Michelle Albers et al v. Unilever United States Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-07160
District Judge Dale S. Fischer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 15, 2016 at 3:23 AM EDT (5.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Aimee Sheaffer, Plaintiff
No Logo Alisa Mendoza, Plaintiff
No Logo Andrea Fleck, Plaintiff
No Logo Angela Davis, Plaintiff
No Logo Annie Anchulis, Plaintiff
No Logo Ashley Mendard, Plaintiff
No Logo Barbara Wilson, Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda Nasalroad, Plaintiff
No Logo Brenda Stout, Plaintiff
No Logo Brittney DiPinto, Plaintiff
No Logo Carine Bell, Plaintiff
No Logo Channel Alexander, Plaintiff
No Logo Colleen Evola, Plaintiff
No Logo Connie Beckham, Plaintiff
No Logo Danielle Panzarino, Plaintiff
No Logo Dawn Buffington, Plaintiff
No Logo Debbie Watson, Plaintiff
No Logo Doreen Crume, Plaintiff
No Logo Dori-Ann Cryst, Plaintiff
No Logo Elsa Diaz, Plaintiff
No Logo Emma Memdoza, Plaintiff
No Logo Erin Cooke, Plaintiff
No Logo Eva Hallman, Plaintiff
No Logo Georgia Williams, Plaintiff
No Logo Gwen Yoney, Plaintiff
No Logo Jaime Rieckhof, Plaintiff
No Logo Karen Elghezouani, Plaintiff
No Logo Kelly Taylor, Plaintiff
No Logo Kimberly Edmonson, Plaintiff
No Logo Kin Meis, Plaintiff
No Logo Lana Oswaldson, Plaintiff
No Logo Leeann Ledlow, Plaintiff
No Logo Libby Estrada, Plaintiff
No Logo Lilla Keresztury, Plaintiff
No Logo Lindsey Morehead, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Corniel, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Hurley, Plaintiff
No Logo Lisa Schleffer, Plaintiff
No Logo Madeline Heffelfinger, Plaintiff
No Logo Mandy Carlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Maria Moran, Plaintiff
No Logo Michelle Albers, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wasserman Comden & Casselman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert Lawrence Esensten +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 996 8266 resensten@wccelaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jesse Bernard Levin +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 345 0162 jbl@rpnalaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gregory B Scarlett +1 818 705 6800 +1 818 345 0162 gbscarlett@sbcglobal.net
No Logo Monica Kaufer, Plaintiff
No Logo Nettie Jordan, Plaintiff
No Logo Pattie Freudenberg, Plaintiff
No Logo Rose Dandaro, Plaintiff
No Logo Rose Derdiarian, Plaintiff
No Logo Sarah Galluppi, Plaintiff
No Logo Shay Rogers, Plaintiff
No Logo Sima Khamisi, Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Rodey, Plaintiff
No Logo Suzanne Light, Plaintiff
No Logo Taejari Morris, Plaintiff
No Logo Tana Werner, Plaintiff
No Logo Tarryn O'Neil, Plaintiff
No Logo Tasha Storing, Plaintiff
No Logo Tina Smithberger, Plaintiff
No Logo Travonda Peterson, Plaintiff
No Logo Vanessa Gola, Plaintiff
No Logo Vickey Rothery, Plaintiff
No Logo Victoria Hamlin, Plaintiff
No Logo Yaffa Tompkins, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Unilever United States, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiff Hardin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sondra A. Hemeryck +1 312 258 5743 +1 312 258 5600 shemeryck@schiffhardin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paula J Morency +1 312 258 5549 +1 312 258 5600 pmorency@schiffhardin.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jeffrey R. Williams +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 jwilliams@mjllp.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sarah Diane Youngblood +1 415 901 8700 +1 415 901 8701 syoungblood@schiffhardin.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 365 - Personal Injury: Product Liability
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Unilever United States Inc. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2013 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Sondra A. Hemeryck, # 3 Exhibits to the Decleration of Sondra A. Hemeryck, # 4 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None
    JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan - REVISED ; estimated length of trial 15-25 days, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albers, Channel Alexander, Annie Anchulis, Connie Beckham, Carine Bell, Dawn Buffington, Mandy Carlin, Erin Cooke, Lisa Corniel, Doreen Crume, Dori-Ann Cryst, Rose Dandaro, Angela Davis, Rose Derdiarian, Brittney DiPinto, Elsa Diaz, Kimberly Edmonson, Karen Elghezouani, Libby Estrada, Colleen Evola, Andrea Fleck, Pattie Freudenberg, Sarah Galluppi, Vanessa Gola, Eva Hallman, Victoria Hamlin, Madeline Heffelfinger, Lisa Hurley, Nettie Jordan, Monica Kaufer, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Leeann Ledlow, Suzanne Light, Kin Meis, Emma Memdoza, Ashley Mendard, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Lindsey Morehead, Taejari Morris, Brenda Nasalroad, Tarryn O'Neil, Lana Oswaldson, Danielle Panzarino, Travonda Peterson, Jaime Rieckhof, Susan Rodey, Shay Rogers, Vickey Rothery, Lisa Schleffer, Aimee Sheaffer, Tina Smithberger, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Kelly Taylor, Yaffa Tompkins, Debbie Watson, Tana Werner, Georgia Williams, Barbara Wilson, Gwen Yoney, Defendant Unilever United States Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - revised Schedule)(Esensten, Robert) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/10/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation and Application to extend Page Limits for Defendant's Motion to dismiss and to set hearing and briefing schedule 24 is approved. Unilever hereby may file a memorandum in support of its Motion to Dismiss that shall not exceed 28-pages. FURTHER, the Court sets the following briefing scheduling and hearing date for Unilever's Motion to Dismiss: January 31, 2013 last day for Plaintiffs' to file and serve Opposition; February 14, 2013 last day for Unilever to file and serveReply; and, March 4, 2013 at 1:30 p.m. hearing on Motion to Dismiss. (ir) (Entered: 01/10/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/9/2013, Entered: None
        Joint STIPULATION to Exceed Page Limitation as to Memorandum in support of Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sarah Youngblood in Support of Stipulation and Application to Extend Page Limits for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Set Hearing and Briefing Schedule, # 2 Proposed Order Extending Page Limits for Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and to Set Hearing and Briefing Schedule)(Youngblood, Sarah) (Entered: 01/09/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Plaintiff has either failed to file the Joint Report as required by the Scheduling Conference Order or has failed to comply with this Court's Scheduling Conference Order, which specifically requires that the parties agree to dates as set forth in Exhibit "A". The date previously set for the Scheduling Conference is vacated. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than 1/21/13 why this action should not be dismissed, and why sanctions should not be imposed pursuant to Local Rule 83-7. A hearing on this Order to Show Cause is set for 1/28/13.The filing of a Joint Rule 26(f) Report by 1/21/13, shall be deemed a sufficient response to this Order to Show Cause. If a timely Report is filed, a scheduling conference will be held in lieu of the hearing on the Order to Show Cause. Counsel are reminded to file mandatory paper chamber copies. Scheduling Conference set for 1/28/2013 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(dp) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/08/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
            JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial unknown, filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albers, Channel Alexander, Annie Anchulis, Connie Beckham, Carine Bell, Dawn Buffington, Mandy Carlin, Erin Cooke, Lisa Corniel, Doreen Crume, Dori-Ann Cryst, Rose Dandaro, Angela Davis, Rose Derdiarian, Brittney DiPinto, Elsa Diaz, Kimberly Edmonson, Karen Elghezouani, Libby Estrada, Colleen Evola, Andrea Fleck, Pattie Freudenberg, Sarah Galluppi, Vanessa Gola, Eva Hallman, Victoria Hamlin, Madeline Heffelfinger, Lisa Hurley, Nettie Jordan, Monica Kaufer, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Leeann Ledlow, Suzanne Light, Kin Meis, Emma Memdoza, Ashley Mendard, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Lindsey Morehead, Taejari Morris, Brenda Nasalroad, Tarryn O'Neil, Lana Oswaldson, Danielle Panzarino, Travonda Peterson, Jaime Rieckhof, Susan Rodey, Shay Rogers, Vickey Rothery, Lisa Schleffer, Aimee Sheaffer, Tina Smithberger, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Kelly Taylor, Yaffa Tompkins, Debbie Watson, Tana Werner, Georgia Williams, Barbara Wilson, Gwen Yoney, Defendant Unilever United States Inc.. (Esensten, Robert) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
              SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Unilever United States Inc amending Amended Complaint,, 10 ,filed by Plaintiffs Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Kimberly Edmonson, Leeann Ledlow, Michelle Albers, Emma Memdoza, Sarah Galluppi, Dori-Ann Cryst, Eva Hallman, Georgia Williams, Lindsey Morehead, Lisa Hurley, Connie Beckham, Gwen Yoney, Tana Werner, Susan Rodey, Victoria Hamlin, Brenda Nasalroad, Elsa Diaz, Colleen Evola, Angela Davis, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Nettie Jordan, Lisa Schleffer, Erin Cooke, Doreen Crume, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Debbie Watson, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Shay Rogers, Mandy Carlin, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Vickey Rothery, Channel Alexander, Danielle Panzarino, Ashley Mendard, Madeline Heffelfinger, Libby Estrada, Travonda Peterson, Jaime Rieckhof, Barbara Wilson, Annie Anchulis, Yaffa Tompkins, Carine Bell, Lana Oswaldson, Tina Smithberger, Tarryn O'Neil, Aimee Sheaffer, Monica Kaufer, Dawn Buffington, Pattie Freudenberg, Vanessa Gola, Andrea Fleck, Kelly Taylor, Kin Meis, Brittney DiPinto, Rose Dandaro (bp) (Entered: 12/13/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER APPROVING THE PARTIES' STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND STIPULATION AND APPLICATION TO CONTINUE RELEVANT DATES by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation for Leave, 19 . Plaintiffs are hereby granted leave to further amend their First Amended Complaint: Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint by December 11, 2012. The FRCP Rule 16(B) Scheduling Conference is continued from December 17, 2012 at 11:00 a.m. to January 14, 2013 at 11:00 a.m.; and The deadline for the Parties to file their Joint FRCP Rule 26(f) Report is continued from December 19, 2012 to January 7, 2013. (bp) (Entered: 12/03/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/30/2012, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION for Leave to To Amend Complaint and Stipulation and Application to Continue Relevant Dates filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albers, Channel Alexander, Connie Beckham, Mandy Carlin, Erin Cooke, Lisa Corniel, Doreen Crume, Dori-Ann Cryst, Angela Davis, Rose Derdiarian, Elsa Diaz, Kimberly Edmonson, Karen Elghezouani, Colleen Evola, Sarah Galluppi, Eva Hallman, Victoria Hamlin, Lisa Hurley, Nettie Jordan, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Leeann Ledlow, Suzanne Light, Emma Memdoza, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Lindsey Morehead, Taejari Morris, Brenda Nasalroad, Susan Rodey, Shay Rogers, Vickey Rothery, Lisa Schleffer, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Debbie Watson, Tana Werner, Georgia Williams, Gwen Yoney. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration OF ATTORNEY JESSE B. LEVIN IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND STIPULATION AND APPLICATION TO CONTINUE RELEVANT DATES, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Certification of Service)(Levin, Jesse) (Entered: 11/30/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting 13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sondra Hemeryck on behalf of defendant Unilever United States Inc, designating Jeffrey Williams as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                      ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting 14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Paula Morency on behalf of defendant Unilever United States Inc, designating Jeffrey Williams as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/21/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re Stipulation to Continue the 12/3/12 Scheduling Conference 15 is APPROVED. The Scheduling Conference originally set for 12/3/12 at 11:00 is hereby continued to 12/17/2012 11:00 AM. Based on the continued Scheduling Conference date and the agreement of the parties, the FRCP 26(f) Joint Report must be filed on or before 12/10/12. (ir) (Entered: 11/21/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                          STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from 12/3/12 to 12/17/12 filed by Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Declaration of Jeffrey R. Williams in Support of Stipulation and Application to Continue Scheduling Conference, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order Continuing Scheduling Conference)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                            APPLICATION for attorney Paula J. Morency to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11274557 paid.) filed by Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/19/2012, Entered: None
                              APPLICATION for attorney Sondra A. Hemeryck to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11274277 paid.) filed by Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/19/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Kimberly Edmonson, Leeann Ledlow, Michelle Albers, Emma Memdoza, Sarah Galluppi, Dori-Ann Cryst, Eva Hallman, Georgia Williams, Lindsey Morehead, Lisa Hurley, Connie Beckham, Gwen Yoney, Tana Werner, Susan Rodey, Victoria Hamlin, Brenda Nasalroad, Elsa Diaz, Colleen Evola, Angela Davis, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Nettie Jordan, Lisa Schleffer, Erin Cooke, Doreen Crume, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Debbie Watson, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Shay Rogers, Mandy Carlin, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Vickey Rothery, Channel Alexander. upon All Defendants. Waiver of Service signed by Jeffrey R. Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Certification of Service)(Levin, Jesse) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None
                                  NON EXECUTED NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Kimberly Edmonson, Leeann Ledlow, Michelle Albers, Emma Memdoza, Sarah Galluppi, Dori-Ann Cryst, Eva Hallman, Georgia Williams, Lindsey Morehead, Lisa Hurley, Connie Beckham, Gwen Yoney, Tana Werner, Susan Rodey, Victoria Hamlin, Brenda Nasalroad, Elsa Diaz, Colleen Evola, Angela Davis, Tasha Storing, Brenda Stout, Nettie Jordan, Lisa Schleffer, Erin Cooke, Doreen Crume, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Sima Khamisi, Debbie Watson, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Shay Rogers, Mandy Carlin, Alisa Mendoza, Maria Moran, Vickey Rothery, Channel Alexander, upon Defendant Unilever United States Inc acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 10/12/2012. Acknowledgment of Service signed by not signed, not indicated. (shb) Modified on 10/17/2012 (shb). (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                    FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Unilever United States Inc amending Complaint - (Discovery) 1 ; Jury Demand,filed by Plaintiffs Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Kimberly Edmonson, Michelle Albers, Lisa Hurley, Tasha Storing, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Vickey Rothery, Maria Moran, Channel Alexander, Connie Beckham, Sarah Galluppi, Colleen Evola, Sima Khamisi, Georgia Williams, Erin Cooke, Susan Rodey, Elsa Diaz, Emma Memdoza, Gwen Yoney, Doreen Crume, Lindsey Morehead, Alisa Mendoza, Dori-Ann Cryst, Nettie Jordan, Eva Hallman, Brenda Stout, Lisa Schleffer, Tana Werner, Debbie Watson, Mandy Carlin, Victoria Hamlin, Angela Davis, Shay Rogers, Leeann Ledlow, Brenda Nasalroad (shb) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer, re granting Stipulation for Extension of Time to File 8 . (rne) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                        STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to Initial Complaint filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey R. Williams in support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER RE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The Joint Report must include the completed Schedule of Pretrial and Trial dates. Trial counsel are ordered to appear in person unless counsel have obtained an order from the Court. Scheduling Conference set for 12/3/2012 11:00 AM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (dp) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/13/2012, Entered: None
                                            STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Unilever United States Inc answer now due 10/12/2012, re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Specially-Appearing Defendant Unilever United States Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jeffrey R. Williams Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Initial Complaint by not More Than 30 Days (Local Rule 8-3), # 2 Proposed Order Extending Time to Respond to Initial Complaint)(Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Hurley, Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Kimberly Edmonson, Michelle Albers, Tasha Storing, Vicey Rothery, Maria Moran, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Channel Alexander, upon Defendant Unilever United States Inc served on 8/24/2012, answer due 9/14/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Scott LaScala, Process Specialist, The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent for Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Scarlett, Gregory) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Courts website under Judge Fischers Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judges Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (vdr) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap) (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Michelle Albers, Channel Alexander, Lisa Corniel, Rose Derdiarian, Kimberly Edmonson, Karen Elghezouani, Lisa Hurley, Lilla Keresztury, Suzanne Light, Maria Moran, Taejari Morris, Vicey Rothery, Tasha Storing. (ghap) (jp). (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      COMPLAINT against Defendant Unilever United States Inc. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Carla Woehrle.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Lisa Hurley, Suzanne Light, Karen Elghezouani, Lisa Corniel, Taejari Morris, Kimberly Edmonson, Michelle Albers, Tasha Storing, Vicey Rothery, Maria Moran, Rose Derdiarian, Lilla Keresztury, Channel Alexander.(ghap) (jp). (Entered: 08/22/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 635 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?