Dawn Brown v. Town of Cary
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 11-1480

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 22, 2016 at 4:46 AM DT (5.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00404059552 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
COURT ORDER filed directing supplemental briefing. Supplemental briefs due: 09/12/2012. [998928252] Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00403774488 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None
    BRIEF by Appellee Dawn D. Brown in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 02/23/2012. [998794848] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 2/27/2013, Entered: None
      Mandate issued. Referencing: [66] Judgment order , [65] Published Authored Opinion. Originating case number: 5:09-cv-00504-FL.. [11-1480] (JSN)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 2/19/2013, Entered: None
        COURT ORDER filed [999045725] denying Motion for rehearing and rehearing en banc [67]. Copies to all parties.. [11-1480] (JSN)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
          Mandate stayed by FRAP 41(d)(1).. [11-1480] (JSN)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
            PETITION for rehearing and rehearing en banc by Appellee Dawn D. Brown. [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
              JUDGMENT ORDER filed. Disposition method: 11-1480 opn.p.arg. Decision: Reversed and remanded. Originating case number: 5:09-cv-00504-FL. Entered on Docket Date: 01/22/2013. [999026425] Copies to all parties and the district court/agency.. [11-1480] (JSN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/22/2013, Entered: None
                PUBLISHED AUTHORED OPINION filed. Originating case number: 5:09-cv-00504-FL Paper copies to all parties and the district court/agency. [999026415]. [11-1480] (JSN)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                  Supplemental BRIEF by Appellant Town of Cary in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/12/2012. [998936834] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/12/2012, Entered: None
                    BRIEF by Appellee Dawn D. Brown in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Supplemental Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 09/12/2012. [998936504] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/30/2012, Entered: None
                      CORRECTED COURT ORDER filed directing supplemental briefing. Supplemental briefs due 09/12/2012. [998928459] Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/5/2012, Entered: None
                        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Dawn D. Brown. Counsel arguing: Mark R. Sigmon Answering argument time: 20 minutes [998888768] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                          ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee Dawn D. Brown. Counsel arguing: Mark R. Sigmon Answering argument time: 20 [998888301] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/3/2012, Entered: None
                            ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Town of Cary. [998888106] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None
                              CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 09/19/2012. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. [11-1480] (JLE)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/27/2012, Entered: None
                                SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITIES (FRAP 28(j)) by Appellant Town of Cary. [998884588]. [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/18/2012, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Christopher A. Brook for William David Bowden and Dawn D. Brown.[998876986] [11-1480] Christopher Brook
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/12/2012, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Appellee Dawn D. Brown. Argument Session: 9/18/12 to 9/21/12 Days you are available: 9/18/12 and 9/19/12 Other scheduling information: Undersigned Counsel is unavailable on 9/20/12 and 9/21/12 due to international travel. [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None
                                      CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 9/18/12 - 9/21/12 argument session. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 06/18/2012 [11-1480] (JLC)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/29/2012, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE re: Substitution of Counsel by Dawn D. Brown. [11-1480] Katherine Parker
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF by Appellant Town of Cary in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Reply. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/19/2012. [998813404] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/5/2012, Entered: None
                                            Corrected BRIEF by Appellee Dawn D. Brown in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Response. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/05/2012. [998802269] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/2/2012, Entered: None
                                              ORDER filed [998801649] granting Motion to amend/correct [42], updating/ resumingcorrected brief deadlines Corrected brief in electronic and paper form due 03/07/2012. Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                MOTION by Appellee Dawn D. Brown to amend/correct Brief of Appellee. Date and method of service: 03/01/2012 ecf [998801117] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                  ORDER filed [998800826] granting Motion to file amicus curiae brief [37] Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                    AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Potential Amicus Curiae North Carolina Institute for Constitutional Law in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 03/01/2012. [998800785] [11-1480] Jeanette Doran
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Potential Amicus Curiae North Carolina Institute for Constitutional Law. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998800460] [11-1480] Jeanette Doran
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jeanette K. Doran for North Carolina Institute for Constitutional Law.[998800459] [11-1480] Jeanette Doran
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/1/2012, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION by to file amicus curiae brief (FRAP 29(e)) with consent of all parties on appeal within time allowed by FRAP 29(e).. Date and method of service: 03/01/2012 ecf [998800456] [11-1480] Jeanette Doran
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER filed [998765570] granting Motion to extend filing time [33], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 02/24/2012. Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION by Appellee Dawn D. Brown to extend filing time for response brief. Date and method of service: 01/13/2012 ecf [998765378] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Amicus Supporting Appellant The North Carolina League of Municipalities. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998764742] [11-1480] Patrick Flanagan
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/13/2012, Entered: None
                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Patrick H. Flanagan for The North Carolina League of Municipalities.[998764737] [11-1480] Patrick Flanagan
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/30/2011, Entered: None
                                                                    AMICUS CURIAE/INTERVENOR BRIEF by Appellant Town of Cary in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Amicus Curiae. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/30/2011. [998755206] [11-1480] Patrick Flanagan
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by William D. Brinton for Town of Cary.[998752264] [11-1480] William Brinton
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                        BRIEF by Appellant Town of Cary in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: Opening. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 12/23/2011. [998751837] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF PAPER FILING by Appellant Town of Cary. Type of paper document filed: appendix Date paper copies mailed, dispatched or delivered to court: 12/23/2011 Method of filing paper copies: hand delivery [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER filed [998730118] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 12/23/2011, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 12/23/2011. Response brief due 01/25/2012. Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                              ORDER filed [998704584] granting Motion to extend filing time [21], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 11/28/2011. Response brief due 01/03/2012. Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                MOTION by Appellant Town of Cary to extend filing time for opening brief and appendix. Date and method of service: 10/19/2011 ecf [998704453] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                  ORDER filed [998656448] granting Motion to substitute party (FRAP 43) [17]. Dawn D. Brown substituted for William David Bowden. Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                    RESPONSE/ANSWER by Appellant Town of Cary to approve/authorize Motion to Substitute. Date and method of service: 08/15/2011 ecf [998655322] [11-1480]--[Edited 08/16/2011 by JSN] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/15/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                      NOTICE ISSUED to Ms. Lisa Carol Glover for Town of Cary and Elizabeth A. Martineau for Town of Cary requesting response to Motion to substitute party (FRAP 43) [17]Response due: 08/26/2011.[998654626].. [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION by Appellee William David Bowden to substitute party (FRAP 43) Name of New Party: Dawn D. Brown, Administratrix of the Estate of William David Bowden.. Date and method of service: 08/12/2010 ecf [998654035] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE re: Statement Noting Plaintiff-Appelle's Death by William David Bowden. [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/29/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                            ORDER filed [998643254] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 10/28/2011, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 10/28/2011. Response brief due 11/30/2011 Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                              ORDER filed [998605461] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 8/29/2011, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 08/29/2011. Response brief due 10/03/2011 Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/3/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                ORDER filed [998605020] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 6/28/2011, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/28/2011. Response brief due 08/01/2011 Copies to all parties... [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/24/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Initial mediation conference scheduled. [11-1480] (LP)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/23/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Town of Cary. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998595948] [11-1480] (JJQ)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                      DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Appellant Town of Cary re: filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1) Disclosure statement due from Town of Cary on 05/31/2011.. [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/20/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Katherine Lewis Parker for William David Bowden.[998594576] [11-1480] Katherine Parker
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee William David Bowden. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [998593158] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/19/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) for William David Bowden.[998593151] [11-1480] Mark Sigmon
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                              DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Town of Cary. [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Lisa Glover for Town of Cary.[998592678] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/18/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Elizabeth A. Martineau for Town of Cary.[998592676] [11-1480] Elizabeth Martineau
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 06/15/2011. Response Brief due 07/18/2011 [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 5:09-cv-00504-FL.. [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2011, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Case docketed. Originating case number: 5:09-cv-00504-FL. Case manager: JeffNeal. Date notice of appeal filed: 05/05/2011 [11-1480] (JSN)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                          Space Space

                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 178 times.

                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?