Personal Audio, LLC v. Ace Broadcasting Network, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-00014
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags
Last Updated July 29, 2017 at 3:07 PM DT (3.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Personal Audio LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Reyes Bartolomei Browne

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Papool S. Chaudhari +1 214 526 7900 +1 214 526 7910 papool@reyeslaw.com
v.
No Logo A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital", Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Doll Amir & Eley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gregory L Doll +1 310 557 9100 +1 310 557 9101 gdoll@dollamir.com

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bijal V Vakil +1 650 213 0303 +1 650 213 8158 bvakil@whitecase.com
No Logo Ace Broadcasting Network, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Lotzi Digital, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Nicole Mitchell, Mediator

Toggle Switch Represented by William M. Steger Federal Building

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Nicole Mitchell +1 903 590 1077 +1 903 590 1081
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (1) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/18/2014, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 48
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 45 Filed: 7/15/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator. Hon. Nicole Mitchell is hereby appointed as mediator in the above referenced case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 07/15/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 07/15/2014)
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/1/2014, Entered: None
            DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Alexander Lee on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Lee, John) Modified on 7/2/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 07/01/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/21/2014, Entered: None
              DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - FILED IN ERROR ANSWER to 12 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Personal Audio, LLC.(Chaudhari, Papool) Modified on 4/22/2014 (nkl, ). (Entered: 04/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER; adopting 41 Report and Recommendations, denying 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Personal Audio, LLC. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 3/31/14. (mrm, ) (Entered: 03/31/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/3/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Personal Audio, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 03/03/2014. (nkl, ) (Entered: 03/03/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/27/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher John Rourk on behalf of Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Rourk, Christopher) (Entered: 02/27/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/18/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital" Notice of Compliance (Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 02/18/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION. The above-captioned cases are hereby CONSOLIDATED for all pretrial issues (except venue) with the LEAD CASE to be Cause No. 2:13-cv-13. All parties are instructed to file any future filings (except relating to venue) in Lead Case 2:13cv13. Individual cases remain active for venue determinations and trial. The Court will enter one docket control order, one protective order, and one discovery order that will govern the entire consolidated case. The local rules page limitations for Markman briefs and other motions will apply to the consolidated case. To further promote judicial economy and to conserve the parties resources, the Court encourages the parties to file a notice with the court in the event that there are other related cases currently pending on the Courts docket that may also be appropriate for consolidation with this case. The parties shall meet and confer regarding any modifications to the docket control order and discovery order that may be necessary to accommodate consolidation of these cases.Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne on 01/02/14. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/04/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/23/2013, Entered: None
                          NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Personal Audio, LLC (P.R. 3-1 and 3-2 Disclosures) (Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 12/23/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/18/2013, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert Parke Latham on behalf of Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Latham, Robert) (Entered: 12/18/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2014 09:00 AM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap and the Honorable Roy Payne.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 12/2/13. (mrm, ) (Entered: 12/03/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/28/2013, Entered: None
                                SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of State Court Litigation or Drop Plaintiff's Claims Against Non-Existent Alleged Partnership filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 10/28/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None
                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 28 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of State Court Litigation or Drop Plaintiff's Claims Against Non-Existent Alleged Partnership filed by Lotzi Digital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of John M. Jackson, # 2 Exhibit A - Email 7/30/2013, # 3 Exhibit B - Email 8/1/2013)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/7/2013, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 28 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of State Court Litigation or Drop Plaintiff's Claims Against Non-Existent Alleged Partnership filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Jack) (Entered: 10/07/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital" (Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 30 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                        ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, by A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital".(Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bijal V Vakil on behalf of A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital" (Vakil, Bijal) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 28 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None
                                            MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of State Court Litigation or Drop Plaintiff's Claims Against Non-Existent Alleged Partnership by Lotzi Digital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - California State Court Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B - California State Court Answer, # 3 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Drop, # 4 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Stay)(Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None
                                            SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Lotzi Digital, Inc.. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 09/16/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None
                                              Defendant's Unopposed Third Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital".( Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital".( Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 09/06/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/3/2013, Entered: None
                                                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 09/03/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted filed by Lotzi Digital, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, John) (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jack Wesley Hill on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Hill, Jack) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Claire Abernathy Henry on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Henry, Claire) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward, Jr on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/16/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas John Ward on behalf of Personal Audio, LLC (Ward, Thomas) (Entered: 08/16/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Personal Audio, LLC (Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/13/2013, Entered: None
                                                                Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/13/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital" served on 7/15/2013, answer due 9/9/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 08/08/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital".( Doll, Gregory) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/5/2013, Entered: None Motion to Dismiss
                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Lotzi Digital, Inc.'s Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief can be Granted by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 08/05/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Blank 12 Filed: 7/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          ANSWER to 5 Amended Complaint, DEFENSES, COUNTERCLAIM against Personal Audio, LLC by Lotzi Digital, Inc..(Jackson, John) (Entered: 07/10/2013)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. Lotzi Digital, Inc. served on 5/20/2013, answer due 7/10/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 06/12/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Lotzi Digital, Inc..( Jackson, John) (Entered: 06/05/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew C Acosta on behalf of Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Acosta, Matthew) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John M Jackson on behalf of Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Jackson, John) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Folsom on behalf of Lotzi Digital, Inc. (Folsom, David) (Entered: 05/24/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                      SUMMONS Issued as to Lotzi Digital, Inc., and Partnership (Attachments: # 1 Partnership)(ehs, ) Modified on 5/10/2013 (sm, ). (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/10/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lotzi Digital, Inc., A Partnership Consisting of Adam Carolla, Donny Misraje, Kathee Schneider-Misraje, Sandy Ganz and Does 1-10, Inclusive dba "Ace Broadcasting" and/or "Carolla Digital", filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - US Patent 8,112,504, # 2 Exhibit B - Letter from Erin E. Brady, Esq.)(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 05/10/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Personal Audio, LLC. Ace Broadcasting Network, LLC served on 3/8/2013, answer due 3/29/2013. (ehs, ) (Entered: 03/27/2013)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                            SUMMONS Issued as to Ace Broadcasting Network, LLC. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/8/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                              ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Roy S. Payne. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 1/8/2013. (ch, ) (Entered: 01/08/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                COMPLAINT against Ace Broadcasting Network, LLC ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0540-3941637.), filed by Personal Audio, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A)(Chaudhari, Papool) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                                                LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 1,114 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?