USA v. Dahle Construction, LLC et al

Criminal Case Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:08-cr-00055
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated September 12, 2016 at 7:06 PM EDT (8.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Dahle Construction, LLC, Defendant

Represented by HOLDEN KIDWELL HAHN & CRAPO

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Donald L Harris +1 208 523 0620 +1 208 523 9518 dharris@holdenlegal.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert Lynn Harris +1 208 523 0620 +1 208 523 9518 rharris@holdenlegal.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/23/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
PROBATION REPORT as to Dahle Construction, LLC and Order discharging probation (Notice sent to USP). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2009, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Early Termination of Unsupervised Probation(Notice sent to USP) as to Kent C Dahle (2). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/1/2009, Entered: None
MOTION for Early Termination of Probation/Supervised Release (Notice sent to USP) by Dahle Construction, LLC, Kent C Dahle. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit of Kent C. Dahle)(Harris, Donald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Kent C Dahle (2), Count(s) 1, $25.Special Assess, $15,000.00 Fine, 1 yr un-supervised probation. (Notice sent to USP and USM). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/29/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
JUDGMENT as to Dahle Construction, LLC (1), Count(s) 1, $125. Special Assess, 1 yr. un-supervised Probation, $15,000.00 fine. (Notice sent to USP and USM). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks) (Entered: 09/30/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle:Sentencing held on 9/23/2008 for Dahle Construction, LLC (1), Count(s) 1, $125. Special Assess, 1 yr. un-supervised Probation, $15,000.00 fine.. (Notice sent to USP & USM) (Court Reporter pam fulwyler.) (lc) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/23/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle:Sentencing held on 9/23/2008 for Kent C Dahle (2), Count(s) 1, $25.Special Assess, $15,000.00 Fine, 1 yr un-supervised probation.. (Notice sent to USP & USM) (Court Reporter pam fulwyler.) (lc) (Entered: 09/26/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/17/2008, Entered: None
SENTENCING MEMORANDUM by Dahle Construction, LLC, Kent C Dahle (Notice sent to USP) (Harris, Donald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to Dahle Construction, LLC, Kent C Dahle granting 11 Stipulation to continue sentencing hearing filed by Dahle Construction, LLC, Kent C Dahle (Notice sent to USM), ( Sentencing reset for 9/23/2008 01:30 PM in Pocatello, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.). Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: None
STIPULATION to Vacate Trial Setting (Harris, Donald)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of sentencing date mileposts as to Dahle Construction, LLC (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: None
NOTICE of sentencing date mileposts as to Kent C Dahle (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle:Arraignment as to Dahle Construction, LLC (1) Count 1 held on 4/1/2008 Plea entered guilty (Notice sent to USP & USM), Initial Appearance as to Dahle Construction, LLC held on 4/1/2008 Plea entered guilty (Notice sent to USP & USM), Plea Agreement Hearing as to Dahle Construction, LLC held on 4/1/2008 (Notice sent to USP & USM), ( Sentencing set for 8/5/2008 09:01 AM in Pocatello, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.) (Court Reporter Pam Fulwyler.) (lc) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle:Arraignment as to Kent C Dahle (2) Count 1 held on 4/1/2008 Plea entered guilty (Notice sent to USP & USM), Initial Appearance as to Kent C Dahle held on 4/1/2008 Plea entered guilty (Notice sent to USP & USM), Plea Agreement Hearing as to Kent C Dahle held on 4/1/2008 (Notice sent to USP & USM), ( Sentencing set for 8/5/2008 09:00 AM in Pocatello, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle.) (Court Reporter Pam Fulwyler.) (lc) (Entered: 04/02/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
CONSENT BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN A MISDEMEANOR CASE by Kent C Dahle (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: None
CONSENT BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE IN A MISDEMEANOR CASE by Dahle Construction, LLC (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Kent C Dahle (Notice sent to USP) (Fica, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: None
PLEA AGREEMENT as to Dahle Construction, LLC (Notice sent to USP) (Fica, Michael)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Dahle Construction, LLC, Kent C Dahle (Notice sent to USP & USM) Arraignment, Initial Appearance, Plea Hearing set for 4/1/2008 09:30 AM in Pocatello, ID before Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: None
INFORMATION for Dahle Construction LLC (Notice sent to USP & USM) as to Dahle Construction, LLC (1) count(s) 1, Kent C Dahle (2) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet Dahle Construction, LLC, # 2 Information for Kent C. Dahle, # 3 Cover Sheet Kent Dahle (4) Sealed Service Information Sheets) (dks) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 111 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?