Target Corporation v. LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:12-cv-01912
District Judge Joan N. Ericksen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 15, 2016 at 10:58 AM EDT (5.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Target Corporation Target Corporation, Plaintiff

Represented by Faegre Baker Daniels LLP

v.
No Logo American Pavement Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gaskins, Bennett, Birrell, Schupp, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew S Birrell +1 612 333 9500 +1 612 333 9579 abirrell@gaskinsbennett.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul C Dworak +1 612 333 9504 +1 612 333 9579 pdworak@gaskinsbennett.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy R Schupp +1 612 333 9500 +1 612 333 9579 tschupp@gaskinsbennett.com
No Logo Asphalt Maintenance Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fisher Bren & Sheridan LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Bradley D Fisher +1 612 332 0100 +1 612 332 9951 bfisher@fisherbren.com
TERMINATED: 12/04/2012 Leah K Flygare +1 612 332 0100 +1 612 332 9951 lflygare@fisherbren.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy M Sieben +1 612 332 0100 +1 612 332 9951 asieben@fisherbren.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McGuinn Hillsman & Palefsky

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ted L. Walker +1 713 225 1354 TLWalkerLaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Walker Firm, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam R. Fracht +1 713 225 1354 afracht@walker-firm.com
No Logo James Stinson, Defendant
No Logo LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Twin Cities Law Firm LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Aaron Hall ahall@twincitiesfirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Lucas J Thompson lt@twincitiesfirm.com
No Logo Leslie J. Bailey, Defendant
No Logo Rose Paving Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Greene Espel PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew M Luger +1 612 373 0830 +1 612 373 0929 aluger@gr-espel.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Erin Sindberg Porter +1 612 373 0380 +1 612 373 0929 esindbergporter@greeneespel.com

Represented by Halunen & Associates

Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Office of Albert F. Ferolie PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/01/2012, LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert F. Ferolie +1 312 715 0255 albertferolie@ferolielaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Law Offices of Brian J. Stephenson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brian J. Stephenson +1 312 804 4783 brian@bstephensonlaw.com
No Logo Sabas Trujillo, Defendant
No Logo Timothy Helstad, Defendant
No Logo United Paving Company, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E Durchfort +1 310 444 8898 david.durchfort@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Skolnick & Shiff, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew H Bardwell +1 612 677 7600 +1 612 677 7601 abardwell@skolnick-shiff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rolin L Cargill +1 612 677 7600 +1 612 677 7601 rcargill@skolnick-shiff.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William R. Skolnick +1 612 677 7600 +1 612 677 7601 wskolnick@skolnick-shiff.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (126) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 309
    LREF
    Blank 194 Filed: 6/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER: American and Helstad's Motion to Dismiss 139 , Asphalt and Stinson's Motion to Dismiss 157 , and United and Trujillo's Motion to Dismiss 165 are GRANTED. Count I (RICO claim) and Count V (Sherman Act claim) of the Second A mended Complaint are DISMISSED without prejudice. Count IV (fraud claim) of the Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice against American, Asphalt, United, Helstad, Stinson, and Trujillo. Rose Paving and Rose's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings 172 is DENIED. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on June 7, 2013. (CBC)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
      MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
        RESPONSE in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Rose Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
          MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Bardwell, Andrew) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Adam R. Fracht, # 2 Exhibit(s) Ex 1, # 3 Exhibit(s) proposed order, # 4 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Ted) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/2/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER: American Pavement Solutions and Helstads Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Count One of Plaintiffs Complaint 17 is DENIED as moot. The hearing on January 10, 2013, at 9:30 a.m. is CANCELLED. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on January 2, 2013. (CBC) (Entered: 01/02/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Target Corporation re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                  MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 112 Motion to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings filed by Target Corporation. (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Target Corporation re 115 Affidavit in Support of Motion, Exhibits 27-31 filed under seal (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                      AFFIDAVIT of Robert Meissner in SUPPORT OF 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Weinberg in SUPPORT OF 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-3, # 2 Exhibit(s) 4-27, 32)(Weinberg, Michelle)SEALED DOCUMENT RECEIVED IN CLERKS OFFICE ON 12/28/12 Modified on 1/3/2013 (LGL). (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                            NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 112 MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 2/5/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/31/2012, Entered: None
                              MOTION to Alter/Amend/Supplement Pleadings 34 Amended Complaint by Target Corporation. (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/31/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                REPLY re 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rose Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Weinberg in OPPOSITION TO 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-I)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 12/04/2012)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        PROTECTIVE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED pursuant to Fed. R.Civ. P. 26(c)(1) that confidential information be disclosed only in designated ways: SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/27/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/27/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Minute Entry: Civil Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/27/2012. Defendants Asphalt Maintenance Inc. and James Stinson's Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. No. 82 ), is GRANTED; Joint Motion by Defendants United Paving Company and Sabas Trujillo for a Protective Order (Doc. No. 87 ), is GRANTED; and Defendants American Pavement Solutions, Inc. and Timothy Helstad's Joint Motion for a Protective Order (Doc. No. 94 ), is GRANTED, as stated on the record. The Court will issue a Protective Order in this case that conforms with Form 6 of the Local Rules. This Minute Order constitutes an Order of the Court. Text only order needed. NO SEPARATE ORDER TO BE ISSUED (Court Reporter n/a and Tape #11/27/12 (13:35 - 14:00)) (MMP) (Entered: 11/27/2012)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 11/20/2012, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE re 82 MOTION for Protective Order , 87 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 11/20/2012)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                              MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 99 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rose Paving Company. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by Rose Paving Company re 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Erin Sindberg Porter in SUPPORT OF 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rose Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-3)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Rose Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 99 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                        MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Rose Paving Company. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE by Rose Paving Company re 82 MOTION for Protective Order , 83 Notice (Other), 91 Declaration, 84 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 90 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 88 Notice of Hearing on Motion, 87 MOTION for Protective Order , 85 Affidavit in Support of Motion OF JOINDER TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 11/16/2012, Entered: None
                                                            ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Rose Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1-3) (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 11/16/2012)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 94 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Dworak, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 94 Joint MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Dworak, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  Joint MOTION for Protective Order by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Dworak, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2012)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson Amended (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 11/14/2012, Entered: None
                                                                      AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 84 Memorandum in Support, 85 Affidavit of Leah K. Flygare by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson . (Fisher, Bradley) Modified on 11/14/2012 (jz). (Entered: 11/14/2012)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                        DECLARATION of DAVID E. DURCHFORT by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company . (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support re 87 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 87 Motion for Protective Order filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 87 MOTION for Protective Order : Motion Hearing set for 11/27/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 82 Motion for Protective Order filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Leah K. Flygare in SUPPORT OF 82 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM in Support re 82 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 11/13/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson of Motion for a Protective Order Motion hearing set before the Honorable Jeffrey J. Keyes, Magistrate Judge, in Courtroom 6A, United States District Court, 646 Warren E. Burger Federal Courthouse, 316 N. Robert Street, St. Paul, MN 55101 (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) Modified on 11/8/2012 (jz). (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          MOTION for Protective Order by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 11/08/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                            TEXT ENTRY NOTICE: The Court has received correspondence dated November 2, 2012, from Defendant Rose Paving Company 80 . The Court will issue no response to the letter. (CBC) (Entered: 11/05/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                              LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Rose Paving Company . (Luger, Andrew) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/2/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 44 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V MOTION for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Walker, Ted) (Entered: 11/02/2012)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 11/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 11/01/2012)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                    NOTICE of Withdrawal as Attorney for Defendant Rose Paving Company (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Rolin L. Cargill III by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                        REPLY re 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 12/31/2012. Discovery due by 10/31/2013. Motions (non-disp) due 12/31/2013. Motions (disp) due by 3/1/2014. Ready for trial due by 7/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/31/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            Minute Entry: Pretrial scheduling conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/31/2012. Pretrial Scheduling Order to be issued. (MMP) (Entered: 10/31/2012)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint, 39 MOTION to Dismiss/General Count One of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing set for 1/10/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 12W (MPLS) before Judge Joan N. Ericksen. (Dworak, Paul) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for R. Douglas Rees by Rose Paving Company. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Rose Paving Company. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Erin Sindberg Porter on behalf of Rose Paving Company. (Sindberg Porter, Erin) (Entered: 10/30/2012)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      EXHIBIT to Reply to Taget Corporation's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss or Motion for Summary Judgment by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Ex 1, # 2 Ex 2, # 3 Ex 3). (Walker, Ted) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (lmb). (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        REPLY re 42 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 44 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Ted) (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-DUPLICATE ENTRY-REPLACED BY #67 REPLY re 42 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 44 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate, # 2 Attachment Filed in Error-Exhibit(s) Exhibits List, # 3 Attachment Filed in Error-Exhibit(s) Ex 1, # 4 Attachment Filed in Error-Exhibit(s) Ex 2, # 5 Exhibit(s) Ex 3)(Walker, Ted) Modified text on 10/29/2012 (jz). Modified on 10/29/2012 (jz). (Entered: 10/29/2012)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Target Corporation, American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad, Leslie J. Bailey, LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC, Asphalt Maintenace Inc., James Stinson, Rose Paving Company, United Paving Company, Sabas Trujillo.(Weinberg, Michelle) Modified filers on 10/29/2012 (jz). (Entered: 10/26/2012)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Weinberg in OPPOSITION TO 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-F)(Weinberg, Michelle) Modified text on 10/19/2012 (jz). (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 10/19/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Weinberg in OPPOSITION TO 44 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-F)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 44 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 10/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. This case is reassigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen. Judge Richard H. Kyle no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 12cv1912 JNE/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JME) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/15/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER for Disqualification and for Reassignment. Signed by Judge Richard H. Kyle on 10/15/12. (kll) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT of Michelle Weinberg in OPPOSITION TO 36 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) A-E)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/11/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 10/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/9/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge John R. Tunheim recused. Case reassigned to Judge Richard H. Kyle for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12cv1912 RHK/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/9/2012. (JME) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 36 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Rose Paving Company. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 36 MOTION to Dismiss/General : at date and time to be determined. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    LR7.1/LR72.2 WORD COUNT COMPLIANCE CERTIFICATE by Rose Paving Company re 37 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Rose Paving Company. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 10/08/2012)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      ANSWER to Amended Complaint by LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC. (Thompson, Lucas) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Leslie J. Bailey. (Thompson, Lucas) (Entered: 10/01/2012)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 44 Motion to Dismiss/General, Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Flygare, Leah) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Leah K Flygare on behalf of Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Flygare, Leah) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 45 Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five : at date and time to be determined. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 45 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts One, Four, and Five by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 09/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General Counts I, IV and V, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Walker, Ted) (Entered: 09/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson re 41 MOTION to Dismiss/General 12(b)(6) and 9(b) MOTION for Summary Judgment . Date and time to be determined. (Walker, Ted) Modified text on 9/27/2012 (jz). (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support and Certificate of Service re 41 MOTION to Dismiss/General 12(b)(6) and 9(b) MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Walker, Ted) Modified on 9/27/2012 (jz). (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General 12(b)(6) and 9(b), MOTION for Summary Judgment and Certificate of Service by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Walker, Ted) Modified on 9/27/2012 (jz). (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              Joint and Separate ANSWER to Amended Complaint Subject to Motion to Dismiss by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 09/26/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Dismiss/General Count One of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/25/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY 35 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Birrell, Andrew) Modified text and link on 9/25/2012 (jz). (Entered: 09/25/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support re 36 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Rose Paving Company. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/20/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss/General by Rose Paving Company. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 09/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition re 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Target Corporation. (Weinberg, Michelle) (Entered: 09/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/31/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form)(MMP) (Entered: 09/11/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/5/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Asphalt Maintenance Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 09/05/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Dworak, Paul) (Entered: 09/04/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR ASPHALT MAINTENANCE AND JAMES STINSON TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Based on the Stipulation (Doc. No. 25 ) of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Asphalt Maintenance and James Stinson to Respond to Complaint is extended through and including September 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 08/31/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC. (Thompson, Lucas) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint by LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC. (Thompson, Lucas) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/31/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by Leslie J. Bailey. (Thompson, Lucas) (Entered: 08/31/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Asphalt Maintenance and James Stinson to Respond to Complaint by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., Target Corporation, James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) Modified filers on 8/30/2012 (jz). (Entered: 08/30/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR ROSE PAVING COMPANY TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Based on the Stipulation (Doc. No. 23 ) of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Rose Paving Company to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including September 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janie S. Mayeron on 08/28/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Rose Paving Company to Respond to Complaint by Rose Paving Company, Target Corporation. (Ferolie, Albert) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/28/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  *TEXT ONLY ENTRY* Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule: All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court and served on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion. Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed and served 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Judge Tunheims calendar clerk a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAM) (Entered: 08/28/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ON PROPOSED ORDER by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad re 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re 17 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM in Support re 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint filed by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 17 MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint : at date and time to be determined. (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2012, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss/General Joint Rule 12(b)(6) Motion To Dismiss Count One of Plaintiff's Complaint by American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/27/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Brian J. Stephenson. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3282596 by Rose Paving Company. (Halunen, Clayton) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Albert F. Ferolie. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-3282561 by Rose Paving Company. (Halunen, Clayton) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Adam R. Fracht by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Ted L. Walker by Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley D Fisher on behalf of Asphalt Maintenance Inc., James Stinson. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(Fisher, Bradley) (Entered: 08/24/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR UNITED PAVING COMPANY AND SABAS TRUJILLO TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: Based on the Stipulation (Doc. No. 10) of counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for United Paving Company and Sabas Trujillo to respond to the Complaint is extended through and including September 20, 2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 08/23/2012. (MMP) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/23/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION by Target Corporation, Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 08/23/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to 1 Complaint, Summons Issued United Paving Company and Sabas Trujillo Acknowledgement filed by Target Corporation. (Hartnett, James) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Target Corporation. American Pavement Solutions Inc. served on 8/6/2012, answer due 8/27/2012; Asphalt Maintenance Inc. served on 8/11/2012, answer due 9/4/2012; Leslie J. Bailey served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012; Timothy Helstad served on 8/6/2012, answer due 8/27/2012; LCH Pavement Consultants, LLC served on 8/9/2012, answer due 8/30/2012; Rose Paving Company served on 8/7/2012, answer due 8/28/2012; James Stinson served on 8/11/2012, answer due 9/4/2012; United Paving Company served on 8/6/2012, answer due 8/27/2012. (Hartnett, James) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/20/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for American Pavement Solutions Inc., Timothy Helstad. (Birrell, Andrew) (Entered: 08/20/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for David E. Durchfort by Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 08/17/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/15/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Rolin L Cargill on behalf of Sabas Trujillo, United Paving Company. (Cargill, Rolin) (Entered: 08/15/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12cv1912 JRT/JJK. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 8/8/2012. (JME) (Entered: 08/09/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau for all further proceedings. NOTE: the new case number is 12cv1912 JRT/SER. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/7/2012. (JME) (Entered: 08/07/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Plaintiff Target Corporation. (RMS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/3/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 4-66835) assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Master List referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (RMS) (Entered: 08/03/2012)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 352 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?