USA v. Taslakian
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:96-cr-10183

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/10/1999, Entered: 8/11/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
Judge Richard G. Stearns .Amended JUDGMENT entered Mark A. Taslakian (1) count(s) 1. One hundred and forty nine (149) days to be served. Twelve month (12) period of supervised release (previous term of supervised release having been revoked this date by the Court) with following special conditions: Sixty (60) days in home detention with electronic monitoring upon release from custody. Deft shall not purchase or possess a firearm or any other dangerous weapon. Deft shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of release from custody and 2 more periodic drug tests thereafter at the direction of the USPO. Participate in a substance abuse program at the direction of the USPO, which may include random drug testing to determine if the deft has reverted to the use of drugs, alcohol. Deft shall not incur any new creidt charges or open any new lines of credit without the prior approval of the USPO. Said term of supervised release shall run concurrent with the term of supervised release imposed in the Waltham District Court. Deft allowed to voluntary surrender to the designated institution by 9/7/99 before 2:00 p.m. (eaf)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/4/1999, Entered: 8/4/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    MOTION by USA , as to Mark A. Taslakian for correction of sentence , filed. (eaf)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 8/3/1999 Judgment*Court Filing
      Judge Richard G. Stearns . JUDGMENT entered Mark A. Taslakian (1) count(s) 1. Thirty (30) days to be served. Twelve month (12) period of supervised release (previous term of supervised release having been revoked this date by the Court) with following special conditions: Sixty (60) days in home detention with electronic monitoring upon release from custody. Deft shall not purchase or possess a firearm or any other dangerous weapon. Deft shall submit to one drug test within 15 days of release from custody and 2 more periodic drug tests thereafter at the direction of the USPO. Participate in a substance abuse program at the direction of the USPO, which may include random drug testing to determine if the deft has reverted to the use of drugs, alcohol. Deft shall not incur any new creidt charges or open any new lines of credit without the prior approval of the USPO. Said term of supervised release shall run concurrent with the term of supervised release imposed in the Waltham District Court. Deft allowed to voluntary surrender to the designated institution by 8/10/99 before 2:00 p.m. (eaf)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/27/1999, Entered: 7/28/1999 Sentencing Memorandum
        SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Mark A. Taslakian , filed. (eaf)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/19/1999, Entered: 5/24/1999 Set Deadlines
          NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Mark A. Taslakian, reset Probation Hearing for 11:00 6/25/99 for Mark A. Taslakian cc: all counsel of record. (eaf)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Affidavit
            AFFIDAVIT of William Marino, as to Mark A. Taslakian, filed. (eaf)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motion for Disclosure
              MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian for Disclosure of impeaching information related to witnesses who are cooperating with the Government for promises, rewards or inducements , filed. (eaf)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motion for Disclosure
                MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian for Disclosure of identity of Govt informant , filed. (eaf)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                  MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian for notice of intent , filed. (eaf)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motion to Continue
                    MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian to continue revocation hearing , filed. (eaf)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/18/1999, Entered: 3/18/1999 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian to stay supervised release revocation hearing, pending disposition of complaint in Waltham District Court , filed. (eaf)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/11/1999, Entered: 3/12/1999 Add and Terminate Attorneys
                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of as counsel for Mark A. Taslakian , filed. (eaf)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/1999, Entered: 3/5/1999 Summons Issued
                          Summons issued for Mark A. Taslakian. "to appear on 3/23/99 at 2:00 to answer a petition for hearing on revocation of supervised release....failure to appear will result in immediate issuance of an arrest warrant." cc: all counsel of record. (eaf)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/5/1997, Entered: 8/25/1997 Notice re passport
                            Copy of notice regarding passport from Pretrial Services to Director, Office of Citizenship, as to Mark A. Taslakian filed. Removal of notice of surrendered passport or order not to obtain passport (tmc)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/12/1997, Entered: 8/22/1997 Judgment*Court Filing
                              Judge Richard G. Stearns . JUDGMENT entered Mark A. Taslakian (1) count(s) 1. Twenty four (24) months probation with the following special conditions: Deft shall not purchase or possess a firearm or any other dangerous weapon. Deft shall pay a fine in the amount of $1,500., the balance of which shall be paid according to a schedule to be determined by the Chief USPO. Deft shall participate in a sustance abuse program as directed by USPO, which may include drug testing. Deft shall not incur any new credit charges or open any additional lines of credit without the approval of the USPO unless he is in compliance with the payment schedule. Deft shall provide access to any financial information. Deft shall pay a special assessment of $200. (eaf)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/28/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian to Modify Conditions of Release , filed. (eaf)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/1997, Entered: 4/30/1997 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                  MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian to Modify Conditions of Release , filed. (eaf)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/5/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Set Deadlines
                                    NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Mark A. Taslakian, set Change of Plea Hearing for 3:00 4/14/97 for Mark A. Taslakian (eaf)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                      Judge Richard G. Stearns . ORDER entered setting Conditions of Release for Mark A. Taslakian : The deft is placed in custody of Jane Taslakian 23 LLoyd Rd., Watertown, MA 02172. Travel restricted to MA and deft shall maintain residence at parents home at 23 LLoyd Rd., Watertown, MA. Avoid all contact in direct or direct with co deft. Curfew 7:00 p.m. to 6:00 a.m. Refrain form possessing a firearm...excessive use of alcohol...Obtain no passport. Notify PTS is any new arrests within 24 hours. Report in person to PTS each Wednesday between 8:30 a.m. and 12:00 noon. Telephone PTS each Monday & Friday between 8:30 a.m. and 12:00 noon. (eaf)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                        MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian for bail , filed. (eaf)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: 3/19/1997 Court Filing
                                          Judge Richard G. Stearns . CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian , re: bail hearing;, set Change of Plea Hearing for 3:00 3/12/97 for Mark A. Taslakian ; Court Reporter: J. Gibbons (eaf)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/1996, Entered: 12/11/1996 Court Filing
                                            Judge Richard G. Stearns . CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian , re: status conference held; Govts awaiting lab results,Case may be plea, set status conference for 2:30 1/9/97 for Mark A. Taslakian before Judge Richard G. Stearns ; Court Reporter: J.Gibbons (jdj)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/14/1996, Entered: 12/4/1996 Court Filing
                                              Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian, re: motion hearing; Hearing held on government's motion to revoke defendant's conditions of release. Goverment's evidence begins with witness #1 (Richard Guerard); Direct; Cross. Defendant's evidence begins. Defendant calls witness #2 (September Brown); Direct; Cross. Defendant calls witness #3 (Jane Taslakian); Defendent rests. Court finds Probable Cause of violation of conditions of release and orders the defendant detained pending trial. Government's motion to revoke is allowed. Court Reporter: Tape 96 (sat)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/1996, Entered: 11/22/1996 Set Deadlines
                                                NOTICE issued of Hearing/Conference as to Mark A. Taslakian, set status conference for 2:45 11/20/96 for Mark A. Taslakian cc: all counsel of record. (eaf)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: 11/14/1996 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  MOTION by USA , as to Mark A. Taslakian to revoke order of release , filed. (eaf)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Response to Motion
                                                    RESPONSE by USA as to Mark A. Taslakian re: [13-1] motion for discovery , filed. (eaf)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/22/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Motion for Discovery
                                                      MOTION by Mark A. Taslakian for discovery , filed. (eaf)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Court Filing
                                                        Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol. Standing ORDER re: discovery motions in a criminal case entered as to Mark A. Taslakian : . (eaf)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/31/1996, Entered: 9/17/1996 Court Filing
                                                          Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian , re: arraignment;, set Discovery Motions deadline to 8/22/96 for Mark A. Taslakian , set Discovery Motions Response deadline to 9/5/96 for Mark A. Taslakian Deft requests modification of release conditions, Cout grants deft's request Condition F Curfew of 10:30 pm. - 6:00 a.m. is no longer required. (eaf)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/27/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Indictment
                                                            INDICTMENT returned Mark A. Taslakian (1) count(s) 1 . (vah)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance of counsel for Mark A. Taslakian , by Attorney Stephen P. Heymann. [ 1:96-m -1052 ] (vah)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION PURSUANT TO BAIL REFORM ACT entered for detention as to Mark A. Taslakian Bond set to NO BAIL for Mark A. Taslakian. [ 1:96-m -1052 ] (vah)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/6/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Court Filing
                                                                  Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian , re: detention hearing; ; Court Reporter: Tape 96 [ 1:96-m -1052 ] (vah)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/3/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Court Filing
                                                                    Mag. Judge Zachary R. Karol . CLERK'S NOTES as to Mark A. Taslakian, Hagop Ajoyan , re: initial appearance; ; Court Reporter: TAPE [ 1:96-m -1052 ] (vah)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/31/1996, Entered: 7/1/1996 Complaint
                                                                      COMPLAINT as to Mark A. Taslakian, Hagop Ajoyan , filed. Pretrial Services [ 1:96-m -1052 ] (vah)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 344 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?