Anderson v. United Recovery Systems, LP

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 4:12-cv-00486
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated August 3, 2017 at 1:23 PM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Phillip L Anderson, Plaintiff

Represented by PO Box 327

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Phillip L Anderson +1 208 201 0632
v.
No Logo United Recovery Systems, LP, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Judgment*
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/6/2013, Entered: 11/6/2013 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/11/2013, Entered: 10/11/2013 Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 8 Report and Recommendations.; finding as moot 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 3 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Blank 11 Filed: 8/8/2013, Entered: 8/8/2013 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ; adopting 8 Report and Recommendations.; finding as moot 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 3 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Amended Complaint
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/1/2013, Entered: 8/2/2013 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Report and Recommendations
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/27/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/26/2013, Entered: 6/27/2013 Request for Reassignment Filed AND Reassignment of Case
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Phillip L Anderson re 2 Complaint (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
ORDER of Conditional Filing - (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of a Motion to Seal In Forma Pauperis Document.by Plaintiff Phillip L Anderson. Responses due by 10/15/2012 (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against United Recovery Systems, LP, filed by Phillip L Anderson. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons)(krb)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/19/2012, Entered: None
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Phillip L Anderson. Responses due by 10/15/2012 (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 44 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?