USA v. Newman
Criminal Case California Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:03-cr-00160-WBS

Tags
Last Updated February 12, 2018 at 2:35 PM ST (3.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Olusere Olowoyeye, GOVT +1 916 554 2891 Olusere.Olowoyeye@usdoj.gov

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nathan Aaron Newman (1)
Office Sacramento
Filed 4/3/2003
County Solano
Terminated 8/13/2003
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=MP.F
Offense Level 4
21841B=MP.F POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE MARIJUANA
Count 2
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 924F.F
Offense Level 4
18924F.F POSSESSION OF A FIREARM IN FURTHERANCE OF A DRUG TRAFFICKING CRIME
Count 3
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922N.F
Offense Level 4
18922N.F FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM
Count 4
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841B=MP.F
Offense Level 4
21841B=MP.F POSSESSION WITH INTENT TO DISTRIBUTE MARIJUANA
Count 5
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 924F.F
Offense Level 4
18924F.F POSSESSION OF A FIREARM IN FURTHERANCE OF A DRUG TRAFFICKING OFFENSE
Count 6
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 922N.F
Offense Level 4
18922N.F FELON IN POSSESSION OF A FIREARM
Defendant Custody Status Custody This Court
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 1/14/2013, Entered: 1/14/2013 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
REVOCATION JUDGMENT and COMMITMENT as to Nathan Aaron Newman signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/12/2013. (Kirksey Smith, K)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: 1/7/2013 Final Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
    MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Senior Judge William B. Shubb: FINAL REVOCATION HEARING re Supervised Release Violation on Charges 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5 as to Nathan Aaron Newman held on 1/7/2013. Defendant having previously admitted to Charges 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5 on 11/13/2012 and the Court found that the defendant had violated the terms and conditions of supervised release as stated in the petition filed 10/23/2012, Court orders Supervised Release REVOKED. Defendant is hereby committed to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons to be imprisoned for a term of thirty (30) months, with no further supervised release to follow. Court orders that any previously imposed criminal monetary penalties that remain unpaid shall remain in effect. Government Counsel Olusere Olowoyeye present. Defense Counsel John Baumgardner for Tim Pori present. Custody Status: Defendant is present, in custody. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. cc: USPO, USM. (Kirksey Smith, K)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/6/2013, Entered: 1/6/2013 Notice of Attorney Appearance - ATY
      NOTICE of ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: John F. Baumgardner appearing for Nathan Aaron Newman. Attorney Baumgardner, John F. ADDED. (Baumgardner, John) Modified on 1/7/2013 (Michel, G).
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: 12/12/2012 Minute Order - CRCourt Filing
        MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY): On the Court's own motion, and with the agreement of counsel, the Admit/Deny Hearing is continued from 12/18/2012 to 1/7/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. cc: USPO-Sac. (Kirksey Smith, K)
          LREF
          Legal Document 27 Filed: 12/11/2012, Entered: 12/11/2012 sentencing memorandum
          SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Nathan Aaron Newman. (Pori, Tim)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: 11/13/2012 Admit/Deny HearingCourt Filing
            MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Judge William B. Shubb: ADMIT/DENY HEARING regarding petition for violation of SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Nathan Aaron Newman held on 11/13/2012. Court confers with counsel and defendant re petition filed 10/23/2012. Defendant informs the Court of his intention to admit to Charges 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5. Defendant questioned by the Court and advised of his Constitutional Rights. Defendant now admits to Charges 1, 2, 3, 4 and 5 of the petition. Court finds admissions knowingly and voluntarily made and accepts them, and finds Defendant in violation of the terms and conditions of Supervised Release. Court special sets the Disposition Hearing re Supervised Release Violation on 12/18/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Defendant ordered to return on said date and time. Government Counsel Olusere Olowoyeye present. Defense Counsel Tim Pori present. Custody Status: Defendant is present, in custody. Court Reporter: Cathie Bodene. cc: USPO- Sac. (Kirksey Smith, K)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: 11/5/2012 Return of Service .....
              ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 11/01/12 as to Nathan Aaron Newman. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/2/2012 Detention OrderCourt Filing
                DETENTION ORDER as to Nathan Aaron Newman signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/1/2012. (Zignago, K.)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: 11/1/2012 Initial Appearance of Revocation ProceedingsCourt Filing
                  MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd: INITIAL APPEARANCE RE REVOCATION OF SUPERVISED RELEASE as to Nathan Aaron Newman held on 11/1/2012. Appearance entered by Olusere Olowoyeye for USA, Tim Allen Pori made general appearance as retained cousnel for Nathan Aaron Newman. Dft advised rights and pending charges, waived prompt preliminary examination, and request hearing before District Court Judge. Further proceedings set for 11/13/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb. Govt moved for detention on flight and danger, defense submitted on detention. Court ordered dft detained pending further proceedings. Government Counsel Olusere Olowoyeye present. Defense Counsel Tim Pori present. Custody Status: present, in custody. Court Reporter/CD Number: Jonathan Anderson/1. (Buzo, P)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/23/2012, Entered: 10/23/2012 Petition for Violation of Prob/Supervised Release-Prb 12C - ARREST onlyCourt Filing
                    PROBATION FORM 12C signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 10/23/2012 ORDERING the issuance of a warrant; initial appearance and detention hearing before Magistrate Judge; NO BAIL as to Nathan Aaron Newman. (Reader, L)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Blank 20 Filed: 4/5/2004, Entered: 4/6/2004 Application/Request - General
                      REQUEST by Dft Nathan Aaron Newman for a Recommendation of change to a North Carolina Facility (lm)
                        LREF
                        Blank 19 Filed: 4/1/2004, Entered: 4/2/2004 Application/Request - General
                        REQUEST by defendant Nathan Aaron Newman for designation to a North Carolina Facility (lm)
                          LREF
                          Blank 17 Filed: 3/9/2004, Entered: 3/9/2004 Remark
                          JUDGMENT and Commitment returned executed on 1/23/04 as to Nathan Aaron Newman (old)
                            LREF
                            Blank 18 Filed: 3/8/2004, Entered: 3/10/2004 Notice of Change of Address - CR
                            NOTICE of classification by US Department of Justice Federal Bureau of prisons re Dft Nathan Newman (lm)
                              LREF
                              Blank 16 Filed: 9/3/2003, Entered: 9/4/2003 Minute Order - CRCourt Filing
                              MINUTE ORDER by Sally Hoover for Judge William B. Shubb re: court modifies it's recommendation to the BOP and now recommends that dft Nathan Newman be incarcerated in an Oregon facility, but only insofar as this accords with security classification and space availability (daw)
                                LREF
                                Blank 15 Filed: 8/19/2003, Entered: 8/20/2003 Judgment and CommitmentCourt Filing
                                JUDGMENT and Commitment issued as to Nathan Aaron Newman by Judge William B. Shubb (lm)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: 8/14/2003 sentencingCourt Filing
                                  MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb RE: Judgment and Sentencing; Sentencing Nathan Aaron Newman (1) count(s) 3, 6 Imprisonment of 120 months as to counst 3 and 6 to be served concurrently for a total of 120 months; TSR 36 as to cts 3 & 6 concurrently for a total of 36 months; recommendation of CA institution; 500 hr drug treatment program; S/A $200 immediately; fine waived ; counts as to Nathan Aaron Newman (1) count(s) 1, 2 , 4 , 5 DISMISSED ; terminating party Nathan Aaron Newman , CASE TERMINATED Kelly O'Halloran (lm)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/28/2003, Entered: 7/29/2003 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                    NOTICE of hearing (Memo) sentencing hearing CONTINUED to 9:00 8/13/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman (cc: all counsel) (crf)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 12 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                      MINUTES before Judge William B Shubb RE: Change of Plea; Withdrew not guilty plea; guilty plea entered by Nathan Aaron Newman (1) count(s) 3 and 6 of the Indictment ; Sentencing hearing SET for 9:00 8/6/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman C/R Angela Weston, Capitol (lm)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 11 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 plea agreement
                                        PLEA Agreement as to Nathan Aaron Newman (lm)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/28/2003, Entered: 5/29/2003 Schedule of Disclosure for PSR
                                          SCHEDULE FOR DISCLOSURE OF PSR as to defendant Nathan Aaron Newman (lm)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/30/2003, Entered: 4/30/2003 Stipulation - CRCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER by Chief Judge William B Shubb to continued Status Conference and for excludable time is GRANTED; Status Conference CONTINUED from 5/7/03 to 9:00 5/28/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman ; Excludable T4 started for Nathan Aaron Newman start date: 5/7/03 end date: 5/28/03 (cc: all counsel) - (lm)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 Detention OrderCourt Filing
                                              ORDER of Detention of Nathan Aaron Newman by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds (sk)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/28/2003, Entered: 4/29/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: Detention Hearing detention hearing held on 4/28/03 as to defendant Nathan Aaron Newman ; government seeks detention and submits on PTS report and the indictment; defense submits; defendant ordered detained; C/R None (sk)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank  Order - CR
                                                  LODGED Stipulation by Dft Nathan Aaron Newman, Pltf USA to Continue the Status Conference from 5/7/03 to 5/28/03 (lm)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 4/22/2003, Entered: 4/23/2003 Notice of Hearing - CR
                                                    NOTICE of hearing (MEMORANDUM) detention hearing RESET on 2:00 4/24/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman (sk)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 5 Filed: 4/16/2003, Entered: 4/17/2003 arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds; dft present and in custody; dft Nathan Aaron Newman arraigned; not guilty plea entered; Attorney appointed ; detention hearing SET on 2:00 4/21/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman; status hearing SET for 9:00 5/7/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman ; jury trial requested; appearances by Kym Smith for govt C/R ECRO (daw)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 4 Filed: 4/10/2003, Entered: 4/11/2003 Warrant Returned - CR
                                                        ARREST Warrant returned executed as to defendant Nathan Aaron Newman defendant arrested on 4/9/03 (lm)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 3 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 Order - CRCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER RE: EXCLUDABLE TIME by Chief Judge William B. Shubb (cc: all counsel) (ak)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 2 Filed: 4/9/2003, Entered: 4/10/2003 In Court Hearing - CRCourt Filing
                                                            MINUTES before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds RE: Arraignment: status of representation, entry of plea and detention hearing SET for 2:00 4/16/03 for Nathan Aaron Newman , first appearance of Nathan Aaron Newman ; defense indicates dft is retaining counsel and requests matter be continued one week; dft remanded pending hearing; C/R Tape 1 of 1 (ak)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 1 Filed: 4/3/2003, Entered: 4/4/2003 indictment
                                                              INDICTMENT by US Attorney Kymberly Smith Counts filed against Nathan Aaron Newman (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6 (lm)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank  Remark
                                                                ARREST Warrant issued for Nathan Aaron Newman by Magistrate Judge Dale A Drozd No Bail (lm)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 45 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?