruction on Count One of the Superceding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 06/18/2008)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 349 Memorandum filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi. ORDERED setting hearing on Defendants Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on Count Three (doc. # 349) on July 3, 2008, at 11:00 a.m. Mr. Laufman may attend by telephone. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 6/17/08.(SJF) (Entered: 06/17/2008)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                        Ex Parte Memorandum re Reasonable Value of Fees by Mohammad Reza Alavi (MAP) MODIFIED TO UNSEAL PURSUANT TO ORDER #396, FILED ON 8/26/08 (MAP). (Entered: 06/16/2008)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 8 held on 5/27/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 7 held on 5/22/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 6 held on 5/21/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 5 P.M. Session held on 5/20/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 5 A.M. Session held on 5/20/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 4 held on 5/16/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams and David C German. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 3 held on 5/15/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams and David C German. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Jury Trial Day 2 held on 5/14/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams and David C German. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Trial Day 1 Opening Statements held on 5/13/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/26/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/3/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 5/13-5/27/08 before Judge Neil V Wake. (BAS, ) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                TEXT-ONLY ORDER re 346 Other Notice filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi. The proposed briefing schedule for Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on Count 3 is approved. The Government's response is to be filed by 6/13/08 and the Defendant's reply is to be filed by 6/20/08. (Please note: this is a text-only entry, no pdf document is attached.)(SJF) (Entered: 06/04/2008)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Mohammad Reza Alavi Defendant's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of His Motion For Judgment of Acquittal on Count Three of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 5/21/2008, 5/22/2008, 5/27/2008 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 06/03/2008)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY Minute Order as to Mohammad Reza Alavi: Due to scheduling conflicts, the Court hereby resets the trial in this matter from 8/1/08 to Monday, 8/4/08, at 8:30 a.m. The Court expects to be in trial the week of 8/4/08 on Monday through Friday. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Stipulated Proposed Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion for Judgment of Acquittal on Count Three of the Superseding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          REDACTED JURY VERDICT as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REDACTED Jury Notes/Questions During Deliberations as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (MAP) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              JURY VERDICT form unsigned as to count two as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                JURY VERDICT form unsigned as to count one as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION of fact by Mohammad Reza Alavi, USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION of fact by Mohammad Reza Alavi, USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Jury Instructions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Jury Questions during trial as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 333 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          WITNESS LIST by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            WITNESS LIST by Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi - that the August 1, 2008 trial on Counts 1 and 2 is a FIRM trial date, except that the parties are advised that, depending on other matters, the court may be able to begin the trial on July 30, 2008. The trial date will not be delayed. That any pretrial motions and further requested jury instructions be filed by June 20, 2008. This is a firm deadline, and no la motions will be allowed. Responses are due no later than June 27, 2008. The court will rule on any such motions by July 2, 2008, as the court will be unavailable from then until the trial date. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in the event of a further mistrial, a subsequent trial in this case will commence September 16, 2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/27/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 328 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Trial Day 8, Jury Trial Completed as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/27/2008, Mohammad Reza Alavi found guilty as to count(s) 3. Mistrial declared as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) for Count 1s,2s. Motions due by 6/20/2008. Jury Trial set for 8/1/2008 08:30 AM before Judge Neil V Wake as to Counts 1 and 2.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 327 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day Seven) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/22/2008. Jury deliberations continue. See text of minute entry. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day 6) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/21/2008. Jury instructed. Closing arguments. Jury deliberations begin. See text of attached minute entry for full details.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 5/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on May 20, 2008 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re 322 MOTION to Quash by Movant Arizona Public Service Company: Exhibits (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Quash Subpoena pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 17(C)(2) by Arizona Public Service Company as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day Five) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/20/2008. Defendant's Rule 29 Motion as to Counts 1 and 2 is denied. As to Count 3, the Rule 29 motion is deferred. Defendant's case. Defendant rests. Government's rebuttal case. Government rests. Jury instructions argued. See text of attached minute entry for full details.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi GOVERNMENT'S SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY ON MEANING OF "AUTHORIZED ACCESS" IN 18:1030(a)(2)(C) (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 313 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 5/14, 5/15 & 5/16/2008 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        TRIAL BRIEF by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day Four) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/16/2008. Government's case continues. Government rests. APS' Motion to Quash Subpoena is granted except to the extent of documents already produced. Defendant's Rule 29 Motion is taken under advisement. See text of attached minute entry for full details.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams/David German). (SJF) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day Three) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/15/2008. Government's case continues. Defendants motion to strike Exhibits 27 and 28 is argued and taken under advisement. Discussion held re protective order and the order is signed and will be filed under seal. 404b issue re Bank of America documents (Exhibit 38) are discussed. The issue is taken under advisement. See text of minute entry for full details of trial day. (Court Reporter David German/Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Amended Minute Entry as to Mohammad Reza Alavi Amending the Jury Trial minute entry for 5/14/2008. Reason for Amendment: to reflect both court reporters present. (Court Reporter David German/Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/15/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial (Day Two) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/14/2008. Government's case.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Jury Trial as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 5/13/2008 (Day One). Voir Dire begun and completed. Jury sworn. Preliminary Instructions. Government's opening. Defendant's opening. See text of minute entry for full details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/13/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRIAL BRIEF by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/12/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Reflecting that 3KeyMaster is Trademarked by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 235 Motion in Limine as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). ORDERED that the Governments Motion In Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Damage Assessment (doc. # 235) is granted, with a jury instruction that there is no direct harm to national security in this case. See attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/8/08.(SJF) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER denying 215 Motion to Dismiss filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Superseding Indictment on Grounds of Untimely Production of Brady Material is denied. See attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/8/08.(SJF) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            LODGED Proposed Defendant's Response to Government's Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Damage Assessment by Mohammad Reza Alavi re 275 motion to seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if motion to seal is granted. (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM (Amended as to date only) by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 5/2/08 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 235 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Damage Assessment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/07/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi set and held on 5/5/2008 regarding the pending motions. Defendant's Motion to Compel 231 is DENIED. Discussion held regarding the pending motions. Defendant is requested to file responses/replies by 5:00 p.m. on 5/6/08 if possible. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 5/2/08 Hrg before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit A - D)(MAP) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 231 First MOTION to Compel Pre-Trial Production of Prior Witness Statements (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 215 First MOTION to dismiss superseding indictment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Motion in Limine
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Concerning Damage Assessment by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 150 Motion to Dismiss Count 1 as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). See text of attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/5/08.(SJF) (Entered: 05/05/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Compel Pre-Trial Production of Prior Witness Statements by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM by Mohammad Reza Alavi 150 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 1 of Superseding Indictment filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi Supplemental Authorities (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE re 225 Other Notice of Intent to Seek Protective Order by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying 149 Motion to Dismiss Count 2 as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). See text of attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/2/08.(SJF) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE Government's Notice of Intent to Seek Protective Order by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi 167 Response to Motion, filed by USA Supplemental Authorities (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Strike the Governments Expert Witnesses by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kalafat, Jason) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE Supplement To That Motion To Dismiss by Mohammad Reza Alavi re 215 First MOTION to dismiss superseding indictment (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing and Pretrial Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 4/30/2008. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count 4 [doc. 148] is denied. Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of GJ Transcripts [doc. 145] is denied as moot. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts 2 and Counts 1 [docs. 149 and 150] are taken under advisement. Pretrial conference held. See text of attached minute entry for full details. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Proposed Voir Dire as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    First MOTION to dismiss superseding indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Laufman, David) (Entered: 05/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE Intent to Use 404B (2nd) by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TEXT-ONLY Minute Order: On Court's Motion, Final pretrial conference is reset to 4/30/08 at 11:00 a.m. and motion hearing on pending motions, docs. 145, 148, 149, and 150 are reset to 4/30/08 at 11:00 a.m. before Judge Neil V. Wake. This is a time change only. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 04/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi pursuant to 27 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, that Milagros A. Cisneros and the Office of the Federal Defender for the District of Arizona file by May 15, 2008, a motion for assessment of attorneys' fees and expenses against Defendant, supported with appropriate evidence, unless by then Defendant has paid those fees and expenses incurred. IT IS ORDERED directing the Clerk's Office to mail a copy of this order to Ms. Cisneros and all counsel of record. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 04/28/08.(DNH) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 4/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 178 Motion to Substitute Attorney. David Howard Laufman is substituted as retained counsel for dft Mohammad Reza Alavi replacing Milagros Anais Cisneros, for all further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 04/28/08.(DNH) (Entered: 04/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 4/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER denying 193 Motion to Continue Trial as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). See attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/27/08.(SJF) (Entered: 04/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 4/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Reply re 150 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 1 of Superseding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 4/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Reply re 149 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) 2 of the Superseding Indictment for Failure to State an Offense Corrected -- No exhibits by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 4/27/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Reply re 149 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) 2 of the Superseding Indictment for Failure to State an Offense by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WITNESS LIST by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sixth MOTION to Continue Trial by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter to State Department, # 2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Statement of the Case by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE PArties Position Regarding Juror Prescreen Order by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 165 Order (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Proposed Voir Dire by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Laufman, David) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 4/24/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER that defendant, through counsel have to 10:00 am on 4/29/08 to file replies in support of motions re: 145 , 148 , 149 , 150 or notify the court by then that defendant has elected to forgo reply briefs. Deferring ruling on 178 Motion to Substitute Attorney as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) until after timely filing of the pre-trial documents (doc. ## 153 and 78) and the reply briefs on pending motions. Current counsel for Defendant remains responsible for completion of all requirements until and unless discharged by order of the court.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/24/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 04/24/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 149 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) 2 of the Superseding Indictment for Failure to State an Offense (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kalafat, Jason) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 145 MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts in Relation to Count 4 of the Superseding Indictment Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts in Relation to Count 4 of the Superseding Indictment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 173 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1); granting 174 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1).Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov.(BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice byAttorney David H Laufman on behalf of Mohammad Reza Alavi. (BAS, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Dawn E Murphy-Johnson on behalf of Mohammad Reza Alavi. (BAS, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 142 Motion to Suppress as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1); denying 152 Motion to Compel as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/23/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 04/23/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 169 Motion for Extension of Time as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). The Governments time to respond to the pending motions is extended to 4/23/08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 152 MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts on Count 1 Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts Re: Count 1 of the Superseding Indictment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/22/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Extend Time by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 142 MOTION to Suppress Statements Re: Superseding Indictment (Evidentiary Hearing Requested) Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Suppress Statements Re: Superseding Indictment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 150 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 1 of Superseding Indictment Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count One of the Superseding Indictment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 148 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 4 of the Superseding Indictment as Unconstitutionally Vague Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count Four of the Superseding Indictment (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re jury prescreen order. See attached documents. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/21/08. (Attachments: # 1 prescreen letter form)(SJF) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER denying 163 Motion for Reconsideration as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). See text of attached order for details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/21/08.(SJF) (Entered: 04/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Reconsideration re 161 Fifth MOTION to Continue Trial filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 161 Motion to Continue Trial (Fifth Request) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/18/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Fifth MOTION to Continue Trial by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/16/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER re Mohammad Reza Alavi: Court orders the 96 Motion to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts; the 97 Motion to Dismiss Count 1; and, the 151 Second Motion to Dismiss Count 1 DENIED. See text of attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/16/08.(SJF) (Entered: 04/16/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              EXHIBIT LIST by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                WITNESS LIST by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 04/09/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Motion Hearing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 4/7/2008. Defendant's Motion to Compel 96 and Motion to Dismiss Count 97 are taken under advisement. Voluntariness hearing held. Motion to Suppress 98 is denied. Final pretrial conference reset from 4/16/08 to 4/30/08 at 10:00 a.m. All pending motions will be heard at that time. All pretrial documents are to be filed by 4/25/08. New plea deadline set for 4/25/08. (Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 04/08/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts on Count 1 by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Second MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 1 of Superseding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 1 of Superseding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EAR 99)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) 2 of the Superseding Indictment for Failure to State an Offense by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Count 4 of the Superseding Indictment as Unconstitutionally Vague by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts in Relation to Count 4 of the Superseding Indictment by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Suppress Statements Re: Superseding Indictment (Evidentiary Hearing Requested) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Ryan P Fayhee appearing for USA. (Fayhee, Ryan) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM AMENDED TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 2/27/2008 before Judge Michelle H. Burns. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 2/27/2008 before Judge Michelle H. Burns. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 04/01/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Mohammad Reza Alavi re 96 MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts (Oral Argument Requested) (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Mohammad Reza Alavi re 97 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Indictment (Oral Argument Requested) (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 03/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re: Arraignment held on 2/27/08 before Judge Michelle H Burns. Taped Proceeding Transcribed by Elizabeth A Lemke. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/16/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/28/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/24/2008. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by non-party to case Janey Henze of Gallagher & Kennedy for arraignment hearing proceedings held on 2/27/08 before Judge Michelle H Burns. (BAS, ) (Entered: 03/27/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 3/21/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 125 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) Motions due by 4/4/2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/20/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 03/21/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Seventh MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions on Superceding Indictment (Unopposed) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 03/20/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 96 MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts (Oral Argument Requested) Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 97 MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Indictment (Oral Argument Requested) Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 03/17/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, Motion Hearing on the pending motions is reset from 4/4/08 to 4/7/08 at 3:30 PM before Judge Neil V.Wake. (SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 03/11/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 98 MOTION to Suppress Statements (Evidentiary Hearing Requested) Government's Response to Defendant's Motion to Suppress Statements (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 03/06/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns: Arraignment as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) Count 1,1s,2s,3s,4s held on 2/27/2008. (Court Reporter COURTSMART). (KAL) (Entered: 02/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 2/28/2008. Oral motion to continue the 3/25/08 trial is granted and trial is reset to 5/13/08 at 9:00 a.m. (1 month). Pretrial Motions deadline extended to 3/28/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake. Pretrial documents due by 4/11/08. Motion hearing on pending motions [docs. 96, 97, 98] set 4/4/08 at 1:30 p.m. See text of attached minute entry for full details.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT-ONLY ORDER: As to Mohammad Reza Alavi, on Court's motion, Status Conference is hereby set for 2/28/2008 at 03:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/28/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Suppress Statements (Evidentiary Hearing Requested) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Counts: Count(s) Indictment (Oral Argument Requested) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: None Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Production of Grand Jury Transcripts (Oral Argument Requested) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 02/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          IT IS ORDERED that the Arraignment as to Mohammad Reza Alavi, presently set for 2/27/2008 at 10:45 am is RESET to 11:30 am. in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. THIS IS A TIME CHANGE ONLY!(emc)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 02/19/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Notice Issued as to Mohammad Reza Alavi Arraignment set for 2/27/2008 10:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. (DMT, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, 3s, 4s. (DMT, ) (Entered: 02/14/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 2/4/2008. Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions 91 is moot. Motions deadline extended to 2/25/2008. Jury Trial reset for 3/25/2008 at 09:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake (10 days). Pretrial Conference reset for 3/13/2008 at 01:30 PM before Judge Neil V Wake. Court extends plea deadline to 2/25/08.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (SJF) (Entered: 02/04/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sixth MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT-ONLY ORDER: On Court's Motion, Status Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi is hereby set for 2/4/2008 at 03:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake.(SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 01/29/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER, that at government's request due to conflict as to Mohammad Reza Alavi, Pretrial documents due by 2/11/2008. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 2/14/2008 01:30 PM before Judge Neil V Wake. Plea deadline set for 2/11/08. Responses to motions in limine shall be filed no later than February 11, 2008.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/24/08.(DMT, ) (Entered: 01/25/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER issued as to Mohammad Reza Alavi: Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2008 at 03:30 PM before Judge Neil V Wake. Plea deadline set for 2/15/08. Motions in limine due 2/1/08, responses 2/15/08. Pretrial documents due 2/19/08. See text of attached order for full details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/18/08.(SJF) (Entered: 01/18/2008)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 81 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Motion deadline extended to 12/14/2007. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 11/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Fourth MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 11/28/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 79 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Removing the special conditions of release requiring home confinement and electronic monitoring.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/25/07.(DMT, ) (Entered: 10/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 10/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi: Pretrial Conference set for 12/20/2007 at 03:00 PM before Judge Neil V Wake. Plea deadline is 12/20/07 at 3:00 PM. Motions due by 11/30/07. Pretrial documents due 12/17/07. See text of order for further details. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/17/07.(SJF) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 74 Motion to Continue Trial and to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Trial continued from 10/2/07 to 1/8/08 at 9:00 a.m. Motions due by 11/30/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/17/07.(SJF) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Status Conference as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 9/17/2007 regarding the 10/2/07 trial date. David Pimsner is present for the Government. Milagros Cisneros, AFPD, is present with Defendant, who is out of custody. Status of the case is discussed. By separate Order, the Court will grant the pending motion to continue trial and continue trial to 1/8/08 at 9:00 a.m. (7-8 days) and also set a Final Pretrial Conference and plea deadline of 12/20/07 at 3:00 p.m.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SJF) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER taking under advisement 74 Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Status conference set 9/17/07 at 9:00 a.m. is AFFIRMED. Defendant and counsel are to appear in person. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/10/07.(SJF) (Entered: 09/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Third MOTION to Continue Trial and, Third MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions (Unopposed) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 09/07/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. Status Conference set for 9/17/2007 at 09:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake regarding the 10/2/07 trial date. Motions to continue trial or plea date requests are due no later than 9/12/07. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/31/07.(SJF) (Entered: 08/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting 71 Motion to Continue Trial as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1); granting 71 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Trial continued from 9/4/07 to 10/2/07 at 9:00 a.m. before Judge Wake. Motions due by 9/7/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 8/6/07.(SJF) (Entered: 08/06/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Continue Trial and, Second MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions (Unopposed) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 08/03/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of agreement to forfeit property by Mohammad Reza Alavi as to Ariana Circle approved by Magistrate Judge Duncan. (DMT, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Mohammad Reza Alavi ($200,000.00)as to agreement to forfeit 401(k) JP Morgan/Chase. (DMT, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF CORRECTION BY THE CLERK as to Mohammad Reza Alavi re 64 Bond. Description of deficiency: Incorrect docket text. Follow up by Clerks Office: The deficiency indicated above has been addressed by the Clerk. Court use only: DMT. (DMT, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of agreement to forfeit property by Mohammad Reza Alavi approved by Magistrate Judge Duncan on 6/4/07. (DMT, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Appearance Bond ($200,000.00) Entered as to Mohammad Reza Alavi by Deed of Trust(DMT, ) Modified on 6/5/2007 (DMT, ). DOCKET TEXT CHANGED FROM 401(K) TO DEED OF TRUST ($200,000.00) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE to Office of Passport Policy and Advisory Services that Mohammad Reza Alavi is not to apply for issuance of a passport during pendency of this action re 62 Order Setting Conditions of Release (DMT, ) (Entered: 06/05/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) $400,000 bond. Signed by Judge David K Duncan on 6/4/07.(CLB) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge David K Duncan : Release Hearing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 6/4/2007. Defendant released on bond with conditions.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (CLB) (Entered: 06/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  IT IS ORDERED setting a release hearing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for 6/4/2007 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge David K. Duncan. Signed by Judge David K. Duncan on 6/1/07.(DKD,AH)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 06/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi, that the Order of April 20, 2007 (doc. # 24 ) is modified to the extent that the court finds that the Government fails to carry its burden of showing that Alavi is a serious flight risk for whom no condition or combination of conditions will reasonably assure his appearance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant is ordered released upon all the conditions previously ordered by the Magistrate Judge, plus notice of any attempt by Alavi to withdraw his 401k securities account before such withdrawal could be completed, and GPS monitoring. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the matter is referred to Magistrate Judge Duncan for implementation of the conditions of release and for further proceedings concerning release. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent Defendant for all proceedings in this case, and Defendant is ordered to repay the United States for those services at the conclusion of these proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defendant keep record of his expenses and services rendered in this case.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/31/07.(DMT, ) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE GOVERNMENT'S CLARIFICATION OF RECORD by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/31/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 53 Motion to Continue Trial as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1); granting 53 Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Trial continued from 7/3/07 to 9/4/07 at 9:00 a.m. Motions due by 8/3/2007. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/29/07.(SJF) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          First MOTION to Continue Trial and, First MOTION to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions (Unopposed) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 05/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Edward C Voss : Initial appearance; Arraignment as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) Count 1 held on 5/10/2007. Plea of not guilty entered. Motions due by 5/25/2007. Jury Trial set for 7/3/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Neil V Wake.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/15/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Status conference set for 5/18/07 at 9:30 a.m. before Judge Wake is vacated.(SJF)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 05/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received being Final Commitment and Warrant of Removal, with Waiver of Rights, minutes, affidavit, report and government's notice, order and docket sheet as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/2/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lawrence O Anderson : Arraignment held on 5/2/2007 reset. Arraignment reset for 5/16/2007 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson.(Court Reporter COURTSMART). (DMT, ) (Entered: 05/04/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 04/11/2007 & 04/17/2007 before Judge Neil V. Wake. (Pimsner, David) (Entered: 05/01/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 4/11/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Type of Hearing: Hearing re Government's Notice of Appeal and Request for Stay. (BAS, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 4/17/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. Court Reporter: Laurie A Adams. Type of Hearing: Hearing re Government's Notice of Appeal. (BAS, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Mohammad Reza Alavi for pretrial proceedings held on 4/17/07 before Judge Neil V Wake. (BAS, ) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ARREST Warrant Returned Executed on 4/9/07 as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) (Entered: 04/30/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Mohammad Reza Alavi for proceedings held on 4/11/2007 and 4/17/2007 before Judge Neil Wake. (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 25 Motion for Reconsideration of Order Denying Appointment of Counsel, only to the extent that the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent Defendant in his arraignment and in an appeal from the order detaining Defendant (doc. # 24) as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defendant keep record of his expenses and services rendered and that Defendant promptly liquidate such assets as arenecessary to obtain counsel and promptly reimburse for such expenses and services provided by the Federal Public Defender. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED setting a status hearing on May 18, 2007, at 9:30 a.m. concerning Defendants compliance with this order. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/23/07.(LCF) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting 23 Motion to Continue Arraignment as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Arraignment has been reset to 5/2/07 at 10:00 a.m. before Mag Judge Anderson.. Signed by Judge David K Duncan on 4/20/07.(LCF) (Entered: 04/24/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Reconsideration by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 18 Motion/ appeal from detention as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1).The order of the Magistrate Judge granting release on conditions is vacated, and Defendant is ordered detained pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §§ 3142(e) and 3145. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Magistrate Judges Order appointing counsel (doc. # 16) is vacated and denying 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1); Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/20/07.(DMT, ) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Continue Arraignment (Expedited Consideration Requested) by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/20/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: This is the time set for Hearing re: Government's Notice of Appeal 10 and Appeal of Release Order/Motion to Review Release Conditions 18 . Discussion held. Government's case: Jason Cammack is sworn and examined. Government rests. Argument presented.IT IS ORDERED taking under advisement [10 and 18] Government's Motions.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams) (MAW) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Mohammad Reza Alavi granting re 18 MOTION Appeal of Release Order/Motion to Review Release Conditions filed by USA. Dft is remanded to custody of US Marshal's Service until further order of this court. Evidentiary hrg will be set for the government's appeal of the release order after the dft has received an identity and removal hrg, in the Central District of CA.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/11/07.(DMT, ) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to Motion by Mohammad Reza Alavi re 18 MOTION Appeal of Release Order/Motion to Review Release Conditions (Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/17/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Order: Due to the ongoing proceedings in this matter, THE COURT ORDERS this case reassigned from the Honorable James A. Teilborg to the Honorable Neil V. Wake. All pleadings and documents filed from this date forward should reflect the new case number of CR07-429-PHX-NVW. Judge update as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. Judge Neil V Wake added. Judge James A Teilborg no longer assigned as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (SJF) (Entered: 04/16/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION Appeal of Release Order/Motion to Review Release Conditions by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (Welty, Joseph) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing by Mohammad Reza Alavi (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Cisneros, Milagros) (Entered: 04/13/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel: Milagros Anais Cisneros for Mohammad Reza Alavi appointed with appointment type: AFPD. Signed by Judge Edward C Voss on 4/12/2007.(MMO) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Neil V Wake: Hearing as to Mohammad Reza Alavi held on 4/11/2007 re 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi, 11 MOTION to Seal Document filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi and 10 MOTION for a stay filed by USA. Defendant not present. Attorney Milagros Anais Cisneros appointed for Mohammad Reza Alavi with appointment type: AFPD for this hearing only. MOTION to Appoint Counsel 12 filed by Mohammad Reza Alavi referred to Magistrate Judge Anderson for ruling. Motion to Seal Document 11 as to Mohammad Reza Alavi found as moot. Government's Motion to Stay 10 the order of Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian (CD CA) of 4/10/07, ordering the release of the defendant subject to certain conditions: GRANTED. Formal Order to follow. Hearing re: Government's Notice of Appeal set for 4/17/2007 9:00 AM in Courtroom 504, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Neil V Wake. Milagros Cisneros is also appointed for this hearing only. If defendant wishes to waive his presence at the above stated hearing, defense counsel Ginstling is to advise the court in writing no later than 4/13/2007.(Court Reporter Laurie Adams). (MMO) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Notice Issued as to Mohammad Reza Alavi Arraignment set for 4/25/2007 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge David K Duncan. (DMT, ) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            INDICTMENT as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1) count(s) 1. (DMT, ) (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (filed unsealed per order of 4/11/07) (REW, ) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Seal Motion to Appoint Counsel by Mohammad Reza Alavi. (REW, ) Modified on 4/12/2007 unsealed per order of 4/11/07 (REW, ). [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 04/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  GOVERNMENT'S NOTICE OF APPEAL AND REQUEST FOR A STAY as to Mohammad Reza Alavi of (the Central District of California) Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian's order of April 10, 2007, ordering the release of the defendant subject to certain conditions. The magistrate judge has agreed to stay her order of release until 5:00 p.m. on April 11, 2007, to enable the government to file this motion. Judge Wake drawn to hear appeal. (SMH) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 8 Motion to Unseal Case as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Edward C Voss on 4/10/07.(MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Unseal Complaint by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 04/11/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 5 Motion to Seal Amended Complaint as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 3/8/07.(MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Seal Amended Complaint by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 03/09/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              COMPLAINT (MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 1 Motion to Seal Complaint as to Mohammad Reza Alavi (1). Signed by Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 2/8/07.(MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Complaint by USA as to Mohammad Reza Alavi. (MAP) [2:07-mj-03074-LOA] (Entered: 02/12/2007)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX070438 as to Dawn E Murphy-Johnson. (BAS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX070439 as to David H Laufman. (BAS, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 254 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?